Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4239 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17645 Week
» 70661 Month
» 190188 Year
» 3217041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Carnforth
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Carnforth |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 11A | 01/01/1923 | 31/03/1958 | 24L | 01/04/1958 | 31/08/1963 | 10A | 01/09/1963 | 05/08/1968 |
|
Date Closed |
05/08/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Barrow line north west of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station into Warton Road, and after about 150
yards left again over a footbridge. This leads to the shed. Walking
time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 11A | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 24L | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 10A | 05/08/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|