Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 2 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 2 Week
» 29500 Month
» 366346 Year
» 1587911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hull Springhead


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Hull Springhead Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q10 0-8-0 117       m/e 02/1907 (New) HLS on 01/10/1931 Withdrawn
Steam Q10 0-8-0 118       m/e 03/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 119       m/e 03/1907 (New) HLS on 01/07/1924 CUD Cudworth
Steam Q10 0-8-0 120       m/e 03/1907 (New) HLS on 27/05/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q10 0-8-0 122       m/e 04/1907 (New) HLS on 07/04/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q10 0-8-0 123       m/e 05/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 124       m/e 05/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 578       m/e 06/1907 (New) HLS on 22/03/1924 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 125       m/e 06/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 126       m/e 06/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 121       m/e 08/1907 (New) HLS on 27/05/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q10 0-8-0 127       m/e 09/1907 (New) HLS on 31/01/1925 CUD Cudworth
Steam Q10 0-8-0 128       m/e 10/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 129       m/e 10/1907 (New) HLS on 23/10/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q10 0-8-0 130       m/e 10/1907 (New) HLS on 18/11/1929 SEL Selby
Steam Q10 0-8-0 131       m/e 11/1907 (New) HLS on 12/11/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q5 0-8-0 656       m/e 05/1908 (New) HLS on 24/12/1925 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q5 0-8-0 764       m/e 08/1911 (New) HLS on 31/05/1924 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1249       m/e 02/1913 (New) HLS on 23/05/1924 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1280       m/e 05/1913 (New) HLS on 22/05/1924 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1311       m/e 07/1913 (New) HLS on 01/02/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2230       m/e 11/1917 (New) HLS on 26/01/1927 EHL East Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2237       m/e 11/1918 (New) HLS on 26/05/1924 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2277       m/e 05/1920 (New) HLS on 01/02/1927 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2299       m/e 01/1921 (New) HLS on 22/05/1924 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1032       on 06/09/1922 HLS on 22/03/1924 SEL Selby
Steam N9 0-6-2T 1617       by 01/01/1923 HLS on 01/01/1948 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam N9 0-6-2T 1649       by 01/01/1923 HLS on 01/01/1948 SUN Sunderland
Steam N9 0-6-2T 1650       by 01/01/1923 HLS on 01/01/1948 AUK West Auckland
Steam N9 0-6-2T 1653       by 01/01/1923 HLS on 01/01/1948 SUN Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2234 m/e 09/1918 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 12/05/1923 HLS on 01/07/1924 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2301 m/e 03/1921 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 17/05/1923 HLS on 23/05/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1002 m/e 03/1902 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 26/08/1924 HLS on 26/05/1927 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 645 m/e 12/1907 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 26/08/1924 HLS on 04/06/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1292 m/e 06/1913 SEL Selby (New) on 27/08/1924 HLS on 24/05/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 785 m/e 09/1903 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 10/10/1924 HLS on 30/01/1925 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1110 m/e 12/1903 NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 10/10/1924 HLS m/e 03/1926 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q5 0-8-0 443 m/e 03/1904 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 10/10/1924 HLS on 07/02/1925 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2264 m/e 03/1920 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 17/11/1924 HLS m/e 01/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2252 m/e 08/1919 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 08/12/1924 HLS on 31/03/1927 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 715 m/e 09/1903 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 30/01/1925 HLS on 24/11/1927 TSK Thirsk
Steam Q5 0-8-0 652 m/e 03/1908 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 30/01/1925 HLS on 14/12/1925 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2231 m/e 12/1917 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 31/01/1925 HLS on 31/03/1927 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2243 m/e 05/1919 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 31/01/1925 HLS on 01/02/1927 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2247 m/e 06/1919 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 16/02/1925 HLS on 01/02/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2294 m/e 11/1920 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 16/02/1925 HLS on 01/02/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1136 m/e 12/1910 SEL Selby (New) on 16/05/1925 HLS on 14/06/1927 MAL Malton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1032 on 22/03/1924 SEL Selby on 18/08/1925 HLS on 01/02/1927 SHI Shildon
Steam Q10 0-8-0 2501 on 27/05/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 22/10/1928 HLS on 06/07/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q10 0-8-0 2502 on 27/05/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 22/10/1928 HLS on 02/01/1931 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6581 on 26/05/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/09/1929 HLS on 09/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6613 on 30/06/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/09/1929 HLS on 06/01/1940 DAR Darlington
Steam O4 2-8-0 6580 on 19/05/1928 YK York (North) on 05/10/1929 HLS on 11/07/1933 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6612 on 11/08/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 23/10/1929 HLS on 11/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6614 on 20/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 23/10/1929 HLS on 11/07/1933 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6610 on 15/06/1928 YK York (North) on 04/11/1929 HLS on 24/02/1940 HTN Heaton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6577 on 31/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 07/02/1930 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6578 on 21/01/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 07/02/1930 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6584 on 24/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 10/05/1941 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6609 on 22/09/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 06/01/1940 DAR Darlington
Steam O4 2-8-0 6615 on 11/02/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 11/07/1933 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6618 on 10/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/11/1929 HLS on 06/01/1940 DAR Darlington
Steam O4 2-8-0 6607 on 11/10/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/01/1930 HLS on 06/01/1940 DAR Darlington
Steam O4 2-8-0 6608 on 30/06/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/01/1930 HLS on 17/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6549 on 30/03/1929 YK York (North) on 06/02/1930 HLS on 07/02/1930 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6617 on 05/05/1928 YK York (North) on 06/02/1930 HLS on 02/10/1940 YK York (North)
Steam O4 2-8-0 6583 on 28/01/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 24/03/1930 HLS on 24/02/1940 HTN Heaton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6616 on 29/10/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 24/03/1930 HLS on 10/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6630 on 10/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 07/04/1930 HLS on 06/07/1940 HTN Heaton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6632 on 17/03/1928 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 07/04/1930 HLS on 15/07/1935 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6262 on 21/04/1924 ANN Annesley on 15/05/1930 HLS on 28/06/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6261 on 14/01/1926 LNG Langwith Junction on 24/05/1930 HLS on 28/06/1933 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6579 on 12/05/1928 YK York (North) on 21/08/1930 HLS on 12/01/1934 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6631 on 26/05/1928 YK York (North) on 21/08/1930 HLS on 07/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2248 m/e 06/1919 SKN Stockton (New) on 27/11/1930 HLS on 04/12/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2255 on 24/12/1924 SKN Stockton on 27/11/1930 HLS on 04/12/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6611 on 29/10/1929 BUL Bullcroft Junction on 05/12/1931 HLS on 12/01/1934 CUD Cudworth
Steam O4 2-8-0 6615 on 02/08/1937 CUD Cudworth on 29/04/1938 HLS on 08/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam O4 2-8-0 6577 on 07/02/1930 CUD Cudworth on 08/01/1940 HLS on 24/02/1940 HTN Heaton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6578 on 07/02/1930 CUD Cudworth on 08/01/1940 HLS on 18/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2217 m/e 06/1917 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 20/01/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2220 m/e 06/1917 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 20/01/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2229 on 25/08/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/01/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2244 on 18/12/1922 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/01/1940 HLS on 02/03/1940 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2264 m/e 01/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/01/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2283 on 18/11/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/01/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2227 on 10/01/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 06/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2257 on 30/03/1939 WHL West Hartlepool on 07/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2244 on 02/03/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 08/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1284 on 17/04/1939 WHL West Hartlepool on 10/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2254 on 01/04/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 18/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2239 on 17/04/1939 WHL West Hartlepool on 23/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2291 on 02/03/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 25/05/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2234 on 01/07/1924 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 06/07/1940 HLS on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2275 on 05/01/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 10/05/1941 HLS on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1276 on 02/01/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/10/1943 HLS on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2219 on 07/08/1939 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/10/1943 HLS on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2241 m/e 12/1918 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 18/10/1943 HLS on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 5404 on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 02/01/1945 HLS on 29/04/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6615 on 08/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/01/1945 HLS on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6211 on 03/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool on 06/01/1945 HLS on 29/04/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6616 on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 10/01/1945 HLS on 29/09/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6352 on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 11/01/1945 HLS on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6606 on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 12/01/1945 HLS on 29/04/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 5008 on 18/10/1944 WHL West Hartlepool on 12/01/1945 HLS on 29/04/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6501 on 03/09/1942 WHL West Hartlepool on 12/01/1945 HLS on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 6581 on 09/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 13/01/1945 HLS on 29/04/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 6578 on 18/05/1940 WHL West Hartlepool on 09/02/1945 HLS on 15/06/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam O1 2-8-0 6350 on 21/03/1943 WHL West Hartlepool on 02/03/1945 HLS on 04/06/1945 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1136 on 16/10/1939 SBK Starbeck on 12/03/1945 HLS on 23/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1174 on 21/10/1939 SBK Starbeck on 12/03/1945 HLS on 21/03/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1190 on 23/06/1943 SBK Starbeck on 12/03/1945 HLS on 17/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam O1 2-8-0 6334 on 11/06/1944 TDK Tyne Dock on 18/06/1945 HLS on 21/03/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam O1 2-8-0 6630 on 19/10/1944 TDK Tyne Dock on 18/06/1945 HLS on 15/06/1946 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam J25 0-6-0 5654 m/e 10/1939 91N To North Eastern Region on 01/01/1948 HLS 4w/e 20/01/1951 54A Sunderland
Steam J25 0-6-0 65707       on 01/01/1948 HLS m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J25 0-6-0 5724       on 01/01/1948 HLS on 21/11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J25 0-6-0 5728       on 01/01/1948 HLS 5w/e 24/03/1951 54C Borough Gardens
Steam N12 0-6-2T 9089       on 01/01/1948 HLS on 30/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9110       on 01/01/1948 HLS on 26/06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9111       on 01/01/1948 HLS 4w/e 23/12/1950 53C Hull Springhead
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9112       on 01/01/1948 HLS w/e 24/11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9113       on 01/01/1948 HLS 5w/e 17/01/1953 50B Neville Hill
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9116       on 01/01/1948 HLS 4w/e 16/05/1953 50B Neville Hill
Steam N13 0-6-2T 9119       on 01/01/1948 HLS 4w/e 24/10/1953 50B Neville Hill
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69789 on 06/07/1940 CUD Cudworth on 16/10/1949 HLS on 28/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63754 on 06/02/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/12/1949 HLS on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 63673 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/12/1949 HLS on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O4 2-8-0 63732 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/12/1949 HLS on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63740 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63755 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63676 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63760 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63712 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63856 on 22/10/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam O1 2-8-0 63874 on 11/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1950 53C on 21/05/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90052       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 21/04/1951 38B Annesley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90571 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 5w/e 15/11/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90586       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90217       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 5w/e 15/11/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90007       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 21/10/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90010       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 31/08/1951 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90378 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 21/10/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90470       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90478 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 30/06/1950 53C w/e 22/11/1958 53E Goole
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90661 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 5w/e 14/06/1958 51G Haverton Hill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90677 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 30/06/1950 53C 4w/e 08/02/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 79227       4w/e 30/06/1950 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam N13 0-6-2T 69111 on 01/01/1948 HLS Hull Springhead 4w/e 23/12/1950 53C on 21/08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63753 on 06/02/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 15/04/1951 53C on 02/09/1951 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63770 on 05/03/1945 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 15/04/1951 53C on 02/09/1951 53C Hull Springhead
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69780 on 28/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 17/06/1951 53C w/e 15/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90427 4w/e 19/05/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/07/1951 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90663       4w/e 21/07/1951 53C 5w/e 22/10/1955 50B Neville Hill
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68673 5w/e 24/03/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/07/1951 53C w/e 19/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69784 on 10/04/1939 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951 53C on 05/03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63770 on 15/04/1951 53C Hull Springhead on 02/09/1951 53C on 16/09/1951 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90467       5w/e 22/09/1951 53C 5w/e 22/10/1955 50B Neville Hill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90233 4w/e 21/04/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/10/1951 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90704 4w/e 25/11/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/10/1951 53C w/e 07/11/1959 53E Goole
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90082       5w/e 21/06/1952 53C 5w/e 22/10/1955 50B Neville Hill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90623       5w/e 21/06/1952 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69783 on 28/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 14/09/1952 53C on 17/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68718 on 01/01/1948 SUN Sunderland 4w/e 20/09/1952 53C 4w/e 22/05/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69010 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 21/03/1953 53C w/e 19/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69011 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 21/03/1953 53C w/e 19/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90511       4w/e 18/04/1953 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69787 on 15/02/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates on 10/05/1953 53C on 09/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J71 0-6-0T 68284 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 4w/e 24/10/1953 53C 4w/e 20/02/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68741 on 01/01/1948 YK York (North) 4w/e 24/10/1953 53C 4w/e 22/05/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam N8 0-6-2T 69378 on 01/01/1948 TDK Tyne Dock 4w/e 24/10/1953 53C 4w/e 19/12/1953 53D Bridlington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13070       on 21/11/1953 (New) 53C 4w/e 22/05/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12114 on 19/07/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 19/12/1953 53C w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12115 on 23/08/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 19/12/1953 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 26E Lees (Oldham)
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12113 on 19/07/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 23/01/1954 53C 4w/e 28/01/1956 26E Lees (Oldham)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13071 on 21/11/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 20/02/1954 53C 4w/e 19/03/1955 53A Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13072 on 19/12/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 20/02/1954 53C 4w/e 19/03/1955 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68743 4w/e 19/12/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/02/1954 53C 4w/e 19/06/1954 54B Tyne Dock
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68747 4w/e 19/12/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/02/1954 53C 4w/e 25/09/1954 52B Heaton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90061 5w/e 22/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 24/04/1954 53C 5w/e 14/06/1958 51A Darlington
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69776 on 21/03/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/05/1954 53C on 14/06/1954 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12116 on 20/09/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12117 on 20/09/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C w/e 30/11/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12118 on 20/09/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C w/e 30/11/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12119 on 20/09/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C on 18/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12120 on 20/09/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 22/05/1954 53C on 28/12/1968 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69771 on 12/03/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates on 03/10/1954 53C w/e 08/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69778 on 28/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 03/10/1954 53C on 03/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69781 on 15/02/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates on 03/10/1954 53C on 23/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68745 on 01/01/1948 YK York (North) 4w/e 13/11/1954 53C w/e 19/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13137       on 02/03/1955 (New) 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13138       on 05/03/1955 (New) 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13139       on 12/03/1955 (New) 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12121 on 18/10/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 19/03/1955 53C w/e 26/09/1970 50C Hull Botanic Gardens
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12122 on 18/10/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 19/03/1955 53C w/e 26/05/1962 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13140       on 29/04/1955 (New) 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 51A Darlington
Diesel 10 0-6-0 13141       on 04/05/1955 (New) 53C 5w/e 24/03/1956 51A Darlington
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69788 on 28/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 16/10/1955 53C on 21/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90352 5w/e 22/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/10/1955 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69772 on 28/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/11/1955 53C on 16/12/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13232 on 12/01/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13233 on 18/01/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C w/e 29/11/1958 53E Goole
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13234 on 25/01/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C w/e 26/05/1962 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13235 on 02/02/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C w/e 10/12/1960 50A York (North)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13236 on 07/02/1956 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C w/e 26/05/1962 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12113 4w/e 18/02/1956 26E Lees (Oldham) 5w/e 24/03/1956 53C 4w/e 25/02/1967 55E Normanton
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69786 on 10/06/1939 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 25/03/1956 53C on 16/12/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12115 5w/e 24/03/1956 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 21/04/1956 53C w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford
Steam J73 0-6-0T 68361 on 01/01/1948 HLA   4w/e 21/04/1956 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam A7 4-6-2T 69782 on 06/03/1955 54B Tyne Dock on 16/12/1956 53C on 16/12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90378 4w/e 21/10/1950 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 19/01/1957 53C 4w/e 08/02/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90482 5w/e 22/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 19/01/1957 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68672 5w/e 20/04/1957 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 24/08/1957 53C w/e 07/02/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68741 4w/e 22/05/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 24/08/1957 53C w/e 07/02/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J25 0-6-0 65663 5w/e 20/07/1957 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/09/1957 53C 5w/e 14/06/1958 50B Neville Hill
Steam J25 0-6-0 65685 5w/e 20/07/1957 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/09/1957 53C 5w/e 14/06/1958 50B Neville Hill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90503 4w/e 21/09/1957 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/12/1957 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77000 4w/e 16/07/1955 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 2w/e 28/12/1957 53C on 01/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J73 0-6-0T 68360 on 01/01/1948 HLA   4w/e 08/01/1958 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90265 m/e 16/06/1956 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 12/04/1958 53C 5w/e 14/06/1958 53E Goole
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90378 4w/e 08/02/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 10/05/1958 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90677 4w/e 08/02/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 10/05/1958 53C w/e 06/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3675       on 05/06/1958 (New) 53C w/e 29/11/1958 53E Goole
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3676       on 12/06/1958 (New) 53C w/e 29/11/1958 53E Goole
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46409 on 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958 53C 4w/e 11/10/1958 53E Goole
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77010 4w/e 16/07/1955 53B Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 11/10/1958 53C on 01/12/1958 53A Hull Dairycoates