Depot: Middlesbrough
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Middlesbrough | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2155 | m/e | 02/1914 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 02/12/1927 | MID | on | 16/05/1929 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1327 | m/e | 10/1921 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | MID | on | 16/05/1929 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2145 | m/e | 11/1913 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 16/05/1929 | MID | on | 26/06/1930 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2162 | m/e | 04/1914 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 16/05/1929 | MID | on | 26/06/1930 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1448 | on | 28/09/1926 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 07/04/1930 | MID | on | 23/01/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1449 | on | 05/10/1926 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 07/04/1930 | MID | on | 23/01/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1768 | on | 27/06/1928 | HTN | Heaton | on | 26/06/1930 | MID | on | 20/03/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1771 | on | 27/06/1928 | HTN | Heaton | on | 26/06/1930 | MID | on | 20/03/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1708 | on | 09/04/1931 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 05/05/1931 | MID | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1717 | on | 09/04/1931 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 05/05/1931 | MID | on | 07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 658 | on | 30/01/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 29/05/1931 | MID | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 646 | on | 30/01/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 21/12/1932 | MID | on | 12/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2162 | on | 16/12/1931 | DAR | Darlington | on | 08/03/1933 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1518 | m/e | 06/1920 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 22/05/1933 | MID | on | 05/07/1934 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2143 | m/e | 10/1913 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 12/06/1933 | MID | on | 18/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 687 | m/e | 12/1907 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 12/10/1933 | MID | on | 04/12/1939 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | m/e | 02/1908 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 12/10/1933 | MID | on | 28/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1472 | on | 27/03/1934 (New) | MID | on | 12/10/1936 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1756 | on | 25/05/1928 | SALT | Saltburn | on | 10/05/1934 | MID | on | 28/05/1935 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1330 | m/e | 12/1921 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 24/05/1934 | MID | on | 29/05/1934 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1500 | on | 29/05/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 05/07/1934 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1501 | on | 19/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 05/07/1934 | MID | on | 22/08/1934 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1327 | on | 19/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 05/07/1934 | MID | on | 30/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 693 | on | 27/06/1934 | WBY | Whitby | on | 22/08/1934 | MID | on | 24/03/1937 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2158 | on | 21/08/1929 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 25/05/1935 | MID | on | 16/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2150 | on | 28/05/1928 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 14/06/1935 | MID | on | 17/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 4354 | S | 01/1936 | MID | m/e | 10/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 7416 | S | 01/1936 | MID | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1479 | on | 07/12/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 23/01/1936 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1486 | on | 05/12/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 23/01/1936 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2152 | on | 28/05/1928 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 29/05/1936 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2151 | on | 28/05/1928 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 11/06/1936 | MID | on | 17/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1499 | m/e | 06/1921 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 24/06/1936 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1532 | on | 08/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1533 | on | 19/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2119 | on | 07/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2120 | m/e | 10/1901 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1704 | m/e | 04/1902 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1694 | on | 25/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1669 | m/e | 12/1903 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1178 | m/e | 10/1907 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 656 | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 21/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 794 | m/e | 11/1911 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 06/02/1937 | MID | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 693 | on | 24/03/1937 | HTN | Heaton | on | 02/05/1937 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1729 | on | 15/12/1930 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 27/05/1937 | MID | on | 19/07/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 411 | m/e | 03/1904 | HAV | Haverton Hill (New) | on | 27/05/1937 | MID | on | 08/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1586 | on | 19/05/1937 | SKN | Stockton | on | 10/01/1938 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1551 | on | 16/03/1938 (New) | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2124 | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 29/03/1938 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 24/06/1937 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 29/03/1938 | MID | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1558 | on | 01/04/1938 (New) | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | on | 28/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 06/1938 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1750 | on | 21/08/1929 | HTN | Heaton | on | 24/08/1938 | MID | on | 20/03/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1782 | on | 27/06/1928 | HTN | Heaton | on | 24/08/1938 | MID | on | 10/04/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1712 | on | 21/08/1929 | HTN | Heaton | on | 31/08/1938 | MID | on | 20/03/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2122 | on | 08/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1320 | m/e | 03/1902 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | on | 01/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1149 | on | 13/08/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | on | 28/03/1943 | NLN | Northallerton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 653 | on | 08/02/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 789 | m/e | 11/1911 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | on | 19/08/1939 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2147 | on | 27/06/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2153 | on | 08/08/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | on | 23/05/1942 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2161 | on | 23/01/1936 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | on | 20/05/1941 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1329 | H | 12/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | on | 18/11/1940 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1521 | on | 16/07/1936 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1531 | on | 03/03/1934 | DAR | Darlington | on | 10/04/1939 | MID | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1708 | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 05/06/1939 | MID | on | 22/11/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 773 | on | 07/11/1938 | DAR | Darlington | on | 29/07/1939 | MID | on | 21/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2147 | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 14/02/1942 | MID | on | 12/01/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1329 | on | 27/12/1941 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 11/06/1942 | MID | on | 30/05/1948 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1501 | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/10/1942 | MID | on | 30/05/1948 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1178 | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 03/01/1944 | MID | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1054 | on | 07/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/01/1944 | MID | on | 16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 657 | on | 07/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/01/1944 | MID | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 771 | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/01/1944 | MID | on | 23/07/1945 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 794 | on | 07/11/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 08/01/1944 | MID | on | 07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2161 | on | 20/05/1941 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 01/04/1944 | MID | on | 29/04/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2151 | on | 28/03/1940 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 12/01/1946 | MID | on | 30/05/1948 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2153 | on | 23/05/1942 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 29/04/1946 | MID | on | 30/05/1948 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 645 | on | 04/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/07/1946 | MID | on | 25/08/1946 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4943 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 10/01/1947 | MID | on | 01/03/1947 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4945 | on | 18/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 12/01/1947 | MID | on | 29/01/1947 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9869 | on | 01/01/1940 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 13/04/1947 | MID | on | 29/01/1950 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3260 | on | 23/07/1945 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 20/07/1947 | MID | on | 21/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3285 | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | on | 13/06/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3295 | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | on | 22/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3364 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3368 | on | 23/07/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/10/1947 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3273 | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/11/1947 | MID | on | 28/03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3291 | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/11/1947 | MID | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3316 | on | 22/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/11/1947 | MID | on | 04/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3317 | on | 20/07/1947 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/11/1947 | MID | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3323 | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 02/11/1947 | MID | on | 08/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7281 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7338 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5084 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5686 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | on | 03/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5710 | m/e | 08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5702 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51J | Northallerton | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65725 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | w/e | 31/07/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5726 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5733 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5764 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5771 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5775 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5776 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5779 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8260 | H | 12/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8303 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | on | 13/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8307 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | on | 20/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8312 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8690 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8711 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | w/e | 19/06/1948 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8712 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8713 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8721 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8740 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8754 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7638 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7639 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7684 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7685 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7686 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7691 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 8425 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | MID | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | 5687 | m/e | 08/1935 | Withdrawn | on | 25/01/1948 (R) | MID | |||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3282 | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | w/e | 21/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3289 | on | 28/03/1943 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | w/e | 21/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3282 | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 21/02/1948 | MID | on | 11/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3289 | on | 15/02/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 21/02/1948 | MID | on | 21/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3375 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | w/e | 15/05/1948 | MID | on | 25/05/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63409 | on | 14/09/1942 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/05/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3442 | on | 05/05/1931 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 15/05/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3375 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 25/05/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4710 | on | 23/07/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 13/06/1948 | MID | w/e | 19/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4819 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 13/06/1948 | MID | w/e | 19/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4710 | on | 13/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | MID | on | 25/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4819 | on | 13/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | MID | on | 25/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68688 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 26/06/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69854 | on | 12/01/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 27/06/1948 | MID | w/e | 03/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4756 | on | 07/01/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/06/1948 | MID | w/e | 03/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69854 | on | 27/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 03/07/1948 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4756 | on | 27/06/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 03/07/1948 | MID | on | 25/06/1950 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | on | 08/09/1936 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 11/07/1948 | MID | w/e | 17/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9880 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | WBY | Whitby | on | 11/07/1948 | MID | w/e | 17/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | on | 11/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 17/07/1948 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 9880 | on | 11/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 17/07/1948 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4847 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 25/07/1948 | MID | w/e | 31/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4847 | on | 25/07/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 31/07/1948 | MID | on | 27/09/1953 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68689 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 31/07/1948 | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69873 | on | 02/12/1935 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 12/09/1948 | MID | w/e | 18/09/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69873 | on | 12/09/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 18/09/1948 | MID | on | 04/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3411 | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3417 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3420 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3411 | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3417 | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3420 | on | 07/11/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 13/11/1948 | MID | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3318 | on | 20/07/1947 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/12/1948 | MID | w/e | 11/12/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3318 | on | 05/12/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 11/12/1948 | MID | on | 27/06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63272 | on | 20/07/1947 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63328 | on | 04/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63332 | on | 29/09/1946 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63351 | on | 29/11/1947 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63272 | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | on | 03/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63328 | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | on | 13/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63332 | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | on | 22/03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63351 | on | 13/02/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 19/02/1949 | MID | on | 29/08/1954 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63290 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 24/04/1949 | MID | w/e | 30/04/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63293 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 24/04/1949 | MID | w/e | 30/04/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63290 | on | 24/04/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 30/04/1949 | MID | on | 15/01/1950 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63293 | on | 24/04/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 30/04/1949 | MID | on | 09/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63281 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/05/1949 | MID | w/e | 07/05/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63281 | on | 01/05/1949 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 07/05/1949 | MID | on | 12/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64821 | on | 23/09/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 15/01/1950 | MID | w/e | 21/01/1950 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64821 | on | 15/01/1950 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 21/01/1950 | MID | on | 27/09/1953 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63256 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 22/01/1950 | MID | w/e | 28/01/1950 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63256 | on | 22/01/1950 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 28/01/1950 | MID | on | 12/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | STR | Stratford | on | 29/01/1950 | MID | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63380 | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | Stockton | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63393 | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63349 | on | 07/02/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63369 | on | 02/11/1947 | SKN | Stockton | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63459 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67755 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67759 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67763 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67764 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67765 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67766 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63349 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63369 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63380 | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63393 | on | 04/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63459 | on | 25/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | on | 29/08/1954 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3373 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 16/07/1950 | 51D | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43050 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | on | 31/08/1950 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43050 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43051 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69854 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69859 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69873 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69876 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69878 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69880 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69854 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69859 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 19/09/1954 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69873 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 17/07/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69876 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 21/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69878 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 08/09/1957 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69880 | on | 19/11/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51D | on | 13/06/1954 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69019 | m/e | 01/1951 (New) | MID | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64817 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64940 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63340 | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3405 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64817 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | on | 14/09/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64940 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | on | 31/08/1952 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63340 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67663 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 18/02/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67677 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 18/02/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64862 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 25/02/1951 | 51D | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64862 | on | 25/02/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 51D | on | 14/09/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43072 | on | 06/09/1950 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | on | 13/09/1950 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43074 | on | 20/09/1950 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43072 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43074 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67663 | on | 18/02/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67677 | on | 18/02/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51D | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51D | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 18/11/1951 | 51D | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 18/11/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 51D | on | 14/09/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65737 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 51D | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 65737 | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42084 | 8w/e | 19/03/1952 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 51D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | on | 28/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43102 | on | 02/03/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43102 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63401 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 31/08/1952 | 51D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63401 | on | 31/08/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63355 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63435 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63452 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69852 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 51E | Stockton | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 11/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69852 | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | on | 19/09/1954 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 05/10/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | on | 09/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | on | 01/03/1953 | 51D | on | 07/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67639 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 51D | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67677 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 51D | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69859 | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | on | 13/06/1954 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69862 | on | 21/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 07/06/1953 | 51E | Stockton | on | 20/09/1953 | 51D | on | 14/02/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65884 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 51K | Saltburn | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 51D | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64756 | on | 30/07/1950 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 29/08/1954 | 51D | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64848 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | on | 29/08/1954 | 51D | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69889 | on | 11/09/1942 | SALT | Saltburn | on | 19/09/1954 | 51D | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69891 | on | 06/10/1946 | SALT | Saltburn | on | 19/09/1954 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65868 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51D | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64756 | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 03/04/1955 | 51D | on | 26/06/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64848 | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 03/04/1955 | 51D | on | 26/06/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68245 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63355 | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63373 | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63396 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/08/1955 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63424 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 14/08/1955 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68290 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68684 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55B | Stourton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13228 | on | 15/12/1955 (New) | 51D | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65720 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67754 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67755 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67759 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67763 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67764 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67765 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67766 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65870 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NBH | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 51D | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67323 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 51D | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67337 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 51D | on | 11/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 51K | Saltburn | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 51D | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51K | Saltburn |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65870 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67763 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50G | Whitby | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67765 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 50G | Whitby | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69858 | on | 10/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 16/06/1957 | 51D | on | 15/09/1957 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69860 | on | 25/09/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 16/06/1957 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69882 | on | 10/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 14/07/1957 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43057 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43071 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67663 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67677 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67684 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51D | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43054 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69830 | on | 10/11/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69831 | on | 10/11/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69834 | on | 10/11/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69842 | on | 10/11/1957 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69866 | on | 19/09/1954 | 51K | Saltburn | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69869 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | SAL | Salisbury | on | 02/02/1958 | 51D | on | 01/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68908 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68942 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 51D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby |