Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1861 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15267 Week
» 68283 Month
» 187810 Year
» 3214663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Swindon
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Swindon |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SDN (132) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 82C | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | SW | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1842 |
Date Closed |
10/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
BRISTOL |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the Gloucester line west of the station. The yard is visible from the line. Turn right outside Swindon Junction Station along Station Road. Continue into Sheppard Street and London Street. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand side. Walking time 10 minutes. Note:- This gate is the official entrance to both the works and the shed. A tunnel leads to the shed buildings. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 132 | 1875 | Change of code to SDN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 82C | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to SW |
|
|
|