Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 609 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18412 Week
» 71428 Month
» 190955 Year
» 3217808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Blackpool Central
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Blackpool Central |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 24E | 1875 | 31/05/1950 | 28A | 01/06/1950 | 31/03/1952 | 24E | 01/04/1952 | 31/08/1963 | 10B | 01/09/1963 | 30/11/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
Central Shed.
The shed is on the east side of the line south of Blackpool Central
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the Central Station, and left again along the
Promenade. After going some distance turn left into Rigby Road.
The shed entrance is on the right hand side, just past the railway over
bridge. Walking time 20 minutes.
A tram labelled Squires Gate runs along the Promenade to Rigby
Road.
North Shed.
The shed is on the north side of the line east of the North Station
(Talbot Road Station). The shed yard is not visible from the line.
Turn right outside Blackpool North Station, and first right into
Queen Street. Turn left into High Street, and right into Pleasant
Street. Bear left at the end of this street, and turn right into Ashburton
Road. A path runs between two-blocks of houses on the right hand side
of this road to the shed (about 100 yards from the turning). Walking
time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 24E | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 28A | 01/04/1952 | Change of code to 24E | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 10B |
|
|
|