Depot: Edge Hill
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Edge Hill | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13271 | on | 10/01/1934 (New) | 8A | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13255 | on | 28/12/1933 | 14B | Kentish Town (New) | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 8A | w/e | 21/09/1935 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13256 | on | 19/12/1933 | 14B | Kentish Town (New) | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 8A | w/e | 23/02/1935 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13257 | on | 23/12/1933 | 14B | Kentish Town (New) | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 8A | w/e | 26/04/1947 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13270 | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/10/1934 | 8A | w/e | 15/06/1935 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13280 | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/01/1935 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13260 | w/e | 24/11/1934 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/03/1935 | 8A | w/e | 03/08/1935 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2961 | w/e | 24/11/1934 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/03/1935 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13267 | on | 08/01/1934 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13268 | on | 24/01/1934 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 8A | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2982 | w/e | 19/01/1935 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13284 | w/e | 19/01/1935 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 8A | w/e | 03/08/1935 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2959 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/07/1935 | 8A | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2948 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 26/10/1935 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 1185 | 0-8-2T | 7887 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 5957 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | m/e | 02/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5019 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5022 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5511 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 2665 | 4-6-2T | 6955 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | m/e | 09/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5022 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5602 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 26/10/1935 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/02/1936 | 8A | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 06/02/1936 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6202 | on | 29/06/1935 | 1B | Camden (New) | on | 22/02/1936 | 8A | on | 19/04/1936 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7791 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8A | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9137 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2951 | w/e | 05/10/1935 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1936 | 8A | w/e | 25/09/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2958 | w/e | 15/12/1934 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 20/06/1936 | 8A | w/e | 05/07/1941 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 17/10/1936 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 09/01/1937 | 8A | w/e | 27/02/1937 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2964 | w/e | 05/06/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2965 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | w/e | 26/12/1942 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | w/e | 25/09/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2982 | w/e | 02/01/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | w/e | 04/12/1937 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5298 | m/e | 12/1937 (New) | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2947 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/02/1938 | 8A | w/e | 10/02/1940 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2948 | w/e | 04/06/1938 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 13/08/1938 | 8A | w/e | 17/08/1940 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2981 | w/e | 02/07/1938 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/11/1938 | 8A | w/e | 29/03/1941 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2968 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | w/e | 10/05/1941 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2975 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | w/e | 03/05/1941 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2978 | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | w/e | 03/05/1941 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2955 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 29/04/1939 | 8A | w/e | 10/02/1940 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6201 | on | 16/09/1939 | 1B | Camden | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | on | 05/10/1940 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 29/02/1936 | 1B | Camden | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | on | 06/04/1940 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 16/09/1939 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | on | 06/04/1940 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 28/09/1935 | 1B | Camden | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | on | 09/12/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6206 | on | 15/07/1939 | 9A | Longsight | on | 02/12/1939 | 8A | on | 06/04/1940 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 09/12/1939 | 8A | on | 30/01/1940 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 09/12/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 30/01/1940 | 8A | on | 16/04/1940 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6207 | on | 02/12/1939 | 1B | Camden | on | 01/06/1940 | 8A | on | 10/08/1940 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6208 | on | 02/12/1939 | 1B | Camden | on | 08/06/1940 | 8A | on | 10/08/1940 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 02/11/1940 | 7C | Holyhead | on | 09/11/1940 | 8A | on | 26/12/1942 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 06/04/1940 | 7C | Holyhead | on | 09/11/1940 | 8A | on | 21/03/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 09/11/1940 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 21/03/1942 | 8A | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 27/06/1933 | W1 | (New) | on | 06/04/1942 | 8A | on | 21/04/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 06/04/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 21/04/1942 | 8A | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 21/04/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | on | 17/10/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 21/03/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | on | 17/10/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 17/10/1942 | 8A | on | 03/04/1943 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 16/05/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 17/10/1942 | 8A | on | 27/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2945 | w/e | 24/01/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/11/1942 | 8A | w/e | 26/12/1942 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2978 | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 14/11/1942 | 8A | w/e | 27/10/1945 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 17/10/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 03/04/1943 | 8A | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 26/12/1942 | 1B | Camden | on | 03/04/1943 | 8A | on | 09/10/1943 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2958 | w/e | 05/07/1941 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/08/1943 | 8A | w/e | 09/03/1946 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2972 | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/08/1943 | 8A | w/e | 27/10/1945 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 03/04/1943 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 09/10/1943 | 8A | on | 27/11/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 02/11/1940 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/01/1944 | 8A | on | 12/07/1947 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6201 | on | 05/10/1940 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | on | 24/03/1945 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 27/11/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 27/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | on | 24/05/1945 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2958 | w/e | 28/08/1943 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 09/03/1946 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1946 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2958 | w/e | 09/03/1946 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1946 | 8A | w/e | 26/04/1947 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 27674 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2946 | w/e | 17/11/1945 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | w/e | 20/07/1946 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2955 | w/e | 17/11/1945 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | w/e | 26/04/1947 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2972 | w/e | 27/10/1945 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | w/e | 20/07/1946 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2925 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6100 | on | 08/06/1946 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | on | 05/11/1959 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6163 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 20/01/1944 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 12/07/1947 | 8A | on | 18/10/1947 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | on | 17/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 20/05/1944 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | on | 14/02/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51318 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11445 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11439 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12111 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 10/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52170 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | Bury | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | on | 18/09/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7402 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 99H | Horwich Works | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7404 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 24/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7597 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7603 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6900 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46917 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9016 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9032 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5B | Crewe South | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8966 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8908 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9355 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8927 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25D | Mirfield | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8898 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8933 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9155 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9242 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9287 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9333 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1A | Willesden | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 20/05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7930 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | on | 07/08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7933 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7938 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | on | 21/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7951 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7956 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | on | 27/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7958 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | on | 04/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7959 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 6 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 7 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 50 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 16C | Mansfield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2426 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2459 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2564 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2597 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2612 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 628 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 495 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4904 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4935 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5045 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5256 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 6J | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5298 | m/e | 12/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5332 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5344 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5347 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 7C | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5351 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 04/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5380 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5387 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5398 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5399 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5400 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5567 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 10C | Patricroft | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5586 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5592 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5613 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5623 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5634 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 17A | Derby | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5666 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5672 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 17A | Derby | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5673 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5681 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5724 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5725 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5500 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5501 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5517 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 3D | Aston | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5520 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5523 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5526 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 21C | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5533 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5543 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5547 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6106 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6111 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6124 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6134 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6135 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6136 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6138 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6144 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6156 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6164 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46924 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7932 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6200 | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 17/01/1948 | 8A | on | 13/03/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5511 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8A | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2596 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 18/10/1947 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 14/02/1948 | 8A | on | 22/09/1951 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9038 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8A | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 18/10/1947 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | on | 21/02/1948 | 8A | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7931 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8A | w/e | 15/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50692 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8A | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10695 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8A | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50696 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 27580 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8A | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7320 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2583 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8A | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2602 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 8A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9C | Macclesfield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7937 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7294 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6147 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 8A | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8A | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8A | on | 13/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58890 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49006 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 8A | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8948 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8A | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9346 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8A | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8932 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5534 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 8A | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9287 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 8A | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58897 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8A | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7720 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8A | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7799 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8A | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45567 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45242 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45248 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45276 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45596 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52330 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58921 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2564 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45181 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45236 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45242 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 03/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45248 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45276 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46126 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 1B | Camden | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 13/03/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 11/12/1948 | 8A | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46201 | on | 24/03/1945 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 11/12/1948 | 8A | on | 13/06/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46204 | on | 24/05/1945 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 11/12/1948 | 8A | on | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52330 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 15/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9136 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4905 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44906 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 8A | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49357 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 2C | Northampton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49241 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49298 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49104 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49224 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46137 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 8A | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49404 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 8A | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49419 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49427 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 8A | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 4E | Tredegar |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45005 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 47936 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 8A | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45017 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45538 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44868 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58911 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50687 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8A | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50695 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8A | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44907 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8A | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8A | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 4E | Tredegar | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 8A | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25352 | m/e | 11/1935 | Withdrawn | w/e | 24/09/1949 (R) | 8A | |||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45724 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46136 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46204 | on | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/10/1949 | 8A | on | 10/06/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46205 | on | 21/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/10/1949 | 8A | on | 07/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48457 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48512 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48513 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 18/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45670 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46153 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8943 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8A | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45515 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8A | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45393 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 8A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45393 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49181 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 2E | Warwick | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8A | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40055 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 8A | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45721 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45737 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45738 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40054 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 8A | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45303 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 8A | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | m/e | 07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44768 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44769 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44772 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44773 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49445 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2F | Coventry | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 8A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49399 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45531 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49412 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | RA | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45531 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8A | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49301 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 8A | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7407 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40001 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40003 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40007 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49394 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49081 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49173 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49200 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45333 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45726 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46204 | on | 10/06/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 30/09/1950 | 8A | on | 22/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49394 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49082 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49173 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49200 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | on | 28/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45333 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45343 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45726 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45028 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49392 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49392 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42892 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42925 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45113 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47519 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44773 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45113 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47519 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44773 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45547 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47487 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47498 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45305 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45741 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47411 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47430 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47487 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47489 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47498 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45305 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45741 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45019 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45676 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45510 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45019 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45676 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45510 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45017 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45070 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45181 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45343 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46144 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46153 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49423 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 2C | Warwick | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9239 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 8A | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49423 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8A | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46166 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45647 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46151 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46158 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46165 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45647 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46151 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46158 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46165 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48260 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45039 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49271 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46205 | on | 07/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 15/09/1951 | 8A | on | 10/11/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | on | 16/05/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46207 | on | 10/08/1940 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | on | 04/02/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46208 | on | 10/08/1940 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42426 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49271 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42426 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 8A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45534 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49314 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9368 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49434 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9437 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | w/e | 01/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48260 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8A | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52105 