Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 373 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 14099 Month
» 330330 Year
» 841432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southport


Depot Details
Depot Name Southport
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
23C01/02/193531/05/1950
27C01/06/195031/08/1963
8M01/09/196306/06/1966
Date Opened 03/1890
Date Closed 06/06/1966
Pre Grouping Company LYR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line east of Southport Chapel Street Station. The yard is not, visible from the line.

Turn right outside Southport Chapel Street Station into Chapel Street, and first right into London Street. Turn left into Derby Road. The goods yard entrance is on the right hand side, and a path leads to the shed from this entrance. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
03/1890Depot opened
01/01/1935Change of code to 23C
01/06/1950Change of code to 27C
01/09/1963Change of code to 8M
06/06/1966Depot closed