Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 972 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6948 Week
» 13082 Month
» 240966 Year
» 1462531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Slough


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Slough Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4270       4w/e 03/11/1945 141 4w/e 01/12/1945 76 Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5229       4w/e 03/11/1945 141 4w/e 01/12/1945 76 Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4617       4w/e 29/12/1945 SLO 4w/e 20/05/1950 84K Chester West
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7791       4w/e 29/12/1945 SLO 4w/e 20/04/1946 PDN Old Oak Common
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7252       4w/e 18/05/1946 SLO 4w/e 30/10/1948 NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7228       4w/e 18/05/1946 SLO 4w/e 30/10/1948 LLY Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7214       4w/e 18/05/1946 SLO 4w/e 17/05/1958 86J Aberdare
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT 2076       4w/e 31/12/1949 SLO m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9424       31/08/1950 (New) 81B 4w/e 10/09/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3697       4w/e 30/11/1950 81B 4w/e 24/03/1962 81E Didcot
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3715       4w/e 30/11/1950 81B 4w/e 31/03/1951 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1448       4w/e 30/11/1950 81B m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9722 8w/e 23/03/1946 RDG Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 30/11/1950 81B m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1450       4w/e 30/04/1951 81B 4w/e 05/09/1959 81F Oxford
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9406       3w/e 19/05/1951 81B 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C Southall
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6132       m/e 31/07/1951 81B 4w/e 03/12/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6153 4w/e 31/01/1951 82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 31/07/1951 81B 8w/e 26/03/1955 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3740       3w/e 17/05/1952 81B 4w/e 24/03/1956 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4638       3w/e 17/05/1952 81B 4w/e 28/09/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4680       4w/e 08/08/1953 81B 4w/e 10/08/1957 85A Worcester
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6664 4w/e 03/10/1953 81C Southall 4w/e 24/04/1954 81B 4w/e 06/09/1958 81F Oxford
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1411 4w/e 21/10/1950 34E Neasden 4w/e 17/07/1954 81B m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5755       4w/e 25/02/1956 81B m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5766       4w/e 25/02/1956 81B m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6115 4w/e 16/07/1955 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/10/1956 81B 4w/e 25/02/1961 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6122       4w/e 06/10/1956 81B 4w/e 16/05/1959 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1465       4w/e 03/11/1956 81B 4w/e 01/12/1956 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6109 m/e 16/06/1956 81C Southall 4w/e 23/02/1957 81B 4w/e 16/07/1960 81E Didcot
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6126 4w/e 27/12/1952 81D Reading (W.R.) 8w/e 20/04/1957 81B 4w/e 31/12/1960 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6160 4w/e 13/07/1957 84E Tyseley 4w/e 07/09/1957 81B 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C Southall
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6117 3w/e 17/05/1952 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1958 81B 4w/e 22/02/1964 81C Southall
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6123 4w/e 13/08/1955 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1958 81B 4w/e 18/06/1960 81E Didcot
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3608       4w/e 06/09/1958 81B 4w/e 28/09/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9463 4w/e 30/04/1952 83G Penzance 4w/e 29/11/1958 81B 4w/e 08/08/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4606 4w/e 30/11/1950 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 21/02/1959 81B 4w/e 21/04/1962 81E Didcot
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5153       4w/e 21/02/1959 81B 4w/e 21/03/1959 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1447 4w/e 16/05/1959 89A Oswestry 4w/e 05/09/1959 81B 4w/e 20/05/1961 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6655 4w/e 14/06/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1959 81B 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C Barry
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5410       4w/e 28/11/1959 81B 4w/e 26/12/1959 82D Westbury
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1444 4w/e 03/10/1959 81F Oxford 4w/e 26/03/1960 81B 4w/e 18/06/1960 81F Oxford
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1453 4w/e 26/01/1946 SDN Swindon w/e 05/04/1960 81B 4w/e 23/04/1960 81B Slough
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1453 w/e 05/04/1960 81B Slough 4w/e 23/04/1960 81B 4w/e 02/12/1961 84C Banbury
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3756 05/10/1959 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 21/05/1960 81B 4w/e 16/07/1960 81C Southall
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6410 4w/e 03/10/1959 83D Laira 4w/e 16/07/1960 81B 13/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8770       4w/e 13/08/1960 81B 4w/e 25/03/1961 81C Southall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4010       31/12/1960 (New) 81B 4w/e 25/02/1961 83E St Blazey
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1474 4w/e 21/05/1960 81C Southall 4w/e 28/01/1961 81B 4w/e 17/06/1961 81C Southall
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1445 4w/e 09/09/1961 84C Banbury 4w/e 07/10/1961 81B 4w/e 28/12/1963 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9422 4w/e 29/11/1958 81C Southall 4w/e 02/12/1961 81B 4w/e 28/09/1963 81C Southall
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6128 4w/e 13/08/1960 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 24/03/1962 81B 3w/e 04/05/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8486 7w/e 31/08/1952 83F Truro 4w/e 24/03/1962 81B 5w/e 31/08/1963 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9495 4w/e 02/12/1961 81C Southall 4w/e 19/05/1962 81B 4w/e 14/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1474 4w/e 17/06/1961 81C Southall 4w/e 16/06/1962 81B 5w/e 31/08/1963 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1622 4w/e 21/03/1953 87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/07/1962 81B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3665 4w/e 12/08/1961 81E Didcot 4w/e 14/07/1962 81B 4w/e 09/02/1963 81C Southall
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1654 4w/e 11/08/1962 81C Southall 4w/e 09/02/1963 81B m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn