Depot: Sunderland
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Sunderland | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2374 | on | 19/05/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 13/07/1933 | SUN | on | 19/01/1934 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2214 | m/e | 05/1917 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 05/07/1934 | SUN | on | 15/01/1938 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1465 | on | 13/11/1935 (New) | SUN | on | 15/06/1936 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1473 | on | 15/11/1935 (New) | SUN | on | 28/11/1938 | CON | Consett | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 960 | H | 12/1935 | SUN | m/e | 03/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1585 | on | 16/04/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 06/05/1937 | SUN | on | 08/07/1939 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2144 | on | 17/09/1938 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 14/11/1938 | SUN | on | 18/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2149 | on | 17/09/1938 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 17/11/1938 | SUN | on | 12/05/1946 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2154 | m/e | 12/1913 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 18/01/1939 | SUN | on | 05/08/1946 | CON | Consett |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2143 | on | 18/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 31/10/1941 | SUN | on | 21/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1327 | on | 30/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 31/10/1941 | SUN | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1523 | on | 26/02/1940 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/06/1943 | SUN | on | 20/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9861 | on | 05/08/1946 | CON | Consett | on | 20/01/1947 | SUN | on | 04/06/1950 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5846 | on | 18/10/1944 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 13/04/1947 | SUN | on | 26/02/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9887 | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 15/11/1947 | SUN | on | 10/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7243 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 19/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7247 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 06/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7251 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 26/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7252 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7257 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 12/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7260 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 24/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7264 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 11/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7267 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 14/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7270 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7283 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 09/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7297 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 15/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7299 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 08/05/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7300 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 06/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7310 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7328 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 21/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7336 | H | 12/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 22/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7348 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 12/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5785 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5793 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 26/03/1949 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5798 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 02/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5817 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5820 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5823 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5834 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 24/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5836 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 26/03/1949 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5843 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 13/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5850 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5853 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 14/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5856 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 26/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5857 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51K | Saltburn | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5865 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5872 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 31/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5878 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5884 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 51K | Saltburn | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8691 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 06/11/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8698 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8707 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | on | 23/04/1950 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8718 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8730 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 06/11/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8016 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 20/11/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9400 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9413 | by | 01/01/1923 | Dar | Barnard Castle | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9421 | by | 01/01/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9425 | by | 01/01/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9427 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | East Hartlepool | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9428 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | East Hartlepool | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9429 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | East Hartlepool | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 09/04/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9422 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 10/01/1948 | SUN | w/e | 17/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9423 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | w/e | 24/01/1948 | SUN | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9853 | on | 17/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 30/05/1948 | SUN | w/e | 05/06/1948 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9853 | on | 30/05/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 05/06/1948 | SUN | on | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68678 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | on | 20/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68704 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9424 | on | 01/01/1948 | PEL | w/e | 06/11/1948 | SUN | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69857 | on | 17/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 07/11/1948 | SUN | w/e | 13/11/1948 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69857 | on | 07/11/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 13/11/1948 | SUN | on | 05/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8016 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 25/12/1948 | SUN | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65836 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 26/03/1949 | SUN | on | 13/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69418 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 23/07/1949 | SUN | w/e | 30/07/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7276 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | Malton | w/e | 07/01/1950 | SUN | w/e | 10/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65832 | on | 01/01/1948 | PMN | Percy Main | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65841 | on | 01/01/1948 | PMN | Percy Main | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5850 | on | 01/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65871 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | w/e | 14/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69418 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 54A | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69418 | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 54A | on | 01/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69018 | m/e | 01/1951 (New) | SUN | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65705 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65705 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69101 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68017 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54D | Consett | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 54A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69426 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 54A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68017 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 69426 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69101 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54A | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68041 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 54A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68058 | on | 16/04/1950 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 54A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67310 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54A | on | 06/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68024 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 54A | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68048 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 54A | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69863 | on | 01/02/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 06/07/1952 | 54A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69863 | on | 06/07/1952 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 54A | on | 03/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69002 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54A | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69007 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54A | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69002 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69007 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54A | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | m/e | 12/1952 (New) | 54A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64919 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | on | 25/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64939 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67344 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54A | on | 27/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 69392 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54A | on | 04/05/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 69390 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 54D | Consett | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54A | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67345 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 54A | on | 13/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67315 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52A | Gateshead | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 54A | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67294 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 54A | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67316 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54A | on | 13/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67334 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54A | on | 26/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67347 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54A | on | 26/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64817 | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | on | 25/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64940 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65708 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 51F | West Auckland | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 54A | on | 28/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67259 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | on | 17/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67321 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | on | 07/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67338 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | on | 27/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67342 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67343 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 54A | on | 04/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67270 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54A | on | 13/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54A | on | 30/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67294 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54A | on | 15/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67333 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54A | on | 08/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65873 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65892 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52B | Heaton | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65893 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 54A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65662 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 51A | Darlington | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 54A | on | 06/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63466 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63467 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | on | 20/08/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63474 | on | 08/05/1924 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | on | 23/09/1956 | 54A | on | 15/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67248 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 54A | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67265 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54A | on | 20/02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67320 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54A | on | 20/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67246 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 54A | on | 27/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67329 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 54A | on | 24/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67253 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 54A | on | 31/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69852 | on | 19/09/1954 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 04/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69854 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 10/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69855 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69858 | on | 16/06/1957 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 10/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69859 | on | 13/06/1954 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 30/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69872 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 16/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69878 | on | 08/09/1957 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 24/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69889 | on | 19/09/1954 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | on | 30/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68044 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 54A | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69870 | on | 27/05/1940 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 22/06/1958 | 54A | on | 24/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69875 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 22/06/1958 | 54A | on | 20/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65666 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | TDK | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 54A | w/e | 04/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67637 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67645 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67261 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 54A | on | 11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69873 | on | 15/09/1957 | 54a | Durham | on | 07/12/1958 | 52G | on | 08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 15/09/1957 | 54a | Durham | on | 07/12/1958 | 52G | on | 01/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63464 | on | 17/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 25/01/1959 | 52G | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63469 | on | 01/03/1940 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 25/01/1959 | 52G | on | 20/08/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65799 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 52G | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65826 | on | 01/01/1948 | PMN | Percy Main | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 52G | on | 26/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65873 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 52G | on | 30/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63463 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 14/06/1959 | 52G | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65823 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52G | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 63473 | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 21/06/1959 | 52G | on | 13/12/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2047 | on | 19/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2050 | on | 17/01/1959 | 52C | Blaydon (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52G | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65891 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52G | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67645 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52G | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 52G | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64700 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | on | 17/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64704 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64710 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | on | 17/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64847 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 08/11/1959 | 52G | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64866 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 08/11/1959 | 52G | on | 13/12/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64701 | on | 07/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64703 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52B | Heaton | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | on | 29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64825 | on | 07/02/1936 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | on | 02/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64833 | on | 10/05/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | on | 26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64853 | on | 18/10/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | on | 30/07/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64942 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 20/03/1960 | 52G | on | 14/01/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 52G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64854 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 11/09/1960 | 52G | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2092 | on | 27/05/1960 | 52E | Percy Main (New) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52G | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64707 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 13/11/1960 | 52G | on | 25/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2163 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2164 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64858 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 15/01/1961 | 52G | on | 29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3241 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3076 | on | 23/01/1954 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52G | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13242 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61038 | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 30/04/1961 | 52G | on | 17/06/1962 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61237 | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 30/04/1961 | 52G | on | 17/06/1962 | 52C | Blaydon |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2310 | on | 15/01/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) | on | 20/05/1961 | 52G | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64713 | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 11/06/1961 | 52G | on | 18/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2329 | on | 21/06/1961 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 52G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65869 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 52G | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64812 | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64843 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64846 | on | 30/07/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64851 | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64853 | on | 30/07/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 20/08/1961 | 52G | on | 12/11/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65883 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52G | on | 01/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52G | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65874 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 52G | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65887 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 52G | w/e | 06/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64806 | on | 13/12/1959 | 52B | Heaton | on | 14/01/1962 | 52G | w/e | 17/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64706 | on | 22/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 21/01/1962 | 52G | on | 29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65788 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | on | 05/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65833 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | on | 01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65865 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65870 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52G | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65846 | on | 26/02/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 15/04/1962 | 52G | on | 28/02/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65787 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 52G | w/e | 14/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65840 | on | 13/05/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/04/1962 (R) | 52G | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65856 | on | 26/08/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/04/1962 (R) | 52G | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50A | York (North) | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63342 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52K | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 04/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63345 | on | 08/05/1959 | 52K | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63365 | on | 23/07/1945 | CON | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 10/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63404 | on | 14/01/1946 | CON | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63418 | on | 19/06/1943 | CON | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63456 | on | 27/09/1959 | 52K | Consett | on | 06/05/1962 | 52G | on | 15/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63376 | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 09/09/1962 | 52G | on | 01/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63400 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 17/02/1963 | 52G | on | 12/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63458 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 17/02/1963 | 52G | on | 19/06/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63385 | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52G | on | 16/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 11/09/1960 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52G | on | 03/10/1965 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63441 | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52G | on | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63444 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 24/02/1963 | 52G | on | 17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63437 | on | 11/09/1960 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1963 | 52G | on | 05/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65864 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52G | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65870 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65874 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65882 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63367 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 07/07/1963 | 52G | on | 31/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63405 | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 21/07/1963 | 52G | on | 14/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63423 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/08/1963 | 52G | on | 16/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63406 | on | 18/01/1959 | 52K | Consett | on | 08/09/1963 | 52G | on | 31/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63433 | on | 05/05/1941 | CON | Consett | on | 08/09/1963 | 52G | on | 30/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63388 | on | 23/06/1963 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 06/10/1963 | 52G | on | 16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63436 | on | 06/12/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 13/10/1963 | 52G | on | 24/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63445 | on | 16/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 13/10/1963 | 52G | on | 19/06/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63346 | on | 14/06/1959 | 52K | Consett | on | 04/10/1964 | 52G | on | 29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65841 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 52G | on | 30/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62026 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 28/02/1965 | 52G | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62030 | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth | on | 28/02/1965 | 52G | on | 09/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65817 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52G | on | 01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63395 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/05/1965 | 52G | on | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62007 | on | 28/06/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 03/10/1965 | 52G | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62006 | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | on | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62021 | on | 25/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62023 | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | on | 23/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52G | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90357 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52G | on | 13/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65894 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90074 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90348 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90078 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | on | 27/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90417 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90395 | on | 28/10/1966 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 (R) | 52G | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65880 | on | 01/01/1948 | NBH | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52G | on | 12/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90112 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52G | on | 10/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90370 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52G | on | 15/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65869 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52G | on | 14/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65892 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52G | on | 07/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90056 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | on | 03/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90321 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90135 | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90560 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90361 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | on | 24/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90386 | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90698 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 52G | on | 05/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65823 | on | 20/03/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 (R) | 52G | |||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62012 | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) | on | 30/04/1967 | 52G | on | 17/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62042 | on | 17/06/1962 | 50A | York (North) | on | 30/04/1967 | 52G | on | 28/05/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62026 | on | 29/01/1967 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 14/05/1967 | 52G | on | 28/05/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65811 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65860 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52G | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65882 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52G | on | 07/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65789 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52G | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65795 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52G | on | 12/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65804 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52G | on | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65812 | on | 05/06/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 (R) | 52G | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65835 | on | 23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 (R) | 52G | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65879 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90009 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52G | on | 01/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52G | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn |