Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 735 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5929 Week
» 12980 Month
» 235381 Year
» 1119762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Grangemouth


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Grangemouth Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2736       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 14/01/1961 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 2737       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 14/01/1961 67C Ayr
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3883       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 23/09/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4320       01/01/1948 31D w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Dock 0-6-0T 16152       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 01/10/1955 65A Eastfield
Steam Dock 0-6-0T 16164       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 27/09/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17265       01/01/1948 31D w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17285       01/01/1948 31D 27/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17287       01/01/1948 31D 27/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17294       01/01/1948 31D m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17334       01/01/1948 31D m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17338       01/01/1948 31D 26/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 17373       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 17/05/1952 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57442       01/01/1948 31D 24/07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15119       01/01/1948 31D 14/07/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 15142       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 23/09/1950 65F Grangemouth
Steam 431 0-4-4T 15238       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 13/02/1960 63B Stirling
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8147       01/01/1948 31D 5w/e 16/07/1949 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8148       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 22/03/1952 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8149       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 31/12/1950 20B Stourton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8150       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 16/07/1955 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8151       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 16/07/1955 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8152       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56230       01/01/1948 31D m/e 01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56232       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56243       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 16/04/1955 68B Dumfries
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56267       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 22/12/1956 67A Corkerhill
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56275       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 21/01/1956 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 16300       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 25/12/1954 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56336       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 05/07/1958 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56375       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 22/12/1956 63B Stirling
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 56376       01/01/1948 31D m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57689       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 10/05/1958 63D Oban
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57691       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 24/09/1960 65D Dawsholm
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57603       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 01/11/1952 64C Dalry Road
Steam 300 0-6-0 57658       01/01/1948 31D 4w/e 24/03/1962 66B Motherwell
Steam 300 0-6-0 57667       01/01/1948 31D 8w/e 27/10/1956 63D Oban
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55142 01/01/1948 31D Grangemouth 4w/e 23/09/1950 65F m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45396 4w/e 16/06/1951 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 09/09/1951 65F 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45119 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951 65F 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45011 4w/e 29/12/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45013 8w/e 09/09/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F 4w/e 06/09/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90763 4w/e 17/05/1952 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/09/1952 65F 4w/e 01/11/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90773       4w/e 06/09/1952 65F 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90757 8w/e 07/10/1952 74A Ashford 4w/e 01/11/1952 65F 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67456 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 27/12/1952 65F m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55214 4w/e 06/09/1952 68D Beattock 4w/e 26/12/1953 65F m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42780 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F 4w/e 11/02/1961 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42802 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F 4w/e 11/02/1961 67C Ayr
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42803 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954 65F 4w/e 11/02/1961 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13132       30/10/1954 (New) 65F w/e 31/08/1968 34E New England
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13132       30/10/1954 (New) 65F 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13133       30/10/1954 (New) 65F 6w/e 02/10/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13134       30/10/1954 (New) 65F w/e 31/08/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13134       30/10/1954 (New) 65F 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13135       27/11/1954 (New) 65F w/e 07/03/1970 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13136       25/12/1954 (New) 65F 6w/e 02/10/1971 66A Polmadie
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90769       8w/e 16/04/1955 65F 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/10 2-10-0 90774 4w/e 15/05/1954 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 16/04/1955 65F 13/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68326 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 01/10/1955 65F m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90199 4w/e 07/08/1954 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 29/10/1955 65F 4w/e 02/08/1958 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13281       10/11/1956 (New) 65F 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90039 4w/e 13/04/1957 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 11/05/1957 65F 4w/e 12/04/1958 65D Dawsholm
Steam Standard Passenger 0-4-4T 55204 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 08/06/1957 65F 4w/e 22/10/1960 63A Perth South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13276 26/10/1956 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 15/02/1958 65F 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Steam J36 0-6-0 65246 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F 4w/e 26/09/1959 65C Parkhead
Steam J36 0-6-0 65241 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F 4w/e 13/02/1960 65E Kipps
Steam J37 0-6-0 64588 01/01/1948 PTH Perth (LNER) 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F 4w/e 26/09/1959 65C Parkhead
Steam J37 0-6-0 64589 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F m/e 05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64592 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F 4w/e 24/03/1962 65K Polmont
Steam J37 0-6-0 64593 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 17/01/1959 65F 4w/e 18/11/1961 65E Kipps
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2724 11/07/1958 64A St Margarets (New) 4w/e 11/04/1959 65F 4w/e 30/07/1960 64A St Margarets
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44234 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 11/04/1959 65F w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 57612 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 26/09/1959 65F w/e 30/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68349 4w/e 12/04/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 21/11/1959 65F m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90539       4w/e 19/12/1959 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65217 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 13/02/1960 65F w/e 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2756 19/05/1960 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 24/09/1960 65F 4w/e 11/03/1961 65A Eastfield
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57429 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 24/09/1960 65F m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2773       04/10/1960 (New) 65F 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2774       11/10/1960 (New) 65F 5w/e 30/01/1965 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45177 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 22/10/1960 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45178 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 22/10/1960 65F 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68344 4w/e 12/04/1958 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 22/10/1960 65F m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2775       25/10/1960 (New) 65F 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3902 20/09/1960 65E Kipps (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65F 4w/e 27/12/1969 64H Leith Central
Steam B1 4-6-0 61401 13/04/1960 65A Eastfield 03/01/1961 65F 16/10/1961 62A Thornton Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61403 09/04/1960 65A Eastfield 03/01/1961 65F 11/11/1963 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61340 27/11/1948 EFD Eastfield (New) 30/01/1961 65F 16/10/1961 62A Thornton Junction
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43137 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/03/1961 65F w/e 02/11/1963 56A Wakefield
Steam J36 0-6-0 65222 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 11/03/1961 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65306 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 11/03/1961 65F w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45125 4w/e 01/08/1959 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 08/04/1961 65F 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45482 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/04/1961 65F m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76074 4w/e 26/08/1961 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F 4w/e 30/11/1963 65D Dawsholm
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76103 4w/e 11/03/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F 4w/e 02/11/1963 65D Dawsholm
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45319 4w/e 27/08/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 66E Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45487 4w/e 21/04/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45496 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 4w/e 21/10/1961 65F 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Steam J36 0-6-0 65214 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 18/11/1961 65F 4w/e 24/03/1962 67D Ardrossan
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90128 4w/e 04/07/1959 65A Eastfield 6w/e 30/12/1961 65F 05/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65257 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 24/03/1962 65F w/e 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2741 16/01/1959 63B Stirling (New) 4w/e 21/04/1962 65F 4w/e 25/07/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76113 4w/e 18/11/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 19/05/1962 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 66E Carstairs
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57311 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 14/07/1962 65F w/e 17/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90234 4w/e 13/04/1957 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/08/1962 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90640 4w/e 02/08/1958 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/08/1962 65F 3w/e 29/09/1962 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam J36 0-6-0 65275 4w/e 27/01/1962 65K Polmont 4w/e 08/09/1962 65F 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65335 4w/e 19/05/1962 65C Parkhead 4w/e 08/09/1962 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbo 0-6-0 57269 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65F m/e 08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44788 4w/e 30/07/1960 63A Perth South 4w/e 24/11/1962 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67C Ayr
Steam 300 0-6-0 57652 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F 4w/e 16/03/1963 66A Polmadie
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90553       4w/e 19/01/1963 65F m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90560 4w/e 27/11/1954 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F 4w/e 04/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90600 4w/e 13/04/1957 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F 4w/e 04/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90614       4w/e 19/01/1963 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64593 4w/e 18/11/1961 65E Kipps 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64610 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F 4w/e 04/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 64611 4w/e 24/03/1962 65K Polmont 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F 5w/e 31/10/1964 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 64621 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44057 w/e 09/03/1963 66A Polmadie 2w/e 16/03/1963 65F w/e 06/07/1963 21B Bescot
Steam J37 0-6-0 64601 w/e 11/02/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 16/03/1963 65F      
Steam J36 0-6-0 65287 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 11/05/1963 65F m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45443 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/06/1963 65F m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65311 m/e 09/06/1956 64E Polmont 5w/e 07/09/1963 65F m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77009 2w/e 07/09/1963 66E Carstairs w/e 12/10/1963 65F 2w/e 23/10/1965 66B Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3215 16/03/1956 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F 4w/e 04/12/1965 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13216 23/03/1956 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F 4w/e 25/12/1965 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 4w/e 27/09/1958 65E Kipps 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F 4w/e 25/01/1964 65J Stirling
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76045 3w/e 16/06/1956 51F West Auckland 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 66E Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45192 4w/e 29/07/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F m/e 08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45362 4w/e 21/04/1951 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45488 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 02/11/1963 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67A Corkerhill
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90114 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A Eastfield 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90199 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A Eastfield 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F 4w/e 25/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90489 6w/e 30/12/1961 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F 4w/e 04/12/1965 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46460 4w/e 11/05/1963 63A Perth South 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67C Ayr
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46468 4w/e 14/07/1962 63A Perth South 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77006 w/e 03/11/1962 66E Carstairs 2w/e 07/12/1963 65F 2w/e 23/10/1965 66B Motherwell
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2776 31/10/1960 65K Polmont (New) 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F 4w/e 28/01/1967 65A Eastfield
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2778 28/11/1960 65K Polmont (New) 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3409 4w/e 08/09/1962 65K Polmont 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3556 4w/e 20/12/1958 64E Polmont 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3557 4w/e 20/12/1958 64E Polmont 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3559 07/11/1958 64E Polmont (New) 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F 5w/e 01/03/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel D2/1 0-4-0 D2703 4w/e 23/11/1957 64E Polmont 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 4w/e 25/01/1964 65J Stirling 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield
Steam J37 0-6-0 64537 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64570 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 5w/e 31/10/1964 62A Thornton Junction
Steam J37 0-6-0 64571 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 5w/e 31/10/1964 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 64592 4w/e 24/03/1962 65K Polmont 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64623 4w/e 28/12/1963 65K Polmont 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 5w/e 31/10/1964 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam J37 0-6-0 64636 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J38 0-6-0 65909 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A Thornton Junction
Steam J38 0-6-0 65917 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A Thornton Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44719 4w/e 01/11/1952 60A Inverness 4w/e 27/06/1964 65F m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64580 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 27/06/1964 65F m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73007 07/1951 63A Perth South (New) 4w/e 25/07/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 65J Stirling
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44970 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A Eastfield 5w/e 26/09/1964 65F 4w/e 26/06/1965 65A Eastfield
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76046 4w/e 02/11/1963 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76100 4w/e 11/03/1961 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76101 06/1957 65D Dawsholm (New) 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76102 4w/e 17/12/1960 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67E Dumfries
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76103 4w/e 02/11/1963 65D Dawsholm 5w/e 31/10/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 67E Dumfries
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73105 12/1955 65A Eastfield (New) 4w/e 26/12/1964 65F 5w/e 30/10/1965 65J Stirling
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3537 08/08/1958 63B Stirling (New) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65F 4w/e 28/12/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3538 15/08/1958 63B Stirling (New) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65F w/e 18/10/1969 2F Bescot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3539 15/08/1958 63B Stirling (New) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65F 5w/e 01/01/1972 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2424 5w/e 30/01/1965 60A Inverness 4w/e 24/06/1967 65F 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2444 4w/e 25/03/1967 67C Ayr 5w/e 30/09/1967 65F 5w/e 05/08/1972 62B Dundee West
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2435 06/04/1960 67C Ayr (New) 4w/e 27/01/1968 65F 4w/e 24/02/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3528 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 31/08/1968 65F 4w/e 28/12/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3529 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 31/08/1968 65F w/e 17/05/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3213 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/10/1968 65F 5w/e 30/11/1968 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3213 5w/e 30/11/1968 65A Eastfield 5w/e 30/11/1968 65F 5w/e 01/08/1970 64H Leith Central
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3182 5w/e 30/11/1968 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/12/1968 65F 6w/e 02/10/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3279 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/12/1968 65F w/e 30/12/1972 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3211 4w/e 25/01/1969 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/02/1970 65F 5w/e 30/05/1970 64H Leith Central
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3214 4w/e 27/12/1969 63A Perth South 4w/e 28/02/1970 65F 5w/e 01/04/1972 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3930 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 29/05/1971 65F 4w/e 19/05/1973 DE Dundee West
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2413 4w/e 26/08/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 29/04/1972 65F 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3243 w/e 22/01/1972 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 25/11/1972 65F 11/12/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3738 4w/e 27/05/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 03/11/1973 GM 4w/e 26/01/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3879 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/01/1974 GM 11/12/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08505 4w/e 29/03/1975 ED Eastfield 4w/e 24/05/1975 GM 22/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08145 4w/e 29/05/1971 62C Dunfermline Townhill 4w/e 29/05/1976 GM 5w/e 03/07/1976 DT Dunfermline Townhill