Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1104 Yesterday
» 3334 Week
» 33624 Month
» 336814 Year
» 1558379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Brighton


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Brighton Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Electric Class 70 C-C CC1       on 26/07/1941 (New) BTN 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Electric Class 70 C-C CC2       on 01/01/1948 BTN 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam P 0-6-0T 1178       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam P 0-6-0T 1557       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 21/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1890       on 01/01/1948 BTN 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1891       on 01/01/1948 BTN 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1892       on 01/01/1948 BTN 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1893       on 01/01/1948 BTN 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1894       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1900       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 17/06/1950 75B Redhill
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 2037       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 2038       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 2039       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Greybacks 4-4-0 2043       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greybacks 4-4-0 2056       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greybacks 4-4-0 2060       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greybacks 4-4-0 2071       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greybacks 4-4-0 2072       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 01/12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2084       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 03/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2086       on 01/01/1948 BTN on 06/10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2088       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2122       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2127       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2139       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D Fratton
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 2235       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2339       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 10/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2340       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2341       on 01/01/1948 BTN on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2342       on 01/01/1948 BTN on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2343       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 06/11/1954 70F Fratton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2344       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 20/08/1954 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2345       on 01/01/1948 BTN 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2346       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2347       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2368       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2372       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2376       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2385       on 01/01/1948 BTN 8w/e 07/10/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2386       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 21/01/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam D3X 0-4-4T 2397       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2437       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 22/03/1958 70B Feltham
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2438       on 01/01/1948 BTN 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2443       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 27/07/1951 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2470       on 01/01/1948 BTN 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2471       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 21/01/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2486       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2491       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 10/10/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2505       on 01/01/1948 BTN 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D Fratton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2513       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 14/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2514       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2523       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2528       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2539       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 08/12/1950 75D Horsham
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2543       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 12/05/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2546       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 29/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2558       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 08/02/1954 71C Dorchester
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2566       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 25/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2567       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 2576       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 12/05/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2577       on 01/01/1948 BTN w/e 24/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2583       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 06/10/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2587       on 01/01/1948 BTN 4w/e 09/09/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2606       on 01/01/1948 BTN m/e 08/1956 Withdrawn
Electric Class 70 C-C 20003       m/e 09/1948 (New) BTN 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 70878       4w/e 30/06/1949 BTN 4w/e 17/06/1950 91M To London Midland Region
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32346 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32349 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32142 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 09/09/1950 75A m/e 11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 32002 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 32325 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A w/e 30/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 32326 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A w/e 02/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32402 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 08/12/1950 75G Eastbourne
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32421 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32422 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32424 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32434 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 6w/e 20/03/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32534 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32538 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 6w/e 20/03/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34035 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32348 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A 6w/e 20/03/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32425 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32426 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32496 4w/e 30/06/1949 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32523 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31870 4w/e 13/11/1950 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31871 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32037 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32038 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32145 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A w/e 02/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32337 4w/e 07/10/1950 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 11/12/1954 70F Fratton
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32406 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 05/02/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32523 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32537 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32588 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A 4w/e 05/02/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam P 0-6-0T 31325 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A 9w/e 12/06/1957 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A 6w/e 20/03/1951 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 4w/e 07/10/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A 6w/e 20/03/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32147 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32338 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32340 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42085       on 27/02/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42086       on 10/03/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42087       on 17/03/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31895 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32169 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32378 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42088       on 30/03/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42089       on 06/04/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32170 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 11/04/1951 75A 6w/e 20/04/1955 75D Horsham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42090       on 15/04/1951 (New) 75A 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42091       on 25/04/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42092       on 03/05/1951 (New) 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E Three Bridges
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31895 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32169 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32378 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A on 07/08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32421 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32422 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32424 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32425 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32426 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32440 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 2w/e 13/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32441 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 5w/e 18/03/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32442 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A m/e 03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32506 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32511 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32539 4w/e 08/12/1950 75D Horsham 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32540 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A m/e 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D Fratton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42086 on 10/03/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42087 on 17/03/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42093       on 22/05/1951 (New) 75A 9w/e 30/06/1952 75E Three Bridges
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31896 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32023 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A w/e 28/07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32168 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A 4w/e 29/10/1953 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34045 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A 3w/e 13/10/1958 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34046 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A w/e 11/03/1959 71B Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34047 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A 3w/e 13/10/1958 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34048 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A w/e 11/03/1959 71B Bournemouth
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32646 4w/e 30/06/1949 FRA Fratton 6w/e 05/09/1951 75A 5w/e 24/08/1953 71D Fratton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31631 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A 9w/e 30/06/1952 71C Dorchester
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31638 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A 5w/e 14/02/1953 75B Redhill
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32346 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E Three Bridges
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32496 4w/e 12/05/1951 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80017 on 08/10/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 75G Eastbourne
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80018 on 13/10/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A 4w/e 19/03/1952 75G Eastbourne
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80019       4w/e 21/01/1952 75A 9w/e 30/06/1952 75G Eastbourne
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32091 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32167 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A w/e 01/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32515 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A w/e 20/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42103 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42105 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80031       on 02/02/1952 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80032       on 04/03/1952 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80033       on 18/03/1952 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80016 on 20/09/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 19/03/1952 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32166 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A 6w/e 20/04/1955 75D Horsham
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 32401 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A m/e 08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 32570 4w/e 21/01/1952 75D Horsham 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A 6w/e 13/08/1952 75D Horsham
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 32586 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32587 4w/e 06/10/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A 4w/e 10/12/1953 70D Basingstoke
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34039 4w/e 19/05/1951 30A Stratford 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A w/e 11/03/1959 71B Bournemouth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42104 on 20/09/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42106 4w/e 05/02/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32425 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32426 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32421 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A w/e 25/08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32422 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A 4w/e 26/05/1953 75A Brighton
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32425 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32426 6w/e 13/08/1952 75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A w/e 25/08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2485 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A w/e 07/12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32518 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A w/e 04/06/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32585 7w/e 27/06/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A m/e 06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32588 4w/e 05/02/1951 75G Eastbourne 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A w/e 12/12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 6w/e 13/08/1952 74E St Leonards 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A 8w/e 13/05/1954 71D Fratton
