Depot: Tyne Dock
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Tyne Dock | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 767 | m/e | 08/1911 (New) | TDK | on | 12/01/1923 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1247 | m/e | 02/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1253 | m/e | 03/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1254 | m/e | 03/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | m/e | 04/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1278 | m/e | 05/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 13/04/1926 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1279 | m/e | 05/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1264 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1284 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1285 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | TDK | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1293 | m/e | 06/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1294 | m/e | 07/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1361 | m/e | 08/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1363 | m/e | 09/1913 (New) | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2213 | m/e | 04/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 26/04/1926 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2215 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 01/03/1940 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | m/e | 07/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2225 | m/e | 08/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 20/12/1924 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2229 | m/e | 10/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2231 | m/e | 12/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 31/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2232 | m/e | 12/1917 (New) | TDK | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2240 | m/e | 12/1918 (New) | TDK | m/e | 03/1926 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2242 | m/e | 12/1918 (New) | TDK | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2243 | m/e | 05/1919 (New) | TDK | on | 31/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2245 | m/e | 05/1919 (New) | TDK | m/e | 1925 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 903 | m/e | 10/1919 (New) | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2255 | m/e | 12/1919 (New) | TDK | on | 24/12/1924 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2263 | m/e | 03/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 14/03/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2264 | m/e | 03/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 17/11/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2265 | m/e | 03/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2275 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 05/01/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2276 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 05/05/1941 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2293 | m/e | 11/1920 (New) | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2263 | on | 14/03/1923 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 03/05/1923 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1291 | on | 22/05/1923 | TDK | m/e | 1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 632 | on | 30/04/1924 (New) | TDK | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 631 | on | 03/05/1924 (New) | TDK | m/e | 1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | on | 03/05/1924 (New) | TDK | m/e | 1930 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 634 | on | 08/05/1924 (New) | TDK | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 922 | m/e | 11/1920 | HTN | Heaton (New) | m/e | 01/1925 | TDK | on | 29/12/1936 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | m/e | 01/1925 | TDK | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 943 | m/e | 06/1921 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 07/01/1925 | TDK | on | 22/03/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2213 | m/e | 04/1917 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 26/04/1926 | TDK | on | 02/03/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2243 | on | 31/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/02/1927 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2277 | m/e | 05/1920 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 01/02/1927 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1291 | m/e | 1927 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 902 | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 629 | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6576 | on | 21/04/1928 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/03/1929 | TDK | on | 13/05/1929 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | York (North) | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | York (North) | on | 13/05/1929 | TDK | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | East Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1279 | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | on | 23/04/1931 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1284 | on | 08/03/1924 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | East Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1285 | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | on | 24/06/1937 | AFP | Annfield Plain |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 632 | m/e | 01/1927 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 764 | on | 31/05/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 15/04/1935 | TDK | on | 10/02/1938 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | F8 | 2-4-2T | 40 | H | 12/1935 | TDK | m/e | 04/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 2069 | H | 12/1935 | TDK | m/e | 06/1939 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1577 | on | 07/04/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 03/05/1937 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1580 | on | 12/04/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 06/05/1937 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2116 | m/e | 08/1901 | AFP | Annfield Plain (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | on | 23/06/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2124 | m/e | 12/1901 | AFP | Annfield Plain (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | on | 29/03/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | on | 29/03/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | on | 29/03/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 643 | m/e | 06/1911 | AFP | Annfield Plain (New) | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | on | 01/03/1940 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2144 | on | 28/05/1928 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 09/07/1938 | TDK | on | 17/09/1938 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 669 | on | 08/06/1937 | HTN | Heaton | on | 24/06/1939 | TDK | on | 01/03/1940 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1247 | on | 18/04/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 29/07/1939 | TDK | on | 19/08/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2272 | m/e | 05/1920 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 29/07/1939 | TDK | on | 15/02/1941 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1292 | on | 24/05/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2302 | on | 11/08/1926 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 629 | on | 14/10/1929 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | on | 25/01/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2231 | on | 28/10/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 02/03/1940 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2247 | on | 17/07/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 02/03/1940 | TDK | on | 15/02/1941 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2268 | m/e | 12/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 10/04/1940 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2301 | on | 23/05/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 10/05/1940 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2232 | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett | on | 02/05/1941 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1473 | on | 28/11/1938 | CON | Consett | on | 14/11/1941 | TDK | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 527 | m/e | 03/1902 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1700 | on | 05/05/1931 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 83 | on | 15/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 162 | m/e | 06/1903 | HAV | Haverton Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1111 | m/e | 03/1904 | HAV | Haverton Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 23/12/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 659 | m/e | 06/1911 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 16/10/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 661 | on | 25/04/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 22/03/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 772 | on | 05/05/1931 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 29/09/1946 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 901 | on | 25/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 904 | on | 18/01/1936 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 14/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 905 | on | 13/08/1934 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 624 | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 625 | on | 04/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 626 | on | 14/09/1942 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 628 | on | 03/09/1932 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 630 | on | 27/11/1930 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 631 | on | 10/02/1938 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | on | 19/03/1937 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | on | 21/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6334 | on | 21/05/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/06/1944 | TDK | on | 18/06/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1111 | on | 23/12/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 22/09/1944 | TDK | on | 14/01/1946 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6630 | on | 06/07/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | on | 18/06/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1009 | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 669 | on | 01/03/1940 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 19/10/1944 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5378 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5395 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 07/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6574 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 07/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6576 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6577 | on | 24/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6367 | on | 28/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6579 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6583 | on | 24/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6609 | on | 24/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6611 | on | 12/06/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6614 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6617 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6618 | on | 24/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6632 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1253 | on | 29/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 14/01/1946 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2222 | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 14/01/1946 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | CON | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2245 | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 14/01/1946 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6334 | on | 18/06/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 21/03/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6566 | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 31/03/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3267 | on | 04/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | on | 12/05/1946 | TDK | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6578 | on | 09/02/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 15/06/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6630 | on | 18/06/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 15/06/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6350 | on | 04/06/1945 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 26/08/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5378 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3753 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6577 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3667 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 07/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6614 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6617 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3857 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3881 | on | 22/07/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3352 | on | 04/12/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | on | 08/03/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3362 | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | on | 07/11/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3363 | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 05/10/1947 | TDK | on | 26/11/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3351 | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett | on | 29/11/1947 | TDK | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65602 | H | 12/1935 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65606 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65632 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | ||||||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5670 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5694 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 22/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5716 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | on | 03/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65721 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8266 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | on | 18/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8272 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8728 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 04/09/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8729 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8731 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9378 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9395 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 09/04/1949 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9410 | by | 01/01/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9420 | by | 01/01/1923 | AFP | Annfield Plain | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8181 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8183 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Y7 | 0-4-0T | 8088 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | m/e | 12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y7 | 0-4-0T | 8089 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | w/e | 20/11/1948 | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68706 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 04/09/1948 | TDK | on | 24/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 2416 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | TDK | ||||||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63124 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63137 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63161 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63164 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63109 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 19/02/1949 | TDK | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9429 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 09/04/1949 | TDK | on | 04/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69418 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 30/07/1949 | TDK | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69008 | m/e | 12/1949 (New) | TDK | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3437 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/12/1949 | TDK | w/e | 03/12/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3437 | on | 01/12/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 03/12/1949 | TDK | on | 13/12/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65666 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/01/1950 | TDK | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77445 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 29/01/1950 | TDK | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67288 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 54B | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9920 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54B | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69105 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 54B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69920 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 54B | on | 12/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69105 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54B | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | 5699 | m/e | 03/1933 | Withdrawn | m/e | 31/01/1951 (R) | 54B | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65713 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 54B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65713 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | on | 15/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65699 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | on | 03/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63755 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63760 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63712 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63856 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63874 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9424 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54B | on | 27/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69426 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54B | w/e | 23/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63359 | on | 01/01/1951 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 06/07/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63359 | on | 06/07/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 54B | on | 27/02/1955 | 54D | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 06/09/1941 | SEL | Selby | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | Selby | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54B | on | 01/11/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | on | 17/08/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54B | on | 01/09/1957 | 54D | Consett |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68687 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69914 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68687 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69914 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54B | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68265 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 52B | Heaton | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 54B | on | 31/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62388 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54B | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69427 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54B | on | 27/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 69394 | on | 01/01/1948 | CON | Consett | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54B | on | 03/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63362 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50C | Selby | on | 13/06/1954 | 54B | on | 08/03/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65680 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 54B | on | 16/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68743 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 54B | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65717 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 54B | on | 22/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90045 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 54D | Consett | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 54B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90054 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 54D | Consett | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 54B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69782 | on | 08/06/1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/03/1955 | 54B | on | 16/12/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69093 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | on | 23/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69102 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69106 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | on | 17/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 69390 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54A | Sunderland | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 54B | on | 18/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92060 | on | 30/11/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92061 | on | 30/11/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92062 | on | 30/11/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92063 | on | 30/11/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92064 | on | 31/12/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92065 | on | 31/12/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92066 | on | 31/12/1955 (New) | 54B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92060 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54B | on | 23/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92061 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54B | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92062 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 54B | w/e | 26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92063 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 54B | on | 24/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92064 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 54B | on | 24/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92065 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 54B | w/e | 03/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92066 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 54B | w/e | 24/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92097 | on | 30/06/1956 (New) | 54B | on | 23/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92098 | on | 31/07/1956 (New) | 54B | w/e | 31/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92099 | on | 31/07/1956 (New) | 54B | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65039 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54B | on | 26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68262 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 54B | w/e | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63378 | on | 01/11/1953 | 50C | Selby | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | on | 14/09/1958 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63406 | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | on | 18/01/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63425 | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | Selby | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | w/e | 15/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63461 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63468 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1957 | 54B | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68031 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 54B | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68059 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 54B | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65645 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68029 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69267 | on | 01/01/1948 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 34E | New England |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69290 | on | 01/01/1948 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 34E | New England |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65695 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 54B | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65117 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 54B | on | 23/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63361 | on | 09/09/1940 | CON | Consett | on | 11/05/1958 | 54B | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63470 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 08/06/1958 | 54B | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69101 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 54B | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65099 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 54B | on | 30/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69917 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54D | Consett | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 52H | on | 02/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63462 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 08/03/1959 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63471 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 08/03/1959 | 52H | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63472 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 08/03/1959 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68019 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54D | Consett | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52H | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68038 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52H | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63350 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | on | 18/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63354 | on | 06/03/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | on | 13/12/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63358 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52H | on | 09/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68730 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 52H | on | 07/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68731 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 52H | on | 09/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63429 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 52H | on | 19/03/1961 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63448 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | SEL | Selby | on | 13/09/1959 | 52H | on | 13/12/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69921 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52H | on | 12/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63463 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63464 | on | 25/01/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63466 | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63473 | on | 21/06/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68704 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52H | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77011 | on | 27/09/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 11/09/1960 | 52H | on | 23/04/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77014 | on | 27/09/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52H | w/e | 29/04/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68036 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 52H | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68747 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 52H | on | 23/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2166 | on | 25/10/1960 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 52H | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61818 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61884 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61986 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61987 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63474 | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 15/01/1961 | 52H | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61884 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 52H | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61906 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 52H | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2311 | on | 30/12/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2312 | on | 05/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2313 | on | 17/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2314 | on | 27/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2315 | on | 06/02/1961 (New) | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64812 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64851 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65693 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 52H | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63384 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 19/03/1961 | 52H | on | 02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3322 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2327 | on | 29/05/1961 (New) | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2326 | on | 02/06/1961 (New) | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2328 | on | 06/06/1961 (New) | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3078 | on | 23/01/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64846 | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 30/07/1961 | 52H | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64853 | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 30/07/1961 | 52H | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63377 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 20/08/1961 | 52H | on | 10/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63467 | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 20/08/1961 | 52H | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63469 | on | 25/01/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 20/08/1961 | 52H | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68016 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52H | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68048 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52H | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68054 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 52H | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61014 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | on | 07/06/1964 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | on | 26/07/1953 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61238 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | on | 07/06/1964 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69025 | m/e | 04/1951 | 52C | Blaydon (New) | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 52H | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61930 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61962 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61969 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68016 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52H | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92167 | on | 31/05/1958 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 52H | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3072 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68029 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68031 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | on | 11/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68054 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63360 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63363 | on | 27/09/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63366 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 16/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63378 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63389 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 27/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63393 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 17/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63399 | on | 08/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63409 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63411 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | on | 06/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90057 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52H | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90074 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52H | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90016 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52H | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63390 | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52H | on | 08/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63408 | on | 14/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52H | on | 02/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52H | on | 02/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | on | 25/01/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52H | on | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90086 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | on | 12/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90090 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | on | 30/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90500 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | on | 12/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61199 | on | 12/06/1960 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1963 | 52H | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61237 | on | 17/06/1962 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1963 | 52H | on | 31/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90434 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90452 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90459 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68053 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68059 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63371 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 07/07/1963 | 52H | w/e | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63401 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 18/08/1963 | 52H | on | 06/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8500 | on | 10/09/1962 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 52H | 3w/e | 30/09/1963 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8501 | on | 10/10/1962 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 52H | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56B | Ardsley |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8536 | on | 29/08/1963 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 52H | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63398 | on | 02/02/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 21/06/1964 | 52H | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90723 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 52H | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63379 | on | 13/04/1947 | CON | Consett | on | 23/05/1965 | 52H | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63455 | on | 19/06/1943 | CON | Consett | on | 23/05/1965 | 52H | on | 22/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63459 | on | 06/10/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 19/12/1965 | 52H | on | 30/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63381 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 09/01/1966 | 52H | on | 08/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63413 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 09/01/1966 | 52H | on | 23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63429 | on | 24/02/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 09/01/1966 | 52H | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63445 | on | 13/10/1963 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 19/06/1966 | 52H | on | 26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63458 | on | 17/02/1963 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 19/06/1966 | 52H | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63344 | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | on | 02/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | on | 02/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63420 | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | on | 05/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63426 | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | Normanton | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | on | 22/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62007 | on | 03/10/1965 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | on | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62021 | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | on | 30/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62023 | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | on | 26/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62026 | on | 28/02/1965 | 52G | Sunderland | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | on | 29/01/1967 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62025 | on | 19/06/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 29/01/1967 | 52H | on | 10/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62011 | on | 23/10/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 05/03/1967 | 52H | on | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62050 | on | 19/06/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 05/03/1967 | 52H | on | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62060 | on | 21/08/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 05/03/1967 | 52H | on | 02/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 62282 | on | 28/02/1950 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 (R) | 52H | |||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62005 | on | 13/03/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 28/05/1967 | 52H | on | 10/09/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62045 | on | 27/03/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 02/07/1967 | 52H | on | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn |