Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14178 Week
» 67194 Month
» 186721 Year
» 3213574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Worcester
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Worcester |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | WOS (215) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 85A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | WS | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Closed |
1985 |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
WORCESTER |
Information |
SO85705555 |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the triangle of the Shrub Hill-Foregate Street-Droitwich lines. The yard is partially visible from all three lines.
From Shrub Hill Station.
Turn right outside Worcester Shrub Hill Station along a narrow
footpath running parallel to the railway. Go down the steps at the end of
the path, and turn left into Tolladine Road. Another footpath leads from
the right hand side of this road (about 50 yards further on) to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
From Foregate Street Station.
Turn left outside Worcester Foregate Street Station into Foregate
Street. Turn left into Sansome Street and continue into Lowesmoor. Fork
right into Lowesmoor Place, and continue into Tolladine Road. A footpath leads. to the shed from the left hand side of this road just before
the railway overbridge. Walking time 15 minutes.
Note. The works are on the opposite side of the line to the shed,
and the entrance is in Tolladine Road. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 215 | 1875 | Change of code to WOS | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 85A | 12/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to WS | 1985 | Depot closed |
|
|
|