Depot: Llandudno Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Llandudno Junction | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8521 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8552 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 05/1945 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8616 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8618 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6701 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5287 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 06/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5283 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 03/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6641 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7A | m/e | 10/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25379 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7A | m/e | 08/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 19" Goods | 4-6-0 | 8727 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7A | m/e | 08/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 5350 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | on | 22/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5294 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | m/e | 05/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5293 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | m/e | 06/1939 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6628 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 79 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 82 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 83 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2984 | w/e | 03/12/1938 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 08/04/1939 | 7A | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2951 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7A | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2954 | w/e | 28/12/1935 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7A | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2952 | w/e | 05/10/1935 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 17/08/1940 | 7A | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2945 | w/e | 20/05/1944 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 08/07/1944 | 7A | w/e | 09/09/1944 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 28/08/1943 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/07/1945 | 7A | w/e | 13/09/1947 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28529 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 7A | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1157 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1167 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5303 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 7A | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2971 | w/e | 25/11/1939 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/10/1946 | 7A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2954 | w/e | 02/02/1946 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 28/06/1947 | 7A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3877 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 10G | Skipton | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6681 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6747 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | on | 07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 87 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 134 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 137 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 671 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 675 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1086 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6J | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1119 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1150 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1A | Willesden | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1156 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 21B | Bournville | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1161 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 925 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 936 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | LIV | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 524 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4860 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4911 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5112 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5253 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5301 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6B | Mold Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5303 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5346 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 7C | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5370 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 7A | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58906 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 7A | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5292 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 7A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40133 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7A | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 646 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7A | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 7A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25332 | m/e | 02/1936 | Withdrawn | w/e | 05/06/1948 (R) | 7A | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2965 | w/e | 26/12/1942 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1114 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1124 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4840 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45045 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44740 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 7A | w/e | 13/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7394 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 7A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28335 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 7A | w/e | 24/02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6604 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 7A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46687 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7A | w/e | 24/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42666 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 7A | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2C | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 7A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42984 | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 7A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40483 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 7A | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40483 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 7A | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41232 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 7A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44808 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 7A | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40900 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 7A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40124 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41116 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44808 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40124 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41116 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44808 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40207 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40208 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58398 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40095 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40207 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40208 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44941 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44941 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41173 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | LIV | Brunswick | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7A | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 7A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58426 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58421 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 12D | Workington | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 7A | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41055 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41111 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41055 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7A | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41111 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40377 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40377 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 7A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45247 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45247 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 7A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45255 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 7A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58375 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40324 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40122 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40125 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8D | Widnes | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40396 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41236 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41237 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41238 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41055 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40548 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40559 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6G | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45005 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6G | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45005 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 6G | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6G | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40086 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6G | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75010 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6G | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75011 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75012 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6G | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6G | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | m/e | 11/1951 | 10C | Patricroft (New) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6G | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45331 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6G | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | m/e | 06/1953 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6G | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40377 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6G | m/e | 09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46421 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6G | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46430 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6G | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43981 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6G | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44525 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6G | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6G | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | m/e | 06/1953 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6G | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | m/e | 06/1953 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6G | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6G | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 09/06/1956 | 6G | w/e | 15/09/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6G | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44864 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44865 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45437 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45441 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1E | Bletchley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75010 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75012 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40580 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40675 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41120 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | on | 06/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41164 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6G | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41235 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6G | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44935 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 9A | Longsight | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45403 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 9A | Longsight | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6G | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75035 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6G | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43615 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6G | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45344 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47631 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6G | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40635 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6G | w/e | 11/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40699 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6G | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45180 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6G | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 21E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40048 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6G | on | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40073 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 16C | Mansfield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41236 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41237 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41244 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40058 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 6G | on | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41226 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41323 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47372 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6G | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40008 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 6G | on | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40128 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 6G | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40128 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 6G | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78059 | m/e | 09/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate (New) | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 6G | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6G | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6G | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78055 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6D | Chester Northgate | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6G | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78058 | m/e | 09/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate (New) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6G | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48253 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48667 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47558 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 21/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45534 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46150 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46156 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45586 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45704 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45733 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46156 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6G | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44682 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44827 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45248 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44686 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21E | Monument Lane | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 6G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8M | Southport |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40077 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6G | on | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40093 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 27/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46420 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46447 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45270 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45370 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45038 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40185 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6G | w/e | 24/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41227 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 6G | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41228 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 6G | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45638 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45671 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46163 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44742 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44749 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45740 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44687 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8M | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44741 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44750 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6G | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45583 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45553 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6G | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45655 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40128 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45547 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 6G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 6G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41228 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 6G | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45056 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75036 | m/e | 08/1953 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48655 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40107 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | on | 02/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40122 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40137 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45527 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46114 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44936 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45050 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45271 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45340 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48246 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48771 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6G | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84020 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 31/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84021 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84022 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45583 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45655 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45671 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45740 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | on | 11/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45530 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45534 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46120 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46144 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46152 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46154 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6G | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40083 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 6G | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46131 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 6G | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45149 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45197 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45289 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45311 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45348 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45369 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40085 | on | 23/04/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 07/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40098 | on | 23/04/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40106 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40086 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40138 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6G | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6G | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41278 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 6G | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75035 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75050 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46155 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46165 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46170 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6G | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73038 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6G | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41230 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6G | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84001 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 31/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41244 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70016 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70014 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70033 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6G | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73011 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73073 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84003 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47507 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47669 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 20/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42482 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42209 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 6G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45045 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45091 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45282 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45301 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45327 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | w/e | 23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44661 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45197 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 14E | Bedford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45289 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 14E | Bedford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45348 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45369 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44774 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44985 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45277 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6G | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41212 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45004 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45387 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41220 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6G | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48648 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6G | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44865 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6G | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45279 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45285 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 6G | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47598 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 6G | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84003 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6G | on | 02/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6G | w/e | 20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41201 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 2M | Wellington | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6G | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41202 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6G | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41285 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 89D | Oswestry | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6G | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45567 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 6G | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45595 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 6G | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45689 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 6G | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45143 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 6G | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41232 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 2L | Leamington | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 6G | w/e | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41272 | on | 14/07/1963 | 84D | Leamington | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 6G | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47673 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6G | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41204 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41241 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41200 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41233 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41234 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45345 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6G | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45298 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45277 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2607 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6G | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70012 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70014 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70023 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70024 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70025 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70027 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2606 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | on | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48269 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48345 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48411 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48749 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45042 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44766 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44875 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45064 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 6G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 6G | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2603 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 6G | on | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2604 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 6G | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2605 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 6G | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12039 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 99C | Crewe Works | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 6G | w/e | 27/01/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3084 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 27/01/1968 | 6G | w/e | 05/02/1972 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12082 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 15/08/1970 | 6G | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3049 | w/e | 19/06/1971 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 6G | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | CH | Chester West |