Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 921 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6526 Week
» 18073 Month
» 417755 Year
» 494342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Neasden


Depot Details
Depot Name Neasden
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
NEA187531/01/1950
34E01/02/195031/01/1958
14D01/02/195831/05/1962
Date Opened 15/03/1899
Date Closed 18/06/1962
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line west of Neasden L.P.T.B. Station. The top of the yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Neasden L.P.T.B. Station along Neasden Lane. Turn right along a cinder path just before the railway over-bridge. Continue under a railway bridge, and this path leads to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Note. There is also an entrance in North Circular Road.
See also under London.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to NEA
15/03/1899Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 34E
01/02/1958Change of code to 14D
18/06/1962Depot closed