Depot: Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Durran Hill (Carlisle) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 4077 | S | 01/1936 | 12C | m/e | 10/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28532 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12C | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28544 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 12C | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44086 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 12C | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58409 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 12C | w/e | 17/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46449 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 12C | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46455 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 12C | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46449 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46455 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58412 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44306 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44306 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46459 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46459 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 12C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 12C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46491 | m/e | 12/1951 | 12D | Workington (New) | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 12C | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46455 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 12C | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12D | Workington |