Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 421 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8158 Week
» 19863 Month
» 351352 Year
» 427939 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Eastfield


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Eastfield Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam K2 2-6-0 1703 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 25/11/1924 EFD 05/01/1925 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4695 07/1921 NWE New England (New) 22/12/1924 EFD 30/08/1927 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4698 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 22/12/1924 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4700 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 22/12/1924 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4704 09/1921 NWE New England (New) 22/12/1924 EFD 20/02/1925 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4691 07/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 23/02/1925 EFD 12/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4696 07/1921 NWE New England (New) 02/03/1925 EFD 27/11/1927 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4701 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 12/03/1925 EFD 07/01/1939 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4692 07/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 27/03/1925 EFD 15/06/1925 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4697 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 01/04/1925 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4699 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 01/04/1925 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4694 07/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 07/06/1925 EFD 31/07/1927 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4703 05/01/1925 DON Doncaster 03/07/1925 EFD 12/1925 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4693 07/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 07/07/1925 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4702 08/1921 NWE New England (New) 20/08/1925 EFD 12/1925 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4704 20/02/1925 STM St Margarets 1927 EFD 07/01/1939 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4692 15/06/1925 STM St Margarets 1928 EFD 07/10/1939 FW Fort William
Steam J39 0-6-0 2732 29/05/1929 YK York (North) (New) 30/05/1929 EFD 17/04/1943 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2731 30/05/1929 YK York (North) (New) 31/05/1929 EFD 17/04/1943 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2738       03/07/1929 (New) EFD 18/08/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 2788       24/02/1930 (New) EFD 11/07/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 2787 17/02/1930 HTN Heaton (New) 27/02/1930 EFD 23/09/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam K2 2-6-0 4682 06/1921 NWE New England (New) 29/10/1931 EFD 01/1939 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2733 06/06/1929 PKD Parkhead (New) 30/10/1931 EFD 17/04/1943 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2734 11/06/1929 PKD Parkhead (New) 30/10/1931 EFD 07/11/1933 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam K2 2-6-0 4685 06/1921 DON Doncaster (New) 30/10/1931 EFD 02/05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2740 09/07/1929 CAR Carlisle Canal (New) 11/11/1931 EFD 01/02/1933 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam K2 2-6-0 4684 06/1921 NWE New England (New) 17/11/1931 EFD 02/1940 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4674 22/03/1930 STR Stratford 11/12/1931 EFD 07/08/1938 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2977       27/05/1932 (New) EFD 13/04/1943 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam J39 0-6-0 2978       07/06/1932 (New) EFD 17/04/1943 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam J39 0-6-0 2979       15/06/1932 (New) EFD 17/04/1943 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam J39 0-6-0 2980       16/06/1932 (New) EFD 17/04/1943 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam A1 4-6-2 2565 10/08/1935 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/05/1936 EFD 09/06/1936 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam A1 4-6-2 2566 18/08/1930 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 07/02/1937 EFD 02/02/1940 STM St Margarets
Steam A1 4-6-2 2567 18/08/1930 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 07/02/1937 EFD 20/11/1938 STM St Margarets
Steam A1 4-6-2 2564 14/07/1924 HAY Haymarket (New) 15/02/1937 EFD 20/11/1940 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam A1 4-6-2 2565 09/06/1936 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 28/03/1937 EFD 19/11/1940 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam A1 4-6-2 2563 27/04/1935 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 27/11/1937 EFD 19/07/1938 STM St Margarets
Steam A3 4-6-2 2796 06/03/1938 HAY Haymarket 19/07/1938 EFD 05/10/1940 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam A3 4-6-2 2797 15/02/1937 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 20/11/1938 EFD 02/02/1940 STM St Margarets
Steam A1 4-6-2 2556 15/03/1939 STM St Margarets 02/02/1940 EFD 04/12/1940 HAY Haymarket
Steam A1 4-6-2 2567 20/11/1938 STM St Margarets 02/02/1940 EFD 20/11/1940 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam K2 2-6-0 4701 07/01/1939 STM St Margarets 07/03/1940 EFD 07/07/1940 FW Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4704 07/01/1939 STM St Margarets 07/07/1940 EFD 29/07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 2563 12/01/1940 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 11/10/1940 EFD 04/12/1940 HAY Haymarket
