Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 741 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5935 Week
» 12986 Month
» 235387 Year
» 1119768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Salisbury


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Salisbury Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 380 4-4-0 387       11/1879 (New) SAL m/e 12/1913 Withdrawn
Steam 380 4-4-0 388       11/1879 (New) SAL m/e 12/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 135 4-4-0 143       12/1880 (New) SAL y/e 1884 - Exeter Queen Street
Steam 135 4-4-0 144       01/1881 (New) SAL m/e 11/1921 Withdrawn
Steam 460 4-4-0 477       08/1884 (New) SAL m/e 10/1927 Withdrawn
Steam 460 4-4-0 467       10/1884 (New) SAL m/e 12/1928 Withdrawn
Steam 460 4-4-0 468       10/1884 (New) SAL m/e 05/1928 Withdrawn
Steam X2 4-4-0 592       03/1892 (New) SAL m/e 12/1936 Withdrawn
Steam X2 4-4-0 593       03/1892 (New) SAL m/e 07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam X2 4-4-0 596       05/1892 (New) SAL m/e 05/1931 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 561       02/1893 (New) SAL m/e 10/1930 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 562       03/1893 (New) SAL m/e 04/1931 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 574       10/1893 (New) SAL m/e 07/1933 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 575       10/1893 (New) SAL m/e 01/1932 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 660       12/1895 (New) SAL m/e 10/1936 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 661       12/1895 (New) SAL m/e 12/1936 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 662       12/1895 (New) SAL m/e 03/1933 Withdrawn
Steam T6 4-4-0 685       04/1896 (New) SAL m/e 02/1936 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 41       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 117       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 05/02/1951 71C Dorchester
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 122       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 05/02/1951 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 127       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam G6 0-6-0T 237       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 243       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam G6 0-6-0T 279       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 12/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 285       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 288       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 312       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 03/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 315       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 317       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 22/03/1958 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam H15 4-6-0 330       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam H15 4-6-0 331       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam H15 4-6-0 332       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam H15 4-6-0 333       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam H15 4-6-0 334       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 17/06/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam H15 4-6-0 335       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 17/06/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 355       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 70D Basingstoke
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 378       01/01/1948 SAL 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 393       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam S11 4-4-0 398       01/01/1948 SAL 6w/e 20/03/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 421       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 432       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 448       01/01/1948 SAL 27/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 449       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 450       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 451       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 07/10/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 452       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 453       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 454       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 455       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 456       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 457       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam H15 4-6-0 475       01/01/1948 SAL w/e 09/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 476       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 13/11/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3441       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 675       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/01/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 690       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 06/11/1954 71B Bournemouth
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 691       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 709       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 715       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 17/06/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 721       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 727       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 06/10/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 729       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 12/05/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 744       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 746       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam S15 4-6-0 828       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 829       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 830       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 06/01/1964 70B Feltham
Steam S15 4-6-0 831       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 832       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 957       01/01/1948 SAL 3w/e 13/10/1958 72B Salisbury
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1612       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 13/11/1950 71D Fratton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1618       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 12/05/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1626       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1630       01/01/1948 SAL w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1636       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1846       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1848       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1872       01/01/1948 SAL 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1873       01/01/1948 SAL 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C6       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C7       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 18/01/1965 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C8       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 08/02/1954 71B Bournemouth
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C9       01/01/1948 SAL 6w/e 01/04/1957 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C10       01/01/1948 SAL 6w/e 27/01/1956 71B Bournemouth
Steam T1 0-4-4T 10 08/1894 BM Bournemouth (New) 01/01/1948 SAL m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 13 06/1895 BM Bournemouth (New) 01/01/1948 SAL m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 361       01/01/1948 SAL m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C148       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C149       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C150       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C151       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C152       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C153       01/01/1948 SAL 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30031 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 17/06/1950 72B 4w/e 17/06/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34035 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950 72B 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam S15 4-6-0 30826 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950 72B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34032 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 09/09/1950 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam H15 4-6-0 30330 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B m/e 05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30331 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30765 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B 4w/e 08/12/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30773 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam H15 4-6-0 30332 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B m/e 11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30333 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B m/e 10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30334 4w/e 17/06/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B m/e 06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30335 4w/e 17/06/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/11/1950 72B m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30300 01/01/1948 DOR Dorchester 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30451 4w/e 07/10/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B w/e 16/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30455 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30456 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30457 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31874 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31875 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30302 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B m/e 10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 304 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30710 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B m/e 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30726 4w/e 07/10/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B 4w/e 06/10/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012 4w/e 08/12/1950 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34015 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34028 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34048 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30673 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 20/03/1951 72B 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30674 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 6w/e 20/03/1951 72B 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30455 4w/e 11/04/1951 70B Feltham 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30457 4w/e 11/04/1951 70B Feltham 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30667 4w/e 13/11/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 4w/e 10/12/1953 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30670 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 2w/e 10/10/1961 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30673 6w/e 20/03/1951 72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30674 6w/e 20/03/1951 72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B m/e 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30723 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31637 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 6w/e 13/08/1952 73E Faversham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31639 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 9w/e 30/06/1952 72C Yeovil Town
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34045 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34046 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34047 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34048 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B 7w/e 27/06/1951 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34049 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 30823 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B m/e 06/01/1964 70B Feltham
Steam S15 4-6-0 30824 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B m/e 06/01/1964 70B Feltham
Steam S15 4-6-0 30825 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 30846 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 4w/e 01/10/1953 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam S15 4-6-0 30847 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 5w/e 18/07/1959 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31636 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32506 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 5w/e 16/09/1955 70C Guildford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34050 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 4w/e 24/11/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34051 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34052 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34053 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 71B Bournemouth
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30703 01/01/1948 WAD Wadebridge 4w/e 06/10/1951 72B m/e 10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31635 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 06/10/1951 72B 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30702 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B w/e 11/03/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32486 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B 3w/e 17/11/1956 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34054 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34055 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30307 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D Fratton 8w/e 07/10/1952 72B m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30721 4w/e 08/12/1950 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 07/10/1952 72B 14/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34099 12/1949 RAM Ramsgate (New) 5w/e 11/12/1952 72B 4w/e 08/01/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31639 9w/e 30/06/1952 72C Yeovil Town 5w/e 14/02/1953 72B 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31813 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953 72B 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31814 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953 72B 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30270 4w/e 08/12/1950 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 29/10/1953 72B m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30266 4w/e 11/04/1951 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 13/05/1954 72B m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30313 4w/e 12/05/1951 70G   6w/e 18/06/1954 72B 4w/e 19/08/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34056 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30309 4w/e 12/05/1951 70G   4w/e 11/12/1954 72B 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30327 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954 72B 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76005 5w/e 11/03/1955 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B 4w/e 25/10/1965 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76006 5w/e 11/03/1955 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76008 02/1953 71A Eastleigh (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B 5w/e 17/04/1967 70F Bournemouth
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30327 4w/e 11/12/1954 72B Salisbury 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B w/e 11/03/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30956 5w/e 12/08/1955 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 16/09/1955 72B 7w/e 20/04/1956 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34059 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/10/1955 72B m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30025 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 72B 3w/e 30/01/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30374 4w/e 08/02/1954 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 72B 9w/e 12/06/1957 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30954 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 17/12/1956 72B 6w/e 01/04/1957 71H Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30953 4w/e 11/12/1954 71H Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 01/04/1957 72B 5w/e 19/07/1957 71H Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35004 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 01/04/1957 72B m/e 14/09/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30954 6w/e 01/04/1957 71H Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 19/07/1957 72B 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30315 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/03/1958 72B 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30729 6w/e 18/06/1954 71D Fratton q/e 06/06/1958 72B 4w/e 06/05/1960 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76007 4w/e 06/06/1958 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 13/10/1958 72B 5w/e 17/04/1967 70F Bournemouth
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30957 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 3w/e 13/10/1958 72B 3w/e 01/05/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76009 3w/e 13/10/1958 72C Yeovil Town w/e 11/03/1959 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30692 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms w/e 11/03/1959 72B w/e 03/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76059 06/1955 75B Redhill (New) 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76060 07/1955 75B Redhill (New) 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh
Steam H15 4-6-0 30522 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30523 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B w/e 09/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H15 4-6-0 30524 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30796 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B w/e 03/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30798 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B w/e 16/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30799 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31019 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31067 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31497 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31507 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76017 06/1953 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76018 06/1953 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76066 07/1956 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B m/e 14/09/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76067 08/1956 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B 5w/e 17/04/1967 70F Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34048 w/e 11/03/1959 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34099 w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31019 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B 4w/e 06/05/1960 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31067 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B 4w/e 06/05/1960 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31497 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B 4w/e 06/05/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31507 5w/e 18/07/1959 72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B 4w/e 06/05/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76053 21/04/1955 75B Redhill (New) 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76054 26/04/1955 75B Redhill (New) 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76055 29/04/1955 75B Redhill (New) 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30033 6w/e 14/06/1959 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960 72B 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30764 5w/e 12/08/1955 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 05/10/1960 72B 4w/e 24/11/1960 71B Bournemouth
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30771 6w/e 15/06/1956 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 24/11/1960 72B m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30783 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 24/11/1960 72B m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34026 6w/e 14/06/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 24/11/1960 72B m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34003 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 72B w/e 20/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34005 4w/e 14/01/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 72B 4w/e 25/10/1965 70F Bournemouth
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31404 m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31898 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34067 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34068 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34091       3w/e 26/05/1961 72B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34092       3w/e 26/05/1961 72B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30021 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961 72B 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4626 w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine m/e 09/11/1961 72B m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4630 w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine m/e 09/11/1961 72B m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31408 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford m/e 09/11/1961 72B 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C Guildford
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30034 4w/e 30/07/1962 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/09/1962 72B w/e 17/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30241 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 22/10/1962 72B 4w/e 01/04/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Q 0-6-0 30532 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 72B m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30249 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 30/01/1963 70E 4w/e 01/04/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616 4w/e 28/05/1962 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 01/04/1963 70E 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30021 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 22/07/1963 70E m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4689 w/e 11/03/1959 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E 3w/e 28/03/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E 4w/e 25/10/1965 70F Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34013 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34014 5w/e 02/07/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34019 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 14/09/1964 70B Feltham
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34027 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34063 4w/e 27/05/1963 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34089 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34100 4w/e 24/02/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E m/e 07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34032 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 11/11/1963 70E m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34036 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 11/11/1963 70E m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34056 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 11/11/1963 70E m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34108 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 11/11/1963 70E m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30025 3w/e 30/01/1963 71B Bournemouth m/e 06/01/1964 70E m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30133 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 70E m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30254 3w/e 30/01/1963 71B Bournemouth m/e 06/01/1964 70E m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30535 4w/e 17/12/1962 71B Bournemouth m/e 06/01/1964 70E 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C Guildford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1210 4w/e 22/02/1964 83D Exmouth Junction m/e 02/03/1964 70E m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41210 4w/e 22/02/1964 83D Exmouth Junction m/e 02/03/1964 70E m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41315 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D Exmouth Junction m/e 02/03/1964 70E m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41230 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/05/1964 70E 4w/e 10/05/1965 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41300 m/e 10/02/1961 75A Brighton 4w/e 22/06/1964 70E m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 w/e 16/09/1961 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 20/07/1964 70E 4w/e 10/05/1965 70F Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34006 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms m/e 14/09/1964 70E m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34007 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms m/e 14/09/1964 70E m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34015 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 14/09/1964 70E m/e 04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34066 m/e 10/02/1961 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 14/09/1964 70E m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80142 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/06/1965 70E 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80144 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/06/1965 70E 4w/e 20/12/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80145 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/06/1965 70E 4w/e 07/02/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80151 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/06/1965 70E 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80152 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/06/1965 70E 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76055 4w/e 18/01/1965 70B Feltham 4w/e 05/07/1965 70E m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34064 m/e 06/01/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70E m/e 05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34076 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70E m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn