Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17866 Week
» 70882 Month
» 190409 Year
» 3217262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Oxford
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Oxford |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | OXF (111) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 81F | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | OX | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
01/04/1854 |
Date Closed |
03/01/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
OWWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
LONDON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station.
The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right out of the yard on the down (west) side of the station. Continue into Cripley Road, and then Abbey Street (cul-de-sac). Turn left along a cinder path at the end, and then right over the canal footbridge. Turn right along the towing path, and the shed entrance is about 20 yards further on the left. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/04/1854 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 111 | 1875 | Change of code to OXF | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 81F | 03/01/1966 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to OX |
|
|
|