Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1670 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19473 Week
» 72489 Month
» 192016 Year
» 3218869 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Stourbridge Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Stourbridge Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | STB (154) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 84F | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 2C | 01/09/1963 | 11/07/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
1870 |
Date Closed |
11/07/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
GWR Division |
WOLVERHAMPTON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Wolverhampton line north of
Stourbridge Junction Station. The yard is visible from the line.
From Stourbridge Junction Station.
Turn right outside Stourbridge Junction Station along the approach
road. Turn left into Brook Road, and right into Red Hill. Continue
along Church Road and High Street through the town, into Stourbridge
Road. Turn left into a broad cinder path between a level crossing and
the gas works. Bear left up a bank, and the shed entrance is on the
right hand side. Walking time 30 minutes.
From Stourbridge Town Station.
Turn left out of the yard in front of Stourbridge Town Station into
Foster Street, and turn right into High Street. Then follow the directions as given above. Walking time 20 minutes.
Note. The shed consists of two separate buildings. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1870 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 154 | 1875 | Change of code to STB | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 84F | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 2C | 11/07/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|