Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Kirkby in Ashfield
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16C | 1875 | 30/09/1955 | 16B | 01/10/1955 | 31/08/1963 | 16E | 01/09/1963 | 03/10/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
1890 |
Date Closed |
03/10/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line north of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left along Station Road at the south end of the station. Turn
left into Low Moor Road North, and the shed entrance is on the left hand
side. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 16C | 1890 | Depot opened | 01/10/1955 | Change of code to 16B | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 16E | 03/10/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|