Depot: Borough Gardens
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Borough Gardens | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1709 | m/e | 05/1902 (New) | BOR | on | 13/01/1926 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 654 | m/e | 04/1908 (New) | BOR | on | 27/01/1927 | SHI | Shildon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1250 | m/e | 02/1913 (New) | BOR | on | 12/01/1923 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1251 | m/e | 02/1913 (New) | BOR | on | 12/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1335 | m/e | 07/1913 (New) | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2227 | m/e | 10/1917 (New) | BOR | on | 27/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2236 | m/e | 10/1918 (New) | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2247 | m/e | 06/1919 (New) | BOR | on | 16/02/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2279 | m/e | 06/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 29/03/1941 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2287 | m/e | 08/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 12/04/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2288 | m/e | 09/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 09/10/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2290 | m/e | 10/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 27/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2291 | m/e | 10/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 24/04/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2292 | m/e | 10/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2294 | m/e | 11/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 16/02/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2295 | m/e | 11/1920 (New) | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2300 | m/e | 01/1921 (New) | BOR | on | 29/03/1941 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2302 | m/e | 03/1921 (New) | BOR | on | 24/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 767 | m/e | 08/1911 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 12/01/1923 | BOR | on | 14/11/1930 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1254 | m/e | 03/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | on | 28/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2229 | m/e | 10/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | on | 25/08/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2265 | m/e | 03/1920 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | on | 19/09/1924 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2268 | m/e | 03/1920 | CAR | Carlisle Canal (New) | m/e | 12/1924 | BOR | on | 10/04/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 655 | m/e | 05/1908 | AFP | Annfield Plain (New) | m/e | 01/1925 | BOR | m/e | 09/1925 | SHI | Shildon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1278 | m/e | 05/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 13/04/1926 | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2302 | on | 24/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 11/08/1926 | BOR | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 631 | on | 03/05/1924 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | m/e | 1927 | BOR | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2261 | m/e | 02/1920 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 27/01/1927 | BOR | on | 12/04/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1311 | m/e | 07/1913 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 01/02/1927 | BOR | on | 29/03/1941 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2247 | on | 16/02/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/02/1927 | BOR | on | 21/11/1934 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2294 | on | 16/02/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/02/1927 | BOR | on | 09/05/1941 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1253 | m/e | 03/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2213 | on | 26/04/1926 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2267 | m/e | 03/1920 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | on | 18/04/1935 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2301 | on | 17/05/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 23/05/1927 | BOR | on | 10/05/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1292 | on | 27/08/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 24/05/1927 | BOR | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 645 | on | 26/08/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 04/06/1927 | BOR | on | 05/10/1936 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2227 | on | 27/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/03/1928 | BOR | on | 10/01/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2290 | on | 27/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/03/1928 | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1254 | on | 28/12/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 20/06/1928 | BOR | on | 12/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1709 | on | 13/01/1926 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/05/1929 | BOR | on | 14/11/1930 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | on | 03/05/1924 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | m/e | 1930 | BOR | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2252 | on | 26/01/1931 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 07/11/1931 | BOR | on | 14/05/1941 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2269 | m/e | 04/1920 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 07/11/1931 | BOR | on | 26/11/1931 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2271 | on | 01/07/1924 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 07/11/1931 | BOR | on | 26/11/1931 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 1863 | H | 12/1935 | BOR | m/e | 05/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 780 | H | 12/1935 | BOR | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2214 | on | 05/07/1934 | SUN | Sunderland | on | 15/01/1938 | BOR | on | 15/02/1941 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 643 | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 01/03/1940 | BOR | on | 06/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 669 | on | 24/06/1939 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 01/03/1940 | BOR | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2274 | on | 09/06/1930 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 09/05/1941 | BOR | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2117 | m/e | 09/1901 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 20/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2120 | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 11/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2123 | m/e | 12/1901 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 27/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1684 | m/e | 12/1902 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 22/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1009 | m/e | 06/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1731 | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 19/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1757 | m/e | 06/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 13/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 29/03/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 15/02/1948 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 792 | m/e | 10/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 29/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1218 | m/e | 11/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1150 | m/e | 04/1904 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 27/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 642 | on | 01/02/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 22/03/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1292 | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1293 | m/e | 06/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2231 | on | 02/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2243 | on | 01/02/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2277 | on | 01/02/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1249 | on | 23/05/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1271 | on | 01/09/1925 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/12/1943 | BOR | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1111 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 23/12/1943 | BOR | on | 22/09/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1213 | on | 10/06/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 18/10/1944 | BOR | on | 13/04/1947 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1111 | on | 22/09/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 14/01/1946 | BOR | on | 22/08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3261 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 31/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3264 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 26/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3267 | on | 12/05/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 06/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3275 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 15/02/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3282 | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3326 | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 06/10/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3402 | on | 14/01/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3259 | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 20/07/1947 | BOR | on | 09/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3377 | on | 23/07/1945 | CON | Consett | on | 29/11/1947 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65600 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65603 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65604 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65611 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65624 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65627 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65633 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | WBY | Whitby | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 5634 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 26/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65641 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 27/09/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65644 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | ||||||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5657 | m/e | 08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5661 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 04/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5676 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 18/01/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5680 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5685 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8287 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 26/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8289 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 20/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8299 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | on | 01/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8679 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8704 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8705 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8706 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | w/e | 04/09/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8708 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8736 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8737 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3350 | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 13/02/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4936 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3366 | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3384 | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3386 | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4936 | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3350 | on | 13/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3366 | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3384 | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3386 | on | 15/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J4 | 0-6-0 | 3354 | m/e | 08/1926 | Withdrawn | w/e | 06/03/1948 (R) | BOR | |||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3354 | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/03/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3458 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/03/1948 | BOR | w/e | 20/03/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3458 | on | 16/03/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/03/1948 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65625 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | on | 09/05/1948 | BOR | on | 15/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61319 | on | 14/05/1948 (New) | BOR | on | 08/06/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4929 | on | 23/07/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 16/05/1948 | BOR | w/e | 22/05/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61320 | on | 18/05/1948 (New) | BOR | on | 16/06/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61321 | on | 20/05/1948 (New) | BOR | on | 08/06/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4929 | on | 16/05/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 22/05/1948 | BOR | on | 04/01/1953 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61322 | on | 25/05/1948 (New) | BOR | on | 29/08/1948 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 8090 | m/e | 10/1936 | Withdrawn | w/e | 26/06/1948 (R) | BOR | |||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3256 | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 27/06/1948 | BOR | w/e | 03/07/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3256 | on | 27/06/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 03/07/1948 | BOR | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3303 | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 11/07/1948 | BOR | w/e | 17/07/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3303 | on | 11/07/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 17/07/1948 | BOR | on | 23/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1291 | on | 24/02/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 25/07/1948 | BOR | w/e | 31/07/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1291 | on | 25/07/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 31/07/1948 | BOR | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68728 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 04/09/1948 | BOR | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8730 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 06/11/1948 | BOR | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8016 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 20/11/1948 | BOR | w/e | 25/12/1948 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61198 | on | 02/06/1947 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 26/12/1948 | BOR | w/e | 01/01/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61198 | on | 26/12/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 01/01/1949 | BOR | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65601 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | w/e | 30/07/1949 | BOR | w/e | 03/12/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9092 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | m/e | 12/1949 | BOR | on | 06/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63358 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 11/12/1949 | BOR | w/e | 17/12/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63358 | on | 11/12/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 17/12/1949 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | 5686 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOR | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65615 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | Malton | w/e | 21/01/1950 | BOR | on | 21/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4846 | on | 23/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 22/01/1950 | BOR | w/e | 28/01/1950 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4846 | on | 22/01/1950 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 28/01/1950 | BOR | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 69391 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 28/01/1950 | BOR | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64864 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64939 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63444 | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 17/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64870 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64897 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64931 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64864 | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64870 | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64897 | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64931 | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64939 | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63444 | on | 17/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64926 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/02/1951 | 54C | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64927 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/02/1951 | 54C | on | 10/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65712 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 54C | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65728 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 54C | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65712 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 54C | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65728 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64941 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 20/05/1951 | 54C | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64941 | on | 20/05/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 54C | on | 04/01/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65705 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 54C | on | 27/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64710 | on | 03/09/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64919 | on | 01/10/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64710 | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64919 | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | on | 01/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63408 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63456 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63408 | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | on | 14/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63456 | on | 27/01/1952 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64700 | on | 03/08/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64707 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64713 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64851 | on | 02/01/1949 | ALS | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64854 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68316 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65645 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54C | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68697 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68694 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65712 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65697 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 54C | on | 26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65702 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65696 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54C | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65700 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54C | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63346 | on | 13/04/1947 | CON | Consett | on | 10/06/1956 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68699 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54C | on | 16/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65785 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | on | 16/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65823 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65873 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68278 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 54C | on | 06/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68695 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | on | 08/06/1958 | 54C | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65857 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50C | Selby | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65893 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 54C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | on | 01/09/1957 | 54D | Consett | on | 20/07/1958 | 54C | on | 25/01/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |