Depot: York (North)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to York (North) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1113 | m/e | 10/1910 (New) | YK | on | 22/06/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1192 | m/e | 05/1911 (New) | YK | on | 01/04/1940 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 799 | m/e | 06/1912 (New) | YK | on | 25/11/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 817 | m/e | 10/1912 (New) | YK | on | 28/09/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 820 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | YK | on | 11/08/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 821 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | YK | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 822 | m/e | 11/1912 (New) | YK | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 823 | m/e | 12/1912 (New) | YK | on | 11/08/1925 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 844 | m/e | 12/1919 (New) | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 950 | y/e | 1912 | GRA | Grantham | y/e | 1920 | YK | y/e | 1923 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 983 | y/e | 1912 | DON | Doncaster | y/e | 1920 | YK | y/e | 1923 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 984 | y/e | 1912 | DON | Doncaster | y/e | 1920 | YK | y/e | 1923 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 250 | y/e | 1912 | DON | Doncaster | y/e | 1920 | YK | y/e | 1923 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 260 | y/e | 1912 | DON | Doncaster | y/e | 1920 | YK | y/e | 1923 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 847 | m/e | 03/1920 (New) | YK | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 845 | m/e | 04/1920 (New) | YK | on | 15/07/1924 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 848 | m/e | 04/1920 (New) | YK | on | 23/06/1931 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 849 | m/e | 04/1920 (New) | YK | on | 23/06/1931 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 908 | m/e | 08/1920 (New) | YK | on | 03/10/1929 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 911 | m/e | 08/1920 (New) | YK | on | 22/09/1924 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 915 | m/e | 09/1920 (New) | YK | m/e | 05/1923 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 921 | m/e | 10/1920 (New) | YK | on | 11/06/1928 | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 923 | m/e | 11/1920 (New) | YK | on | 14/05/1928 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 925 | m/e | 12/1920 (New) | YK | on | 25/11/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 927 | m/e | 12/1920 (New) | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 933 | m/e | 03/1921 (New) | YK | on | 22/10/1927 | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 936 | m/e | 04/1921 (New) | YK | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 942 | m/e | 06/1921 (New) | YK | on | 06/07/1925 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2364 | m/e | 11/1922 (New) | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 950 | y/e | 1920 | YK | York (North) | y/e | 1923 | YK | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 983 | y/e | 1920 | YK | York (North) | y/e | 1923 | YK | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 984 | y/e | 1920 | YK | York (North) | y/e | 1923 | YK | S | 01/1936 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2366 | on | 04/01/1923 (New) | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2368 | on | 19/02/1923 (New) | YK | on | 30/05/1923 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2370 | on | 12/03/1923 (New) | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2372 | on | 17/04/1923 (New) | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2373 | on | 04/05/1923 (New) | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2374 | on | 19/05/1923 (New) | YK | on | 13/07/1933 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2376 | on | 29/05/1923 (New) | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2378 | on | 29/06/1923 (New) | YK | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2380 | on | 31/07/1923 (New) | YK | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2382 | on | 31/08/1923 (New) | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2368 | on | 30/05/1923 | SEL | Selby | on | 01/09/1923 | YK | on | 20/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1371 | on | 29/09/1923 (New) | YK | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1374 | on | 23/10/1923 (New) | YK | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1377 | on | 10/11/1923 (New) | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 1447 | on | 10/03/1923 | DON | Doncaster | m/e | 12/1923 | YK | S | 01/1936 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 813 | m/e | 09/1912 | SCA | Scarborough (New) | m/e | 01/1924 | YK | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 3986 | y/e | 1920 | DON | Doncaster | m/e | 03/1924 | YK | m/e | 04/1924 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1247 | m/e | 02/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | on | 21/02/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1361 | m/e | 08/1913 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | on | 02/01/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | m/e | 07/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | on | 21/02/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 787 | m/e | 02/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 09/03/1924 | YK | on | 03/10/1938 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 788 | m/e | 02/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 09/03/1924 | YK | on | 22/07/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 797 | m/e | 05/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 09/03/1924 | YK | on | 08/09/1936 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2233 | m/e | 08/1918 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 22/03/1924 | YK | m/e | 03/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 1424 | m/e | 04/1924 | YK | S | 01/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1276 | m/e | 05/1913 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 02/04/1924 | YK | on | 02/01/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 924 | m/e | 12/1920 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 08/05/1924 | YK | on | 07/07/1925 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1384 | on | 01/01/1924 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 08/05/1924 | YK | on | 07/07/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 775 | m/e | 08/1906 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | m/e | 07/1924 | YK | on | 15/08/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2005 | m/e | 12/1899 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 01/07/1924 | YK | on | 21/11/1928 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 1077 | m/e | 08/1906 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 01/07/1924 | YK | on | 06/11/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 757 | m/e | 04/1906 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 07/07/1924 | YK | on | 23/02/1926 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 761 | m/e | 06/1906 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 07/07/1924 | YK | on | 06/05/1927 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 766 | m/e | 06/1906 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 07/07/1924 | YK | on | 06/05/1927 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1149 | m/e | 04/1904 | SCA | Scarborough (New) | on | 15/07/1924 | YK | on | 01/10/1924 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5473 | on | 29/07/1922 | GOR | Gorton | on | 22/09/1924 | YK | on | 28/02/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 845 | on | 15/07/1924 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 01/10/1924 | YK | on | 14/01/1930 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2115 | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 27/02/1925 | YK | on | 21/05/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 911 | on | 22/09/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/03/1925 | YK | on | 28/10/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1129 | m/e | 12/1910 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 19/03/1925 | YK | on | 23/05/1925 | SHI | Shildon |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1195 | m/e | 06/1911 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 20/03/1925 | YK | on | 30/10/1925 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2228 | on | 17/02/1925 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 06/07/1925 | YK | on | 04/01/1926 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 744 | m/e | 07/1908 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 07/07/1925 | YK | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4678 | m/e | 08/1918 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 11/08/1925 | YK | on | 01/04/1926 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4688 | m/e | 07/1921 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 28/08/1925 | YK | on | 02/04/1926 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 942 | on | 06/07/1925 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 28/09/1925 | YK | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1767 | on | 11/12/1925 (New) | YK | m/e | 02/1926 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1766 | on | 02/12/1925 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 14/12/1925 | YK | on | 07/02/1926 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1195 | on | 30/10/1925 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 22/02/1926 | YK | m/e | 01/1927 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 820 | on | 11/08/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/04/1926 | YK | on | 10/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 823 | on | 11/08/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 01/04/1926 | YK | on | 22/07/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 782 | on | 24/10/1923 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | on | 22/09/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 815 | on | 01/05/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | on | 22/09/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 757 | on | 07/06/1926 | CLK | Colwick | on | 22/09/1926 | YK | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 30/01/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | m/e | 03/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6576 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 21/04/1928 | YK | on | 15/03/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6617 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 05/05/1928 | YK | on | 06/02/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6579 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 12/05/1928 | YK | on | 21/08/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2228 | on | 04/01/1926 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 14/05/1928 | YK | on | 17/06/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6580 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 19/05/1928 | YK | on | 05/10/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6631 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 26/05/1928 | YK | on | 21/08/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6610 | on | 30/11/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 15/06/1928 | YK | on | 04/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6611 | on | 27/10/1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 15/06/1928 | YK | on | 29/10/1929 | BUL | Bullcroft Junction |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2711 | on | 09/10/1928 (New) | YK | on | 03/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2712 | on | 12/10/1928 (New) | YK | on | 22/11/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2713 | on | 22/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 03/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2714 | on | 14/01/1905 | STR | Stratford | on | 22/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 03/12/1928 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2715 | on | 26/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 05/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2716 | on | 27/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 07/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2717 | on | 29/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 18/01/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2718 | on | 15/04/1905 | STR | Stratford | on | 30/11/1928 (New) | YK | on | 07/12/1928 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2719 | on | 01/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | on | 04/12/1928 (New) | YK | on | 26/01/1929 | PKS | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2720 | on | 06/12/1928 (New) | YK | on | 14/12/1928 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2721 | on | 26/03/1929 (New) | YK | on | 09/04/1929 | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6549 | on | 30/03/1929 | YK | on | 06/02/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2722 | on | 08/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 18/04/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2723 | on | 10/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 18/04/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2724 | on | 15/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 20/04/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2725 | on | 22/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 02/05/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2726 | on | 24/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 01/05/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2727 | on | 30/04/1929 (New) | YK | on | 10/05/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2728 | on | 10/05/1929 (New) | YK | on | 15/06/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2729 | on | 10/05/1929 (New) | YK | on | 24/05/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6576 | on | 15/03/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/05/1929 | YK | on | 05/10/1929 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2730 | on | 17/05/1929 (New) | YK | on | 24/05/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2732 | on | 29/05/1929 (New) | YK | on | 30/05/1929 | EFD | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2731 | on | 14/10/1905 | STR | Stratford | on | 30/05/1929 (New) | YK | on | 31/05/1929 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 921 | on | 11/06/1928 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 22/07/1929 | YK | on | 28/10/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 926 | m/e | 12/1920 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 22/07/1929 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2770 | on | 28/08/1929 (New) | YK | on | 07/09/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2771 | on | 04/09/1929 (New) | YK | on | 07/09/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2772 | on | 11/09/1929 (New) | YK | on | 18/09/1929 | IPS | Ipswich | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2774 | on | 20/09/1929 (New) | YK | on | 28/09/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2773 | on | 30/09/1929 (New) | YK | on | 09/10/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2775 | on | 30/09/1929 (New) | YK | on | 11/10/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 923 | on | 14/05/1928 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 03/10/1929 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2776 | on | 07/10/1929 (New) | YK | on | 15/10/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2777 | on | 16/10/1929 (New) | YK | on | 21/10/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2778 | on | 18/10/1929 (New) | YK | on | 28/10/1929 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2779 | on | 25/10/1929 (New) | YK | on | 31/10/1929 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 908 | on | 03/10/1929 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 02/11/1929 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2780 | on | 04/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 08/11/1929 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2781 | on | 07/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 15/11/1929 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2782 | on | 12/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 16/11/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2783 | on | 18/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 21/11/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2784 | on | 26/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 05/12/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2785 | on | 29/11/1929 (New) | YK | on | 10/12/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1470 | on | 13/01/1930 (New) | YK | on | 28/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1487 | on | 18/01/1930 (New) | YK | on | 22/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1174 | on | 23/01/1925 | BUL | Bullcroft Junction | on | 03/03/1930 | YK | on | 21/10/1939 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2371 | on | 28/03/1923 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 23/06/1931 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1373 | on | 19/10/1923 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 23/06/1931 | YK | on | 19/01/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 628 | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby | on | 03/09/1932 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2374 | on | 13/07/1933 | SUN | Sunderland | on | 19/01/1934 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2401 | on | 30/12/1922 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 09/02/1934 | YK | on | 03/07/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2403 | on | 24/03/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 26/04/1934 | YK | on | 21/05/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1212 | y/e | 1924 | SEL | Selby | on | 26/04/1934 | YK | on | 23/10/1939 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1193 | m/e | 05/1911 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | on | 04/05/1934 | YK | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2400 | m/e | 12/1922 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 07/05/1934 | YK | on | 13/04/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2402 | on | 11/03/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 13/08/1934 | YK | on | 25/07/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 911 | on | 28/10/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 16/10/1934 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 921 | on | 28/10/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 16/10/1934 | YK | on | 03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1372 | on | 20/07/1931 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 16/10/1934 | YK | on | 09/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2404 | on | 25/03/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 07/11/1934 | YK | on | 06/02/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1211 | y/e | 1924 | SEL | Selby | on | 11/03/1935 | YK | on | 08/11/1939 | SBH | Blyth (South) |
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 4071 | S | 01/1936 | YK | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 4079 | S | 01/1936 | YK | m/e | 10/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4424 | m/e | 04/1924 | YK | York (North) | S | 01/1936 | YK | on | 01/07/1943 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4447 | m/e | 12/1923 | YK | York (North) | S | 01/1936 | YK | on | 17/06/1936 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 3984 | y/e | 1923 | YK | York (North) | S | 01/1936 | YK | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | 3986 | m/e | 04/1924 | SBK | Starbeck | S | 01/1936 | YK | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4386 | S | 01/1936 | YK | m/e | 03/1939 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4387 | S | 01/1936 | YK | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4396 | S | 01/1936 | YK | m/e | 08/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4398 | S | 01/1936 | YK | m/e | 06/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4180 | S | 01/1936 | YK | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 920 | m/e | 09/1920 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2381 | on | 16/08/1923 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4772 | on | 08/08/1936 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4447 | on | 17/06/1936 | SEL | Selby | on | 29/08/1936 | YK | on | 01/07/1943 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4773 | on | 03/10/1936 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2570 | on | 27/09/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 11/11/1936 | YK | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2576 | on | 19/10/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 17/11/1936 | YK | on | 11/12/1936 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 759 | on | 11/05/1934 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/12/1936 | YK | on | 06/05/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2568 | on | 19/09/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 11/12/1936 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2577 | on | 24/10/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 07/01/1937 | YK | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | on | 03/04/1935 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 19/03/1937 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2363 | m/e | 11/1922 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 31/05/1937 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4776 | on | 16/07/1937 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4777 | on | 06/08/1937 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4780 | on | 31/08/1937 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4782 | on | 10/09/1937 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 932 | on | 01/07/1924 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 30/09/1937 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 764 | on | 15/04/1935 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 10/02/1938 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1535 | on | 11/02/1938 (New) | YK | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4799 | on | 28/03/1938 (New) | YK | on | 06/09/1938 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1560 | on | 07/04/1938 (New) | YK | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2569 | on | 24/09/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 18/04/1938 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1290 | on | 01/02/1936 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 19/06/1938 | YK | on | 23/08/1938 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2783 | on | 06/07/1936 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 19/06/1938 | YK | on | 12/08/1938 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4804 | on | 31/08/1938 (New) | YK | on | 27/09/1938 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4806 | on | 23/09/1938 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4808 | on | 05/10/1938 (New) | YK | on | 29/05/1955 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4810 | on | 19/10/1938 (New) | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4814 | on | 30/12/1938 (New) | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4818 | on | 06/03/1939 (New) | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1180 | on | 28/09/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 10/04/1939 | YK | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1183 | on | 20/01/1925 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 10/04/1939 | YK | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4827 | on | 02/05/1939 (New) | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 934 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 27/05/1939 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2379 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1373 | on | 19/01/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2116 | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 23/06/1939 | YK | on | 20/05/1940 | MAL | Malton |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1176 | on | 10/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 24/06/1939 | YK | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4835 | on | 26/06/1939 (New) | YK | on | 24/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 1213 | y/e | 1925 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 01/07/1939 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4839 | on | 31/07/1939 (New) | YK | on | 19/08/1939 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1534 | on | 12/06/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 21/10/1939 | YK | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1477 | on | 31/07/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 23/10/1939 | YK | on | 27/02/1940 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2735 | on | 29/09/1939 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 22/11/1939 | YK | on | 29/02/1940 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2505 | on | 16/11/1936 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 02/12/1939 | YK | on | 09/12/1939 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2501 | on | 09/07/1934 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 09/12/1939 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 01/03/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2261 | on | 12/04/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/02/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2580 | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/02/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2597 | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 29/02/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4872 | on | 09/03/1940 (New) | YK | on | 06/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4875 | on | 03/04/1940 (New) | YK | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4878 | on | 19/04/1940 (New) | YK | on | 06/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4881 | on | 10/05/1940 (New) | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1371 | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 11/05/1940 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1362 | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 18/05/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 925 | on | 01/06/1939 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 25/05/1940 | YK | on | 13/06/1942 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 942 | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2369 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1126 | m/e | 11/1910 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 843 | on | 18/10/1934 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 922 | on | 29/12/1936 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1385 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 943 | on | 25/03/1940 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 05/07/1940 | YK | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6514 | on | 06/04/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 31/08/1940 | YK | on | 20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6574 | on | 30/08/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/09/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5395 | on | 30/08/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 16/09/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5378 | on | 01/01/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 19/09/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6617 | S | 01/1936 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 02/10/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6632 | S | 01/1936 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 02/10/1940 | YK | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | 3401 | on | 25/02/1941 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 19/04/1941 | YK | on | 05/05/1941 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3656 | on | 25/06/1941 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 26/07/1941 | YK | on | 06/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4889 | on | 28/08/1941 (New) | YK | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3660 | on | 23/10/1941 (New) | YK | on | 30/11/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4896 | on | 04/12/1941 (New) | YK | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3661 | on | 07/01/1942 (New) | YK | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3643 | on | 04/03/1942 (New) | YK | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3648 | on | 21/05/1942 (New) | YK | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3666 | on | 05/09/1942 (New) | YK | on | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3672 | on | 11/11/1942 (New) | YK | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3673 | on | 02/12/1942 (New) | YK | on | 05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3674 | on | 23/12/1942 (New) | YK | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2572 | on | 03/10/1924 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2576 | on | 11/12/1936 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 840 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 841 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 842 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 843 | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 845 | on | 14/01/1930 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 846 | on | 18/10/1934 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 13/01/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 847 | on | 07/11/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 848 | on | 22/06/1932 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 849 | on | 22/06/1932 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 906 | on | 26/08/1941 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 909 | on | 30/08/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 914 | on | 31/10/1929 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 915 | on | 19/03/1924 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 29/09/1946 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 924 | on | 07/07/1925 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 928 | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 929 | m/e | 02/1921 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 930 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 28/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 931 | m/e | 03/1921 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 933 | on | 04/04/1942 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 936 | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 937 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2365 | on | 30/09/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2367 | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2375 | on | 16/01/1937 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 29/09/1946 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2377 | on | 28/09/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2380 | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1374 | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1375 | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1376 | on | 29/08/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1378 | on | 09/10/1929 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1379 | on | 16/10/1934 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1380 | on | 29/11/1923 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1381 | on | 04/12/1923 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 10/09/1961 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1382 | on | 29/08/1941 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1383 | on | 22/11/1929 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1384 | on | 07/07/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3680 | on | 15/04/1943 (New) | YK | on | 20/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3686 | on | 19/08/1943 (New) | YK | on | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3687 | on | 20/09/1943 (New) | YK | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3688 | on | 07/10/1943 (New) | YK | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3689 | on | 27/10/1943 (New) | YK | on | 26/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3690 | on | 09/12/1943 (New) | YK | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3691 | on | 20/01/1944 (New) | YK | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3693 | on | 20/04/1944 (New) | YK | on | 19/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3694 | on | 21/06/1944 (New) | YK | on | 19/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 739 | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 843 | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 747 | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | on | 29/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 756 | on | 06/05/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 29/09/1946 | YK | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1015 | on | 04/01/1947 (New) | YK | on | 17/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1115 | on | 10/01/1947 (New) | YK | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1016 | on | 16/01/1947 (New) | YK | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1017 | on | 28/01/1947 (New) | YK | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1018 | on | 04/02/1947 (New) | YK | on | 30/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1216 | on | 15/07/1947 (New) | YK | on | 23/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1415 | on | 29/09/1946 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1430 | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1446 | on | 29/09/1946 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/07/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 522 | on | 19/06/1947 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 16/08/1947 | YK | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1413 | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton | on | 24/08/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1402 | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1432 | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton | on | 31/08/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 524 | on | 26/09/1947 (New) | YK | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1239 | on | 02/10/1947 (New) | YK | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1034 | on | 03/10/1947 (New) | YK | on | 29/11/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1240 | on | 06/10/1947 (New) | YK | on | 16/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1400 | on | 06/05/1946 | SKN | Stockton | on | 25/10/1947 | YK | on | 07/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1035 | on | 31/10/1947 (New) | YK | on | 05/04/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2379 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2740 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2751 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/06/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2755 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/06/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2759 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2760 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2761 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2763 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 28/02/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5027 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 21/08/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5044 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 31/10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5051 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5056 | m/e | 11/1935 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5059 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5060 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 16/07/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5068 | m/e | 12/1935 | LOW | Lowestoft | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5073 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5076 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5079 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5108 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 16/07/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5121 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5656 | m/e | 11/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5700 | m/e | 11/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5723 | m/e | 11/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8230 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8231 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8238 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8240 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 10/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8246 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 24/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8250 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 06/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8253 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 55E | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8268 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/06/1948 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8275 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8280 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 02/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8282 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 26/10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8286 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 16/06/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8292 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8293 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 10/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8294 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8297 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 26/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8298 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8310 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8677 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 12/11/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8695 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8699 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8715 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8722 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8726 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8735 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 22/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8739 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50E | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8741 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8745 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8031 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8032 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8042 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 28/01/1950 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8043 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8044 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8045 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8046 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8152 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 526 | on | 09/01/1948 (New) | YK | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5639 | m/e | 03/1933 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/01/1948 (R) | YK | |||||
Steam | N4 | 0-6-2T | 5619 | m/e | 10/1933 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/01/1948 (R) | YK | |||||
Steam | N4 | 0-6-2T | 5621 | m/e | 10/1937 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/01/1948 (R) | YK | w/e | 06/08/1949 | WBY | Whitby | |
Steam | N4 | 0-6-2T | 5631 | m/e | 06/1932 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/01/1948 (R) | YK | w/e | 29/01/1949 | MAL | Malton | |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5679 | m/e | 09/1935 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/02/1948 (R) | YK | |||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60532 | on | 25/03/1948 (New) | YK | on | 27/11/1949 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60534 | on | 23/04/1948 (New) | YK | on | 27/11/1949 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5093 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 01/05/1948 | YK | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5120 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 01/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 30/07/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60535 | on | 05/05/1948 (New) | YK | on | 27/11/1949 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61071 | on | 30/08/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 16/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 22/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61084 | on | 09/10/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 22/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61071 | on | 16/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 22/05/1948 | YK | on | 11/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61084 | on | 16/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 22/05/1948 | YK | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1239 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 23/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70839 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77013 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78526 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78538 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 13/08/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78684 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1239 | on | 23/05/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 29/05/1948 | YK | on | 20/09/1953 | 68E | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 522 | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 30/05/1948 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2726 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 05/06/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8313 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 19/06/1948 | YK | w/e | 03/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63102 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63128 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63129 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63136 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63138 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63157 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60526 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 02/10/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 524 | on | 18/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | on | 02/12/1962 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1288 | on | 16/02/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | w/e | 02/10/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60526 | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 02/10/1948 | YK | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1288 | on | 26/09/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 02/10/1948 | YK | on | 06/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2727 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2736 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2744 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YK | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61337 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | STM | St Margarets | on | 31/10/1948 | YK | w/e | 06/11/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61337 | on | 31/10/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 06/11/1948 | YK | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2742 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 13/11/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2745 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 13/11/1948 | YK | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2369 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5043 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8039 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | w/e | 30/04/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8040 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 20/11/1948 | YK | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60138 | on | 10/12/1948 (New) | YK | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 864 | on | 24/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | on | 12/12/1948 | YK | w/e | 18/12/1948 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 864 | on | 12/12/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 18/12/1948 | YK | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60121 | on | 22/12/1948 (New) | YK | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60140 | on | 24/12/1948 (New) | YK | on | 09/10/1949 | KX | Kings Cross | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 963 | on | 24/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | on | 26/12/1948 | YK | w/e | 01/01/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60141 | on | 31/12/1948 (New) | YK | on | 09/10/1949 | KX | Kings Cross | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 963 | on | 26/12/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 01/01/1949 | YK | on | 29/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63061 | on | 13/04/1947 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/02/1949 | YK | on | 13/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63109 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63076 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63078 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63099 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68051 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | w/e | 30/04/1949 | YK | w/e | 16/07/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60129 | on | 15/06/1949 (New) | YK | on | 04/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65845 | on | 23/10/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 10/07/1949 | YK | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65849 | on | 01/01/1948 | PMN | Percy Main | w/e | 16/07/1949 | YK | w/e | 06/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5890 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 16/07/1949 | YK | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68061 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 16/07/1949 | YK | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 17/07/1949 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1038 | on | 05/12/1947 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 17/07/1949 | YK | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | on | 17/07/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1038 | on | 17/07/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | YK | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63056 | on | 29/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63069 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63103 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90235 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90609 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63100 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63197 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60153 | on | 26/08/1949 (New) | YK | on | 02/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63057 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63022 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90006 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63009 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63011 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77445 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78532 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63129 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63157 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63162 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79186 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79227 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60501 | on | 04/09/1949 | 64B | Haymarket | on | 27/11/1949 | YK | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60502 | on | 04/09/1949 | 64B | Haymarket | on | 27/11/1949 | YK | on | 03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60503 | on | 26/05/1948 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 27/11/1949 | YK | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61404 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1423 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1426 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1450 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1456 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1458 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1466 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61404 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1423 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1426 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 01/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1450 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1456 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1458 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1466 | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | on | 06/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65075 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65708 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | WBY | Whitby | w/e | 17/12/1949 | YK | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 8416 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | YK | on | 04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68017 | on | 01/01/1948 | SCA | Scarborough | w/e | 28/01/1950 | YK | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54D | Consett |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65883 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5894 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65067 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWD | Tweedmouth | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 50A | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65861 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 30/04/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60140 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 04/06/1950 | 50A | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60146 | on | 30/04/1950 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 04/06/1950 | 50A | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60140 | on | 04/06/1950 | 50A | York (North) | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 50A | on | 11/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90670 | on | 22/07/1947 | WD | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50C | Selby | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90511 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | on | 17/04/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62397 | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50A | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62730 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62735 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68677 | m/e | 12/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62730 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62732 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62734 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | on | 15/07/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62735 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68677 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50A | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60074 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 27/11/1950 | 50A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60074 | on | 27/11/1950 | 50A | York (North) | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50A | on | 17/12/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60501 | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/12/1950 | 50A | on | 08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60503 | on | 27/11/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/12/1950 | 50A | on | 27/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69016 | m/e | 01/1951 (New) | YK | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69020 | m/e | 01/1951 (New) | YK | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65118 | on | 13/05/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65118 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 50A | on | 29/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65874 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 50A | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65874 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68042 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63270 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50F | Malton | on | 11/03/1951 | 50A | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63270 | on | 11/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 50A | on | 10/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65874 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68042 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68051 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | DAR | Darlington | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68029 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68029 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62746 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62345 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65887 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62345 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62746 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65887 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61053 | on | 27/06/1946 | IPS | Ipswich (New) | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61339 | on | 08/09/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61053 | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | on | 25/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | on | 19/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61339 | on | 02/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50A | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62774 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | PKG | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65883 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62774 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65650 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65691 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51F | West Auckland | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65883 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65675 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65683 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65675 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65683 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61416 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61426 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65844 | on | 08/11/1939 | SBH | Blyth (South) | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | on | 27/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61416 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61426 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | on | 29/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | on | 27/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 21/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65827 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65848 | on | 01/01/1948 | PMN | Percy Main | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61002 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 11/11/1951 | 50A | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61002 | on | 11/11/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 50A | on | 06/06/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65677 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65687 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 50A | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65677 | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61419 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61436 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61419 | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61436 | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | on | 17/02/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50A | on | 15/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42083 | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62702 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62702 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61039 | on | 12/12/1947 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61040 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61039 | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61040 | on | 06/07/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60901 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60907 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60929 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60901 | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60907 | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | w/e | 28/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60929 | on | 14/09/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | m/e | 12/1952 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60512 | on | 08/09/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 14/12/1952 | 50A | on | 02/12/1962 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60515 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 14/12/1952 | 50A | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62343 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50Fs1 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 50C | Selby | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50FPICK | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90047 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90500 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61015 | on | 17/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region | on | 21/06/1953 | 50A | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | on | 19/05/1953 | SR | To Southern Region | on | 21/06/1953 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61176 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 19/07/1953 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61224 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 19/07/1953 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60895 | on | 19/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 29/07/1953 | 50A | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60981 | on | 19/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 27/09/1953 | 50A | w/e | 15/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60982 | on | 19/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 27/09/1953 | 50A | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68724 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51F | West Auckland | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61473 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61424 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/11/1953 | 50A | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68401 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50A | on | 12/07/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68435 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50A | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61015 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/02/1954 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | on | 15/11/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 21/02/1954 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90424 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61473 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61474 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 29/05/1955 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61424 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 05/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 29/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1954 | 50A | on | 09/02/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90044 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 50A | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90603 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90517 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65793 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | SEL | Selby | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65837 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68686 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 50A | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 50C | Selby | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65648 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65656 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65675 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50G | Whitby | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65714 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65723 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | on | 14/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80116 | on | 04/05/1955 (New) | 50A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50G | Whitby | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61422 | on | 07/06/1953 | 50C | Selby | on | 29/05/1955 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60837 | on | 05/10/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 29/05/1955 | 50A | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 26/06/1955 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 26/06/1955 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61274 | on | 21/06/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 26/06/1955 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61291 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 26/06/1955 | 50A | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62745 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60941 | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 25/09/1955 | 50A | on | 06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60946 | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 25/09/1955 | 50A | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60982 | on | 26/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 25/09/1955 | 50A | on | 05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65647 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | on | 26/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65714 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | on | 09/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69910 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69915 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69916 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | on | 12/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69922 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | on | 22/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | on | 23/08/1953 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 20/11/1955 | 50A | on | 08/06/1958 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90409 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68681 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 55E | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13237 | on | 09/02/1956 (New) | 50A | on | 15/03/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13238 | on | 15/02/1956 (New) | 50A | on | 23/03/1986 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13239 | on | 17/02/1956 (New) | 50A | on | 24/04/1983 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69890 | on | 15/08/1948 | WBY | Whitby | on | 19/02/1956 | 50A | on | 10/06/1956 | 50G | Whitby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13240 | on | 24/02/1956 (New) | 50A | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13241 | on | 02/03/1956 (New) | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13242 | on | 06/03/1956 (New) | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13243 | on | 09/03/1956 (New) | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13244 | on | 15/03/1956 (New) | 50A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62046 | on | 21/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 12/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62047 | on | 20/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62048 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 01/11/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62049 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62050 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 01/11/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62056 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 18/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62057 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 13/03/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62061 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 14/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62062 | m/e | 01/1950 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 01/11/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62063 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | on | 07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62747 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50A | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62771 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50A | on | 17/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13313 | on | 25/06/1956 (New) | 50A | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13314 | on | 03/07/1956 (New) | 50A | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13315 | on | 05/07/1956 (New) | 50A | on | 20/05/1984 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13318 | on | 09/10/1956 (New) | 50A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13319 | on | 11/10/1956 (New) | 50A | on | 19/05/1985 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13320 | on | 16/10/1956 (New) | 50A | w/e | 18/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 07/06/1953 | 50F | Malton | on | 21/10/1956 | 50A | on | 03/03/1957 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51235 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 50A | m/e | 10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69913 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 50A | on | 08/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62395 | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 50A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73163 | m/e | 02/1957 (New) | 50A | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90068 | on | 07/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 16/06/1957 | 50A | on | 01/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90424 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90012 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90309 | on | 29/01/1950 | TDK | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90611 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90625 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90445 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90405 | on | 02/07/1947 | WD | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90475 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90487 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65683 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | on | 02/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68273 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | on | 14/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68687 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | on | 15/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61419 | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | Selby | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60848 | on | 09/09/1956 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60887 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | on | 06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60939 | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68698 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50A | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68729 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47581 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50A | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47403 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 50A | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47239 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 50A | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61410 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50A | on | 03/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61413 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50A | on | 11/12/1960 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61440 | on | 25/09/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50A | on | 15/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 20/11/1955 | 52B | Heaton | on | 08/06/1958 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90543 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90578 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90230 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47607 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20D | Normanton | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | on | 30/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42477 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42553 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42639 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65698 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50C | Selby | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | on | 15/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47418 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 50A | on | 09/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47436 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 50A | on | 20/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47254 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 50A | on | 15/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46480 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46481 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51A | Darlington | 2w/e | 13/09/1958 | 50A | 3w/e | 04/10/1958 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60828 | on | 11/03/1958 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60855 | on | 20/10/1957 | 34E | Neasden | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | on | 13/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60876 | on | 20/10/1957 | 34E | Neasden | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | on | 19/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60877 | on | 20/10/1957 | 34E | Neasden | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60878 | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62740 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 50A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77012 | w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 50A | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47334 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68736 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69016 | m/e | 01/1951 | YK | York (North) (New) | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61069 | on | 26/08/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 25/01/1959 | 50A | on | 26/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61086 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 25/01/1959 | 50A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47556 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50A | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68392 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50A | on | 30/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68431 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50A | w/e | 15/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47403 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41252 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42083 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42085 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50G | Whitby | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68309 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 50A | on | 14/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61273 | on | 21/06/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 07/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61276 | on | 14/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 28/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61291 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61319 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 16/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61478 | on | 01/05/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 12/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61433 | on | 23/09/1956 | 50C | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 30/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61456 | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 01/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61458 | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 02/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 30/06/1957 | 50C | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | on | 08/06/1958 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 50A | on | 01/11/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2046 | on | 13/12/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) (New) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90467 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90663 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | on | 13/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42477 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42553 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42639 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50F | Malton |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2245 | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | on | 05/07/1959 | 50A | on | 27/08/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2062 | on | 03/07/1959 | 50C | Selby (New) | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 50A | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2063 | on | 14/07/1959 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2270 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 50A | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61452 | on | 14/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 18/07/1959 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2064 | on | 23/07/1959 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2065 | on | 11/08/1959 (New) | 50A | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2066 | on | 17/08/1959 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61198 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61388 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62005 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 13/03/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62009 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62047 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 01/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62065 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | on | 30/08/1959 | 50A | on | 20/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | on | 01/09/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | on | 06/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60842 | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60879 | on | 16/06/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61469 | on | 08/06/1958 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 19/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61466 | on | 09/02/1958 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 24/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64706 | on | 26/06/1939 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | on | 26/07/1959 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64818 | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64821 | on | 27/09/1953 | 50D | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64845 | on | 05/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64847 | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 08/11/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64855 | on | 10/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64857 | on | 20/07/1940 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64859 | on | 10/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64861 | on | 23/07/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64866 | on | 14/07/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 08/11/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/11/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64942 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 20/03/1960 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64944 | on | 20/07/1940 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 13/12/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63436 | on | 16/06/1957 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63449 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77013 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90518 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 16/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47438 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47462 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47581 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62738 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 21/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62753 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 22/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62770 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 23/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | on | 15/09/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 19/09/1959 (R) | 50A | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65861 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65881 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65891 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68686 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 14/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69910 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69912 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | on | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2269 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60837 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 01/11/1959 | 50A | on | 16/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60864 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 01/11/1959 | 50A | on | 16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60877 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 01/11/1959 | 50A | on | 13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60939 | on | 14/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 01/11/1959 | 50A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43014 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 50A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43055 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43056 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 50A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43070 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 50A | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90045 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 50A | on | 27/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D252 | on | 21/12/1959 (New) | 50A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | on | 30/12/1959 (New) | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D254 | on | 31/12/1959 (New) | 50A | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 64H | Leith Central | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D253 | on | 08/01/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D253 | on | 08/01/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | on | 29/01/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | on | 07/12/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2595 | on | 30/01/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | on | 01/02/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D258 | on | 03/02/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D259 | on | 05/02/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61425 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 14/02/1960 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61431 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 14/02/1960 | 50A | on | 25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D253 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69003 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69008 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D258 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D259 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3872 | on | 12/03/1960 (New) | 50A | on | 20/07/1981 | MR | March | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3940 | on | 16/03/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 50A | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3874 | on | 19/03/1960 (New) | 50A | on | 23/07/1993 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D254 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 64H | Leith Central | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3946 | on | 02/04/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D275 | on | 16/05/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2147 | on | 19/05/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D276 | on | 23/05/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2148 | on | 24/05/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D277 | on | 30/05/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2150 | on | 10/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60516 | on | 22/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 12/06/1960 | 50A | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60518 | on | 25/02/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 12/06/1960 | 50A | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60810 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton | on | 12/06/1960 | 50A | w/e | 21/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2095 | on | 15/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2096 | on | 16/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2151 | on | 16/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2075 | on | 24/11/1959 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50A | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2097 | on | 18/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D281 | on | 20/06/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2152 | on | 22/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D282 | on | 27/06/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2153 | on | 27/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2094 | on | 28/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2598 | on | 30/06/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2154 | on | 01/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2098 | on | 02/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D283 | on | 04/07/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2599 | on | 08/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3070 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3071 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D284 | on | 11/07/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2600 | on | 13/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2099 | on | 15/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D285 | on | 18/07/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2601 | on | 20/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | on | 26/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2100 | on | 27/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2602 | on | 28/07/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2156 | on | 08/08/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2101 | on | 09/08/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2157 | on | 16/08/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2102 | on | 17/08/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2158 | on | 22/08/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2103 | on | 27/08/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2159 | on | 29/08/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2160 | on | 05/09/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | on | 12/06/1960 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61020 | on | 08/11/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | on | 12/06/1960 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 06/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61031 | on | 30/11/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 07/06/1964 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61039 | on | 08/11/1959 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 06/08/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61049 | on | 08/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61062 | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 03/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61068 | on | 03/04/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61240 | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2161 | on | 13/09/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 55F | Manningham | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 50A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2162 | on | 21/09/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2104 | on | 24/09/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2163 | on | 03/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2105 | on | 06/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2164 | on | 07/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2106 | on | 15/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2165 | on | 17/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2107 | on | 22/10/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2110 | on | 18/11/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60150 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 20/11/1960 | 50A | on | 05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60154 | on | 23/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 20/11/1960 | 50A | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2111 | on | 25/11/1960 (New) | 50A | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2112 | on | 09/12/1960 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3235 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50A | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2113 | on | 23/12/1960 (New) | 50A | on | 03/08/1975 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65691 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 50A | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2151 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D349 | on | 14/06/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D350 | on | 21/06/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D351 | on | 28/06/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D352 | on | 05/07/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D353 | on | 12/07/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D354 | on | 19/07/1961 (New) | 50A | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D355 | on | 16/08/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D356 | on | 23/08/1961 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60124 | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | on | 22/11/1964 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60126 | on | 27/04/1949 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | on | 18/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60848 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | w/e | 16/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60911 | on | 06/09/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60967 | on | 12/06/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | on | 10/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 52G | Sunderland | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90217 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | on | 21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90078 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90623 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | on | 05/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | on | 08/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D354 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 31B | March | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D385 | on | 28/03/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D386 | on | 04/04/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D387 | on | 11/04/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D388 | on | 18/04/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D389 | on | 02/05/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D390 | on | 09/05/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D391 | on | 16/05/1962 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62042 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 17/06/1962 | 50A | on | 30/04/1967 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43097 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 50A | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60155 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 04/11/1962 | 50A | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90517 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 50A | on | 15/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60531 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60536 | on | 08/10/1962 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60519 | on | 16/10/1961 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60805 | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60833 | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60886 | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 10/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60929 | on | 10/09/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60932 | on | 08/06/1958 | 52B | Heaton | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60942 | on | 16/06/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60945 | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | on | 06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D345 | on | 17/05/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill (New) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D346 | on | 24/05/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill (New) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D347 | on | 31/05/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill (New) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D348 | on | 07/06/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill (New) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5096 | on | 09/04/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5099 | on | 03/06/1960 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5098 | on | 26/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5100 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82027 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82028 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82029 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46473 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41251 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65854 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65859 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77004 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77013 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 50A | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61275 | on | 07/11/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 12/05/1963 | 50A | on | 28/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3076 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 50A | on | 30/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5176 | on | 08/01/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 50A | w/e | 04/09/1965 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62058 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/08/1963 | 50A | on | 03/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62062 | on | 01/11/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/08/1963 | 50A | on | 21/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62007 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 25/08/1963 | 50A | on | 28/06/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92005 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | w/e | 30/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92006 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92221 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | w/e | 10/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60120 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 20/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60141 | on | 21/05/1950 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60143 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 06/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60145 | on | 20/11/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 02/01/1966 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60147 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 28/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62010 | on | 20/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 18/10/1965 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62028 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 21/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62029 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | on | 16/06/1963 | SBH | Blyth (South) | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | on | 21/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92205 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92206 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | on | 17/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | on | 17/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60146 | on | 28/07/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 13/10/1963 | 50A | on | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7578 | on | 30/11/1963 | 16A | Toton (New) | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 50A | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60156 | on | 05/04/1959 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 26/01/1964 | 50A | on | 10/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2065 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 50A | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 55F | Manningham |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2054 | on | 11/04/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 50A | on | 19/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7578 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50A | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43133 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50D | Goole | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60152 | on | 09/09/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | on | 21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61176 | on | 15/12/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | on | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61256 | on | 14/09/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | on | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61303 | on | 04/03/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | on | 21/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62012 | on | 02/12/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | on | 30/04/1967 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43138 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50A | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 50A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65846 | on | 15/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 28/02/1965 | 50A | on | 25/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65823 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65856 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50A | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2081 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2231 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 50A | w/e | 18/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60129 | on | 06/12/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 11/07/1965 | 50A | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60151 | on | 18/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 11/07/1965 | 50A | on | 24/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5200 | on | 16/01/1965 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 50A | w/e | 18/09/1965 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5176 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61035 | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | on | 12/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61199 | on | 16/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | on | 05/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61216 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | on | 23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 31/10/1965 | 50A | on | 15/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61238 | on | 07/06/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 31/10/1965 | 50A | on | 17/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5177 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5178 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42204 | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90347 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90395 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 50A | on | 28/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60806 | on | 05/07/1964 | 51A | Darlington | on | 02/01/1966 | 50A | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D243 | on | 06/11/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D244 | on | 09/11/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D271 | on | 20/04/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D392 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D241 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D249 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D280 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1990 | on | 26/02/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42108 | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 56A | Wakefield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1991 | on | 02/03/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1992 | on | 15/03/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1993 | on | 26/03/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1994 | on | 16/04/1966 (New) | 50A | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60145 | on | 27/03/1966 | Withdrawn | on | 17/04/1966 (R) | 50A | on | 19/06/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1995 | on | 23/04/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77012 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 50A | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45055 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 50A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1788 | on | 09/12/1964 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 50A | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1791 | on | 10/12/1964 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 50A | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43123 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 21/05/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1996 | on | 01/06/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1997 | on | 03/06/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1998 | on | 14/06/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1999 | on | 25/06/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1994 | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6784 | on | 12/12/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | on | 19/12/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | on | 28/12/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | on | 31/12/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6788 | on | 14/01/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6789 | on | 18/01/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6790 | on | 28/01/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | on | 20/02/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | on | 08/03/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6819 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6820 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 3w/e | 13/08/1966 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6823 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6824 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6825 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6826 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6827 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1100 | on | 01/08/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1101 | on | 12/08/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2052 | on | 04/02/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2053 | on | 11/04/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1102 | on | 09/09/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1989 | on | 26/02/1966 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1103 | on | 02/10/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6831 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | on | 03/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6833 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6834 | on | 10/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6835 | on | 10/04/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6836 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | on | 19/10/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6791 | on | 31/01/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6792 | on | 13/02/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77002 | on | 19/06/1966 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1105 | on | 09/11/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61173 | on | 05/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 13/11/1966 | 50A | on | 23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1106 | on | 25/11/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6861 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6862 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6863 | on | 06/08/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6864 | on | 22/08/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6865 | on | 29/08/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61012 | on | 17/07/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | on | 18/12/1966 | 50A | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1107 | on | 23/12/1966 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5154 | on | 20/05/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5155 | on | 03/06/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50A | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61189 | on | 13/11/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 15/01/1967 | 50A | on | 11/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61030 | on | 31/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 22/01/1967 | 50A | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61123 | on | 05/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | on | 22/01/1967 | 50A | on | 11/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D254 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 50A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D258 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D259 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 50A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | on | 28/01/1967 (New) | 50A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1109 | on | 28/01/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1110 | on | 28/01/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62001 | on | 27/03/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 05/02/1967 | 50A | on | 25/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1111 | on | 25/02/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D272 | on | 25/04/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D274 | on | 09/05/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D275 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | on | 13/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D277 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8300 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8301 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8302 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8303 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8304 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8305 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8306 | on | 22/04/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8307 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8308 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8309 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 50A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D285 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3726 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50A | on | 30/08/1981 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2101 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 55B | on | 21/11/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 55B | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 55B | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2324 | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | on | 08/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8018 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2047 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55B | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2150 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55B | on | 19/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1536 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55B | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1537 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55B | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2073 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55B | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2247 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55B | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2267 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55B | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2063 | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 55B | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D353 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55B | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55B | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55B | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1109 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1110 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1111 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 08/11/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1510 | w/e | 27/09/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1517 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1767 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 15/11/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8019 | w/e | 17/08/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8030 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1514 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 18/10/1969 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1516 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8031 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1512 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 28/03/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1519 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 15/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D277 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | on | 23/08/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D279 | on | 13/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1513 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1511 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55B | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1518 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4044 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55B | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1515 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 55B | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8029 | 2w/e | 26/08/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 55B | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D352 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 30/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1533 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1542 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D252 | on | 21/12/1959 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D281 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 30/05/1970 | 55B | on | 13/02/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D224 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 04/07/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D316 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D385 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 04/07/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8027 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8024 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 65A | Eastfield |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D340 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 04/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 01/08/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1541 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1543 | on | 10/08/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1545 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1570 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1571 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1572 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1573 | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1574 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1768 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D228 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 01/08/1970 | 55B | w/e | 29/08/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D252 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1106 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55B | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1107 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55B | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1100 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 55B | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3276 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 36A | Doncaster | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 55B | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55G | Knottingley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D282 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D08 | Liverpool Division |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D283 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | on | 05/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1111 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3687 | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 25/09/1971 | 55B | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3937 | on | 04/03/1960 | 55D | Royston (New) | w/e | 02/10/1971 | 55B | on | 23/05/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1522 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1523 | w/e | 14/02/1970 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1524 | w/e | 14/02/1970 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5520 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5521 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 19/05/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5522 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 18/08/1973 | CD | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5583 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5587 | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5600 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5616 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5618 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 19/05/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5850 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5599 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | 55B | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D258 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D271 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 26/01/1974 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D284 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | on | 30/05/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D285 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 29/02/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 29/02/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D347 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1618 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1619 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5659 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 55B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D280 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 55B | on | 12/09/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5538 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5558 | w/e | 18/03/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5559 | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55B | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5585 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D255 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55B | w/e | 03/02/1973 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2090 | on | 05/05/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55B | on | 18/07/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2111 | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55B | w/e | 03/08/1974 | HS | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5537 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55B | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2172 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 55B | on | 26/05/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D259 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D271 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5550 | w/e | 12/02/1972 | 31B | March | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 55B | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/05/1973 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D269 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 19/05/1973 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2013 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 31B | March | w/e | 14/07/1973 | YK | on | 18/07/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2371 | 2w/e | 24/03/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 08/09/1973 | YK | 2w/e | 25/07/1976 | HS | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1102 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1103 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1105 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5581 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | w/e | 12/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5584 | w/e | 22/04/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | w/e | 12/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5662 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5677 | w/e | 31/03/1973 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | w/e | 10/11/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5678 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5653 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 10/11/1973 | YK | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5560 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/01/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5565 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 12/01/1974 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5800 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/01/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5850 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 12/01/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 26/01/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40100 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/05/1974 | YK | w/e | 15/06/1974 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40124 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | YK | w/e | 15/06/1974 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31146 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 11/05/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31148 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 11/05/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40050 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills | w/e | 15/06/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40056 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 15/06/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08042 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 03/08/1974 | YK | on | 11/03/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40067 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40068 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47432 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47433 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | m/e | 11/1981 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47471 | 5w/e | 29/06/1974 | ED | Eastfield | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | on | 31/12/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47547 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47541 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47553 | w/e | 10/08/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | on | 12/02/1978 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31134 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31253 | w/e | 19/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31280 | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31302 | w/e | 06/07/1974 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31305 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 26/10/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31308 | w/e | 06/07/1974 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31312 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31319 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 40B | Immingham | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31281 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 26/10/1974 | YK | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47546 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 09/11/1974 | YK | w/e | 22/01/1978 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31115 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | YK | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47153 | w/e | 20/12/1969 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 07/12/1974 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47520 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47521 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47522 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47523 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47524 | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47525 | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47526 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47527 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47528 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 29/02/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47549 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 06/09/1981 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47552 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | on | 06/09/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31119 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31123 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31163 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40047 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | YK | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47542 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | YK | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47543 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | YK | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03159 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | 40A | Lincoln | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | YK | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31272 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | YK | on | 15/08/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08540 | w/e | 14/08/1971 | 55H | Neville Hill | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | YK | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08771 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | TE | Thornaby | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | YK | on | 20/03/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47430 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47431 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47544 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | on | 15/05/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40049 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | YK | on | 23/01/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40059 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | YK | on | 08/08/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31111 | w/e | 26/10/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | YK | m/e | 05/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31115 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | YK | m/e | 10/1976 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08336 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/05/1976 | YK | on | 05/04/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08388 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/05/1976 | YK | on | 20/07/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31127 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham | m/e | 10/1976 | YK | m/e | 02/1978 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31131 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham | m/e | 10/1976 | YK | m/e | 07/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40052 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | on | 17/06/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40054 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | on | 31/12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40056 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | on | 06/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40057 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40058 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | on | 02/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40067 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | on | 12/07/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40068 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | on | 24/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40069 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | on | 18/09/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40070 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills | m/e | 10/1977 | YK | on | 14/06/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47434 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | YK | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47459 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | YK | on | 25/03/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47462 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | YK | on | 31/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47164 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | YK | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47183 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | YK | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47297 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | SF | Stratford | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | YK | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31181 | m/e | 01/1977 | IM | Immingham | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | YK | on | 04/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31327 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | IM | Immingham | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | YK | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40006 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HM | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | YK | on | 13/03/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47542 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | SF | Stratford | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | YK | m/e | 02/1978 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47543 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | SF | Stratford | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | YK | m/e | 02/1978 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47541 | w/e | 22/01/1978 | HA | Haymarket | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | YK | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31175 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | TI | Tinsley | on | 05/07/1981 | YK | on | 02/03/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08064 | w/e | 09/05/1976 | HM | Healey Mills | on | 02/08/1981 | YK | on | 23/12/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08096 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | on | 09/08/1981 | YK | on | 09/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08501 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | on | 30/08/1981 | YK | on | 15/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08559 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50A | York (North) | on | 30/08/1981 | YK | on | 20/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47421 | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 06/09/1981 | YK | m/e | 10/1981 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08499 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | on | 13/05/1988 | YK | on | 01/06/2004 | Withdrawn |