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32165 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 11/12/1952 75A 6w/e 20/04/1955 75D Horsham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80019 8w/e 07/10/1952 75B Redhill 5w/e 14/02/1953 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 32390 4w/e 08/12/1950 74E St Leonards 5w/e 14/02/1953 75A w/e 01/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 5w/e 11/12/1952 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30950 5w/e 14/02/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 4w/e 06/11/1954 74D Tonbridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42068 on 20/10/1950 74B Ramsgate (New) 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 4w/e 26/05/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42075 on 30/11/1950 74C Dover Marine (New) 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42077 on 14/12/1950 74C Dover Marine (New) 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42082 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A 8w/e 20/07/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Atlantics 4-4-2 32422 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton 4w/e 26/05/1953 75A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30051 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A 4w/e 01/10/1953 75D Horsham
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30052 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E Three Bridges
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30053 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30129 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32573 4w/e 06/10/1951 75D Horsham 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31319 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 24/08/1953 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75B Redhill
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32636 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 5w/e 24/08/1953 75A 3w/e 01/11/1955 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 31310 4w/e 05/02/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 01/10/1953 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 74B Ramsgate
Steam H 0-4-4T 31320 4w/e 11/04/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 29/10/1953 75A 3w/e 09/05/1955 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32662 4w/e 01/10/1953 74E St Leonards 4w/e 30/12/1953 75A 4w/e 27/05/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76005 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh m/e 01/1954 75A 8w/e 13/05/1954 71C Dorchester
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76006 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh m/e 01/1954 75A 8w/e 13/05/1954 71C Dorchester
Steam P 0-6-0T 31558 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33017 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A 4w/e 06/11/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33037 8w/e 07/10/1952 73C Hither Green 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C Hither Green
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32646 5w/e 24/08/1953 71D Fratton 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70F Fratton
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30955 9w/e 30/06/1952 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 20/08/1954 75A 4w/e 11/12/1954 74A Ashford
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30956 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 20/08/1954 75A 5w/e 12/08/1955 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32482 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 06/11/1954 75A m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31901 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31902 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31903 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32343 4w/e 06/11/1954 70F Fratton 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13092 w/e 27/11/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13093 w/e 04/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A 4w/e 30/07/1962 70C Guildford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13094 w/e 11/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A w/e 10/10/1967 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 4w/e 11/12/1954 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 4w/e 11/12/1954 75D Horsham 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C Hither Green
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32468 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A w/e 20/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32481 6w/e 05/09/1951 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A w/e 12/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 32570 6w/e 13/08/1952 75D Horsham 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A w/e 14/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam E5X 0-6-2T 32576 6w/e 13/08/1952 75D Horsham 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A on 09/07/1955 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13098 w/e 22/01/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13099 w/e 22/01/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13100 w/e 29/01/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13101 w/e 05/02/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32516 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A w/e 15/10/1955 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13217 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C Hither Green 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 4w/e 05/03/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13218 w/e 09/04/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 4w/e 03/06/1969 75C Selhurst
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13219 w/e 16/04/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 4w/e 30/04/1970 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13220 w/e 23/04/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 4w/e 01/05/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13221 w/e 23/04/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30031 4w/e 17/06/1950 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42067 on 13/10/1950 74B Ramsgate (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32503 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 5w/e 16/09/1955 75A w/e 14/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31319 6w/e 21/06/1955 75B Redhill 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A 7w/e 20/04/1956 74A Ashford
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32467 4w/e 06/10/1951 75D Horsham 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A w/e 26/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32484 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A w/e 17/09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32512 4w/e 07/10/1950 75B Redhill 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A w/e 27/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 8w/e 13/05/1954 71D Fratton 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70F Fratton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30108 5w/e 14/02/1953 75D Horsham 3w/e 01/11/1955 75A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71B Bournemouth
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32655 4w/e 08/02/1954 74E St Leonards 3w/e 01/11/1955 75A 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30055 6w/e 21/06/1955 75F Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 20/04/1956 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80015 on 14/09/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80017 8w/e 07/10/1952 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80018 5w/e 14/02/1953 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30052 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E Three Bridges
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30054 6w/e 21/06/1955 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A w/e 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30056 6w/e 21/06/1955 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E Three Bridges
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31776 5w/e 11/12/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31777 5w/e 11/12/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31778 5w/e 11/12/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32562 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A w/e 06/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42068 4w/e 08/02/1954 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42070 4w/e 05/02/1951 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42071 4w/e 06/10/1951 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42075 7w/e 19/12/1955 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A 3w/e 17/11/1956 74C Dover Marine
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80145       on 16/10/1956 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80146       on 30/10/1956 (New) 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80147       on 15/11/1956 (New) 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80010 on 10/07/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A w/e 11/03/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80011 on 21/07/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A w/e 11/03/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C Hither Green 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C Hither Green 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C Hither Green
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32165 6w/e 20/04/1955 75D Horsham 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A w/e 11/03/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32166 6w/e 20/04/1955 75D Horsham 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A w/e 11/03/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32502 9w/e 08/02/1955 70D Basingstoke 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A w/e 08/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32521 3w/e 01/11/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A 4w/e 22/03/1958 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32536 3w/e 01/11/1955 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A 6w/e 25/01/1957 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80148       on 29/11/1956 (New) 75A 4w/e 24/06/1963 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80149       on 13/12/1956 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32449 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 4w/e 17/12/1956 75A 5w/e 18/03/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80150       on 28/12/1956 (New) 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80151       on 18/01/1957 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80152       on 06/02/1957 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80153       on 25/02/1957 (New) 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80154       on 26/03/1957 (New) 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 70B Feltham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11222       on 17/04/1957 (New) 75A w/e 11/03/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A q/e 06/06/1958 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A q/e 06/06/1958 73C Hither Green
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32670 4w/e 20/08/1954 74E St Leonards 4w/e 14/01/1958 75A 4w/e 27/05/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80012 on 17/08/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A w/e 11/03/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32480 3w/e 17/11/1956 75D Horsham 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32507 4w/e 19/03/1952 75B Redhill 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32519 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A w/e 12/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30109 4w/e 06/10/1951 70C Guildford q/e 06/06/1958 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30900 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 75A w/e 10/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30901 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 75A on 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30052 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30056 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30110 q/e 06/06/1958 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam P 0-6-0T 31325 9w/e 12/06/1957 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A w/e 19/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31554 6w/e 01/04/1957 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A w/e 30/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34008 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34019 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2082       on 19/02/1959 (New) 75A 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C Hither Green
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75070 6w/e 01/04/1957 71A Eastleigh w/e 11/03/1959 75A 6w/e 09/02/1960 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80013 on 28/08/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) w/e 11/03/1959 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32635       4w/e 11/03/1959 75A w/e 31/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34097 4w/e 24/02/1958 71B Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959 75A 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34098 4w/e 24/02/1958 71B Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959 75A 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34099 4w/e 24/02/1958 71B Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959 75A 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B Salisbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42066 6w/e 13/08/1952 75E Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959 75A w/e 05/12/1959 1E Bletchley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42067 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959 75A w/e 05/12/1959 1E Bletchley
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30914 on 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A 4w/e 06/05/1960 75B Redhill
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 4w/e 14/01/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A 4w/e 06/05/1960 75B Redhill
Steam H 0-4-4T 31269 3w/e 13/10/1958 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A on 12/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31276 4w/e 01/10/1953 74A Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31279 q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31308 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31530 q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A m/e 10/02/1961 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31543 4w/e 29/10/1953 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31548 q/e 06/06/1958 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A w/e 08/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31890 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31891 8w/e 20/07/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75E Three Bridges
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3221 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30047 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A w/e 06/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30048 7w/e 27/06/1951 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 19/08/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30049 4w/e 11/04/1951 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30050 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30051 4w/e 01/10/1953 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30916 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30917 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30056 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 22/10/1959 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 71B Bournemouth
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30110 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 22/10/1959 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 71B Bournemouth
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32580 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 6w/e 22/10/1959 75A w/e 17/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 3w/e 01/05/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 26/11/1959 75A m/e 08/12/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 3w/e 01/05/1959 73C Hither Green 5w/e 26/11/1959 75A w/e 27/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80143 on 10/09/1956 34E Neasden (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80144 on 25/09/1956 34E Neasden (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2281       on 27/02/1960 (New) 75A w/e 28/05/1966 32B Ipswich
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2282       on 28/02/1960 (New) 75A w/e 28/05/1966 32B Ipswich
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30053 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32636 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960 75A 4w/e 27/05/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34055 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/03/1960 75A m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2286       on 26/03/1960 (New) 75A 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C Guildford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3221 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A 4w/e 05/07/1965 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30049 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A 5w/e 06/07/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30050 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30051 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30916 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A 4w/e 06/05/1960 75B Redhill
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30917 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32479 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A w/e 02/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32495 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A w/e 17/09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30902 q/e 06/06/1958 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A 4w/e 24/11/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30918 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A 4w/e 24/11/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30919 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31322 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 06/05/1960 75A m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30052 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 10/06/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30328 4w/e 10/03/1960 73J Tonbridge 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30379 4w/e 10/03/1960 73J Tonbridge 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A 7w/e 03/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32578 9w/e 08/02/1955 74D Tonbridge 7w/e 23/08/1960 75A w/e 22/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32337 4w/e 05/04/1960 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 05/10/1960 75A w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32344 4w/e 20/08/1954 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 05/10/1960 75A w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30907 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A w/e 09/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30911 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A 4w/e 04/01/1962 75B Redhill
Steam H 0-4-4T 31005 6w/e 05/10/1960 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A m/e 10/02/1961 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam C 0-6-0 31280 6w/e 05/10/1960 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A 7w/e 23/08/1961 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34038 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41300 m/e 03/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms (New) m/e 10/02/1961 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41301 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C Guildford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41303 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41305 6w/e 13/08/1952 71A Eastleigh m/e 10/02/1961 75A 5w/e 18/03/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30920 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961 75A w/e 25/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80138 5w/e 31/12/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32509 4w/e 05/04/1960 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A w/e 31/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32581 7w/e 27/06/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A w/e 17/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30533 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A 3w/e 07/01/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam Q 0-6-0 30538 4w/e 06/11/1954 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41291       7w/e 03/05/1961 75A 4w/e 06/04/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Q 0-6-0 30534 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 03/05/1961 75A on 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84024 m/e 10/02/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A w/e 16/09/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84025 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84026 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84027 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam E6 0-6-2T 32417 3w/e 13/10/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam E6 0-6-2T 32418 4w/e 22/03/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34027 6w/e 14/06/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41260 4w/e 11/09/1954 24F Fleetwood w/e 24/06/1961 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41261 4w/e 11/09/1954 24F Fleetwood w/e 24/06/1961 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41283 w/e 12/12/1959 26F Patricroft w/e 24/06/1961 75A 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41287 4w/e 09/10/1954 10C Patricroft w/e 24/06/1961 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31819 m/e 10/02/1961 75B Redhill 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31820 m/e 10/02/1961 75B Redhill 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31821 3w/e 26/05/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31859 3w/e 26/05/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford
Steam Q 0-6-0 30535 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A 4w/e 17/12/1962 71B Bournemouth
Steam C 0-6-0 31280 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A Brighton 7w/e 23/08/1961 75A m/e 08/12/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41324 w/e 13/06/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 16/09/1961 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41325 4w/e 15/06/1957 55F Manningham w/e 16/09/1961 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41326 4w/e 15/06/1957 55F Manningham w/e 16/09/1961 75A w/e 03/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41327 m/e 04/1952 20F Skipton (New) w/e 16/09/1961 75A w/e 03/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30922 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A Stewarts Lane m/e 09/11/1961 75A w/e 25/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961 75A on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30928 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961 75A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31400 4w/e 08/07/1960 70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31401 4w/e 08/07/1960 70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961 75A m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31402 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961 75A w/e 25/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31403 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961 75A w/e 30/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30325 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A 4w/e 01/02/1962 70C Guildford
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30326 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A 4w/e 01/02/1962 70C Guildford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30929 m/e 09/11/1961 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30930 m/e 09/11/1961 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A 4w/e 01/02/1962 75B Redhill
Steam Q 0-6-0 30537 4w/e 06/11/1954 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Q 0-6-0 30549 5w/e 16/09/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 31722 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C Guildford 4w/e 01/02/1962 75A 4w/e 01/05/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3096 6w/e 05/10/1960 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 05/03/1962 75A w/e 30/09/1968 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2280 on 25/02/1960 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A 4w/e 18/01/1965 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2283 5w/e 18/03/1961 73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A w/e 28/05/1966 32B Ipswich
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3095 5w/e 11/03/1955 73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A 5w/e 02/07/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32470 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A w/e 23/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32474 2w/e 10/10/1961 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A w/e 19/05/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3217 4w/e 05/03/1962 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A w/e 30/09/1968 70D Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31828 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31829 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31873 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34013 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34014 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34101 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A 4w/e 24/06/1963 70A Nine Elms
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3100 4w/e 05/04/1960 70B Feltham 4w/e 30/07/1962 75A 4w/e 08/06/1965 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31830 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31831 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31832 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31833 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76030 w/e 17/09/1960 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76031 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76032 w/e 17/09/1960 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76033 w/e 17/09/1960 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76034 w/e 16/09/1961 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75067 7w/e 23/08/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A 4w/e 19/04/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75068 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A 4w/e 19/04/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30911 4w/e 04/01/1962 75B Redhill 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30916 4w/e 06/05/1960 75B Redhill 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30930 4w/e 01/02/1962 75B Redhill 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31890 5w/e 02/07/1962 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A w/e 30/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31891 2w/e 10/10/1961 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A m/e 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31901 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A w/e 30/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31910 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A w/e 14/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41223 4w/e 14/06/1958 1C Watford w/e 22/12/1962 75A 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41230 w/e 17/11/1962 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 22/12/1962 75A 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41276 m/e 10/1950 7D Rhyl (New) w/e 22/12/1962 75A 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41294 9w/e 12/06/1957 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C Guildford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41299 m/e 10/02/1961 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C Guildford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41312 6w/e 09/02/1960 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41313 6w/e 09/02/1960 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41314 9w/e 12/06/1957 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963 75A w/e 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32678 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963 75A w/e 06/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34063 w/e 11/03/1959 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/05/1963 75A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34088 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/06/1963 75A 4w/e 22/07/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80034 4w/e 28/05/1962 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 19/08/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80010 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A on 14/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80011 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80014 on 05/09/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80016 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80017 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80018 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80019 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 22/06/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80068 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80084 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80085 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80088 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80089 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80094 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80139 5w/e 31/12/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80140 5w/e 31/12/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80141 5w/e 31/12/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80142 5w/e 31/12/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41230 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70E Salisbury
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2276 4w/e 30/07/1962 75C Norwood Junction m/e 06/01/1964 75A w/e 28/05/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3668 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction m/e 06/01/1964 75A 3w/e 08/04/1968 73C Hither Green
Steam Q 0-6-0 30531 4w/e 22/07/1963 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 75B Redhill
Steam Q 0-6-0 30543 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 75A 4w/e 25/05/1964 75B Redhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3220 4w/e 01/05/1962 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 08/06/1965 75A w/e 02/05/1973 73C Hither Green
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3669 on 19/02/1959 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 05/07/1965 75A 5w/e 30/09/1971 75C Selhurst
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2000 w/e 15/01/1966 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966 75A w/e 30/06/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2001 w/e 27/11/1965 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966 75A 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A Brighton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2002 w/e 04/12/1965 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966 75A 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A Brighton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2003 w/e 27/11/1965 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 28/05/1966 75A 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A Brighton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2000 w/e 30/06/1966 30A Stratford 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A w/e 24/10/1967 75C Selhurst
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2001 w/e 28/05/1966 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A w/e 30/09/1968 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2002 w/e 28/05/1966 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A 4w/e 19/09/1966 75C Selhurst
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2003 w/e 28/05/1966 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A w/e 30/09/1968 73C Hither Green
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2289 4w/e 08/06/1965 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A 4w/e 19/09/1966 75C Selhurst
Electric Class 70 C-C 20001 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A on 01/1969 Withdrawn
Electric Class 70 C-C 20002 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A on 12/1968 Withdrawn
Electric Class 70 C-C 20003 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A on 06/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2030 4w/e 25/07/1966 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 19/09/1966 75A on 08/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2031 4w/e 25/07/1966 70C Guildford 4w/e 19/09/1966 75A on 07/05/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3222 w/e 08/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 14/11/1966 75A w/e 02/05/1973 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3223 w/e 02/07/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 14/11/1966 75A 4w/e 09/07/1967 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3226 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/11/1966 75A w/e 02/05/1973 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3100 4w/e 08/06/1965 75C Norwood Junction w/e 18/01/1967 75A w/e 30/09/1968 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4103 m/e 12/10/1964 73C Hither Green 3w/e 08/04/1968 75A 4w/e 09/07/1968 70B Feltham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3041 5w/e 09/12/1968 70B Feltham 4w/e 10/02/1969 75A 9w/e 29/12/1971 75C Selhurst