Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2570 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15976 Week
» 68992 Month
» 188519 Year
» 3215372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 33 | 06/01/1882 | 31/12/1922 | W33 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 4B | 01/01/1923 | 31/12/1948 | 87K | 01/02/1950 | 31/07/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
06/01/1882 |
Date Closed |
31/08/1959 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
WR |
1947 Directions |
The Shed is on the south side of the line west of Swansea Victoria Station. Turn left outside Swansea Victoria Station along Victoria Road, changing to Oystermouth Road, and turn left into Paxton Street. The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past the railway over-bridge. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 4B | 06/01/1882 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 87K | 31/08/1959 | Depot closed |
|
|
|