Depot: Sowerby Bridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Sowerby Bridge | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12605 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25E | ||||||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50835 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 07/08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 10891 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24C | Lostock Hall | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 04/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 10925 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 09/08/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50934 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 14/08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50943 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 18/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11381 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51482 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4038 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4042 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12099 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12575 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12376 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 30/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12587 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12616 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 30/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7509 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | on | 09/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9507 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9528 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9568 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9569 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9606 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9628 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50711 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9540 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | on | 19/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9582 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42149 | on | 07/05/1948 (New) | 25E | on | 25/02/1962 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42384 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 25E | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 25E | on | 25/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49617 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 25E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | Rebuilt Compound | 2-8-0 | 9614 | m/e | 12/1928 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/05/1949 (R) | 25E | |||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 10909 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | w/e | 17/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52400 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25E | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | Rebuilt Compound | 2-8-0 | 9603 | m/e | 12/1928 | Withdrawn | w/e | 12/11/1949 (R) | 25E | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9648 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 25E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51348 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 25E | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51348 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 25E | w/e | 05/09/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52217 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25E | on | 12/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49624 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25E | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50893 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 25E | w/e | 29/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50953 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 25E | w/e | 08/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42639 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25E | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51488 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10765 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 25E | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90321 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 25E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90531 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 25E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90593 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 25E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90406 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90724 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90277 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90385 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90707 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 25E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90728 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | w/e | 02/09/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | w/e | 02/09/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 25E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90726 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 25E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49662 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49663 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49662 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49663 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | on | 28/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50898 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | w/e | 23/02/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50712 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25E | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50892 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49650 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49657 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49661 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49673 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49674 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49650 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | on | 26/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49657 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | on | 16/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49661 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | on | 19/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49673 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | on | 24/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49674 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52592 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50715 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52592 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52408 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | w/e | 31/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50715 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10887 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10887 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 25E | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52154 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49620 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52255 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49602 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52154 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52255 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52351 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49602 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | on | 27/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49620 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77484 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50892 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77484 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50892 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25E | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90354 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50715 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50715 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 25E | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50778 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 25E | w/e | 07/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52558 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25E | on | 26/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52355 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90181 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90308 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50715 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 25E | w/e | 05/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50752 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 25E | on | 12/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90316 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 25E | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90581 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49511 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25E | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52408 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25E | w/e | 27/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52410 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25E | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49624 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49554 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 25E | on | 27/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52351 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25E | on | 15/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50818 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25E | on | 03/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50777 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 25E | on | 03/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52399 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 25E | m/e | 03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 25E | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49552 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 25E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52452 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 25E | on | 23/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49592 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 25E | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52576 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 25E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47266 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47299 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25E | on | 25/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47379 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25E | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90412 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90329 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90310 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25E | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 56F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52411 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25A | Wakefield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25E | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90360 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25E | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90122 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47249 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42094 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56E | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90113 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41251 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41252 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56E | on | 17/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42311 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25C | Goole | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42380 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20E | Manningham | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40190 | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56E | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40190 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 56E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90470 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42083 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 56E | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42380 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 56E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46438 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56E | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46483 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56E | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90233 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90281 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56E | on | 11/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52133 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 56E | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52355 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 56E | m/e | 02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 56F | Low Moor | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90692 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56E | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42094 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 56E | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47379 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 56E | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52515 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56E | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52121 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56E | on | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52413 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56E | on | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52461 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 56E | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44055 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 56E | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44094 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 56E | on | 03/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44153 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 56E | w/e | 29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43968 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 56E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44039 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 56E | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |