Depot: Lees (Oldham)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Lees (Oldham) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12437 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26F | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12214 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26F | ||||||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12300 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26F | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 52545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | on | 13/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12248 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 17/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52326 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | Bury | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12569 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12378 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12387 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52607 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23B | Aintree | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12464 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 24D | Lower Darwen | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9509 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9548 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1A | Willesden | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | on | 16/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9593 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | on | 26/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9668 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 12 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 08/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 56 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 57 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 59 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 60 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 61 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 62 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2550 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2635 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 26F | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 26F | w/e | 13/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 26F | on | 05/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77014 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 26F | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77494 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 26F | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79283 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 26F | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52345 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26F | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26F | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52416 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26F | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52099 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 26F | w/e | 14/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40014 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26F | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49598 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 26F | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49598 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26F | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49618 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 26F | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49618 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26F | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41281 | m/e | 10/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26F | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49608 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26F | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49536 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26F | on | 18/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49608 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26F | on | 04/07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52615 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | w/e | 27/06/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52360 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42551 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49563 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26F | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 52549 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 26F | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 52549 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49662 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26F | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52108 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26F | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52569 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26F | w/e | 09/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52427 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | m/e | 06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42114 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52388 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 26F | w/e | 15/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49578 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41280 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41281 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41282 | m/e | 10/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood (New) | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84010 | on | 08/09/1953 | 25F | Low Moor (New) | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84015 | on | 02/10/1953 | 25F | Low Moor (New) | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84012 | on | 17/09/1953 | 25F | Low Moor (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26F | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52293 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 26F | w/e | 21/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42657 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 26F | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84013 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26E | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84014 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26E | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84019 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26E | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49505 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 26E | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 26E | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52410 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 26E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 26E | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12115 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26E | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41280 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 26E | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24G | Skipton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90671 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 26E | w/e | 07/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41206 | w/e | 09/08/1947 | 20G | Hellifield | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 26E | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52240 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26E | w/e | 15/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90140 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 26E | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90141 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90271 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90402 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52183 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 27C | Hamilton (West) | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 26E | w/e | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90525 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26E | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90708 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26E | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52269 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26E | w/e | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52322 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 26E | w/e | 06/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52466 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26E | w/e | 22/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 26E | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52207 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26E | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42287 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 26E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52275 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 26E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90194 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 26E | w/e | 21/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52456 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 26E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52271 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 26E | w/e | 05/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90331 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 26E | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46484 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46485 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46486 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42183 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42079 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26E | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46449 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9P | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46487 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9P | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90564 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 9P | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46452 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 9P | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90398 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 9P | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |