Depot: Thornaby
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Thornaby | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69830 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69831 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 27/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69834 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 11/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69842 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 29/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69860 | on | 16/06/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 14/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69869 | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 13/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 14/07/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69891 | on | 19/09/1954 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 16/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63340 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 26/10/1958 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63349 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63355 | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 03/06/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63360 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63364 | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63368 | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 08/11/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63369 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63370 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 11/11/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63371 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 07/07/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63373 | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 03/06/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63375 | on | 25/05/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 10/03/1963 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63380 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63388 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/06/1963 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63389 | on | 13/04/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63393 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63396 | on | 14/08/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63401 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/08/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63403 | on | 29/09/1957 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 26/10/1958 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63405 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 21/07/1963 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63409 | on | 15/05/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63411 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63417 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 16/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63420 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63424 | on | 14/08/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 11/11/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63426 | on | 13/04/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63428 | on | 29/09/1957 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63430 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63435 | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63442 | on | 15/05/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63445 | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | on | 16/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63447 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63452 | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13139 | on | 11/03/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 10/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13140 | on | 18/03/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 10/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13141 | on | 18/03/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 05/07/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13142 | on | 22/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 26/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13143 | on | 22/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 08/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13144 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3145 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/04/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3146 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 12/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13147 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 06/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13148 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 05/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13149 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/07/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13150 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 10/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13151 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90074 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90132 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90426 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90014 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90027 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 27/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90076 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90081 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90240 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90016 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90273 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90603 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 12/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90605 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90434 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90435 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90446 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90090 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90409 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90098 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90373 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90091 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90451 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90452 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90459 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90461 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90462 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90465 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90481 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 56D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90488 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90500 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90517 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43072 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43102 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65720 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65730 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 21/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65732 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65734 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 14/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65736 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 20/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65737 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 20/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65738 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65740 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 28/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65741 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65742 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65743 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65744 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65745 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 11/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65746 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65749 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 05/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65753 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 15/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65754 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65755 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65763 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 29/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65765 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65766 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65767 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65768 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65769 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 23/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65750 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65751 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 08/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65752 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65756 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 04/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65757 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 16/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65758 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 22/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65759 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 28/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65760 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 24/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65761 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65762 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 03/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65770 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 25/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65772 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65773 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65774 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 31/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65775 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 25/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65776 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 18/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65777 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 05/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65778 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 31/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65779 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 27/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65870 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68908 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68942 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 19/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68948 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68245 | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 27/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68260 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68290 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 12/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68312 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 02/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68684 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 15/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68688 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68689 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68690 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 20/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68712 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 05/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68721 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 21/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68740 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | on | 31/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69006 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69019 | m/e | 01/1951 | MID | Middlesbrough (New) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68011 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68023 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68049 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68060 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68062 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67754 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67759 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67764 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67765 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67766 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3138 | on | 18/03/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 02/11/1958 | 51L | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 34E | New England |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61031 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 30/11/1958 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67759 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68406 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 51L | on | 18/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68272 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 51L | on | 06/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68729 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 51L | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65865 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65868 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 51L | on | 29/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65790 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65835 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65839 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 51L | on | 22/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61030 | on | 26/06/1947 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61032 | on | 07/08/1947 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61034 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61037 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61173 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61220 | on | 06/08/1947 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 24/03/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61255 | on | 15/02/1959 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 04/03/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61303 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 04/03/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62001 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 07/04/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62003 | on | 14/09/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 03/04/1960 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62041 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 26/07/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62042 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 51E | Stockton | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 17/06/1962 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63341 | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63343 | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63344 | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 07/06/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63347 | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 01/04/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63361 | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 01/04/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63367 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 07/07/1963 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63374 | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63382 | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63416 | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63432 | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63450 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50C | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63451 | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | on | 08/04/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90086 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90397 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46478 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65747 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | on | 16/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65773 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | on | 18/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65787 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65788 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65833 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65884 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68696 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | on | 30/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68049 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68060 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68078 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67754 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67766 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90048 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 51L | w/e | 06/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90698 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2067 | on | 25/08/1959 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60911 | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/09/1959 | 51L | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60915 | on | 25/07/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 06/09/1959 | 51L | on | 01/07/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60946 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/09/1959 | 51L | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60960 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/09/1959 | 51L | on | 26/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90593 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90233 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90377 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90406 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61062 | on | 07/08/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61240 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61257 | on | 19/11/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 09/12/1962 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64730 | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64758 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 07/08/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | on | 09/07/1961 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63399 | on | 30/06/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 08/11/1959 | 51L | on | 02/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60885 | on | 23/09/1956 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 08/11/1959 | 51L | on | 16/06/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64706 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | on | 21/01/1962 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64818 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | on | 24/12/1961 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64857 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | on | 17/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 22/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64821 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64835 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64845 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64855 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 24/12/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64859 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 24/12/1961 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64861 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 26/11/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64870 | on | 26/06/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 13/12/1959 | 51L | on | 18/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2078 | on | 24/12/1959 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2079 | on | 07/01/1960 (New) | 51L | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3137 | on | 18/03/1956 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90072 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90022 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | on | 31/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3873 | on | 19/03/1960 (New) | 51L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3875 | on | 26/03/1960 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3876 | on | 01/04/1960 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61068 | on | 27/03/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 03/04/1960 | 51L | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60806 | on | 12/04/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 12/06/1960 | 51L | on | 16/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60967 | on | 26/03/1943 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 12/06/1960 | 51L | on | 10/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2069 | on | 19/09/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60846 | on | 14/09/1958 | 52B | Heaton | on | 19/06/1960 | 51L | on | 24/02/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2077 | on | 07/12/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2099 | on | 15/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2100 | on | 27/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | on | 26/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60808 | on | 26/06/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | on | 01/07/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60809 | on | 26/06/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | on | 11/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60859 | on | 03/01/1954 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60901 | on | 12/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | on | 16/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60916 | on | 03/04/1955 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68039 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64757 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 16/10/1960 | 51L | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61818 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61844 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | on | 05/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61986 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61218 | on | 01/08/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 05/02/1961 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61259 | on | 24/11/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 05/02/1961 | 51L | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 51L | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43070 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 51L | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68675 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 51L | on | 28/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68688 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 51L | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43075 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 51L | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 51L | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5151 | on | 15/04/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5152 | on | 01/05/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5153 | on | 10/05/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2320 | on | 14/03/1961 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 51L | on | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5154 | on | 20/05/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5155 | on | 03/06/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5156 | on | 17/06/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5157 | on | 07/07/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5158 | on | 10/07/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5159 | on | 27/07/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 07/08/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5160 | on | 19/08/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 07/08/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69004 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 51L | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5161 | on | 02/09/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5162 | on | 09/09/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68754 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 51L | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5163 | on | 29/09/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5164 | on | 07/10/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69002 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 51L | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69717 | on | 01/01/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 07/10/1961 (R) | 51L | |||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5165 | on | 19/10/1961 (New) | 51L | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5166 | on | 02/11/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69016 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 51L | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5167 | on | 25/11/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67635 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51L | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67640 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51L | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5168 | on | 01/12/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5169 | on | 15/12/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5112 | on | 30/12/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5113 | on | 28/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5170 | on | 29/12/1961 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5370 | on | 17/01/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5372 | on | 24/01/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5371 | on | 29/01/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5373 | on | 31/01/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5171 | on | 03/02/1962 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5374 | on | 07/02/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5375 | on | 14/02/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5172 | on | 17/02/1962 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5376 | on | 21/02/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2306 | on | 17/11/1960 | 51A | Darlington (New) | on | 25/02/1962 | 51L | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2307 | on | 28/11/1960 | 51A | Darlington (New) | on | 25/02/1962 | 51L | on | 14/08/1966 | To Store | |
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5377 | on | 28/02/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2107 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | 2w/e | 31/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2153 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2154 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | m/e | 07/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2317 | on | 22/02/1961 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2338 | on | 21/09/1961 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | on | 01/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5378 | on | 07/03/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5173 | on | 17/03/1962 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5174 | on | 30/03/1962 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77001 | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77010 | on | 01/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 51L | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 51F | West Auckland |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5175 | on | 21/04/1962 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43015 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65818 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | w/e | 30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65820 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6769 | on | 17/07/1962 (New) | 51L | ||||||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6770 | on | 17/08/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6771 | on | 22/08/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6772 | on | 04/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6773 | on | 10/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6774 | on | 17/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6755 | on | 21/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6775 | on | 24/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6756 | on | 28/09/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | on | 15/08/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | on | 05/09/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6757 | on | 05/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6776 | on | 08/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6758 | on | 10/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6759 | on | 12/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6777 | on | 12/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6760 | on | 19/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77011 | on | 23/04/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) | on | 21/10/1962 | 51L | on | 15/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6761 | on | 24/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6762 | on | 26/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77014 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6778 | on | 29/10/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6763 | on | 07/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6764 | on | 07/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6765 | on | 14/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6766 | on | 16/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6767 | on | 21/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6768 | on | 23/11/1962 (New) | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | on | 18/07/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D392 | on | 30/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D393 | on | 07/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | on | 13/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | on | 27/06/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | on | 04/07/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 51L | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2316 | on | 02/06/1963 | 51L | on | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2331 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 51L | on | 01/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | on | 14/11/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6781 | on | 22/11/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6782 | on | 29/11/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6783 | on | 05/12/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43135 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 65D | Dawsholm | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 51L | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43140 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 51L | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90588 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 51L | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90082 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 51L | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90445 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 51L | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60884 | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 26/01/1964 | 51L | on | 05/07/1964 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | on | 02/12/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 26/01/1964 | 51L | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63361 | on | 01/04/1962 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 02/02/1964 | 51L | on | 17/05/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63398 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 02/02/1964 | 51L | on | 21/06/1964 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63443 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 02/02/1964 | 51L | on | 15/11/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63446 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 02/02/1964 | 51L | on | 27/09/1964 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65817 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 51L | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65892 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 51L | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8588 | on | 20/03/1964 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8589 | on | 04/05/1964 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8590 | on | 12/05/1964 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8591 | on | 08/07/1964 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6779 | on | 06/11/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 51L | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5156 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5157 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6755 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | w/e | 19/02/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6756 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D237 | on | 09/10/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | on | 23/10/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D246 | on | 20/11/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | on | 02/05/1960 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D238 | on | 12/10/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D239 | on | 19/10/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2070 | on | 02/10/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2076 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1868 | on | 28/05/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 51L | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1889 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 51L | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1889 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 51L | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5248 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5249 | on | 16/01/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5250 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5251 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5252 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5253 | on | 16/01/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5254 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5255 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5370 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5371 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | D5372 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 51L | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D15 | Leicester Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5251 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5252 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5253 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5254 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5255 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5256 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5248 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5249 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5250 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D15 | Leicester Division | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5251 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5252 | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5253 | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5254 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5255 | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5256 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | 3w/e | 13/08/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2307 | on | 14/08/1966 | 98S | on | 11/12/1966 | 51L | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5176 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5178 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 51L | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D242 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 51L | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D241 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 51L | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8310 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8311 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8312 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8313 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8314 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8315 | on | 20/05/1967 (New) | 51L | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6796 | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2046 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2067 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | 2w/e | 26/07/1975 | DN | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2068 | on | 02/09/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 05/04/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2070 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 28/11/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2076 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 05/04/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2077 