Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 340 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4200 Week
» 6782 Month
» 271415 Year
» 1492980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Warrington Dallam


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Warrington Dallam Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2955 w/e 13/10/1934 8A   w/e 21/09/1935 8B w/e 05/03/1937 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2951 w/e 13/07/1935 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/10/1935 8B w/e 20/06/1936 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13252 w/e 13/07/1935 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/10/1935 8B w/e 17/08/1940 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2979 w/e 25/05/1935 5B Crewe South w/e 09/11/1935 8B w/e 13/11/1937 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13274 w/e 13/07/1935 10B Preston w/e 16/11/1935 8B w/e 13/11/1937 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2967 w/e 20/04/1935 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/03/1936 8B w/e 26/09/1936 3A Bescot
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2964 w/e 13/10/1934 12B   w/e 08/05/1936 8B w/e 27/03/1937 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2962 w/e 20/04/1935 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 09/05/1936 8B w/e 21/02/1942 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2971 w/e 01/06/1935 5B Crewe South w/e 03/10/1936 8B w/e 25/09/1937 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2972 w/e 16/11/1935 3D Aston w/e 21/11/1936 8B w/e 21/02/1942 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2982 w/e 03/07/1937 8A Edge Hill w/e 04/12/1937 8B w/e 05/07/1941 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2953 w/e 22/01/1938 8C Speke Junction w/e 29/04/1939 8B w/e 21/02/1942 5B Crewe South
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 80       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 29/12/1951 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 81       01/01/1948 8B 8w/e 29/11/1952 5D Stoke
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 84       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 23/02/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 207       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 04/11/1950 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2583       01/01/1948 8B w/e 12/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2606       01/01/1948 8B w/e 14/01/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7268       01/01/1948 8B m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7352       01/01/1948 8B w/e 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7376       01/01/1948 8B w/e 07/11/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7387       01/01/1948 8B w/e 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7591       01/01/1948 8B w/e 19/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7652       01/01/1948 8B m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7654       01/01/1948 8B w/e 23/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7657       01/01/1948 8B w/e 19/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T 6906       01/01/1948 8B m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T 6920       01/01/1948 8B 01/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T 6924       01/01/1948 8B m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3207       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 14/01/1950 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3283       01/01/1948 8B 29/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3314       01/01/1948 8B 02/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3357       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 08/08/1953 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3389       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 08/08/1953 3D Aston
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3398       01/01/1948 8B 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3615       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 23/02/1957 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3657       01/01/1948 8B w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12100       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam 27 0-6-0 52118       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 04/10/1952 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 27 0-6-0 12140       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 06/10/1951 8C Speke Junction
Steam 27 0-6-0 12175       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam 27 0-6-0 12250       01/01/1948 8B w/e 27/10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12330       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9008       01/01/1948 8B w/e 08/11/1958 8C Speke Junction
Steam G1 0-8-0 9085       01/01/1948 8B w/e 12/08/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9338       01/01/1948 8B m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8944       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam G1 0-8-0 9075       01/01/1948 8B 5w/e 24/12/1949 3B Bushbury
Steam G1 0-8-0 9136       01/01/1948 8B w/e 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 9411       01/01/1948 8B 8w/e 19/06/1954 2D Coventry
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9178       01/01/1948 8B m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9247       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 19/05/1951 3B Bushbury
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9302       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C Speke Junction
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6603       01/01/1948 8B w/e 21/07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6663       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6688       01/01/1948 8B m/e 04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6710       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 5A Crewe North
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6718       01/01/1948 8B 24/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4897       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 22/03/1952 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5001       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5026       01/01/1948 8B 3w/e 11/12/1948 10C Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5032       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 14/06/1958 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5035       01/01/1948 8B w/e 22/06/1963 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5095       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 09/09/1950 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5109       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 12/07/1952 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5149       01/01/1948 8B 4w/e 12/07/1952 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5196       01/01/1948 8B w/e 02/04/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5252       01/01/1948 8B w/e 27/06/1959 26F Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5321       01/01/1948 8B w/e 05/08/1961 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43237 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 3w/e 11/12/1948 8B 30/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3618 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 3w/e 11/12/1948 8B 4w/e 23/02/1957 2B Nuneaton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42607 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 5w/e 16/07/1949 8B w/e 15/04/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8926 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 5w/e 24/12/1949 8B 29/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 28 0-6-0 52598 01/01/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 3w/e 14/01/1950 8B 4w/e 04/11/1950 10C Patricroft
Steam 28 0-6-0 52608 01/01/1948 26D Bury 3w/e 14/01/1950 8B 4w/e 02/12/1950 7D Rhyl
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3282 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 2w/e 17/06/1950 8B w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48689 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950 8B 4w/e 08/09/1951 20C Royston
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43787 3w/e 14/01/1950 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 04/11/1950 8B 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43633 3w/e 14/01/1950 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 04/11/1950 8B 28/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50687 4w/e 04/11/1950 7D Rhyl 4w/e 02/12/1950 8B m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45495 3w/e 14/01/1950 10C Patricroft 4w/e 02/12/1950 8B w/e 20/06/1964 10B Blackpool Central
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 46727 01/01/1948 7D Rhyl 4w/e 31/12/1950 8B 4w/e 22/03/1952 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49093 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley 4w/e 17/07/1951 8B 8w/e 16/07/1955 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49249 01/01/1948 1C Watford 4w/e 17/07/1951 8B 8w/e 16/07/1955 2A Rugby
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 46643 4w/e 19/05/1951 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 11/08/1951 8B 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K Rhyl
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90122 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90126 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90140 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90163 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90197 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90204 4w/e 25/11/1950 38A Colwick 4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 26G Belle Vue
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90702       4w/e 08/09/1951 8B 4w/e 26/01/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40001 4w/e 27/01/1951 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/10/1951 8B 4w/e 05/09/1953 1A Willesden
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49024 4w/e 07/10/1950 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 06/10/1951 8B 4w/e 06/11/1954 2C Warwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48142 5w/e 16/07/1949 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B 4w/e 19/05/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48188 4w/e 02/12/1950 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48348 01/01/1948 19E Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48349 01/01/1948 19E Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B 4w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48531 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B w/e 07/11/1959 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48714 4w/e 04/11/1950 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B w/e 22/08/1959 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48715 4w/e 04/11/1950 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41321       m/e 02/1952 (New) 8B 4w/e 26/02/1955 6H Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41322       m/e 02/1952 (New) 8B 4w/e 06/11/1954 2C Warwick
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41323       m/e 03/1952 (New) 8B 4w/e 26/02/1955 6H Bangor
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49113 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952 8B 8w/e 29/11/1952 2B Nuneaton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45255 4w/e 19/04/1952 6H Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1952 8B 4w/e 06/11/1954 6J Holyhead
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47362 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 8w/e 29/11/1952 8B w/e 20/06/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48154 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 21/03/1953 8B 8w/e 11/07/1953 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50644 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B Preston 4w/e 21/03/1953 8B w/e 25/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50644 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B Preston 4w/e 21/03/1953 8B w/e 25/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48520 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 18/04/1953 8B w/e 17/06/1961 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45271 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 8B 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40202 4w/e 12/07/1952 5D Stoke 4w/e 08/08/1953 8B 4w/e 26/01/1957 6D Chester Northgate
Steam 27 0-6-0 52225 01/01/1948 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 08/08/1953 8B 4w/e 17/05/1958 99C Crewe Works
Steam 27 0-6-0 52432 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/08/1953 8B 4w/e 17/05/1958 6K Rhyl
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40143 5w/e 03/01/1953 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/09/1953 8B 4w/e 26/01/1957 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45271 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 31/10/1953 8B 4w/e 01/12/1956 6H Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45354 4w/e 03/10/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 31/10/1953 8B w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50643 8w/e 14/06/1952 10B Preston 4w/e 28/11/1953 8B m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50643 8w/e 14/06/1952 10B Preston 4w/e 28/11/1953 8B m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48491 01/01/1948 15B Kettering 4w/e 27/02/1954 8B w/e 25/10/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48673 01/01/1948 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 27/02/1954 8B 4w/e 19/05/1956 18A Toton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1210 4w/e 06/10/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 27/03/1954 8B w/e 23/07/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41210 4w/e 06/10/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 27/03/1954 8B w/e 23/07/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48247 4w/e 31/10/1953 6B Mold Junction 8w/e 19/06/1954 8B w/e 22/08/1959 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48634 4w/e 27/02/1954 9F Heaton Mersey 8w/e 19/06/1954 8B 4w/e 11/09/1954 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44237 3w/e 14/01/1950 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 09/10/1954 8B w/e 19/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44261 3w/e 14/01/1950 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 09/10/1954 8B 4w/e 29/01/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44356 01/01/1948 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 09/10/1954 8B w/e 22/02/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41322 4w/e 06/11/1954 2C Warwick 4w/e 01/01/1955 8B 4w/e 26/02/1955 6H Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45255 4w/e 06/11/1954 6J Holyhead 4w/e 01/01/1955 8B w/e 27/06/1959 26F Patricroft
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44384 4w/e 09/10/1954 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 29/01/1955 8B w/e 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41211 4w/e 05/09/1953 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 26/02/1955 8B 4w/e 26/01/1957 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41212 4w/e 05/09/1953 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955 8B 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224 4w/e 19/04/1952 6K Rhyl 4w/e 26/02/1955 8B 4w/e 21/05/1955 3E Monument Lane
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48441 4w/e 31/10/1953 2E Northampton 8w/e 16/07/1955 8B w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48094 4w/e 31/10/1953 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 25/02/1956 8B w/e 29/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49323 4w/e 11/08/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/09/1956 8B w/e 08/11/1958 26F Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48683 2w/e 17/06/1950 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 06/10/1956 8B w/e 07/11/1959 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48693 4w/e 03/12/1955 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 06/10/1956 8B 4w/e 23/03/1957 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45328 4w/e 06/10/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 03/11/1956 8B 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45271 4w/e 01/12/1956 6H Bangor 4w/e 29/12/1956 8B 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43308 4w/e 29/12/1956 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 23/02/1957 8B 17/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43619 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 23/02/1957 8B 29/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 41901 4w/e 09/10/1954 5A Crewe North 4w/e 10/08/1957 8B 4w/e 07/09/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41235 4w/e 08/10/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 10/08/1957 8B 8w/e 05/10/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48349 4w/e 18/05/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 10/08/1957 8B 4w/e 17/05/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41212 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 07/09/1957 8B w/e 01/11/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45328 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 07/09/1957 8B w/e 20/06/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40125 m/e 16/06/1956 1A Willesden 8w/e 05/10/1957 8B 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40156 4w/e 23/03/1957 1A Willesden 8w/e 05/10/1957 8B w/e 17/10/1959 16C Mansfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45271 4w/e 07/09/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 05/10/1957 8B w/e 01/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48655 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 30/11/1957 8B 4w/e 22/03/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43387 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 30/11/1957 8B 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43231 3w/e 14/01/1950 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 25/01/1958 8B 11/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49121 4w/e 28/12/1957 5C Stafford 4w/e 25/01/1958 8B m/e 30/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44593 4w/e 22/03/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 19/04/1958 8B w/e 01/11/1958 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48106 4w/e 19/05/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 17/05/1958 8B w/e 18/02/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48188 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes 4w/e 17/05/1958 8B w/e 05/03/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48296 4w/e 23/03/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 17/05/1958 8B w/e 08/10/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48720 4w/e 26/01/1952 8D Widnes 4w/e 17/05/1958 8B w/e 25/10/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41213 4w/e 26/02/1955 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/06/1958 8B w/e 29/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48373 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 14/06/1958 8B w/e 29/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48746 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 12/07/1958 8B w/e 05/05/1962 8A Edge Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47659 4w/e 21/02/1953 10B Preston w/e 29/11/1958 8B w/e 09/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43615 4w/e 30/11/1957 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/01/1959 8B w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43651 8w/e 29/11/1952 9G Northwich w/e 17/01/1959 8B 25/07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41324 8w/e 05/10/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/06/1959 8B w/e 02/04/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45546 4w/e 26/01/1957 5A Crewe North w/e 27/06/1959 8B w/e 04/07/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45549 w/e 20/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 27/06/1959 8B w/e 16/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45550 w/e 20/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 27/06/1959 8B w/e 18/06/1960 21D Aston
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45503 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 04/07/1959 8B w/e 18/06/1960 24L Carnforth
Steam 27 0-6-0 52225 4w/e 17/05/1958 99C Crewe Works w/e 05/09/1959 8B w/e 31/12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48408 w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/09/1959 8B w/e 07/11/1959 3A Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3851 12/09/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) w/e 03/10/1959 8B w/e 12/11/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47401 4w/e 09/10/1954 10C Patricroft w/e 03/10/1959 8B w/e 09/01/1960 24L Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47392 w/e 20/06/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 09/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43257 4w/e 12/07/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 16/09/1961 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43295 4w/e 12/07/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 07/11/1959 8B 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45256 w/e 11/10/1958 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 23/06/1962 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45276 3w/e 11/12/1948 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 23/07/1960 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45343 4w/e 24/03/1951 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45380 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 09/04/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45398 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 09/04/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45410 4w/e 24/04/1954 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959 8B w/e 29/10/1960 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3795       21/11/1959 (New) 8B w/e 31/03/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3796       21/11/1959 (New) 8B w/e 03/03/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3797       28/11/1959 (New) 8B w/e 23/12/1961 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3834       02/01/1960 (New) 8B w/e 07/04/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3835       02/01/1960 (New) 8B w/e 10/03/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 D2911 15/12/1959 2B Nuneaton (New) w/e 23/01/1960 8B w/e 30/01/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45516 8w/e 05/10/1957 8A Edge Hill w/e 06/02/1960 8B 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45518 8w/e 11/07/1953 10B Preston w/e 06/02/1960 8B w/e 18/06/1960 21D Aston
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47406 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth w/e 12/03/1960 8B w/e 11/08/1962 12F Workington
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41324 w/e 20/06/1959 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 02/04/1960 8B w/e 13/06/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45501 w/e 23/01/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 8B w/e 10/09/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45511 w/e 23/01/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 8B w/e 10/09/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45546 w/e 23/01/1960 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 8B w/e 09/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48188 w/e 05/03/1960 2B Nuneaton w/e 21/05/1960 8B w/e 05/05/1962 8A Edge Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43189 w/e 28/02/1959 3A Bescot w/e 18/06/1960 8B w/e 03/12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45196 w/e 02/04/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 25/06/1960 8B w/e 09/07/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44208 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 10/09/1960 8B w/e 15/10/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44451 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 10/09/1960 8B w/e 15/10/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44750       w/e 10/09/1960 8B w/e 08/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45524 4w/e 29/01/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/09/1960 8B w/e 10/06/1961 8A Edge Hill
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45544 w/e 20/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/09/1960 8B w/e 09/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47669 w/e 09/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/09/1960 8B w/e 10/02/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43410 4w/e 04/10/1958 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 17/09/1960 8B w/e 24/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48505 w/e 30/07/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 08/10/1960 8B w/e 15/10/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 w/e 23/04/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1960 8B w/e 19/05/1962 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48268 w/e 02/07/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 15/10/1960 8B w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43240 w/e 20/06/1959 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 15/10/1960 8B w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43514 4w/e 29/11/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 15/10/1960 8B w/e 23/09/1961 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44986 4w/e 17/05/1958 6J Holyhead w/e 15/10/1960 8B w/e 14/04/1962 6B Mold Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1210 w/e 23/07/1960 8D Widnes w/e 29/10/1960 8B w/e 29/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41210 w/e 23/07/1960 8D Widnes w/e 29/10/1960 8B w/e 29/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44061 w/e 07/11/1959 5E Alsager w/e 05/11/1960 8B w/e 12/01/1963 24G Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44063 3w/e 14/01/1950 5E Alsager w/e 19/11/1960 8B w/e 20/06/1964 9M Bury
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3851 w/e 12/11/1960 6A Chester (MR) w/e 03/12/1960 8B w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42081 w/e 17/09/1960 9A Longsight w/e 17/12/1960 8B w/e 07/01/1961 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45380 w/e 09/04/1960 8A Edge Hill w/e 31/12/1960 8B w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45381 w/e 15/10/1960 8A Edge Hill w/e 31/12/1960 8B w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45050 w/e 19/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 8B w/e 01/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48268 w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden w/e 18/02/1961 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41211 4w/e 26/01/1957 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 08/04/1961 8B w/e 07/03/1964 8K Bank Hall
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41288 4w/e 23/02/1952 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 08/04/1961 8B w/e 03/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48106 w/e 18/02/1961 1A Willesden w/e 06/05/1961 8B w/e 30/11/1963 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48129 3w/e 11/12/1948 1A Willesden w/e 06/05/1961 8B w/e 19/05/1962 8D Widnes
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84000 4w/e 11/08/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 17/06/1961 8B w/e 13/04/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84001 w/e 09/01/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 17/06/1961 8B w/e 01/12/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47594 w/e 25/03/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 29/07/1961 8B w/e 03/03/1962 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45271 w/e 01/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 29/07/1961 8B w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45550 w/e 18/06/1960 21D Aston w/e 05/08/1961 8B w/e 05/05/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45321 w/e 05/08/1961 5D Stoke w/e 19/08/1961 8B w/e 15/02/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45150 w/e 12/09/1959 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 8B w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45414 w/e 09/07/1960 24K Preston w/e 09/09/1961 8B w/e 04/08/1962 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84024 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A Brighton w/e 16/09/1961 8B w/e 06/01/1962 8D Widnes
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43257 w/e 16/09/1961 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 23/09/1961 8B w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45583 w/e 23/09/1961 21D Aston w/e 21/10/1961 8B 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45638 w/e 16/09/1961 21D Aston w/e 21/10/1961 8B 14/03/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2864       25/10/1961 (New) 8B w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45655 w/e 23/09/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/10/1961 8B 17/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45671 w/e 23/09/1961 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/10/1961 8B 09/11/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2865       01/11/1961 (New) 8B w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44232 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 04/11/1961 8B w/e 09/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44494 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 04/11/1961 8B m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44589 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 04/11/1961 8B w/e 14/11/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12075 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden w/e 23/12/1961 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41217 w/e 13/08/1960 8D Widnes w/e 13/01/1962 8B w/e 20/06/1964 8M Southport
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12076 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden w/e 24/02/1962 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12078 4w/e 04/12/1954 1A Willesden w/e 10/03/1962 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45197 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South w/e 10/03/1962 8B w/e 05/05/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12100 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden w/e 31/03/1962 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12070 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden w/e 07/04/1962 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48509 4w/e 13/08/1955 8A Edge Hill w/e 05/05/1962 8B w/e 22/09/1962 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48512 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield w/e 05/05/1962 8B w/e 29/09/1962 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48554 01/01/1948 1A Willesden w/e 19/05/1962 8B w/e 22/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48326 w/e 19/05/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 23/06/1962 8B w/e 29/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44219 4w/e 06/11/1954 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 8B w/e 30/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44239 w/e 11/06/1960 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 8B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44491 4w/e 26/01/1957 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 8B 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44522 w/e 06/02/1960 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 8B w/e 09/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44524 4w/e 21/02/1953 2E Northampton w/e 30/06/1962 8B w/e 06/10/1962 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45018 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 28/07/1962 8B w/e 18/05/1963 26C Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45414 w/e 04/08/1962 5D Stoke w/e 18/08/1962 8B w/e 08/02/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90315 4w/e 18/06/1960 84C Banbury w/e 25/08/1962 8B w/e 19/01/1963 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90466 4w/e 21/02/1959 81C Southall w/e 25/08/1962 8B w/e 19/01/1963 26C Bolton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90125 4w/e 06/11/1954 86C Cardiff Canton w/e 08/09/1962 8B w/e 19/01/1963 27B Aintree
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90566 w/e 11/11/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 15/09/1962 8B w/e 19/01/1963 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90369 4w/e 20/04/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 15/09/1962 8B w/e 16/03/1963 24L Carnforth
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90392 4w/e 20/04/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 15/09/1962 8B w/e 16/03/1963 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45354 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 15/09/1962 8B w/e 22/06/1963 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45380 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 15/09/1962 8B w/e 30/03/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90227 w/e 28/04/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 22/09/1962 8B w/e 16/03/1963 26D Bury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44553 w/e 18/08/1962 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 06/10/1962 8B w/e 27/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48676 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 12/01/1963 8B w/e 23/03/1963 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48727 w/e 10/12/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 12/01/1963 8B w/e 16/03/1963 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48557 4w/e 04/11/1950 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 11/05/1963 8B w/e 20/03/1965 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48676 w/e 23/03/1963 8D Widnes w/e 11/05/1963 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45156 w/e 22/12/1962 26C Bolton w/e 18/05/1963 8B w/e 22/06/1963 8A Edge Hill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47531 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 08/06/1963 8B w/e 20/06/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45580 4w/e 06/09/1952 24E Blackpool Central w/e 22/06/1963 8B w/e 03/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45730 w/e 16/09/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963 8B 05/10/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2392 16/06/1961 9G Gorton (New) w/e 29/06/1963 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2391 15/06/1961 9G Gorton (New) w/e 06/07/1963 8B w/e 28/11/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45652 w/e 25/06/1960 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1963 8B 16/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45700 w/e 09/03/1963 17A Derby w/e 06/07/1963 8B 04/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44076 w/e 22/04/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/07/1963 8B w/e 02/05/1964 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45633 w/e 09/03/1963 17A Derby w/e 20/07/1963 8B 16/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45261 4w/e 23/02/1957 26B Agecroft w/e 14/09/1963 8B w/e 08/02/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45338 01/01/1948 26B Agecroft w/e 14/09/1963 8B w/e 08/02/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45563 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 14/09/1963 8B w/e 27/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45590 w/e 22/06/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 14/09/1963 8B 11/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45663 w/e 07/11/1959 26F Patricroft w/e 14/09/1963 8B w/e 16/11/1963 8C Speke Junction
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45664 w/e 22/06/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 14/09/1963 8B w/e 16/11/1963 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44181 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 02/11/1963 8B w/e 14/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44115 w/e 12/12/1959 5D Stoke w/e 09/11/1963 8B w/e 10/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44294 w/e 16/02/1963 18A Toton w/e 09/11/1963 8B w/e 06/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44349 w/e 23/06/1962 5D Stoke w/e 09/11/1963 8B w/e 03/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41262 w/e 06/02/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 09/11/1963 8B w/e 11/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41264 w/e 18/06/1960 56F Low Moor w/e 09/11/1963 8B w/e 20/06/1964 8M Southport
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45666 w/e 04/08/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 23/11/1963 8B 17/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45726 4w/e 11/09/1954 5A Crewe North w/e 23/11/1963 8B 20/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48515 w/e 25/05/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 07/12/1963 8B w/e 20/03/1965 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48045 w/e 16/03/1963 8D Widnes w/e 11/01/1964 8B w/e 14/03/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48536 w/e 01/06/1963 8D Widnes w/e 11/01/1964 8B w/e 18/07/1964 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48297 w/e 06/05/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 22/02/1964 8B w/e 19/09/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48543 w/e 06/12/1958 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 22/02/1964 8B w/e 20/03/1965 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44356 w/e 22/02/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 07/03/1964 8B w/e 03/10/1964 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48108 4w/e 08/08/1953 16A Nottingham w/e 14/03/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48139 w/e 19/05/1962 8D Widnes w/e 14/03/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48500 w/e 21/07/1962 8C Speke Junction w/e 14/03/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48301 w/e 18/01/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 28/03/1964 8B w/e 04/04/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48050 w/e 18/01/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 11/04/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48421 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/05/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48451 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 09/05/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48558 w/e 30/04/1960 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 09/05/1964 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45663 w/e 16/11/1963 8C Speke Junction w/e 18/07/1964 8B 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45664 w/e 16/11/1963 8C Speke Junction w/e 18/07/1964 8B 28/03/1965 55A Holbeck (MR)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45604 w/e 14/09/1963 10A Carnforth w/e 25/07/1964 8B w/e 24/04/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45703 w/e 02/11/1963 10A Carnforth w/e 25/07/1964 8B 21/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44730       w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 21/01/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44731       w/e 05/09/1964 8B m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44819 w/e 25/05/1963 24E Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 20/05/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44930 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 30/01/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45078 w/e 09/01/1960 24E Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 30/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45238 w/e 25/07/1964 10B Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 24/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45256 w/e 11/07/1964 10B Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45303 w/e 15/08/1964 10B Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 10/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45436 4w/e 03/10/1953 24E Blackpool Central w/e 05/09/1964 8B w/e 21/01/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43954 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 07/11/1964 8B 21/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44935 w/e 25/01/1964 8K Bank Hall w/e 21/11/1964 8B w/e 30/01/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45041 w/e 19/10/1963 8K Bank Hall w/e 21/11/1964 8B w/e 07/10/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45109 w/e 12/10/1963 8K Bank Hall w/e 21/11/1964 8B w/e 01/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45129 w/e 19/10/1963 8K Bank Hall w/e 21/11/1964 8B w/e 17/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44358 w/e 17/08/1963 9G Gorton w/e 05/12/1964 8B w/e 12/12/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44195 w/e 12/05/1962 9G Gorton w/e 12/12/1964 8B w/e 06/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48163 w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton w/e 06/03/1965 8B w/e 03/04/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92048 w/e 02/05/1964 16A Toton w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 15/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92049 w/e 02/05/1964 16A Toton w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 19/02/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92053 w/e 22/09/1962 18A Toton w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 19/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92055 w/e 22/09/1962 18A Toton w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 07/10/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 w/e 25/04/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 17/06/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92059 w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 15/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92070 w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 15/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92078 31/03/1956 18A Toton (New) w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 06/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92086 w/e 24/10/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 19/06/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92116 w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92119 w/e 11/04/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 17/06/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92124 w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 03/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92126 w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92156 30/11/1957 18A Toton (New) w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92160 4w/e 04/10/1958 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 19/02/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92163 w/e 07/11/1959 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 8B w/e 19/06/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48221 w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton w/e 27/03/1965 8B w/e 17/04/1965 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48704 w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton w/e 27/03/1965 8B w/e 17/04/1965 8L Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44658 w/e 06/03/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/04/1965 8B w/e 20/05/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44930 w/e 30/01/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/04/1965 8B w/e 20/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44935 w/e 30/01/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/04/1965 8B w/e 15/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44779 w/e 20/03/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/06/1965 8B w/e 17/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45070 w/e 15/09/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/06/1965 8B w/e 20/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45221 w/e 06/03/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/06/1965 8B w/e 07/10/1967 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45375 w/e 13/02/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/06/1965 8B w/e 07/10/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45068 w/e 25/01/1964 8L Aintree w/e 03/07/1965 8B m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45323 w/e 14/12/1963 8L Aintree w/e 03/07/1965 8B w/e 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44963 w/e 19/09/1964 5C Stafford w/e 24/07/1965 8B w/e 31/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8128 12/01/1966 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 05/02/1966 8B w/e 26/02/1966 41A Tinsley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45312 w/e 06/07/1963 8A Edge Hill w/e 12/02/1966 8B w/e 07/10/1967 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45232 w/e 25/05/1963 17B Burton w/e 05/03/1966 8B w/e 31/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92095 w/e 03/07/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 28/05/1966 8B w/e 01/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44934 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/08/1966 8B w/e 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45133 w/e 19/06/1965 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/08/1966 8B w/e 07/10/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92132 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 13/08/1966 8B w/e 07/10/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92224 w/e 07/11/1964 2D Banbury w/e 13/08/1966 8B w/e 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44920 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 20/08/1966 8B w/e 20/05/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92218 w/e 30/03/1963 84C Banbury w/e 15/10/1966 8B w/e 11/03/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92227 4w/e 11/08/1962 84C Banbury w/e 15/10/1966 8B w/e 11/03/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45055 w/e 22/10/1966 8L Aintree w/e 13/05/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45330 w/e 11/05/1963 27B Aintree w/e 13/05/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44809 w/e 22/10/1966 8L Aintree w/e 17/06/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44816 w/e 22/10/1966 8L Aintree w/e 17/06/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5273 w/e 02/10/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 22/07/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008 w/e 05/12/1964 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 8B w/e 07/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92050 w/e 05/02/1966 8C Speke Junction w/e 12/08/1967 8B w/e 30/09/1967 Withdrawn