Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15669 Week
» 68685 Month
» 188212 Year
» 3215065 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Walsall Pleck
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Walsall Pleck |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 3W | 1880 | 31/12/1910 | 3b | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M3W | 01/01/1923 | 02/09/1925 |
|
Date Opened |
1880 |
Date Closed |
02/09/1925 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1880 | Depot opened | 1880 | Change of code to 3W | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 3b | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M3W | 02/09/1925 | Depot closed |
|
|
|