Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18272 Week
» 71288 Month
» 190815 Year
» 3217668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Rhyl
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Rhyl |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 38R | 04/1899 | 31/12/1922 | W38R | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 7D | 01/01/1923 | 29/02/1952 | 6K | 01/03/1952 | 11/02/1963 |
|
Date Closed |
11/02/1963 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 04/1899 | Change of code to 38R | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to W38R | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 7D | 01/03/1952 | Change of code to 6K | 11/02/1963 | Depot closed |
|
|
|