Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1563 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19366 Week
» 72382 Month
» 191909 Year
» 3218762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Helensburgh
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Helensburgh |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | Pkd | 11/08/1894 | 31/01/1950 | 65H | 01/02/1950 | 31/10/1961 |
|
Date Opened |
11/08/1894 |
Date Closed |
30/09/1961 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NBR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
SCR |
Information |
The depot closed on 7th November, 1960 but due to a failure of the new Glasgow Suburban Electric Trains it was reopened as an emergency measure on 18th December, 1960 before final closure as stipulated above. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the north side of Helensburgh (terminal) Station.
The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn right at the back of the station, and bear right around the
perimeter of the goods yard to the shed. Walking time less than 5
minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 11/08/1894 | Depot opened | 11/08/1894 | Change of code to Pkd | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 65H | 30/09/1961 | Depot closed |
|
|
|