Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3636 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17042 Week
» 70058 Month
» 189585 Year
» 3216438 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Dundee West
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Dundee West |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29C | 1884 | 31/01/1950 | 62B | 01/04/1967 | 05/05/1973 | DE | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1885 |
Date Closed |
1958 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line, west of Dundee West
Station. The yard is visible from the line and from the L.N.E. main
line.
Turn left outside Dundee West or Tay Bridge Stations along Union
Street. Turn left into Nethergate, and fork left into Magdalen Yard
Road. A broad path leads from the left hand side of this road to the
shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/04/1967 | Change of code to 62B | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to DE |
|
|
|