Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2365 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15771 Week
» 68787 Month
» 188314 Year
» 3215167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Grangemouth
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Grangemouth |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 28C | 1870 | 31/12/1939 | 31D | 01/01/1940 | 31/01/1950 | 65F | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | GM | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1870 |
Date Closed |
1993 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
SCR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line about l¼ miles south of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Grangemouth Station along the main road to
Falkirk, and continue along this road for about a mile. Cross the Stirling-Linlithgow road, and turn next left along a lane. The shed entrance
is on the left hand side. Walking time 25 minutes.
The Grangemouth-Falkirk bus services pass the station and the end of the lane. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 31D | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 65F | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to GM |
|
|
|