Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17050 Week
» 70066 Month
» 189593 Year
» 3216446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Buxton (LNWR)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16B | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W16B | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 9D | 01/01/1923 | 31/08/1963 | 9L | 01/09/1963 | 04/03/1968 | BX | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1892 |
Date Closed |
04/03/1968 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
MR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the L.N.W. Stockport line north of
the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside Buxton Western Station, or right outside Buxton
Midland Station into the approach road. Continue through the large
gates and along the goods yard road. Turn left at the end into Charles Street.
Turn left into Lightwood Road, and right just before the railway
overbridge into Hogshaw Villas Road. Turn left almost immediately
into an opening. Go through the gate at the end, and turn right along
a cinder path. This leads along the top of an embankment to the shed.
Walking time 15 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 9D | 1892 | Depot opened | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 9L | 04/03/1968 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to BX |
|
|
|