Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Consett
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Consett |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CON | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 54D | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 52K | 01/10/1958 | 30/04/1965 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is situated at Consett junction, in the fork of the Blackhill-Consett and Blackhill-Bishop Auckland and Durham lines. The yard is visible from both of these lines.
Turn right outside Consett Station into Delves Lane, and continue
to the cross roads in the centre of the town. Turn left here into Front
Street, continue for about three-quarters of a mile, crossing an ironworks level-crossing en route. Cross the bridge over several L.N.E.
and ironworks lines. A few yards after the railway bridge a path will
be seen on the left-hand side leading through some allotments. Continue
along this path for about 10 yards, from where a boarded crossing over
four lines leads to the shed. Walking time 30 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to CON | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 54D | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 52K |
|
|
|