Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 956 Today
» 1368 Yesterday
» 3626 Week
» 9008 Month
» 47075 Year
» 47075 Total
Record: 1511 (01/12/2016)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Exmouth Junction


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Exmouth Junction Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 135 4-4-0 141 y/e 1884 - Exeter Queen Street y/e 1887 EXJ 12/1913 Withdrawn
Steam 135 4-4-0 142 y/e 1884 - Exeter Queen Street y/e 1887 EXJ 12/1913 Withdrawn
Steam 135 4-4-0 143 y/e 1884 - Exeter Queen Street y/e 1887 EXJ 06/1923 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 569       06/1893 (New) EXJ 01/1932 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 570       06/1893 (New) EXJ 07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 576       11/1893 (New) EXJ 08/1933 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 663       04/1896 (New) EXJ 10/1936 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 665       06/1896 (New) EXJ 06/1933 Withdrawn
Steam X6 4-4-0 666       06/1896 (New) EXJ 04/1943 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 364       07/1896 (New) EXJ 10/1944 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 365       07/1896 (New) EXJ 03/1938 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 366       07/1896 (New) EXJ 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh
Steam T1 0-4-4T 367       07/1896 (New) EXJ 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 850 m/e 08/1926 BAT Stewarts Lane (New) m/e 03/1930 EXJ m/e 04/1930 BAT Stewarts Lane
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 24       01/01/1948 EXJ w/e 03/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 25       01/01/1948 EXJ 3w/e 17/11/1956 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 32       01/01/1948 EXJ w/e 11/03/1959 70B Feltham
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 34       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 20/03/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 37       01/01/1948 EXJ 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 39       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 17/06/1950 To Store
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 46       01/01/1948 EXJ 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 49       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 55       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 105       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 124       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 19/03/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 133       01/01/1948 EXJ 8w/e 07/10/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 135       01/01/1948 EXJ 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 137       01/01/1948 EXJ 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 245       01/01/1948 EXJ 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 252       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 20/03/1951 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 253       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 20/03/1951 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 255       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 256       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 282       01/01/1948 EXJ 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 283       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 301       01/01/1948 EXJ 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 320       01/01/1948 EXJ 8w/e 07/10/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 323       01/01/1948 EXJ 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 329       01/01/1948 EXJ 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 356       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 374       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 375       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 376       01/01/1948 EXJ 8w/e 07/10/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 382       01/01/1948 EXJ 08/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 383       01/01/1948 EXJ 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 389       01/01/1948 EXJ 01/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 436       01/01/1948 EXJ 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 439       01/01/1948 EXJ 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3029       01/01/1948 EXJ 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 668       01/01/1948 EXJ 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 669       01/01/1948 EXJ 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 671       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 15/06/1956 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 723       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 724       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 725       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 730       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 747       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam S15 4-6-0 823       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam S15 4-6-0 824       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam S15 4-6-0 825       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam S15 4-6-0 826       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 09/09/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam S15 4-6-0 827       01/01/1948 EXJ 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 843       01/01/1948 EXJ 2w/e 31/08/1963 70B Feltham
Steam S15 4-6-0 844       01/01/1948 EXJ 2w/e 31/08/1963 70B Feltham
Steam S15 4-6-0 845       01/01/1948 EXJ 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam S15 4-6-0 846       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam S15 4-6-0 847       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Z 0-8-0T 954       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 17/12/1956 72B Salisbury
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1407       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1408       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1409       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1625       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1635       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1638       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1828       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1832       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1833       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1834       01/01/1948 EXJ 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1835       01/01/1948 EXJ 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1836       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1837       01/01/1948 EXJ 5w/e 11/12/1952 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1838       01/01/1948 EXJ 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1839       01/01/1948 EXJ 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1840       01/01/1948 EXJ 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1841       01/01/1948 EXJ 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1842       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1845       01/01/1948 EXJ 8w/e 20/07/1953 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1847       01/01/1948 EXJ 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1853       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1855       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1856       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1869       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1871       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1874       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1875       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 2124       01/01/1948 EXJ 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 2135       01/01/1948 EXJ 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 2695       01/01/1948 EXJ 04/1957 Withdrawn
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 2697       01/01/1948 EXJ 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C1       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 25/01/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C2       01/01/1948 EXJ 8w/e 13/05/1954 71B Bournemouth
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C3       01/01/1948 EXJ m/e 20/07/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C4       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 01/04/1957 72B Salisbury
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 21C5       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam O2 0-4-4T 192       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 72F Wadebridge
Steam O2 0-4-4T 193       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 30/12/1953 70B Feltham
Steam O2 0-4-4T 199       01/01/1948 EXJ 9w/e 12/06/1957 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam O2 0-4-4T 207       01/01/1948 EXJ 6w/e 27/03/1953 71D Fratton
Steam O2 0-4-4T 224       01/01/1948 EXJ 5w/e 24/08/1953 70A Nine Elms
Steam O2 0-4-4T 230       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 06/10/1951 71C Dorchester
Steam O2 0-4-4T 232       01/01/1948 EXJ 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 3125       01/01/1948 EXJ 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 3488       01/01/1948 EXJ 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 3520       01/01/1948 EXJ 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34001       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34002       01/01/1948 EXJ m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34003       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 17/06/1950 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34004       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34005       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34006       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34007       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34008       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34009       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34010       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34011       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34013       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34014       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34015       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34016       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 24/02/1958 74B Ramsgate
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34017       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 19/03/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34018       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34019       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34020       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34021       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 08/12/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34024       01/01/1948 EXJ m/e 11/11/1963 70F Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34025       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34026       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 24/02/1958 74B Ramsgate
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34027       01/01/1948 EXJ 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34028       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34029       01/01/1948 EXJ w/e 11/03/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34041       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34042       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34043       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34044       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34045       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34046       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34047       01/01/1948 EXJ 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30707 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 30/06/1949 EXJ 9w/e 30/06/1952 70D Basingstoke
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30706 4w/e 30/06/1949 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 17/06/1950 72A 4w/e 11/12/1954 71B Bournemouth
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30715 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 17/06/1950 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30039 4w/e 17/06/1950 98S   4w/e 09/09/1950 72A 6w/e 20/03/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31829 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31830 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31831 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34003 4w/e 17/06/1950 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30714 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 07/10/1950 72A 04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34034 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950 72A 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31828 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31836 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31846 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31866 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A 4w/e 11/04/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31867 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 13/11/1950 72A 4w/e 11/04/1951 75B Redhill
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 72A 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34021 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 72A 4w/e 14/01/1958 74B Ramsgate
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30580 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C Guildford
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30704 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30705 4w/e 08/12/1950 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 3w/e 17/11/1956 70C Guildford
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30708 4w/e 08/12/1950 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30711 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30712 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31634 01/01/1948 BAS Basingstoke 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31635 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31636 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31843 4w/e 30/06/1949 RED Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 5w/e 11/12/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31844 4w/e 30/06/1949 RED Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A 6w/e 13/08/1952 71D Fratton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30021 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C Guildford 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30023 01/01/1948 BPL Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30321 01/01/1948 BPL Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 356 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30374 4w/e 05/02/1951 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30375 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30455 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 11/04/1951 70B Feltham
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30457 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 11/04/1951 70B Feltham
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30670 01/01/1948 BPL Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34012 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34015 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34028 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30041 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 6w/e 18/06/1954 70B Feltham
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31848 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31849 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31851 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 06/10/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31852 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 06/10/1951 71D Fratton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34049 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34050 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34051 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34052 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34053 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34054 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34055 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34056 4w/e 30/06/1949 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 01/01/1948 DOV Dover 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 19/05/1951 30A Stratford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34058 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34059 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A 4w/e 10/10/1955 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30021 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 2w/e 10/10/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30023 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 6w/e 27/03/1953 71D Fratton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 42 01/01/1948 BPL Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 6w/e 18/06/1954 70B Feltham
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30044 01/01/1948 BPL Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30321 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 8w/e 07/10/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30356 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D Fratton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30374 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 4w/e 10/12/1953 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30375 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 8w/e 20/07/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31842 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35005 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 4w/e 19/03/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34013 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34015 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34022 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 4w/e 14/01/1958 74B Ramsgate
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34023 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34028 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A w/e 11/03/1959 71B Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34031 4w/e 08/12/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34032 6w/e 20/03/1951 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34033 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A 4w/e 06/10/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34060 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30040 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A 8w/e 07/10/1952 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30357 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D Fratton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34061 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A 4w/e 24/11/1960 73H Dover
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34062 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30045 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34031 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A w/e 11/03/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42099 18/08/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A 4w/e 21/01/1952 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42103 14/09/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42105 27/09/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A 4w/e 21/01/1952 75A Brighton
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30676 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1952 72A 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35025       4w/e 19/03/1952 72A 6w/e 18/06/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34034 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 19/03/1952 72A m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41313       05/1952 (New) 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41314       05/1952 (New) 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41315       05/1952 (New) 72A 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82010       25/06/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41313 05/1952 72A Exmouth Junction (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A 5w/e 11/03/1955 75E Three Bridges
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41314 05/1952 72A Exmouth Junction (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A 5w/e 11/03/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41315 05/1952 72A Exmouth Junction (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A 5w/e 14/02/1953 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 4w/e 19/04/1952 91S To Southern Region 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82011       01/07/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82012       04/07/1952 (New) 72A 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82013       09/07/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82017       08/08/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82018       08/09/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82019       26/09/1952 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30707 9w/e 30/06/1952 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A 5w/e 14/02/1953 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30708 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A 12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30717 6w/e 13/08/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31840 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31841 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952 72A 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30575 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 5w/e 11/12/1952 72A 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31842 9w/e 30/06/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction 5w/e 11/12/1952 72A 6w/e 18/06/1954 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31837 5w/e 11/12/1952 72C Yeovil Town 5w/e 14/02/1953 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30023 4w/e 26/05/1953 71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A 6w/e 05/10/1960 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30676 4w/e 19/03/1952 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30727 4w/e 06/10/1951 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A 5w/e 11/03/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31851 4w/e 06/10/1951 71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A 9w/e 08/02/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam S15 4-6-0 30846 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury 4w/e 01/10/1953 72A 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31844 8w/e 20/07/1953 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953 72A 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31845 8w/e 20/07/1953 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30374 4w/e 10/12/1953 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 08/02/1954 72A 3w/e 17/11/1956 72B Salisbury
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30667 4w/e 10/12/1953 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 08/02/1954 72A 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30193 4w/e 30/12/1953 70B Feltham 4w/e 08/02/1954 72A 9w/e 12/06/1957 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35013 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1954 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34069 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 4w/e 19/03/1954 72A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35014 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 8w/e 13/05/1954 72A 4w/e 20/08/1954 71B Bournemouth
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35002 8w/e 13/05/1954 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 18/06/1954 72A q/e 06/06/1958 71B Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41296       4w/e 20/08/1954 72A 5w/e 11/03/1955 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35008 4w/e 08/02/1954 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 20/08/1954 72A 4w/e 10/03/1960 71B Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82020       29/09/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 09/10/1954 2B Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82021       06/10/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 09/10/1954 2B Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82022       15/10/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82023       22/10/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82024       29/10/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82025       05/11/1954 (New) 72A 4w/e 24/09/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30315 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A 4w/e 22/03/1958 72B Salisbury
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30691 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34056 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34057 4w/e 06/11/1954 72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954 72A 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31842 6w/e 18/06/1954 72E Barnstaple Junction 5w/e 11/03/1955 72A 6w/e 21/06/1955 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41297 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 21/06/1955 72A 4w/e 10/10/1955 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41306 04/1952 73E Faversham (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 72A 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41307 04/1952 75E Three Bridges (New) 6w/e 21/06/1955 72A 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30956 4w/e 20/08/1954 75A Brighton 5w/e 12/08/1955 72A 5w/e 16/09/1955 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75070       10/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75071       10/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75072       11/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75073       11/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75074       12/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75075       12/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75076       12/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75077       12/1955 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75078       01/1956 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75079       01/1956 (New) 72A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30950 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford Chart Leacon 7w/e 20/04/1956 72A w/e 20/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30956 5w/e 16/09/1955 72B Salisbury 7w/e 20/04/1956 72A 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31635 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956 72A 6w/e 25/01/1957 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31804 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956 72A 6w/e 25/01/1957 70F Fratton
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30183 4w/e 29/10/1953 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 15/06/1956 72A 5w/e 19/07/1957 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31842 6w/e 21/06/1955 72E Barnstaple Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 72A m/e 20/07/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31843 5w/e 11/12/1952 72E Barnstaple Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35026       6w/e 25/01/1957 72A 9w/e 12/06/1957 71B Bournemouth
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35009 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 6w/e 01/04/1957 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41318 6w/e 15/06/1956 74B Ramsgate 9w/e 12/06/1957 72A 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30374 3w/e 17/11/1956 72B Salisbury 9w/e 12/06/1957 72A 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35011 8w/e 13/05/1954 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 12/06/1957 72A 4w/e 10/03/1960 71B Bournemouth
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30199 9w/e 12/06/1957 72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 19/07/1957 72A m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34075 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate 7w/e 08/10/1957 72A 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34076 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate 7w/e 08/10/1957 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34081       7w/e 08/10/1957 72A m/e 20/07/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34086       7w/e 08/10/1957 72A 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C Dover
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34035 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34036 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34037 4w/e 12/05/1951 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A 4w/e 24/02/1958 74B Ramsgate
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34038 4w/e 12/05/1951 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 14/01/1958 72A 4w/e 24/11/1960 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34072       4w/e 24/02/1958 72A m/e 20/07/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34074 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34079       4w/e 24/02/1958 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34104 3w/e 17/11/1956 74C Dover 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34106       4w/e 24/02/1958 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34108       4w/e 24/02/1958 72A m/e 11/11/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34109       4w/e 24/02/1958 72A 7w/e 23/08/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30317 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 22/03/1958 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30726 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D Fratton q/e 06/06/1958 72A 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30955 4w/e 11/12/1954 74A Ashford Chart Leacon 3w/e 13/10/1958 72A 12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31626 5w/e 11/03/1955 72C Yeovil Town 3w/e 13/10/1958 72A w/e 11/03/1959 72C Yeovil Town
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31790 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 3w/e 13/10/1958 72A 6w/e 14/06/1959 72C Yeovil Town
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31791 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 3w/e 13/10/1958 72A 6w/e 14/06/1959 72C Yeovil Town
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30182 6w/e 27/03/1953 72C Yeovil Town 3w/e 13/10/1958 72A 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30027 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C Guildford w/e 11/03/1959 72A 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30327 6w/e 21/06/1955 72B Salisbury w/e 11/03/1959 72A 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30702 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B Salisbury w/e 11/03/1959 72A 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30953 5w/e 19/07/1957 71H Templecombe (S&D) w/e 11/03/1959 72A w/e 15/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34011 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms w/e 11/03/1959 72A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34063 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate w/e 11/03/1959 72A 4w/e 27/05/1963 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34110 01/1951 71B Bournemouth (New) w/e 11/03/1959 72A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30957 3w/e 13/10/1958 72B Salisbury 3w/e 01/05/1959 72A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35026 9w/e 12/06/1957 71B Bournemouth 3w/e 01/05/1959 72A m/e 02/03/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30338 8w/e 13/05/1954 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30718 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30719 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30951 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford Chart Leacon 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30952 6w/e 18/06/1954 74A Ashford Chart Leacon 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30954 5w/e 19/07/1957 72B Salisbury 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31850 01/01/1948 RDG Reading (S.R.) 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 5w/e 26/11/1959 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31851 9w/e 08/02/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 5w/e 26/11/1959 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31852 8w/e 20/07/1953 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 5w/e 26/11/1959 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31853 3w/e 13/10/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31860 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34064 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 4w/e 28/05/1962 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34065 6w/e 21/06/1955 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34107       6w/e 14/06/1959 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30048 5w/e 18/07/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 19/08/1959 72A 4w/e 19/04/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30313 6w/e 18/06/1954 72B Salisbury 4w/e 19/08/1959 72A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4666 4w/e 30/09/1950 87C Danygraig 5w/e 26/11/1959 72A 5w/e 31/12/1959 72F Wadebridge
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4694       5w/e 26/11/1959 72A 5w/e 31/12/1959 72F Wadebridge
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9756       5w/e 26/11/1959 72A 4w/e 06/05/1960 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3633 5w/e 26/11/1959 72F Wadebridge 5w/e 31/12/1959 72A 4w/e 06/05/1960 73H Dover
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3679 5w/e 26/11/1959 72F Wadebridge 5w/e 31/12/1959 72A 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41308 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 6w/e 09/02/1960 72A 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41309 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 6w/e 09/02/1960 72A 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35010 6w/e 27/01/1956 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960 72A 4w/e 20/07/1964 83D Exmouth Junction
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35022 6w/e 18/06/1954 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960 72A m/e 02/03/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35025 6w/e 15/06/1956 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30729 q/e 06/06/1958 72B Salisbury 4w/e 06/05/1960 72A 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30125 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 6w/e 05/10/1960 72A 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34084 4w/e 22/03/1958 74C Dover 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A 4w/e 27/05/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34097 w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A 4w/e 28/05/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34098 w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A 4w/e 28/05/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41292       m/e 10/02/1961 72A 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41299       m/e 10/02/1961 72A 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31855 6w/e 18/06/1954 73C Hither Green m/e 10/02/1961 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31856 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C Hither Green m/e 10/02/1961 72A 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31857 8w/e 17/01/1961 70B Feltham m/e 10/02/1961 72A 4w/e 22/10/1962 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31874 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 72A 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31875 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 72A 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34066 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate m/e 10/02/1961 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34078 6w/e 14/06/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30120 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 18/03/1961 72A m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84020 m/e 10/02/1961 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A w/e 16/09/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84021 m/e 10/02/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A w/e 16/09/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84022 m/e 10/02/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A w/e 16/09/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84023 m/e 10/02/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A w/e 16/09/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31901 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31902 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31903 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31904 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34086 4w/e 22/03/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41238 4w/e 09/08/1952 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 24/06/1961 72A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41270 w/e 13/12/1958 14D Neasden w/e 24/06/1961 72A 4w/e 25/05/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41272 w/e 13/12/1958 14D Neasden w/e 24/06/1961 72A w/e 20/07/1963 84D Leamington
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41284 w/e 07/02/1959 14D Neasden w/e 24/06/1961 72A m/e 12/10/1964 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34109 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 23/08/1961 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 w/e 19/12/1959 16D Annesley w/e 16/09/1961 72A m/e 20/07/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41321 w/e 30/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 16/09/1961 72A 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41322 w/e 21/01/1961 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 16/09/1961 72A 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41323 w/e 09/01/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 16/09/1961 72A 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30689 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 2w/e 10/10/1961 72A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30697 6w/e 20/04/1955 70C Guildford 2w/e 10/10/1961 72A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30700 w/e 11/03/1959 70C Guildford 2w/e 10/10/1961 72A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31409 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961 72A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31848 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961 72A 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34070 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961 72A 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34083 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/11/1961 72A 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31818 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/02/1962 72A 2w/e 31/08/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31406 3w/e 26/05/1961 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 05/03/1962 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80035 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80036 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A 09/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34020 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037 4w/e 28/05/1962 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 2w/e 10/01/1965 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80038 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 4w/e 27/07/1963 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80039 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 2w/e 10/01/1965 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80040 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 06/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80041 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80042 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 06/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80043 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 6w/e 12/10/1964 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 6w/e 12/10/1964 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80064 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 72A 4w/e 13/06/1965 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam W 2-6-4T 31917 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1962 72A 3w/e 30/01/1963 70B Feltham
Steam Q 0-6-0 30530 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 72A 4w/e 22/07/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam Q 0-6-0 30531 4w/e 09/09/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 72A 4w/e 22/07/1963 75E Three Bridges
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4666 5w/e 31/12/1959 72F Wadebridge 4w/e 09/02/1963 72A 4w/e 29/06/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4694 5w/e 31/12/1959 72F Wadebridge 4w/e 09/02/1963 72A 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41206 w/e 30/09/1961 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 09/02/1963 72A 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4655 4w/e 04/11/1961 83B Taunton 4w/e 09/03/1963 72A 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6400 4w/e 18/04/1959 83D Laira 4w/e 06/04/1963 72A 4w/e 30/11/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6430 4w/e 09/02/1963 88H Tondu 4w/e 06/04/1963 72A 4w/e 30/11/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41291 7w/e 03/05/1961 75A Brighton 4w/e 06/04/1963 72A 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82001 4w/e 08/09/1962 86C Hereford 4w/e 04/05/1963 72A 4w/e 28/12/1963 83B Taunton
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82002 4w/e 06/10/1962 86C Hereford 4w/e 04/05/1963 72A 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2241 4w/e 17/05/1958 85C Hereford 4w/e 27/07/1963 72A 5w/e 31/08/1963 86C Hereford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4692 w/e 11/03/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/07/1963 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6412 4w/e 11/08/1956 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/07/1963 72A 4w/e 30/11/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2214 4w/e 31/12/1960 89A Shrewsbury 5w/e 31/08/1963 72A 4w/e 27/12/1964 83D Exmouth Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3759 5w/e 18/07/1959 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 3w/e 28/03/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4610 4w/e 24/06/1963 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616 4w/e 01/04/1963 70E Salisbury 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 4w/e 22/02/1964 86G Pontypool Road
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31812 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31821 m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31854 3w/e 26/05/1961 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31859 m/e 08/12/1961 70C Guildford 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4666 4w/e 29/06/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73161 w/e 22/06/1963 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73162 w/e 22/06/1963 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 2w/e 10/01/1965 81F Oxford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80038 4w/e 27/07/1963 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 07/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41302 4w/e 01/06/1963 83D Laira 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41315 4w/e 01/06/1963 83D Laira 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D m/e 02/03/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41316 4w/e 01/06/1963 83D Laira 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D m/e 20/07/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41317 4w/e 01/06/1963 83D Laira 4w/e 28/09/1963 83D 12/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3517 4w/e 01/06/1963 83C Exeter 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D Exmouth Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3519 4w/e 01/06/1963 83C Exeter 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 2w/e 31/05/1967 83A Newton Abbot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3521 4w/e 06/09/1958 83C Exeter 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 1w/e 15/01/1966 84A Laira
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4129 07/05/1962 83C Exeter (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 2w/e 31/05/1967 83A Newton Abbot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4130 14/05/1962 83C Exeter (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 5w/e 01/05/1966 85A Worcester
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4162 04/05/1962 83C Exeter (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 2w/e 31/05/1967 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4162 04/05/1962 83C Exeter (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 2w/e 31/05/1967 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4673 4w/e 16/06/1962 83C Exeter 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 4w/e 30/11/1963 83C Westbury
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73030 4w/e 17/05/1958 10C Patricroft 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 6w/e 12/10/1964 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73044 11/1953 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 2w/e 10/01/1965 81F Oxford
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73166 w/e 22/06/1963 26F Patricroft 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82040 4w/e 03/11/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34054 9w/e 30/06/1952 72B Salisbury 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34061 m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D m/e 20/07/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34084 4w/e 27/05/1963 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2277 2w/e 17/11/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 30/11/1963 83D 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3205 4w/e 12/01/1963 86C Hereford 4w/e 28/12/1963 83D 4w/e 27/12/1964 83D Exmouth Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1210 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 22/02/1964 83D m/e 02/03/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41210 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 22/02/1964 83D m/e 02/03/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75005 4w/e 25/01/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 13/04/1964 83D 5w/e 16/05/1965 83E Yeovil Town
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75025 4w/e 25/01/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 13/04/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85A Worcester
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82035 4w/e 28/12/1963 82E Bristol Barrow Road 6w/e 13/04/1964 83D 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82039 4w/e 03/11/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 6w/e 13/04/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75022 4w/e 07/10/1961 81F Oxford 3w/e 04/05/1964 83D 2w/e 21/02/1965 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3516 4w/e 01/06/1963 83D Laira 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 7w/e 07/11/1965 83C Westbury
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3517 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 4w/e 06/12/1969 84B St Blazey
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82030 4w/e 04/11/1961 83B Taunton 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82042 4w/e 04/11/1961 83B Taunton 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82044 4w/e 04/11/1961 83B Taunton 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41223 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224 4w/e 06/04/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D m/e 12/10/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35010 4w/e 10/03/1960 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 20/07/1964 83D m/e 14/09/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9647 3w/e 19/05/1951 83B Taunton 6w/e 12/10/1964 83D 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75008 4w/e 20/07/1964 83G Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 12/10/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85A Worcester
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41208 4w/e 28/12/1963 83F Barnstaple Junction w/e 15/11/1964 83D w/e 22/11/1964 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41216 4w/e 09/02/1963 72E Barnstaple Junction w/e 15/11/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41249 4w/e 28/12/1963 83F Barnstaple Junction w/e 22/11/1964 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2214 5w/e 31/08/1963 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/12/1964 83D 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3205 4w/e 28/12/1963 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/12/1964 83D 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80035 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town 2w/e 10/01/1965 83D 2w/e 21/02/1965 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1442 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town 2w/e 21/02/1965 83D      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1450 6w/e 12/10/1964 83E Yeovil Town 2w/e 21/02/1965 83D 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75022 2w/e 21/02/1965 82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 07/03/1965 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 85A Worcester
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037 2w/e 10/01/1965 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 07/03/1965 83D 4w/e 13/06/1965 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80039 2w/e 10/01/1965 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 07/03/1965 83D 5w/e 16/05/1965 83E Yeovil Town