Depot: East Hartlepool
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to East Hartlepool | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 651 | m/e | 06/1903 (New) | EHL | on | 10/12/1938 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 769 | m/e | 08/1911 (New) | EHL | on | 22/04/1939 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 783 | m/e | 10/1911 (New) | EHL | on | 10/12/1938 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1640 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | H | 12/1935 | BOW | Bowes Bridge | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1644 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1651 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1655 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 383 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1705 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2230 | m/e | 11/1917 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 26/01/1927 | EHL | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | on | 01/03/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1284 | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2242 | m/e | 12/1918 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | on | 08/03/1937 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2239 | m/e | 12/1918 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 17/02/1937 | EHL | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2262 | on | 07/02/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 27/02/1938 | EHL | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1215 | on | 13/06/1935 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 28/03/1938 | EHL | on | 17/04/1939 | WHL | West Hartlepool |