Depot: Walton on the Hill
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Walton on the Hill | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11253 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 23F | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5830 | m/e | 11/1935 | GOR | Gorton | m/e | 01/1936 | WAL | m/e | 07/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4304 | on | 05/01/1947 | WAL | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 39A | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 1395 | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 19/01/1947 | WAL | on | 09/02/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2311 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | on | 18/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 8584 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 13/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9265 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9298 | m/e | 12/1935 | STP | Heaton Mersey | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9338 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 21/02/1948 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9344 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9356 | on | 01/01/1948 | WAL | w/e | 23/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5133 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | WAL | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9353 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 27E | on | 14/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52328 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52333 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46436 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24F | Fleetwood (New) | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41194 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41194 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27E | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44038 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44221 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44464 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44038 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44221 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44464 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46437 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 27E | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44474 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44474 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44481 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44541 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41195 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 27E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41195 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 27E | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27E | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27E | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41104 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27E | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41193 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51338 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 27E | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41185 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41104 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41085 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41085 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41186 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27C | Southport | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44218 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27E | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42111 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42112 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27E | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27E | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44040 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44291 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 27E | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44471 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 27E | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44462 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 25D | Mirfield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27E | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44241 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 27E | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47201 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 27E | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44014 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27E | w/e | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44188 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27E | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44299 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27E | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44605 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47480 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 27E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43843 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 27E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47235 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 27E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47655 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47681 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 4C | Swansea (Upper Bank) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50781 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 27E | w/e | 06/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47225 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27E | w/e | 15/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47228 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27E | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42328 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 27E | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43907 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 27E | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44023 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 27E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42429 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 27E | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3858 | on | 31/10/1959 (New) | 27E | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43988 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 27E | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42540 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 27E | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44462 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 27E | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42054 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 27E | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42617 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 27E | on | 09/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44118 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27E | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44177 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27E | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44192 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 27E | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75043 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75060 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75061 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75064 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8R | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree |