Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southport


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Southport Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2230       05/06/1946 (New) 23C 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2231       05/06/1946 (New) 23C 01/01/1948 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2232       12/06/1946 (New) 23C 01/01/1948 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2347       4w/e 22/06/1946 23C 01/01/1948 5C Stafford
Steam 28 0-6-0 12588       4w/e 22/06/1946 23C 01/01/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 6 2-4-2T 10893       4w/e 22/06/1946 23C 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 6 2-4-2T 10950       4w/e 22/06/1946 23C 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4056       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 27/03/1965 55D Royston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4062       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 31/12/1950 25D Mirfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4471       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 25/02/1956 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4474       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 02/12/1950 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1085       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 04/10/1952 27C Southport
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1193 4w/e 22/06/1946 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 16/06/1951 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1196 4w/e 22/06/1946 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 01/01/1948 23C 3w/e 11/12/1948 17A Derby
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 11490       01/01/1948 23C m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12161       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 28/12/1957 99H Horwich Works
Steam 27 0-6-0 12197       01/01/1948 23C m/e 09/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 52256       01/01/1948 23C 21/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12271       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 04/11/1950 26D Bury
Steam 27 0-6-0 12272       01/01/1948 23C 5w/e 03/01/1953 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 27 0-6-0 12381       01/01/1948 23C m/e 02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12400       01/01/1948 23C m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12523       01/01/1948 23C 5w/e 24/12/1949 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10678       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 04/11/1950 10B Preston
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10687 4w/e 22/06/1946 24D Lower Darwen 01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 04/11/1950 7D Rhyl
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50696       01/01/1948 23C m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50728       01/01/1948 23C 07/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50743       01/01/1948 23C m/e 06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10746       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 08/09/1951 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10752       01/01/1948 23C 3w/e 14/01/1950 24F Fleetwood
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10778       01/01/1948 23C m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50849       01/01/1948 23C m/e 02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2291       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2292       01/01/1948 23C 16/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2293       01/01/1948 23C w/e 06/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2294       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 22/03/1952 24A Accrington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4887       01/01/1948 23C w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4926       01/01/1948 23C 8w/e 14/06/1952 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4989       01/01/1948 23C w/e 25/05/1963 17B Burton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5061       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 24/03/1951 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5200       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 24/03/1951 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5334       01/01/1948 23C 4w/e 16/06/1951 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5415       01/01/1948 23C 8w/e 14/06/1952 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5435       01/01/1948 23C 8w/e 14/06/1952 25X  
Steam 27 0-6-0 12278 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 3w/e 11/12/1948 23C 8w/e 29/11/1952 27B Aintree
Steam 28 0-6-0 52582 01/01/1948 23B Aintree 5w/e 24/12/1949 23C m/e 06/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40196 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 3w/e 14/01/1950 23C w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40197 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 3w/e 14/01/1950 23C w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41102 01/01/1948 24A Accrington 2w/e 17/06/1950 27C 4w/e 07/10/1950 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 2w/e 17/06/1950 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 24/03/1951 27C 4w/e 19/05/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45061 4w/e 24/03/1951 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1951 27C 4w/e 16/06/1951 28A Blackpool Central
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45200 4w/e 24/03/1951 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1951 27C 4w/e 19/04/1952 24A Accrington
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40937 4w/e 09/09/1950 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 16/06/1951 27C 4w/e 06/10/1951 26C Bolton
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41186 4w/e 16/06/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C 8w/e 29/11/1952 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41189 4w/e 16/06/1951 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C 5w/e 21/06/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41194 4w/e 09/09/1950 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C 4w/e 04/10/1952 21B Bournville
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50640 01/01/1948 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C m/e 04/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46435 2w/e 14/01/1950 24E Blackpool Central (New) 4w/e 17/07/1951 27C 4w/e 08/09/1951 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50806 4w/e 07/10/1950 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 06/10/1951 27C m/e 02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75015       12/1951 (New) 27C w/e 14/12/1963 8L Aintree
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75016       01/1952 (New) 27C w/e 25/05/1963 2B Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75017       01/1952 (New) 27C w/e 14/12/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75018       03/1952 (New) 27C w/e 25/05/1963 2B Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75019       03/1952 (New) 27C w/e 14/12/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41102 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 22/03/1952 27C 8w/e 29/11/1952 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50777 4w/e 06/10/1951 28A Blackpool Central 8w/e 14/06/1952 27C 4w/e 24/04/1954 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50777       8w/e 14/06/1952 27C 4w/e 24/04/1954 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41085 01/01/1948 23C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952 27C 8w/e 29/11/1952 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41187 4w/e 17/07/1951 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/10/1952 27C 8w/e 29/11/1952 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45415 8w/e 14/06/1952 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 04/10/1952 27C 8w/e 11/07/1953 10C Patricroft
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50721 01/01/1948 24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 29/11/1952 27C 4w/e 10/08/1957 27A Bank Hall
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50721       8w/e 29/11/1952 27C 4w/e 10/08/1957 27A Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45078 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction 8w/e 29/11/1952 27C 8w/e 11/07/1953 27C Southport
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41102 8w/e 29/11/1952 27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 11/07/1953 27C 4w/e 31/10/1953 27B Aintree
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41193 4w/e 06/10/1951 27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 11/07/1953 27C 4w/e 31/10/1953 27A Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45078 8w/e 29/11/1952 27C Southport 8w/e 11/07/1953 27C 8w/e 19/06/1954 24A Accrington
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 51425 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 05/09/1953 27C 4w/e 23/04/1955 27A Bank Hall
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50781 4w/e 07/10/1950 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 31/10/1953 27C 4w/e 30/11/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50781       4w/e 31/10/1953 27C 4w/e 30/11/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 4w/e 24/04/1954 25F Low Moor 8w/e 19/06/1954 27C 4w/e 01/01/1955 25G Farnley Junction
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41186 4w/e 24/04/1954 25F Low Moor 8w/e 19/06/1954 27C 4w/e 16/06/1957 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41187 4w/e 24/04/1954 25F Low Moor 8w/e 19/06/1954 27C 4w/e 19/05/1956 27A Bank Hall
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41189 4w/e 24/04/1954 25F Low Moor 8w/e 19/06/1954 27C 4w/e 09/10/1954 27A Bank Hall
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50712 8w/e 11/07/1953 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C 4w/e 10/08/1957 27A Bank Hall
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50712 8w/e 11/07/1953 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C 4w/e 10/08/1957 27A Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45061 8w/e 11/07/1953 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45077 4w/e 12/07/1952 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/10/1954 27C 8w/e 16/07/1955 24E Blackpool Central
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50746 4w/e 08/09/1951 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 04/12/1954 27C m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50746       4w/e 04/12/1954 27C m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42537 01/01/1948 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 26/03/1955 27C w/e 22/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84014 4w/e 29/01/1955 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 23/04/1955 27C 4w/e 03/12/1955 26E Lees (Oldham)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 4w/e 01/01/1955 25G Farnley Junction 8w/e 16/07/1955 27C 4w/e 19/05/1956 27A Bank Hall
Steam 27 0-6-0 52123 4w/e 21/02/1953 26C Bolton 8w/e 16/07/1955 27C m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45228 8w/e 16/07/1955 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 08/10/1955 27C w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40090 4w/e 08/09/1951 20E Manningham 4w/e 03/12/1955 27C w/e 18/06/1960 27C Southport
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45218 4w/e 26/03/1955 25A Wakefield m/e 16/06/1956 27C w/e 12/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41101 4w/e 19/05/1956 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 10/08/1957 27C 4w/e 30/11/1957 24E Blackpool Central
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41189 4w/e 05/11/1955 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 10/08/1957 27C 8w/e 05/10/1957 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42290 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 10/08/1957 27C w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42435 4w/e 30/11/1957 5D Stoke 4w/e 28/12/1957 27C w/e 14/11/1964 9H Patricroft
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42475 4w/e 30/11/1957 5D Stoke 4w/e 28/12/1957 27C w/e 25/10/1958 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42621 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 12/07/1958 27C w/e 26/09/1959 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75029 4w/e 01/01/1955 81F Oxford w/e 18/10/1958 27C 4w/e 24/01/1959 81F Oxford
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40178 4w/e 09/08/1952 20E Manningham w/e 07/02/1959 27C w/e 14/02/1959 55F Manningham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40178 w/e 14/02/1959 99H Horwich Works w/e 28/02/1959 27C 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42451 4w/e 06/09/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 20/06/1959 27C w/e 19/01/1963 9G Gorton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42063 4w/e 06/10/1956 26A Newton Heath w/e 20/06/1959 27C w/e 16/02/1963 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42367 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden w/e 08/08/1959 27C w/e 26/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42422 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden w/e 08/08/1959 27C w/e 19/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42366 4w/e 19/04/1958 1A Willesden w/e 15/08/1959 27C w/e 19/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42368 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden w/e 15/08/1959 27C w/e 12/09/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40145 4w/e 26/12/1953 86G Pontypool Road w/e 29/08/1959 27C w/e 22/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50850 4w/e 11/08/1951 26C Bolton w/e 13/06/1960 27C m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50850       w/e 13/06/1960 27C m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40090 4w/e 03/12/1955 27C Southport w/e 18/06/1960 27C w/e 08/07/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42662 w/e 30/04/1960 24A Accrington w/e 18/06/1960 27C 12/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42645 w/e 25/06/1960 26B Agecroft w/e 02/07/1960 27C 11/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40586 4w/e 10/08/1957 24G Skipton w/e 23/07/1960 27C w/e 29/10/1960 27A Bank Hall
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41277 w/e 14/02/1959 17B Burton w/e 31/12/1960 27C w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41328 w/e 14/02/1959 17B Burton w/e 31/12/1960 27C w/e 16/09/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45105 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath w/e 28/01/1961 27C w/e 26/01/1963 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42551 w/e 08/08/1959 24D Lower Darwen w/e 15/04/1961 27C 12/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42485 w/e 15/04/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 17/06/1961 27C 08/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42132 4w/e 24/03/1956 20G Hellifield w/e 17/06/1961 27C w/e 11/06/1966 8K Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44689 w/e 04/03/1961 24B Rose Grove w/e 17/06/1961 27C w/e 18/05/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44692 w/e 04/03/1961 24B Rose Grove w/e 17/06/1961 27C w/e 17/03/1962 27B Aintree
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40090 w/e 08/07/1961 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/12/1961 27C w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40191 w/e 25/11/1961 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 02/12/1961 27C w/e 22/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44742 w/e 06/01/1962 27A Bank Hall w/e 17/03/1962 27C m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44743 4w/e 14/06/1958 27A Bank Hall w/e 17/03/1962 27C w/e 14/11/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44744 4w/e 14/06/1958 27A Bank Hall w/e 17/03/1962 27C w/e 18/05/1963 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44745 4w/e 14/06/1958 27A Bank Hall w/e 17/03/1962 27C 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44767 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 17/03/1962 27C w/e 14/11/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42061 w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor w/e 22/12/1962 27C 25/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84012 w/e 25/03/1961 24F Fleetwood w/e 16/02/1963 27C 12/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44809 w/e 23/02/1963 9A Longsight w/e 18/05/1963 27C w/e 24/07/1965 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45083 w/e 04/08/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 18/05/1963 27C w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75032 w/e 23/06/1962 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 25/05/1963 27C w/e 20/07/1963 27A Bank Hall
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 w/e 22/09/1962 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 25/05/1963 27C w/e 20/07/1963 27A Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44816 w/e 22/09/1962 17B Burton w/e 25/05/1963 27C w/e 20/06/1964 8K Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45375 w/e 22/06/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1963 27C w/e 13/02/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45017 w/e 02/05/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/07/1963 27C w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45055 w/e 15/09/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/07/1963 27C 4w/e 23/04/1966 51C West Hartlepool
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42682 w/e 21/05/1960 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 27C 25/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45135 4w/e 28/11/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/08/1963 27C w/e 14/11/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45109 w/e 27/07/1963 26A Newton Heath w/e 24/08/1963 27C w/e 12/10/1963 8K Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45337 01/01/1948 26B Agecroft w/e 24/08/1963 27C w/e 14/11/1964 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44686 w/e 14/05/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 14/09/1963 8M m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44687 w/e 08/10/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 14/09/1963 8M m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84017 8w/e 19/06/1954 24F Fleetwood w/e 26/10/1963 8M w/e 20/06/1964 9K Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44753 w/e 09/11/1963 10H Lower Darwen w/e 30/11/1963 8M w/e 14/11/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44756 w/e 09/11/1963 10H Lower Darwen w/e 30/11/1963 8M m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44757 w/e 09/11/1963 10H Lower Darwen w/e 30/11/1963 8M w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42369 w/e 13/10/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/03/1964 8M w/e 24/10/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42675 w/e 08/02/1964 8P Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 18/04/1964 8M 18/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41217 w/e 13/01/1962 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 20/06/1964 8M w/e 13/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41264 w/e 09/11/1963 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 20/06/1964 8M w/e 13/02/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42078 w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction w/e 20/06/1964 8M w/e 11/06/1966 8K Bank Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44809 w/e 07/08/1965 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/09/1965 8M w/e 18/06/1966 8K Bank Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42665 w/e 21/08/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/10/1965 8M w/e 11/06/1966 12E Tebay
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 w/e 21/08/1965 12C Barrow in Furness w/e 27/11/1965 8M w/e 18/06/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)