Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 360 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1609 Week
» 22051 Month
» 358897 Year
» 1580462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Skipton


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Skipton Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1534 m/e 04/1892 21C Cornbrook Junction m/e 01/1899 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1535 m/e 04/1892 21C Cornbrook Junction m/e 01/1899 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1536 m/e 04/1892 21C Cornbrook Junction m/e 01/1899 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1537 m/e 04/1892 21C Cornbrook Junction m/e 01/1899 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2611       m/e 06/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2612       m/e 06/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2613       m/e 06/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2614       m/e 06/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2615       m/e 06/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2616       m/e 07/1900 (New) 30 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1534 m/e 01/1899 30 Skipton m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1535 m/e 01/1899 30 Skipton m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1536 m/e 01/1899 30 Skipton m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1537 m/e 01/1899 30 Skipton m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2611 m/e 06/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2612 m/e 06/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2613 m/e 06/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2614 m/e 06/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 20 Buxton (MR)
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2615 m/e 06/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2616 m/e 07/1900 30 Skipton (New) m/e 12/1902 30 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1270 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1271 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1412 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1413 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1415 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1416 m/e 12/1902 30 Skipton m/e 05/1908 30 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1270 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1271 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1412 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1413 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1414 m/e 05/1908 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1415 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1416 m/e 05/1908 30 Skipton m/e 04/1914 30 m/e 12/1921 LTS London, Tilbury and Southend Railway
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1266 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 4w/e 17/05/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1270 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 4w/e 12/07/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1271 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 4w/e 06/11/1927 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1412 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1413 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1414 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1415 m/e 04/1914 30 Skipton m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1417 m/e 04/1914 32 Lancaster Green Ayre m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1430 m/e 04/1914 5 Brecon m/e 12/1921 30 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1235   12/1921 18 Nottingham   03/1930 30   09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1263 m/e 12/1921 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 29 Manningham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1266 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1412 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 4w/e 28/11/1931 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1413 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1414 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1415 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1417 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1430 m/e 12/1921 30 Skipton m/e 03/1930 30 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1235   03/1930 30 Skipton   09/1933 30 4w/e 23/02/1935 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1253 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20F Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1269 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 4w/e 18/05/1935 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1275 m/e 03/1930 W9 Ryecroft (Walsall) m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20F Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1277 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20F Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1298 m/e 03/1930 29 Manningham m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 22E Highbridge
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1366 m/e 03/1930 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20F Skipton
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1411 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 21A Saltley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1413 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20E Manningham
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1414 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 4w/e 01/12/1934 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1415 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 4w/e 23/02/1935 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1417 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 4w/e 30/12/1939 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1430 m/e 03/1930 30 Skipton m/e 09/1933 30 m/e 11/1945 20G Hellifield
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1253 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton m/e 11/1945 20F 4w/e 07/09/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1275 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton m/e 11/1945 20F 4w/e 22/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1277 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton m/e 11/1945 20F 4w/e 18/05/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1366 m/e 09/1933 30 Skipton m/e 11/1945 20F 4w/e 25/02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1781       4w/e 22/06/1946 20F on 01/01/1948 20F Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3893       on 01/01/1948 20F on 22/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3904       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 02/12/1950 23C Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3944       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 21/05/1955 20E Manningham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3960       on 01/01/1948 20F on 14/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3984       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 19/05/1951 23C Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3999       on 01/01/1948 20F on 22/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4000       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4007       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 11/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4041       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 06/04/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4197       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 19/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4222       on 01/01/1948 20F 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E To Eastern Region
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4276       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 22/06/1963 24G Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4277       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 22/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4299       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 23/03/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1748       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 22/03/1952 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1767       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 08/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1781 4w/e 22/06/1946 20F Skipton on 01/01/1948 20F m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1805       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 21/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1820       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 02/08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 323       on 01/01/1948 20F m/e 09/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 406       on 01/01/1948 20F m/e 01/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 409       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 16/05/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2P 4-4-0 414       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 11/08/1956 17B Burton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 422       on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 17/10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 452       on 01/01/1948 20F 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 2P 4-4-0 484       on 01/01/1948 20F 8w/e 11/07/1953 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8081 m/e 01/1937 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) (New) on 01/01/1948 20F w/e 23/05/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8317       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 23/03/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3784       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 27/03/1954 20E Manningham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3251       on 01/01/1948 20F 2w/e 17/06/1950 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3295       on 01/01/1948 20F 4w/e 12/07/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3337       on 01/01/1948 20F on 20/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10623       on 01/01/1948 20F 5w/e 24/12/1949 20E Manningham
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10671       on 01/01/1948 20F 5w/e 24/12/1949 20E Manningham
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10795       on 01/01/1948 20F on 16/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 326 on 01/01/1948 22D Templecombe (S&D) 3w/e 11/12/1948 20F 4w/e 16/06/1951 23B Hellifield
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58060 m/e 11/1945 17B Burton 2w/e 17/06/1950 23A 4w/e 09/09/1950 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58040 m/e 11/1945 15D Bedford 4w/e 07/10/1950 23A 4w/e 06/09/1952 20C Royston
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58090 m/e 11/1945 17A Derby 4w/e 02/12/1950 23A 4w/e 21/03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43112       on 29/03/1951 (New) 23A w/e 25/10/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43113       on 13/04/1951 (New) 23A w/e 25/10/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58075 m/e 11/1945 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 19/05/1951 23A 5w/e 03/01/1953 20G Hellifield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44570 on 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 16/06/1951 23A on 25/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58045 4w/e 19/05/1951 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 17/07/1951 23A 4w/e 03/11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48404 on 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952 20F 4w/e 23/02/1952 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41666 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 23/02/1952 20F m/e 06/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41325       m/e 03/1952 (New) 20F 4w/e 15/06/1957 55F Manningham
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41326       m/e 04/1952 (New) 20F 4w/e 15/06/1957 55F Manningham
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41327       m/e 04/1952 (New) 20F w/e 16/09/1961 75A Brighton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43257 on 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 8w/e 14/06/1952 20F 4w/e 12/07/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47454 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1952 20F w/e 26/09/1964 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43916 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 04/10/1952 20F on 23/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44431 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1952 20F w/e 09/04/1960 24H Hellifield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47428 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 8w/e 11/07/1953 20F w/e 15/09/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46452       4w/e 03/10/1953 20F w/e 15/09/1962 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40472 on 01/01/1948 18C Hasland 4w/e 28/11/1953 20F w/e 10/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43178 on 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 30/01/1954 20F 4w/e 15/06/1957 55F Manningham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58066 4w/e 31/10/1953 20G Hellifield 4w/e 30/01/1954 20F 4w/e 24/04/1954 20C Royston
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41273 m/e 09/1950 20C Royston (New) 4w/e 24/04/1954 20F 4w/e 20/10/1956 55F  
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84009 on 03/09/1953 20C Royston (New) 4w/e 29/01/1955 20F 8w/e 16/07/1955 20C Royston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43992 4w/e 19/05/1951 17D Rowsley 4w/e 08/10/1955 20F on 09/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40409 8w/e 11/07/1953 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 08/10/1955 20F w/e 13/07/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41205 w/e 09/08/1947 20G Hellifield 4w/e 01/12/1956 20F 4w/e 18/05/1957 27A Bank Hall
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41280 4w/e 19/05/1956 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 18/05/1957 24G w/e 07/02/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41284 4w/e 01/12/1956 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 18/05/1957 24G w/e 07/02/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40586 4w/e 01/01/1955 26C Bolton 4w/e 10/08/1957 24G w/e 23/07/1960 27C Southport
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44105 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 8w/e 05/10/1957 24G w/e 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44119 4w/e 21/04/1956 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 05/10/1957 24G w/e 23/01/1960 24D Lower Darwen
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84015 4w/e 10/08/1957 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 09/08/1958 24G w/e 13/11/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76048 w/e 11/10/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 25/10/1958 24G w/e 30/05/1959 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76084 4w/e 04/10/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 25/10/1958 24G w/e 21/02/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44220 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 08/11/1958 24G w/e 04/05/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47238 w/e 28/02/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 11/04/1959 24G w/e 23/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44282 on 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield w/e 23/01/1960 24G w/e 15/09/1962 24H Hellifield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44579 on 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield w/e 23/01/1960 24G w/e 03/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44567 4w/e 21/02/1953 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 26/03/1960 24G w/e 15/09/1962 26D Bury
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46501 w/e 09/04/1960 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/06/1960 24G w/e 15/09/1962 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47577 4w/e 11/09/1954 24B Rose Grove w/e 09/07/1960 24G w/e 10/08/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84028 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh w/e 16/09/1961 24G w/e 13/11/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036 w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall w/e 15/09/1962 24G w/e 25/05/1963 5B Crewe South
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78037 w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall w/e 15/09/1962 24G w/e 21/03/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44061 w/e 05/11/1960 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 12/01/1963 24G w/e 06/04/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44125 w/e 29/04/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/01/1963 24G w/e 26/09/1964 10H Lower Darwen
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44061 w/e 06/04/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 27/04/1963 24G w/e 19/09/1964 12D Workington
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78055 w/e 17/11/1962 5B Crewe South w/e 25/05/1963 24G w/e 21/03/1964 8L Aintree
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44149 on 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield w/e 22/06/1963 24G w/e 07/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44276 on 01/01/1948 20F Skipton w/e 22/06/1963 24G w/e 22/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42492 w/e 22/06/1963 24C Lostock Hall w/e 14/09/1963 10G w/e 28/09/1963 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44041 w/e 06/04/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/11/1963 10G w/e 11/01/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44486 w/e 02/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/11/1963 10G w/e 25/01/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44222 w/e 09/04/1960 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 18/04/1964 10G w/e 24/10/1964 10H Lower Darwen
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44240 4w/e 11/08/1951 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 18/04/1964 10G w/e 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5202 w/e 04/01/1964 9A Longsight w/e 09/05/1964 10G w/e 01/08/1964 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47631 w/e 20/06/1964 10H Lower Darwen w/e 11/07/1964 10G w/e 26/09/1964 10F Rose Grove
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44263 w/e 25/04/1964 10H Lower Darwen w/e 26/09/1964 10G w/e 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47201 w/e 06/04/1963 24C Lostock Hall w/e 26/09/1964 10G w/e 22/01/1966 10C Fleetwood
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47602 w/e 29/02/1964 10C Fleetwood w/e 03/10/1964 10G w/e 08/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44188 w/e 04/01/1964 9G Gorton w/e 03/10/1964 10G w/e 05/12/1964 2F Bescot
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44211 w/e 25/04/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 17/10/1964 10G w/e 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44125 w/e 26/09/1964 10H Lower Darwen w/e 24/10/1964 10G w/e 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43952 w/e 07/12/1963 10H Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964 10G on 20/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43975 w/e 28/12/1963 16D Nottingham w/e 07/11/1964 10G on 16/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44222 w/e 24/10/1964 10H Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964 10G w/e 14/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44462 w/e 04/01/1964 10H Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964 10G w/e 20/03/1965 12D Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44527 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 07/11/1964 10G w/e 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44548 w/e 14/12/1963 10H Lower Darwen w/e 07/11/1964 10G w/e 09/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44597 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 07/11/1964 10G w/e 20/03/1965 12D Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44063 w/e 20/06/1964 9M Bury w/e 28/11/1964 10G w/e 01/05/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43913 w/e 23/01/1960 26D Bury w/e 12/12/1964 10G on 03/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44456 8w/e 29/11/1952 9G Northwich w/e 19/12/1964 10G w/e 27/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44310 w/e 28/12/1963 6H Bangor w/e 02/01/1965 10G w/e 17/04/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44389 on 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 02/01/1965 10G w/e 17/04/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75051 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/03/1965 10G w/e 29/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75057 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/03/1965 10G w/e 12/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75058 w/e 25/01/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/03/1965 10G w/e 08/04/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75059 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/03/1965 10G w/e 08/04/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75011 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 05/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75015 w/e 25/04/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 11/02/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75017 w/e 14/12/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 07/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75019 w/e 14/12/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75039 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75041 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 08/04/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75042 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 08/04/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75044 w/e 23/11/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/03/1965 10G w/e 12/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44310 w/e 17/04/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 01/05/1965 10G w/e 08/05/1965 12D Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44389 w/e 17/04/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 01/05/1965 10G w/e 10/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41241 w/e 12/06/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 21/08/1965 10G w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41272 w/e 14/11/1964 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 21/08/1965 10G m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47317 w/e 10/04/1965 10C Fleetwood w/e 22/01/1966 10G w/e 16/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47599 w/e 19/02/1966 10D Lostock Hall w/e 09/04/1966 10G w/e 24/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41251 w/e 09/11/1963 10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 23/04/1966 10G w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47667 w/e 16/01/1965 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/09/1966 10G w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75027 w/e 22/10/1966 8L Aintree w/e 12/11/1966 10G w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75026 w/e 22/10/1966 8L Aintree w/e 19/11/1966 10G w/e 08/04/1967 10A Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47293 w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall w/e 03/12/1966 10G w/e 31/12/1966 Withdrawn