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 01/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2078 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2093 | 4w/e | 22/05/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2099 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 10/02/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2149 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 24/07/1971 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2153 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 08/11/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2204 | on | 14/03/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2205 | on | 14/03/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2340 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3137 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 34E | New England |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3672 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | m/e | 08/1977 | SB | Shirebrook |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5154 | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5155 | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2057 | on | 15/05/1959 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6797 | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6798 | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3942 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | on | 20/09/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3943 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5166 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5167 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5168 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5169 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3182 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6758 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6775 | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2061 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2065 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 55H | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | on | 31/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2243 | on | 26/10/1956 | 50B | Neville Hill (New) | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2315 | on | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 (R) | 51L | |||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8601 | on | 02/09/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8602 | on | 09/09/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8604 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8605 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | on | 28/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3401 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 51L | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3406 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/05/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3503 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/05/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3405 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8599 | on | 28/08/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8600 | on | 06/08/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8603 | on | 07/09/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1103 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1106 | on | 25/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1107 | on | 23/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | on | 28/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3913 | on | 22/11/1960 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 10/04/1971 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6792 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1105 | on | 09/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 51L | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1101 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | w/e | 01/02/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1102 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3321 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | on | 14/09/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3915 | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | w/e | 07/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1769 | w/e | 08/06/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 03/08/1968 | 51L | w/e | 02/05/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3242 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 07/09/1968 | 51L | on | 29/08/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2243 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6831 | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1758 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1759 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1770 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1790 | on | 10/12/1964 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 55G | Knottingley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1797 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 03/05/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1880 | on | 10/02/1966 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1881 | on | 18/06/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6824 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6951 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6952 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6712 | on | 10/03/1961 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6711 | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 51L | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6823 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 51L | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6820 | on | 15/05/1968 | CF | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6827 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 51L | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1582 | on | 16/05/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1579 | on | 01/05/1964 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 01/02/1969 | 51L | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1785 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 51L | w/e | 01/08/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1788 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 51L | w/e | 01/08/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1789 | on | 27/11/1964 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 51L | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 55G | Knottingley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6872 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 51L | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 51L | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6834 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 51L | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6874 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 51L | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6826 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6871 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51L | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6866 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 14/06/1969 | 51L | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1797 | w/e | 03/05/1969 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 21/06/1969 | 51L | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3317 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 51L | w/e | 22/01/1972 | 64H | Leith Central |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6779 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3687 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 51L | w/e | 25/09/1971 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1883 | on | 09/07/1965 | 40B | Immingham (New) | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1884 | on | 06/07/1965 | 40B | Immingham (New) | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6741 | on | 07/06/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 51L | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1792 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1795 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1796 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1799 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6712 | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6731 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6791 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6871 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6874 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6893 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | on | 01/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | on | 31/07/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6899 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6902 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6911 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6777 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5165 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1879 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 02/05/1970 | 51L | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6866 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 02/05/1970 | 51L | w/e | 19/02/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5166 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5167 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 51L | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5168 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 51L | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6701 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | on | 05/07/1981 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6702 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | on | 04/10/1981 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6703 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | on | 21/01/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6704 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | on | 04/10/1987 | ML | Motherwell |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6705 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6706 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | on | 04/10/1981 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6707 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3241 | w/e | 10/05/1969 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 51L | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 64H | Leith Central |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3195 | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 51L | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3078 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 51L | on | 30/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6901 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5170 | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 51L | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5171 | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 51L | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2048 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 20/03/1971 | 51L | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3073 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/04/1971 | 51L | m/e | 03/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6732 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6920 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 51L | w/e | 09/02/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5534 | w/e | 15/05/1971 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 51L | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3322 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 51L | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5550 | w/e | 09/01/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 07/08/1971 | 51L | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3657 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 14/08/1971 | 51L | on | 30/10/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5542 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5543 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5544 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5558 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5559 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6700 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6721 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6801 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6802 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6809 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6810 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6812 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6813 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6814 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1894 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1895 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 51L | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | KY | Knottingley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3935 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 51L | w/e | 20/05/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5167 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5170 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5172 | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/11/1971 | 51L | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3938 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 11/12/1971 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1791 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5548 | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5606 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 29/07/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5696 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5850 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1974 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3917 | on | 12/12/1960 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | w/e | 22/01/1972 | 51L | w/e | 01/07/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D4054 | w/e | 28/11/1970 | 36A | Doncaster | w/e | 18/03/1972 | 51L | on | 11/06/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6709 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6710 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6755 | w/e | 19/02/1972 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 51L | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3091 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 20/05/1972 | 51L | w/e | 21/07/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3799 | w/e | 27/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 10/06/1972 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1894 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 51L | w/e | 11/05/1974 | KY | Knottingley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6768 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 51L | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5541 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 29/07/1972 | 51L | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5807 | w/e | 05/08/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | on | 15/05/1988 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6760 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | w/e | 08/03/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6818 | w/e | 15/02/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1989 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | on | 30/09/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1990 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | on | 22/09/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1991 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1992 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | w/e | 01/02/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6731 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5804 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 51L | w/e | 18/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5805 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 51L | w/e | 12/01/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5845 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 51L | m/e | 11/1978 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5810 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 51L | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 51L | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6770 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6772 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | on | 31/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6777 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | on | 26/07/1981 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6873 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3285 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 51L | on | 26/09/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5836 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 51L | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6759 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 31B | March | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 51L | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 51L | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6916 | w/e | 18/09/1971 | 30A | Stratford | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 51L | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 12/05/1973 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6741 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | w/e | 09/03/1974 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6757 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6767 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1878 | w/e | 27/02/1971 | 55G | Knottingley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1880 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 31/08/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1881 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1882 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 21/06/1981 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5555 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | m/e | 10/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5556 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | m/e | 10/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6708 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 24/02/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6709 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 01/03/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | w/e | 16/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6861 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6863 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 01/01/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6867 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 01/02/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6868 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6900 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 01/12/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6912 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6919 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 13/10/1973 | TE | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5559 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | on | 25/01/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5817 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5825 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | on | 07/02/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5829 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37253 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 09/02/1974 | TE | w/e | 10/08/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37013 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 31B | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | on | 16/11/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37015 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | on | 01/09/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6716 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37024 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | m/e | 05/1977 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37025 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 31B | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | m/e | 02/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37082 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 31B | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37117 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31132 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31284 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | w/e | 18/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37032 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37074 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | MC | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37085 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37164 | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | IM | Immingham | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37165 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | on | 30/06/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37250 | w/e | 02/02/1974 | MR | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | w/e | 26/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31130 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31143 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 12/12/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31152 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 01/06/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31282 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 17/01/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31283 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 03/11/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31297 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | m/e | 10/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31306 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | w/e | 06/07/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37010 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37238 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | w/e | 26/10/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37242 | w/e | 09/02/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31299 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 18/05/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31300 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 18/05/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31153 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 06/07/1974 | TE | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37036 | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/07/1974 | TE | m/e | 03/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08310 | 4w/e | 22/05/1965 | 51A | Darlington | 2w/e | 27/07/1974 | TE | on | 04/09/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37097 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | IM | Immingham | w/e | 10/08/1974 | TE | on | 05/06/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03010 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 31B | March | 3w/e | 21/09/1974 | TE | on | 10/11/1974 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47360 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | TE | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31139 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 40B | Immingham | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | TE | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37094 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IM | Immingham | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | TE | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37092 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/10/1974 | TE | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37093 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 26/10/1974 | TE | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03171 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 16/11/1974 | TE | m/e | 07/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47039 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47050 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31278 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | Gateshead | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | on | 29/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31290 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | Gateshead | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37084 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37087 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 52A | Gateshead | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37082 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/01/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47052 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TE | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31287 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | Gateshead | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | TE | on | 09/09/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37166 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 40B | Immingham | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37199 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | TE | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47052 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | Gateshead | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TE | on | 30/04/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47298 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | TE | w/e | 29/02/1976 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37079 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | on | 30/06/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37080 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | on | 18/09/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37100 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37249 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | Gateshead | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | m/e | 10/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08771 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 01/11/1975 | TE | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08212 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | w/e | 16/11/1975 | TE | on | 06/09/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37119 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37055 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | MR | March | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | m/e | 07/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37056 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 31B | March | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | m/e | 07/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37131 | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37160 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | m/e | 07/1977 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03075 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50A | York (North) | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | TE | on | 18/07/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03159 | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | TE | m/e | 07/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03096 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 2w/e | 25/07/1976 | TE | on | 02/12/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08772 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 15/08/1976 | TE | m/e | 03/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37045 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | HM | Healey Mills | m/e | 10/1976 | TE | on | 31/10/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08003 | w/e | 16/11/1975 | DN | Darlington | m/e | 11/1976 | TE | m/e | 03/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08053 | w/e | 16/11/1975 | DN | Darlington | m/e | 11/1976 | TE | m/e | 03/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08211 | on | 26/01/1969 | 36C | Frodingham | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | TE | m/e | 03/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08373 | w/e | 11/12/1971 | 36A | Doncaster | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | TE | on | 26/05/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08608 | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 36A | Doncaster | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | TE | on | 07/11/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08864 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | TE | on | 23/08/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08860 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 04/12/1976 | TE | on | 01/03/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47291 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 01/1977 | TE | m/e | 30/11/1979 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37101 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March | m/e | 02/1977 | TE | on | 01/02/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37096 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | MR | March | m/e | 03/1977 | TE | 2w/e | 17/02/1979 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37113 | w/e | 16/02/1974 | MR | March | m/e | 03/1977 | TE | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08211 | m/e | 03/1977 | 98S | m/e | 04/1977 | TE | on | 03/03/1985 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47368 | w/e | 25/05/1974 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 06/1977 | TE | on | 12/06/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31298 | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 07/1977 | TE | m/e | 10/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08059 | m/e | 03/1977 | 98S | m/e | 09/1977 | TE | on | 21/09/1980 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08772 | m/e | 03/1977 | 98S | m/e | 09/1977 | TE | on | 14/01/1994 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40152 | w/e | 30/05/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40153 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40194 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | m/e | 09/1981 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47313 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40124 | w/e | 15/06/1974 | HM | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | TE | on | 06/01/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31248 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | m/e | 11/1978 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31266 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | MR | March | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | m/e | 11/1978 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31279 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37019 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | IM | Immingham | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | on | 05/07/1981 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37046 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | 2w/e | 17/02/1979 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37048 | w/e | 10/08/1974 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | on | 31/03/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37053 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | on | 01/07/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37057 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | Gateshead | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37141 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37042 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | HM | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 17/02/1979 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40193 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | on | 24/10/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37119 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | TE | Thornaby | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37095 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37098 | w/e | 10/08/1974 | HM | Healey Mills | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | on | 01/05/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37161 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby | m/e | 30/11/1979 | TE | on | 01/04/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47009 | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 30A | Stratford | on | 21/06/1981 | TE | on | 26/07/1981 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47363 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby | on | 21/06/1981 | TE | on | 31/10/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47212 | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 40B | Immingham | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47221 | w/e | 16/08/1969 | 40B | Immingham | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37076 | on | 05/07/1981 | GD | Gateshead | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | on | 01/12/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37078 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | GD | Gateshead | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08150 | m/e | 31/10/1976 | EH | Eastleigh | on | 23/08/1981 | TE | on | 14/10/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08383 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 73F | Ashford | on | 23/08/1981 | TE | on | 17/03/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08185 | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 06/09/1981 | TE | on | 14/02/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40121 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 04/10/1981 | TE | on | 13/03/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40183 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills | on | 04/10/1981 | TE | on | 01/06/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31116 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 04/02/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31120 | on | 01/11/1981 | IM | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 27/09/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31200 | m/e | 05/1977 | MR | March | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 30/06/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31270 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 26/05/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31275 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 31/01/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31276 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 11/02/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31290 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 04/02/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31312 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 14/01/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31324 | m/e | 10/1977 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 16/04/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37128 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | TE | on | 01/02/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31105 | w/e | 16/05/1976 | SF | Stratford | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 01/05/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31131 | on | 19/02/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 22/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31215 | m/e | 02/1978 | IM | Immingham | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 04/06/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31229 | m/e | 09/1977 | MR | March | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 10/08/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31260 | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 12/01/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31264 | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 08/04/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31286 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 20/12/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37521 | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | Thornaby | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37668 | w/e | 17/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 20083 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 20086 | 4w/e | 16/06/1973 | HA | Haymarket | on | 15/05/1988 | TE | on | 01/09/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31184 | m/e | 02/1978 | GD | Gateshead | on | 05/06/1988 | TE | on | 04/02/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60017 | on | 30/10/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60018 | on | 30/10/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60023 | on | 08/11/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60028 | on | 09/11/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60030 | on | 21/11/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60029 | on | 26/11/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60025 | on | 12/12/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60034 | on | 12/12/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60024 | on | 17/12/1990 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60022 | on | 21/01/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60020 | on | 31/01/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60038 | on | 04/03/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60050 | on | 08/03/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60037 | on | 04/04/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60005 | on | 25/04/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60031 | on | 02/05/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60036 | on | 25/06/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60059 | on | 05/07/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60021 | on | 14/12/1991 (New) | TE | ||||||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | 60007 | on | 05/02/1992 (New) | TE |