Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 560 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13966 Week
» 66982 Month
» 186509 Year
» 3213362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Birmingham Division
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Birmingham Division |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | D02 | 18/04/1966 | 05/05/1973 |
|
Date Opened |
16/01/1965 |
Information |
Tyseley - Wolverhampton - Walsall - (On and from January 16th 1965 all Midland Division Main Line Diesel locomotives ceased to be allocated to specific depots and were reallocated to Divisions or under the control of the Line Power Controller at Derby) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 16/01/1965 | Depot opened | 18/04/1966 | Change of code to D02 |
|
|
|