Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 435 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3023 Week
» 32521 Month
» 369367 Year
» 1590932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Speke Junction


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Speke Junction Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2960 w/e 07/03/1936 5B Crewe South w/e 17/10/1936 8C w/e 09/01/1937 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2948 w/e 28/12/1935 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/01/1938 8C w/e 04/06/1938 4A Shrewsbury
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2953 w/e 01/06/1936 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/01/1938 8C w/e 29/04/1939 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2955 w/e 05/03/1937 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/01/1938 8C w/e 29/04/1939 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2972 w/e 28/08/1943 8A Edge Hill w/e 27/10/1945 8C w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2978 w/e 14/11/1942 8A Edge Hill w/e 27/10/1945 8C w/e 19/11/1949 9A Longsight
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2946 w/e 24/01/1942 5B Crewe South w/e 17/11/1945 8C w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2955 w/e 10/02/1940 5B Crewe South w/e 17/11/1945 8C w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2974 w/e 21/02/1942 5B Crewe South w/e 17/11/1945 8C w/e 24/04/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2946 w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill w/e 20/07/1946 8C w/e 27/08/1949 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2972 w/e 22/06/1946 8A Edge Hill w/e 20/07/1946 8C w/e 24/04/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2976 w/e 14/07/1945 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 13/09/1947 8C w/e 25/10/1947 6B Mold Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7080       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7088       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 22/02/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7090       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 02/01/1954 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7093       on 01/01/1948 8C on 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7097       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 24/04/1954 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7284       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7388       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 10/11/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7439       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 13/08/1955 6J Holyhead
Steam 27 0-6-0 12088       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 27/01/1951 10C Patricroft
Steam 27 0-6-0 12143       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 16/06/1951 10C Patricroft
Steam 27 0-6-0 12163       on 01/01/1948 8C 5w/e 24/12/1949 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 27 0-6-0 52219       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51342       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 18/09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11444       on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 99C Crewe Works
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51405       on 01/01/1948 8C on 11/12/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51427       on 01/01/1948 8C on 20/11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11397       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 03/11/1956 27B Aintree
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51469       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9027       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9060       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9057       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 18/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9066       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 02/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9065       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 8904       on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 1A Willesden
Steam G1 0-8-0 9365       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8942       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 15/08/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9341       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 23/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9086       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9140       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 23/12/1950 TESTS  
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9218       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9219       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 30/09/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9253       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 24/03/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9281       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 09/10/1954 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9293       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 07/10/1950 2B Nuneaton
Steam G1 0-8-0 9297       on 01/01/1948 8C m/e 04/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 1185 0-8-2T 7875       on 01/01/1948 8C on 28/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1185 0-8-2T 7877       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 21/02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 1185 0-8-2T 7881       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 21/07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1185 0-8-2T 7884       on 01/01/1948 8C w/e 09/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2788       on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A Longsight
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2810       on 01/01/1948 8C 4w/e 21/02/1953 3D Aston
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2815       on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2926 4w/e 22/06/1946 1A Willesden on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2933       on 01/01/1948 8C 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2934       on 01/01/1948 8C 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2949 w/e 20/12/1947 2B Bletchley w/e 06/03/1948 8C w/e 08/07/1950 8E Brunswick
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2965 w/e 05/06/1948 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 17/07/1948 8C w/e 20/10/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42977 w/e 05/07/1947 5B Crewe South w/e 27/11/1948 8C w/e 20/10/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42979 w/e 08/11/1941 6B Mold Junction w/e 04/12/1948 8C w/e 19/11/1949 9A Longsight
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42982 w/e 05/07/1941 5B Crewe South w/e 04/12/1948 8C w/e 02/02/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 27619       3w/e 11/12/1948 8C m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52100 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C w/e 15/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52175 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C w/e 19/10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 48944 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C w/e 28/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9143 on 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C w/e 15/08/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9302 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 3w/e 11/12/1948 8C 4w/e 19/05/1951 10C Patricroft
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42962 w/e 16/12/1944 5B Crewe South w/e 11/12/1948 8C w/e 09/02/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42964 w/e 02/05/1942 2D Nuneaton w/e 15/01/1949 8C w/e 09/02/1952 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42973 w/e 29/04/1939 2D Nuneaton w/e 15/01/1949 8C w/e 27/08/1949 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42971 w/e 12/10/1946 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 01/10/1949 8C w/e 09/02/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 7699       5w/e 24/12/1949 8C 4w/e 24/02/1951 3E Monument Lane
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48747 on 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 5w/e 24/12/1949 8C w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot
Steam G2 0-8-0 49395 on 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 4w/e 09/09/1950 8C 4w/e 20/04/1957 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47309 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C 4w/e 04/11/1950 8E Brunswick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48054 on 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C w/e 07/11/1959 6B Mold Junction
Steam G2 0-8-0 49396 4w/e 09/09/1950 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C 4w/e 08/09/1951 10B Preston
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42786 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C 4w/e 26/01/1957 9A Longsight
Steam G2 0-8-0 49398 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/11/1950 8C w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 49451 on 01/01/1948 10B Preston 4w/e 02/12/1950 8C w/e 15/08/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12024 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C w/e 08/08/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7112 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C w/e 22/11/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12026 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C 4w/e 23/04/1955 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 7114 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C 4w/e 16/05/1953 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12028 4w/e 02/12/1950 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C on 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49153 on 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C w/e 14/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42892 4w/e 04/11/1950 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 31/12/1950 8C w/e 09/01/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam G2 0-8-0 49406 on 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley 4w/e 27/01/1951 8C w/e 15/08/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49134 on 01/01/1948 3A Bescot 4w/e 08/09/1951 8C w/e 31/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52140 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 06/10/1951 8C 4w/e 16/05/1953 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42965 w/e 20/10/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/01/1952 8C w/e 26/01/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 26/01/1952 8C 4w/e 23/02/1952 2A Rugby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45001 4w/e 06/10/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 26/01/1952 8C 4w/e 23/02/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45327 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B Crewe South 4w/e 26/01/1952 8C 4w/e 23/02/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48373 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C 4w/e 14/06/1958 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48736 5w/e 16/07/1949 5B Crewe South 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C 4w/e 09/08/1952 5B Crewe South
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49113 5w/e 16/07/1949 11A Carnforth 4w/e 23/02/1952 8C 4w/e 12/07/1952 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48323 4w/e 16/06/1951 8D Widnes 4w/e 09/08/1952 8C 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12018 8w/e 14/06/1952 8A Edge Hill 8w/e 29/11/1952 8C on 28/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48039 3w/e 14/01/1950 2A Rugby 8w/e 29/11/1952 8C w/e 30/01/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48510 on 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 8w/e 29/11/1952 8C 4w/e 16/05/1953 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12012 4w/e 19/05/1951 18A Toton 5w/e 03/01/1953 8C 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B Crewe South
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42941 8w/e 29/11/1952 5B Crewe South 3w/e 24/01/1953 8C 8w/e 11/07/1953 6B Mold Junction
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12012 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B Crewe South 4w/e 16/05/1953 8C 4w/e 03/10/1953 5B Crewe South
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12015 4w/e 21/03/1953 5B Crewe South 4w/e 16/05/1953 8C on 28/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12007 4w/e 16/05/1953 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 8C on 14/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12027 4w/e 16/05/1953 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 8C on 04/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47490 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 03/10/1953 8C 4w/e 06/10/1956 8D Widnes
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47516 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 03/10/1953 8C 4w/e 11/09/1954 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48094 3w/e 24/12/1949 5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/10/1953 8C 4w/e 25/02/1956 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49155 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 28/11/1953 8C 4w/e 27/02/1954 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48729 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby 4w/e 30/01/1954 8C 4w/e 11/08/1956 1A Willesden
Steam 27 0-6-0 52232 on 01/01/1948 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 27/02/1954 8C w/e 19/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9368 4w/e 29/12/1951 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 17/07/1954 8C on 07/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49266 on 01/01/1948 3A Bescot 4w/e 09/10/1954 8C 4w/e 23/03/1957 2C Warwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13087       on 06/11/1954 (New) 8C 4w/e 01/12/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13088       on 06/11/1954 (New) 8C 4w/e 01/12/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47269 4w/e 05/09/1953 2A Rugby 4w/e 06/11/1954 8C 4w/e 01/01/1955 2A Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47493 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 06/11/1954 8C w/e 13/12/1958 26A Newton Heath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13089       on 04/12/1954 (New) 8C 4w/e 25/02/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42964 w/e 30/10/1954 2B Nuneaton w/e 08/01/1955 8C w/e 14/01/1956 5A Crewe North
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12026 4w/e 23/04/1955 5B Crewe South 4w/e 13/08/1955 8C on 21/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel DELTIC Co-Co DP1       on 24/10/1955 (New) 8C m/e 06/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47309 4w/e 04/11/1950 8E Brunswick 4w/e 25/02/1956 8C 4w/e 03/11/1956 10C Patricroft
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13089 4w/e 25/02/1956 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 24/03/1956 8C 4w/e 01/12/1956 5B Crewe South
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49110 m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn 4w/e 21/04/1956 (R) 8C 4w/e 23/02/1957 2A Rugby
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12029 4w/e 29/01/1955 5B Crewe South 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C on 21/05/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12081 4w/e 24/03/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C w/e 11/06/1966 9A Longsight
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12082 4w/e 19/05/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A Chester (MR)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49110 4w/e 23/02/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 20/04/1957 8C      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49214 on 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 20/04/1957 8C w/e 10/08/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12082 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 8C w/e 18/07/1959 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48206 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 10/08/1957 8C w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48264 on 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 10/08/1957 8C w/e 18/06/1960 2B Nuneaton
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49306 3w/e 11/12/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 05/10/1957 8C w/e 14/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47314 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 30/11/1957 8C w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47560 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 30/11/1957 8C w/e 16/07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48203 4w/e 07/09/1957 9G Northwich 4w/e 30/11/1957 8C 4w/e 22/02/1958 2A Rugby
Steam G2 0-8-0 49397 4w/e 23/02/1952 2A Rugby 4w/e 30/11/1957 8C w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 49433 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 30/11/1957 8C w/e 15/08/1959 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam G2 0-8-0 49424 4w/e 21/04/1956 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/03/1958 8C 4w/e 12/07/1958 17B Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48323 4w/e 19/04/1958 8D Widnes 4w/e 17/05/1958 8C w/e 07/11/1959 6B Mold Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3019 4w/e 28/12/1957 5B Crewe South 4w/e 06/09/1958 8C w/e 30/03/1963 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49008 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 08/11/1958 8C w/e 15/08/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47612 on 01/01/1948 2C Northampton w/e 07/03/1959 8C w/e 10/11/1962 12F Workington
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47493 w/e 13/12/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 14/03/1959 8C w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48268 on 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 11/04/1959 8C w/e 18/06/1960 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48408 4w/e 14/06/1958 6E Chester West w/e 11/04/1959 8C w/e 20/06/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12006 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 18/07/1959 8C on 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48506 w/e 22/11/1958 8D Widnes w/e 15/08/1959 8C w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48074 w/e 20/06/1959 1E Bletchley w/e 22/08/1959 8C w/e 07/11/1959 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48247 8w/e 19/06/1954 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 22/08/1959 8C w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48535 4w/e 03/12/1955 1E Bletchley w/e 22/08/1959 8C w/e 31/10/1964 9J Agecroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48714 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 22/08/1959 8C w/e 16/03/1963 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48531 4w/e 26/01/1952 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 07/11/1959 8C w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47310 w/e 07/11/1959 3A Bescot w/e 19/12/1959 8C w/e 05/11/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 47160 4w/e 14/06/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/12/1959 8C w/e 17/12/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 47164 w/e 04/07/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 19/12/1959 8C w/e 04/02/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45041 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/01/1960 8C w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45312 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/01/1960 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48479 4w/e 14/06/1958 8A Edge Hill w/e 30/01/1960 8C w/e 28/05/1960 8E Northwich
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3870 on 17/02/1960 5D Stoke (New) w/e 27/02/1960 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47647 on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke w/e 27/02/1960 8C w/e 10/11/1962 12F Workington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3370 on 02/08/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) w/e 05/03/1960 8C w/e 25/08/1962 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48437 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby w/e 30/04/1960 8C w/e 17/09/1960 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48722 4w/e 08/09/1951 3A Bescot w/e 30/04/1960 8C w/e 21/05/1966 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48368 4w/e 28/01/1956 9G Northwich w/e 28/05/1960 8C w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44065 on 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 11/06/1960 8C w/e 17/09/1960 12F Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44445 w/e 05/12/1959 6B Mold Junction w/e 11/06/1960 8C w/e 17/09/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44493 on 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 11/06/1960 8C w/e 17/09/1960 6H Bangor
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48479 w/e 28/05/1960 8E Northwich w/e 18/06/1960 8C w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12003 w/e 25/07/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/07/1960 8C w/e 19/08/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44749       w/e 10/09/1960 8C w/e 01/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45140 w/e 27/08/1960 24K Preston w/e 10/09/1960 8C w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44807 w/e 18/06/1960 24K Preston w/e 17/09/1960 8C w/e 08/07/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45386 on 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft w/e 17/09/1960 8C w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45329 w/e 18/06/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 24/09/1960 8C w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44864 4w/e 01/12/1956 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1960 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45370 w/e 17/09/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 15/10/1960 8C w/e 13/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45404 w/e 29/10/1960 2A Rugby w/e 19/11/1960 8C w/e 22/06/1963 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47344 4w/e 23/02/1952 5D Stoke w/e 10/12/1960 8C w/e 16/09/1961 12F Workington
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47431 w/e 17/09/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 10/12/1960 8C w/e 13/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48505 w/e 15/10/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/01/1961 8C w/e 16/09/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45137 w/e 02/04/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 8C w/e 31/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45147 w/e 19/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 8C w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45284 w/e 19/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 8C w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45375 w/e 19/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 8C w/e 05/08/1961 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45184 w/e 07/11/1959 2A Rugby w/e 11/02/1961 8C w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45032 4w/e 14/06/1958 8A Edge Hill w/e 04/03/1961 8C w/e 08/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48479 w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton w/e 25/03/1961 8C w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48166 w/e 18/06/1960 2B Nuneaton w/e 15/04/1961 8C w/e 06/05/1961 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48250 w/e 25/03/1961 21B Bescot w/e 22/04/1961 8C w/e 31/10/1964 9J Agecroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48297 w/e 07/01/1961 81E Didcot w/e 06/05/1961 8C w/e 22/02/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48294       w/e 10/06/1961 8C w/e 07/10/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48692 4w/e 14/06/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 10/06/1961 8C w/e 23/09/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48711 4w/e 26/01/1952 9G Northwich w/e 10/06/1961 8C w/e 07/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47383 on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR) w/e 17/06/1961 8C w/e 10/11/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48520 4w/e 18/04/1953 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 17/06/1961 8C m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2199       on 29/06/1961 (New) 8C w/e 31/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45386 w/e 10/06/1961 6J Holyhead w/e 08/07/1961 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45375 w/e 05/08/1961 5D Stoke w/e 19/08/1961 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45034 w/e 10/06/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 09/09/1961 8C w/e 20/06/1964 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45073 w/e 10/06/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 09/09/1961 8C w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2385 w/e 02/09/1961 6A Chester (MR) w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 10/11/1962 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3855 on 10/10/1959 27F Brunswick (New) w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3856 on 17/10/1959 27F Brunswick (New) w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3857 on 24/10/1959 27F Brunswick (New) w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44127 4w/e 23/03/1957 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 30/09/1961 99C Crewe Works
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44232 4w/e 23/03/1957 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 04/11/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44494 4w/e 04/11/1950 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 04/11/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44589 w/e 10/01/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 04/11/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42445 4w/e 25/01/1958 17F Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 22/06/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42580 4w/e 24/04/1954 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42584 4w/e 04/10/1952 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 22/06/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42598 4w/e 12/07/1952 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 30/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42612 4w/e 04/10/1952 8E Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C on 25/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42183 w/e 10/01/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 17/02/1962 2E Northampton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42186 w/e 11/07/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 26/05/1962 21D Aston
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42077 w/e 17/06/1961 6H Bangor w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 10/11/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42078 w/e 17/06/1961 6H Bangor w/e 16/09/1961 8C w/e 20/06/1964 8M Southport
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44741 w/e 08/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/09/1961 8C w/e 13/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44742 w/e 01/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/09/1961 8C w/e 06/01/1962 27A Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45071 w/e 17/06/1961 21E Monument Lane w/e 28/10/1961 8C w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44749 w/e 01/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 11/11/1961 8C w/e 05/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44750 w/e 08/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 11/11/1961 8C w/e 04/08/1962 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44751 w/e 10/06/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 18/11/1961 8C m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44754 w/e 16/09/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 18/11/1961 8C w/e 11/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 w/e 08/10/1960 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 19/05/1962 8C w/e 20/06/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51253 w/e 25/03/1961 27A Bank Hall w/e 09/06/1962 8C w/e 22/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42389 4w/e 20/04/1957 5C Stafford w/e 23/06/1962 8C w/e 23/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48045 w/e 05/05/1962 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/07/1962 8C w/e 16/03/1963 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48046 w/e 08/07/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/07/1962 8C w/e 28/03/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48500 w/e 19/05/1962 6B Mold Junction w/e 21/07/1962 8C w/e 14/03/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44750 w/e 04/08/1962 5D Stoke w/e 18/08/1962 8C m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45069 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 15/09/1962 8C w/e 16/02/1963 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45329 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 15/09/1962 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45332 w/e 23/06/1962 6A Chester (MR) w/e 15/09/1962 8C w/e 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4146       on 19/09/1962 (New) 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4147       on 25/09/1962 (New) 8C w/e 10/06/1967 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4148       on 25/09/1962 (New) 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45131 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 13/10/1962 8C w/e 20/04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45181 w/e 23/06/1962 6J Holyhead w/e 13/10/1962 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45412 w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor w/e 13/10/1962 8C w/e 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45413 w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor w/e 13/10/1962 8C w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45441 4w/e 10/08/1957 6J Holyhead w/e 13/10/1962 8C w/e 04/02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4152       on 02/11/1962 (New) 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4153       on 13/11/1962 (New) 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42121 4w/e 28/11/1953 8A Edge Hill w/e 01/12/1962 8C w/e 20/06/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3370 w/e 25/08/1962 6A Chester (MR) w/e 22/12/1962 8C w/e 27/04/1963 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2393 on 03/07/1961 8A Edge Hill (New) w/e 30/03/1963 8C w/e 31/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42491 4w/e 18/05/1957 24H Hellifield w/e 20/04/1963 8C on 28/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48425 w/e 23/06/1962 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/09/1963 8C w/e 11/01/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48469 w/e 01/09/1962 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/09/1963 8C w/e 19/10/1963 9M Bury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48702 w/e 01/09/1962 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/09/1963 8C w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45181 w/e 13/07/1963 24L Carnforth w/e 14/09/1963 8C w/e 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45329 w/e 13/07/1963 24L Carnforth w/e 14/09/1963 8C w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45057 w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/10/1963 8C w/e 12/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45103 w/e 13/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/10/1963 8C w/e 11/01/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45388 w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/10/1963 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2389 on 26/04/1961 9G Gorton (New) w/e 12/10/1963 8C w/e 06/08/1966 9A Longsight
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2390 on 16/05/1961 9G Gorton (New) w/e 12/10/1963 8C w/e 06/08/1966 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45188 w/e 17/08/1963 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/10/1963 8C w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44738       w/e 09/11/1963 8C w/e 06/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44739       w/e 09/11/1963 8C w/e 23/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45571 on 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central w/e 16/11/1963 8C on 16/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45663 w/e 14/09/1963 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/11/1963 8C w/e 18/07/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45664 w/e 14/09/1963 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/11/1963 8C w/e 18/07/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3858 on 31/10/1959 27E Walton on the Hill (New) w/e 14/12/1963 8C w/e 04/09/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42455 w/e 20/06/1959 24E Blackpool Central w/e 21/12/1963 8C w/e 20/06/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48218 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 14/03/1964 8C w/e 10/10/1964 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44725       w/e 14/03/1964 8C w/e 14/10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45466 4w/e 09/08/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/03/1964 8C w/e 20/06/1964 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45201 4w/e 22/02/1958 24E Blackpool Central w/e 21/03/1964 8C m/e 05/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2372 on 26/07/1961 8D Widnes (New) w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 31/12/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2394 on 21/07/1961 8D Widnes (New) w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 06/08/1966 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3793 on 31/10/1959 8D Widnes (New) w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3794 on 07/11/1959 8D Widnes (New) w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48129 w/e 19/05/1962 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48296 w/e 08/10/1960 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48308 w/e 15/11/1958 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 13/04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48709 w/e 15/11/1958 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 15/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46410 w/e 16/11/1963 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 19/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46423 w/e 25/05/1963 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 16/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46424 w/e 25/05/1963 8D Widnes w/e 18/04/1964 8C w/e 10/07/1965 12D Workington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45197 w/e 06/07/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 02/05/1964 8C w/e 11/07/1964 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45417 w/e 25/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 02/05/1964 8C w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48774 4w/e 30/11/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/05/1964 8C w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92054 w/e 08/12/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 13/06/1964 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92115 on 31/12/1956 18B Westhouses (New) w/e 13/06/1964 8C w/e 19/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92158 w/e 21/09/1963 16G Westhouses w/e 13/06/1964 8C w/e 23/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45034 w/e 20/06/1964 10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/07/1964 8C w/e 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3367 w/e 25/07/1959 5B Crewe South w/e 18/07/1964 8C w/e 20/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12010 4w/e 04/12/1954 5B Crewe South w/e 18/07/1964 8C w/e 28/11/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48026 w/e 25/04/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/09/1964 8C w/e 10/10/1964 9J Agecroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48297 w/e 22/02/1964 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 19/09/1964 8C w/e 10/10/1964 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44732       w/e 19/09/1964 8C w/e 28/05/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44950 on 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central w/e 19/09/1964 8C w/e 20/04/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92020 w/e 02/11/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 23/01/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92084 w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 23/01/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92089 w/e 09/02/1963 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 23/01/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92111 w/e 23/11/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 23/01/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48536 w/e 18/07/1964 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 10/10/1964 9J Agecroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48682 3w/e 14/01/1950 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 26/09/1964 8C w/e 10/10/1964 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92117 w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering w/e 10/10/1964 8C w/e 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92127 w/e 02/05/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 10/10/1964 8C w/e 23/01/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48029 w/e 07/09/1963 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 24/10/1964 8C w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48509 w/e 07/09/1963 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 24/10/1964 8C w/e 13/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92025 w/e 18/04/1964 16B Annesley w/e 07/11/1964 8C w/e 25/02/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92027 w/e 18/04/1964 16B Annesley w/e 07/11/1964 8C w/e 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46440 w/e 23/05/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1964 8C w/e 18/06/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46503 w/e 08/08/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1964 8C w/e 19/11/1966 8E Northwich
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44743 w/e 17/03/1962 27C Southport w/e 14/11/1964 8C w/e 08/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44753 w/e 30/11/1963 8M Southport w/e 14/11/1964 8C w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008 w/e 02/05/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 05/12/1964 8C w/e 12/08/1967 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92104 w/e 07/04/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 05/12/1964 8C w/e 15/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92131 w/e 30/01/1960 18B Westhouses w/e 05/12/1964 8C w/e 15/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3836 on 02/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) w/e 09/01/1965 8C w/e 29/01/1966 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3837 on 02/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) w/e 09/01/1965 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46515 on 06/01/1953 89A Oswestry (New) w/e 23/01/1965 8C w/e 28/05/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46516 4w/e 31/10/1959 89A Oswestry w/e 23/01/1965 8C w/e 19/11/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46518 w/e 29/06/1963 89D Oswestry w/e 23/01/1965 8C w/e 19/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45338 w/e 08/02/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 13/02/1965 8C w/e 15/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45466 w/e 20/06/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 13/02/1965 8C w/e 25/02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48189 w/e 25/04/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48425 w/e 11/01/1964 8A Edge Hill w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 12/03/1966 9K Bolton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48457 on 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South w/e 06/03/1965 8C m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48476 w/e 10/06/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 06/01/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44877 w/e 26/05/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45154 w/e 18/07/1964 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45212 w/e 03/10/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 06/03/1965 8C w/e 26/06/1965 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44806 w/e 12/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 13/03/1965 8C w/e 20/04/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45059 w/e 22/09/1962 17B Burton w/e 13/03/1965 8C w/e 08/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45407 w/e 07/04/1962 17B Burton w/e 13/03/1965 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48029 w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/06/1965 8C      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48163 w/e 03/04/1965 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/06/1965 8C w/e 17/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48296 w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/06/1965 8C w/e 17/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92153 w/e 12/10/1963 16G Westhouses w/e 26/06/1965 8C on 30/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12010 w/e 28/11/1964 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 03/07/1965 8C on 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48408 w/e 16/09/1961 1E Bletchley w/e 10/07/1965 8C w/e 18/09/1965 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48493 w/e 17/08/1963 1E Bletchley w/e 10/07/1965 8C w/e 03/02/1968 8E Northwich
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92154 w/e 03/07/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 24/07/1965 8C w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48251 w/e 07/03/1964 5B Crewe South w/e 24/07/1965 8C w/e 28/08/1965 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48292 w/e 01/07/1961 5B Crewe South w/e 24/07/1965 8C w/e 12/03/1966 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48398 w/e 07/03/1964 5B Crewe South w/e 24/07/1965 8C w/e 18/09/1965 8E Northwich
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92091 4w/e 16/03/1957 38B Annesley w/e 31/07/1965 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44678 w/e 29/05/1965 5B Crewe South w/e 21/08/1965 8C w/e 22/01/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44679 w/e 29/05/1965 5B Crewe South w/e 21/08/1965 8C w/e 22/01/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48305 w/e 24/07/1965 8E Northwich w/e 18/09/1965 8C w/e 13/01/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48374 w/e 10/07/1965 8E Northwich w/e 18/09/1965 8C w/e 23/09/1967 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3578 on 22/09/1958 8A Edge Hill (New) w/e 29/01/1966 8C w/e 28/05/1966 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2551 4w/e 25/08/1956 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 05/02/1966 8C on 06/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2552 3w/e 16/06/1956 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 05/02/1966 8C on 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2553 w/e 23/06/1962 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 05/02/1966 8C on 06/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2555 w/e 23/06/1962 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 05/02/1966 8C on 13/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2564 w/e 23/06/1962 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 05/02/1966 8C on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92022 w/e 27/06/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 05/02/1966 8C w/e 25/02/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92050 w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 05/02/1966 8C w/e 12/08/1967 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45223 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 05/02/1966 8C w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48010 w/e 19/06/1965 1A Willesden w/e 12/03/1966 8C w/e 23/04/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48203 w/e 02/10/1965 2F Bescot w/e 12/03/1966 8C w/e 23/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48335 4w/e 20/05/1950 91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/03/1966 8C w/e 23/04/1966 9B Stockport Edgeley
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11172 w/e 04/09/1965 82C Swindon w/e 04/06/1966 8C 7w/e 19/06/1966 91M To London Midland Region
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92138 on 31/07/1957 21A Saltley (New) w/e 20/08/1966 8C w/e 08/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92155 on 30/11/1957 21A Saltley (New) w/e 20/08/1966 8C w/e 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92204 w/e 14/09/1963 2A Tyseley w/e 20/08/1966 8C w/e 09/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48412 w/e 23/07/1966 8L Aintree w/e 20/08/1966 8C w/e 31/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48648 w/e 17/04/1965 8L Aintree w/e 20/08/1966 8C w/e 22/07/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2556 w/e 12/02/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/09/1966 8C w/e 24/06/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2559 on 11/10/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 17/09/1966 8C w/e 24/06/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11166 on 15/06/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 17/09/1966 8C on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2567 w/e 07/03/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/09/1966 8C on 11/11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2571 w/e 15/09/1962 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 17/09/1966 8C on 20/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2573 w/e 15/09/1962 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 17/09/1966 8C on 13/01/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92228 on 31/07/1958 84C Banbury (New) w/e 15/10/1966 8C w/e 28/01/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2850 on 06/10/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2851 on 03/10/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2852 on 14/10/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2853 on 25/10/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2854 on 04/11/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2855 on 21/11/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2856 on 02/12/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2857 on 04/12/1960 27A Bank Hall (New) w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2858 w/e 20/07/1963 27A Bank Hall w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 06/01/1968 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2860 w/e 18/06/1966 8K Bank Hall w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2867 w/e 27/03/1965 10D Lostock Hall w/e 22/10/1966 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12038 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 12/11/1966 8C w/e 20/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12034 4w/e 09/08/1958 17A Derby w/e 10/12/1966 8C w/e 20/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92139 on 31/07/1957 21A Saltley (New) w/e 10/12/1966 8C w/e 12/08/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48060 w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 10/12/1966 8C w/e 20/04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45043 w/e 23/04/1966 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 8C w/e 25/11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12012 w/e 19/02/1966 2B Oxley w/e 28/01/1967 8C on 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45406 w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 28/01/1967 8C w/e 08/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48674 w/e 26/03/1966 2B Oxley w/e 04/02/1967 8C w/e 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48098 on 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/02/1967 8C w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48253 w/e 12/11/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 04/03/1967 8C w/e 06/01/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92218 w/e 15/10/1966 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 11/03/1967 8C w/e 12/08/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92227 w/e 15/10/1966 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 11/03/1967 8C w/e 04/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45031 w/e 22/06/1963 6A Chester (MR) w/e 18/03/1967 8C m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45056 w/e 10/04/1965 5B Crewe South w/e 18/03/1967 8C w/e 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45231 w/e 22/06/1963 6A Chester (MR) w/e 01/04/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10A Carnforth
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12005 w/e 16/01/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 29/04/1967 8C on 09/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12009 w/e 14/01/1967 1F Rugby w/e 29/04/1967 8C on 30/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12019 w/e 14/01/1967 1F Rugby w/e 29/04/1967 8C on 14/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12021 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B Crewe South w/e 29/04/1967 8C w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12025 w/e 22/11/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 29/04/1967 8C on 11/11/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 17/06/1967 8C w/e 12/08/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92119 w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 17/06/1967 8C w/e 12/08/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2126 w/e 27/05/1967 16C Derby w/e 29/07/1967 8C w/e 26/08/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2560 w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/08/1967 8C on 25/11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2562 w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/08/1967 8C on 20/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2566 7w/e 19/06/1966 91M To London Midland Region w/e 26/08/1967 8C on 06/01/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3546 4w/e 26/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 09/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3033 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3184 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 07/10/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3187 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3352 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3353 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3354 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 18/12/1971 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3359 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 15/12/1973 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3360 4w/e 31/08/1967 91M To London Midland Region w/e 16/09/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3109 w/e 08/10/1966 2A Tyseley w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12035 w/e 11/02/1961 21A Saltley w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7122 w/e 11/02/1961 21A Saltley w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12061 on 30/11/1949 21A Saltley (New) w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12094 w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92055 w/e 13/03/1965 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 07/10/1967 8C w/e 23/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3398 w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 21/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3399 w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 28/10/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3197 w/e 09/09/1967 16C Derby w/e 11/11/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92069 w/e 22/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/11/1967 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92094 w/e 22/05/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/11/1967 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92160 w/e 19/02/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/11/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92165 w/e 09/02/1963 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/11/1967 8C w/e 16/03/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2198 w/e 01/10/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 25/11/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2396 w/e 11/03/1967 2F Bescot w/e 09/12/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48153 w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/12/1967 8C w/e 16/03/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48206 w/e 24/06/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/12/1967 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 w/e 21/08/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/12/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2300 w/e 17/06/1961 40E Colwick w/e 16/12/1967 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2117 w/e 24/06/1967 12D Workington w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2209 w/e 20/05/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2221 w/e 25/11/1967 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2253 w/e 29/04/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2274 w/e 22/04/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12034 w/e 20/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92218 w/e 12/08/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92233 w/e 27/06/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92249 w/e 27/06/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968 8C w/e 04/05/1968 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48493 w/e 03/02/1968 8E Northwich w/e 09/03/1968 8C w/e 11/05/1968 10F Rose Grove