Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 783 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14189 Week
» 67205 Month
» 186732 Year
» 3213585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Penzance
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Penzance |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | PZ (153) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 83G | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 84D | 01/09/1963 | 05/05/1973 | PZ | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
NEWTON ABBOT |
Information |
SW49323130 |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line mid-way between Marazion
and Penzance Stations. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn sharp right outside Penzance Station along the main road to
the east (A30). The shed entrance is on the right-hand side. Walking
time 15 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 153 | 1875 | Change of code to PZ | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 83G | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 84D | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to PZ |
|
|
|