Depot: Annfield Plain
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Annfield Plain | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2116 | m/e | 08/1901 (New) | AFP | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2124 | m/e | 12/1901 (New) | AFP | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 655 | m/e | 05/1908 (New) | AFP | m/e | 01/1925 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 643 | m/e | 06/1911 (New) | AFP | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1648 | by | 01/01/1923 | AFP | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1652 | by | 01/01/1923 | AFP | H | 12/1935 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | m/e | 04/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | m/e | 01/1925 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1279 | m/e | 05/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1284 | m/e | 06/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | m/e | 01/1925 | TDK | Tyne Dock | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1285 | m/e | 06/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 632 | on | 30/04/1924 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 629 | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2225 | on | 03/07/1930 | SEL | Selby | on | 07/06/1934 | AFP | on | 15/07/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1264 | m/e | 06/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1285 | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | on | 21/12/1939 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1291 | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1294 | m/e | 07/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | on | 15/07/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2232 | m/e | 12/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2215 | m/e | 06/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 01/03/1940 | AFP | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett |