Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1089 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4949 Week
» 7531 Month
» 272164 Year
» 1493729 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wigan Central (L&Y)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Wigan Central (L&Y) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1193       4w/e 22/06/1946 23D 01/01/1948 23C Southport
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1196       4w/e 22/06/1946 23D 01/01/1948 23C Southport
Steam 30 0-8-0 12839       4w/e 22/06/1946 23D 01/01/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 6 2-4-2T 10945       4w/e 22/06/1946 23D 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T 10945       4w/e 22/06/1946 23D m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2472 09/11/1936 10C Patricroft (New) w/e 27/09/1947 23D w/e 14/02/1948 26C Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2537       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 26/03/1955 27C Southport
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2554       01/01/1948 23D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2557       01/01/1948 23D 19/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2569       01/01/1948 23D 25/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2592       01/01/1948 23D w/e 04/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2614       01/01/1948 23D w/e 15/09/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2631       01/01/1948 23D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2632       01/01/1948 23D w/e 15/09/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2640       01/01/1948 23D w/e 15/09/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2641       01/01/1948 23D w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2642       01/01/1948 23D w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 678       01/01/1948 23D 8w/e 14/06/1952 5C Stafford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 679       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 07/10/1950 8E Brunswick
Steam 2P 4-4-0 680       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 04/10/1952 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2362       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2381       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 19/05/1956 9A Longsight
Steam 30 0-8-0 12727       01/01/1948 23D 14/10/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 52806       01/01/1948 23D m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 52827       01/01/1948 23D m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 52828       01/01/1948 23D m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 52834       01/01/1948 23D m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 52837       01/01/1948 23D 03/04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 30 0-8-0 12839 4w/e 22/06/1946 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 01/01/1948 23D w/e 29/10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12093       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 21/02/1953 99C Crewe Works
Steam 27 0-6-0 52152       01/01/1948 23D 06/03/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12169       01/01/1948 23D w/e 20/12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12189       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 23/02/1952 25D Mirfield
Steam 27 0-6-0 12290       01/01/1948 23D 2w/e 17/06/1950 28B Fleetwood
Steam 27 0-6-0 12312       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 22/03/1952 26C Bolton
Steam 27 0-6-0 12360       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 29/12/1951 26F Lees (Oldham)
Steam 27 0-6-0 12413       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 13/08/1955 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 28 0-6-0 12588 4w/e 22/06/1946 23C Southport 01/01/1948 23D 2w/e 17/06/1950 28B Fleetwood
Steam 28 0-6-0 12598       01/01/1948 23D 3w/e 14/01/1950 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 28 0-6-0 52602       01/01/1948 23D 13/11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50692       01/01/1948 23D m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10757       01/01/1948 23D 5w/e 16/07/1949 24E Blackpool Central
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50844       01/01/1948 23D m/e 09/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10887       01/01/1948 23D 4w/e 24/03/1951 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42179       01/12/1948 (New) 23D 2w/e 11/12/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42180       07/12/1948 (New) 23D w/e 30/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12437 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 3w/e 11/12/1948 23D 5w/e 16/07/1949 24E Blackpool Central
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42179 01/12/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) (New) 2w/e 11/12/1948 23D 06/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52390 01/01/1948 23B Aintree 5w/e 16/07/1949 23D 4w/e 09/08/1952 26A Newton Heath
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49585 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall 5w/e 24/12/1949 23D 10/02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49610 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 24/12/1949 23D 19/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 01/01/1948 24A Accrington 2w/e 17/06/1950 27D 4w/e 24/03/1951 27C Southport
Steam 31 0-8-0 52870 01/01/1948 23B Aintree 2w/e 17/06/1950 27D w/e 22/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 31 0-8-0 52916 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 2w/e 17/06/1950 27D 25/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49568 01/01/1948 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 09/09/1950 27D 19/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41102 2w/e 17/06/1950 27C Southport 4w/e 07/10/1950 27D 5w/e 23/06/1951 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49612 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 04/11/1950 27D 05/09/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49625 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 04/11/1950 27D 05/01/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49638 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 04/11/1950 27D 4w/e 28/11/1953 27B Aintree
Steam 28 0-6-0 52616 01/01/1948 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 02/12/1950 27D w/e 14/11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49659 01/01/1948 25D Mirfield 4w/e 02/12/1950 27D 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49511 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 27/01/1951 27D 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49592 01/01/1948 23B Aintree 4w/e 24/02/1951 27D 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49637 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 24/02/1951 27D 4w/e 28/11/1953 27B Aintree
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49664 01/01/1948 26C Bolton 4w/e 24/02/1951 27D 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41100 2w/e 17/06/1950 26B Agecroft 4w/e 19/05/1951 27D 5w/e 23/06/1951 35C Spital Bridge
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 4w/e 24/03/1951 27C Southport 4w/e 19/05/1951 27D 5w/e 23/06/1951 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 27 0-6-0 52262 5w/e 24/12/1949 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 19/05/1951 27D w/e 14/02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52387 01/01/1948 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 19/05/1951 27D 4w/e 29/12/1956 26D Bury
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41186 01/01/1948 25F Low Moor 4w/e 16/06/1951 27D 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C Southport
Steam 27 0-6-0 52289 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 16/06/1951 27D 4w/e 29/12/1956 26D Bury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43952 4w/e 19/05/1951 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D w/e 15/09/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44105 4w/e 31/12/1950 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D 8w/e 05/10/1957 24G Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44220 4w/e 31/12/1950 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D w/e 08/11/1958 24G Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44225 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D w/e 28/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44240 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D w/e 18/04/1964 10G Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44291 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D 4w/e 30/01/1954 26G Belle Vue
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41100 4w/e 21/07/1951 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D 4w/e 22/03/1952 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 4w/e 21/07/1951 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D 4w/e 22/03/1952 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41102 4w/e 21/07/1951 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D 4w/e 22/03/1952 27C Southport
Steam 28 0-6-0 52554 01/01/1948 26D Bury 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D w/e 25/10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52275 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 08/09/1951 27D 4w/e 29/12/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40588 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1951 27D 4w/e 31/10/1953 27A Bank Hall
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49592 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree 4w/e 06/10/1951 27D 4w/e 10/09/1955 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49511 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree 4w/e 22/03/1952 27D 4w/e 21/03/1953 25E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 27 0-6-0 52255 4w/e 19/05/1951 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/09/1952 27D w/e 29/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52095 4w/e 21/02/1953 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/03/1953 27D 4w/e 29/12/1956 24B Rose Grove
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40681 01/01/1948 26E Bacup 4w/e 18/04/1953 27D 4w/e 08/08/1953 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40691 4w/e 09/08/1952 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 18/04/1953 27D 8w/e 11/07/1953 25G Farnley Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44544 4w/e 07/10/1950 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 18/04/1953 27D w/e 18/04/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40680 4w/e 04/10/1952 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 08/08/1953 27D 4w/e 21/04/1956 25G Farnley Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44464 4w/e 07/10/1950 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 08/08/1953 27D w/e 02/03/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 7F 0-8-0 49554 4w/e 02/12/1950 27B Aintree 4w/e 03/10/1953 27D 4w/e 28/11/1953 27B Aintree
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44221 4w/e 07/10/1950 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 28/11/1953 27D w/e 15/09/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90121 4w/e 08/09/1951 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953 27D w/e 06/02/1960 26C Bolton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90570 4w/e 16/06/1951 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953 27D w/e 06/02/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90671 4w/e 11/08/1951 27B Aintree 4w/e 28/11/1953 27D 4w/e 18/05/1957 26E Lees (Oldham)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42473 8w/e 19/06/1954 26D Bury 4w/e 14/08/1954 27D w/e 03/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51474 4w/e 24/04/1954 24A Accrington 4w/e 14/08/1954 27D 4w/e 23/02/1957 24A Accrington
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90584       4w/e 09/10/1954 27D 4w/e 22/02/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90599       4w/e 09/10/1954 27D w/e 06/02/1960 26B Agecroft
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42792 4w/e 10/09/1955 15B Kettering 4w/e 08/10/1955 27D w/e 28/11/1959 9G Gorton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40584 4w/e 17/07/1954 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 24/03/1956 27D 4w/e 21/04/1956 25G Farnley Junction
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40587 4w/e 21/04/1956 25G Farnley Junction m/e 16/06/1956 27D 29/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40680 4w/e 21/04/1956 25G Farnley Junction m/e 16/06/1956 27D w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90277 m/e 16/06/1956 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 08/09/1956 27D 4w/e 06/10/1956 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78060       13/10/1956 (New) 27D w/e 15/09/1962 27B Aintree
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78061       13/10/1956 (New) 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78062       20/10/1956 (New) 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78063       m/e 11/1956 (New) 27D w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78064       m/e 11/1956 (New) 27D w/e 08/02/1964 16C Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44486 4w/e 21/04/1956 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 01/12/1956 27D w/e 02/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78040 11/12/1954 27A Bank Hall (New) 4w/e 23/02/1957 27D w/e 14/01/1961 27B Aintree
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90102 4w/e 02/12/1950 26B Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1957 27D 4w/e 20/04/1957 26C Bolton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40681 4w/e 24/03/1956 26C Bolton 4w/e 14/06/1958 27D w/e 27/08/1960 26F Patricroft
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42475 4w/e 28/12/1957 27C Southport w/e 25/10/1958 27D 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90561 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath w/e 24/01/1959 27D w/e 06/02/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42621 4w/e 12/07/1958 27C Southport w/e 26/09/1959 27D w/e 03/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42715 w/e 23/01/1960 26C Bolton w/e 06/02/1960 27D w/e 05/11/1960 27B Aintree
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42731 4w/e 04/12/1954 26D Bury w/e 06/02/1960 27D 08/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42734 4w/e 18/04/1953 26B Agecroft w/e 06/02/1960 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42821 4w/e 28/11/1953 24D Lower Darwen w/e 06/02/1960 27D w/e 23/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42864 w/e 07/02/1959 27B Aintree w/e 12/03/1960 27D 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44222 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E To Eastern Region w/e 09/04/1960 27D w/e 18/04/1964 10G Skipton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42697 w/e 06/02/1960 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/04/1960 27D w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42624 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath w/e 30/04/1960 27D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42555 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove w/e 18/06/1960 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42794 4w/e 04/12/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 22/07/1961 27D 09/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40191 w/e 23/09/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 25/11/1961 27D w/e 02/12/1961 27C Southport
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42715 w/e 05/11/1960 27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962 27D w/e 22/06/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42721 4w/e 23/03/1957 27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962 27D w/e 18/05/1963 26C Bolton
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42711 4w/e 23/03/1957 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1962 27D w/e 11/05/1963 26C Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42494 4w/e 04/10/1958 26F Patricroft w/e 08/12/1962 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42063 w/e 20/06/1959 27C Southport w/e 16/02/1963 27D w/e 11/05/1963 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78057 w/e 28/11/1959 8E Northwich w/e 11/05/1963 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42589 4w/e 12/07/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 11/05/1963 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42135       w/e 11/05/1963 27D 22/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42440 w/e 13/05/1961 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 18/05/1963 27D 28/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78027 w/e 11/05/1963 27A Bank Hall w/e 29/06/1963 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42634 w/e 22/06/1963 12E Barrow in Furness w/e 20/07/1963 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42680 w/e 21/05/1960 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 27D w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78002 4w/e 16/05/1953 89C Machynlleth w/e 17/08/1963 27D w/e 14/09/1963 8K Bank Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42647 01/01/1948 26B Agecroft w/e 26/10/1963 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42730 w/e 15/09/1962 27B Aintree w/e 23/11/1963 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78020 w/e 07/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 14/12/1963 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42675 4w/e 05/11/1955 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 08/02/1964 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8M Southport
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42878 w/e 23/11/1963 9G Gorton w/e 22/02/1964 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45218 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/03/1964 8P w/e 18/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)