Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 611 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18414 Week
» 71430 Month
» 190957 Year
» 3217810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Redditch
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Redditch |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 3R | 1872 | 31/12/1910 | 3c | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M3R | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 21a | 01/01/1923 | 31/08/1963 | 2e | 01/09/1963 | 07/06/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
1872 |
Date Closed |
01/06/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1872 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 3R | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 3c | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M3R | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 21a | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 2e | 01/06/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|