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8A | w/e | 25/04/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51313 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8A | on | 27/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45128 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12018 | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 14/07/1952 | 8A | w/e | 11/10/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46205 | on | 10/11/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/09/1952 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46205 | on | 20/09/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | on | 22/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45256 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 6J | Holyhead | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46149 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 7C | Holyhead | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46152 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9A | Longsight | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52140 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 16/05/1953 | 8A | on | 23/05/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 22/09/1951 | 66A | Polmadie | on | 16/05/1953 | 8A | on | 23/05/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45249 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45289 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46106 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46166 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 23/05/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 11/09/1953 | 8A | on | 12/06/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45250 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45388 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42121 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46226 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8A | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45373 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46110 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45005 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 8A | w/e | 27/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45410 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8A | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45603 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | Camden | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45535 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8A | on | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42664 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41116 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41121 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41166 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 26/06/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 18/09/1954 | 8A | on | 25/06/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46206 | on | 21/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 25/09/1954 | 8A | on | 23/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46132 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46157 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46228 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45516 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45544 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46132 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46226 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46254 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 8A | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48509 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8A | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46211 | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/10/1955 | 8A | on | 09/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46114 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46142 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45401 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 8A | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46212 | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 28/01/1956 | 8A | on | 10/03/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46207 | on | 22/09/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 04/02/1956 | 8A | on | 25/02/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46207 | on | 04/02/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 25/02/1956 | 8A | on | 03/10/1959 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48433 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 8A | w/e | 06/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45552 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45583 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 8A | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44773 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 8A | w/e | 16/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46147 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6J | Holyhead | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46211 | on | 09/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 16/06/1956 | 8A | on | 07/07/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 25/06/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 15/09/1956 | 8A | on | 22/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46210 | on | 18/02/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 15/09/1956 | 8A | on | 06/07/1958 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47566 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45539 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42564 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 8A | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45623 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 8A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48280 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 8A | w/e | 07/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45249 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8A | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 22/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 21/09/1957 | 8A | on | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46204 | on | 22/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 21/09/1957 | 8A | on | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45516 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 8A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46130 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6J | Holyhead | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 8A | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47488 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45554 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45560 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46137 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8A | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47431 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8A | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49394 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8A | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42602 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8A | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45630 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45689 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48504 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45032 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46147 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46155 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46156 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46204 | on | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 05/07/1958 | 8A | on | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3576 | on | 20/08/1958 (New) | 8A | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46209 | on | 02/05/1942 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 06/09/1958 | 8A | on | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 23/05/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 20/09/1958 | 8A | on | 20/08/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3578 | on | 22/09/1958 (New) | 8A | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42441 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45586 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45678 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45733 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45256 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3579 | on | 25/09/1958 | 24K | Preston (New) | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 8A | on | 16/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49366 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49116 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8A | m/e | 31/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49416 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8A | w/e | 01/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49130 | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | w/e | 15/11/1958 (R) | 8A | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 22L | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45549 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48249 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 8A | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48318 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 8A | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46211 | on | 07/07/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 29/11/1958 | 8A | on | 07/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48504 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49132 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 8A | w/e | 18/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49405 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49435 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 8A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49082 | w/e | 16/11/1957 | Withdrawn | w/e | 28/02/1959 (R) | 8A | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47656 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46130 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 8A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 8A | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47285 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 8A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47594 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 8A | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49243 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 8A | w/e | 11/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44714 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44905 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D215 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 8A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D218 | on | 07/07/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 8A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D220 | on | 13/07/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44905 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D222 | on | 27/07/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 8A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45678 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49064 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4E | Tredegar | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 04/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45281 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45578 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45583 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45586 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45613 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45666 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D223 | on | 05/08/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45704 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 8A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D231 | on | 11/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D234 | on | 25/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 8A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D236 | on | 05/10/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 8A | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48683 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8A | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47289 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47336 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46211 | on | 07/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 21/11/1959 | 8A | on | 11/03/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2912 | on | 28/12/1959 (New) | 8A | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2913 | on | 31/12/1959 (New) | 8A | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42459 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 8A | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42583 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 8A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48927 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8A | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45380 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8A | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45398 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D214 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D268 | on | 28/03/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44838 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 09/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45187 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45440 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D9 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D235 | on | 28/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48742 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45412 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45438 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51441 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45196 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 8A | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49444 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49155 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 8A | w/e | 26/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D290 | on | 22/08/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44758 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 20/08/1960 | 1B | Camden | on | 10/09/1960 | 8A | on | 11/03/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49448 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49262 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45735 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46126 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46154 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46233 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 08/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44855 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49352 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D293 | on | 12/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44682 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45381 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45680 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45188 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45410 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 8A | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48349 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 8A | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49037 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 8A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45091 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8A | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45307 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45392 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2E | Northampton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D305 | on | 06/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D309 | on | 16/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D300 | on | 31/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D306 | on | 13/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D312 | on | 13/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45520 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45543 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8A | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42081 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46236 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D303 | on | 18/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D328 | on | 11/01/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49002 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49142 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49415 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47594 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 8A | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47166 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49352 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46229 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46241 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8A | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46243 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D343 | on | 10/05/1961 (New) | 8A | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D344 | on | 18/05/1961 (New) | 8A | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49130 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 8A | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45524 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45547 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45551 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8A | w/e | 16/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49142 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8A | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2198 | on | 22/06/1961 (New) | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2393 | on | 03/07/1961 (New) | 8A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47597 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 8A | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2373 | on | 02/08/1961 (New) | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D331 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D332 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45513 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45518 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42599 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45533 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45655 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45671 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8A | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45094 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45327 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45340 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45041 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45131 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45284 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46110 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46116 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | on | 17/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46134 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49114 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 18/11/1961 (R) | 8A | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45015 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 8A | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D219 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46110 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 8A | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45254 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 8A | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47594 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 8A | w/e | 11/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45148 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 8A | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45295 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45316 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 8A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48188 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | w/e | 14/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48746 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49377 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49293 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48425 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45139 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 8A | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D173 | on | 13/07/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 8A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D223 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8A | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45139 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48078 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48469 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48532 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48652 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48702 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 55B | Stourton | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48509 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48512 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 8A | w/e | 24/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42815 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 8A | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42848 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 8A | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42886 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 8A | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42920 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | on | 26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42924 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42925 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | on | 28/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42851 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 8A | on | 30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4154 | on | 13/12/1962 (New) | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4155 | on | 14/12/1962 (New) | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42833 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 8A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3019 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3370 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44964 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45156 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 8A | w/e | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45312 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 8A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44864 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45244 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 8A | w/e | 03/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48029 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 8A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45188 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 8A | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47349 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8A | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47230 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8A | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47485 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 8A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48425 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8A | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45103 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45261 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 8A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45338 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 8A | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45414 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 8A | w/e | 06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48026 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48151 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48176 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48189 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48199 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48200 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44827 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8A | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45466 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8A | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D228 | on | 28/08/1959 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 8A | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D290 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 8A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47415 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 8A | w/e | 16/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45617 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | on | 07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45672 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | on | 07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45676 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45733 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46239 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46240 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 8A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2391 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2392 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 8A | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45402 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47406 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8A | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48029 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48129 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8A | w/e | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48296 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48303 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48163 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75060 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8A | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44837 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8A | w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44863 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48293 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44688 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8A | w/e | 20/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44717 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 8A | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3858 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47493 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 8A | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 8A | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3836 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44926 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8A | w/e | 20/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44933 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3578 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48467 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48528 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 8A | w/e | 05/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48178 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48371 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48536 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44666 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44774 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45426 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 8A | w/e | 23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48056 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48258 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 8A | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48743 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48045 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48119 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48124 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48604 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8A | w/e | 29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48687 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 28/01/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48696 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48395 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 8A | w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48529 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48665 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44777 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45287 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44834 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 8A | w/e | 09/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48012 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 8A | w/e | 30/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4147 | on | 25/09/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8A | w/e | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48268 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8A | w/e | 28/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48450 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 8A | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48374 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48692 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3950 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48294 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45055 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | w/e | 03/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45375 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8A | w/e | 27/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48362 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 23/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48614 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 27/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48715 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48752 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44711 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45282 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45296 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | w/e | 23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 8A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn |