Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4196 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17602 Week
» 70618 Month
» 190145 Year
» 3216998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Malvern (MR)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Malvern (MR) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 4M | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | 4b | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M4M | 01/01/1923 | 14/09/1931 |
|
Date Opened |
16/05/1864 |
Date Closed |
14/09/1931 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 16/05/1864 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 4M | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 4b | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M4M | 14/09/1931 | Depot closed |
|
|
|