Steam J39 0-6-0 1880 19/06/1937 CAR Carlisle Canal 27/05/1941 EFD 28/08/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1863 13/04/1938 CAR Carlisle Canal (New) 06/1941 EFD 08/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V4 2-6-2 3402 21/03/1941 DON Doncaster (New) 12/09/1941 EFD 24/05/1954 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam K2 2-6-0 4684 02/1940 STM St Margarets 09/1942 EFD 16/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4682 01/1939 STM St Margarets 07/09/1942 EFD 20/11/1949 PKD Parkhead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1804 25/03/1938 STM St Margarets (New) 28/09/1942 EFD 18/01/1943 PKD Parkhead
Steam K2 2-6-0 4686 25/01/1932 STM St Margarets 10/1942 EFD 23/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4694 31/07/1927 STM St Margarets 10/1942 EFD 21/05/1957 65J Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 4695 30/08/1927 STM St Margarets 10/1942 EFD 07/12/1942 STM St Margarets
Steam K2 2-6-0 4696 27/11/1927 STM St Margarets 10/1942 EFD 07/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4702 12/1925 STM St Margarets 07/10/1942 EFD 05/10/1952 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4674 07/08/1938 STM St Margarets 07/12/1942 EFD 07/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 6139 03/1907 LNG Langwith Junction (New) 31/03/1943 EFD 21/04/1943 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam J39 0-6-0 1804 18/01/1943 PKD Parkhead 17/04/1943 EFD 18/07/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam K2 2-6-0 4689 07/01/1932 STM St Margarets 24/04/1943 EFD 05/10/1952 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4695 07/12/1942 STM St Margarets 24/04/1943 EFD 23/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 4703 12/1925 STM St Margarets 24/04/1943 EFD 23/09/1952 61A Kittybrewster
Steam V2 2-6-2 3683       02/06/1943 (New) EFD 20/08/1945 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 3684 07/1943 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 01/07/1943 (New) EFD 10/1943 EFD Eastfield
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5058 09/11/1942 LNG Langwith Junction 26/08/1943 EFD 13/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 6139 21/04/1943 LNG Langwith Junction 26/08/1943 EFD 18/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 3684 01/07/1943 EFD Eastfield (New) 10/1943 EFD 20/08/1945 HAY Haymarket
Steam V4 2-6-2 3401 24/02/1942 HAY Haymarket 23/10/1943 EFD 24/05/1954 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam V2 2-6-2 3682 12/05/1943 HAY Haymarket (New) 05/11/1944 EFD 20/08/1945 ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam K2 2-6-0 4639 29/09/1938 NWE New England 14/12/1945 EFD 14/12/1947 PKD Parkhead
Steam K1 2-6-0 3445 06/07/1946 THJ Thornton Junction 24/08/1946 EFD 01/09/1946 THJ Thornton Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 1070       28/08/1946 (New) EFD 16/09/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 1071       29/08/1946 (New) EFD 30/08/1946 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam B1 4-6-0 1073       06/09/1946 (New) EFD 16/09/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 1072       07/09/1946 (New) EFD 21/09/1946 HAY Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 1116       13/01/1947 (New) EFD 18/05/1952 34E Neasden
Steam B1 4-6-0 1117       15/01/1947 (New) EFD 07/11/1955 65C Parkhead
Steam B1 4-6-0 1197       29/05/1947 (New) EFD 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam B1 4-6-0 1172 09/06/1947 GOR Gorton (New) 13/06/1947 EFD 27/01/1956 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 1180       30/06/1947 (New) EFD 20/06/1955 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 1243       14/10/1947 (New) EFD 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam B1 4-6-0 1260       26/11/1947 (New) EFD 21/03/1957 64B Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 1261       28/11/1947 (New) EFD 21/03/1957 64B Haymarket
Steam D33 4-4-0 62460       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D33 4-4-0 62462       01/01/1948 EFD 11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62469       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 18/04/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62472       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62473       01/01/1948 EFD 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62474       01/01/1948 EFD 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62477       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62479       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 21/03/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62481       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62482       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 31/10/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62489       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 21/03/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62493       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 21/03/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62496       01/01/1948 EFD 20/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62497       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 13/06/1953 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Glen 4-4-0 62498       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 15/05/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8551       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 21/04/1951 65G Yoker
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8552       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 21/04/1951 61A Kittybrewster
Steam C15 4-4-2T 7456       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 27/12/1952 65F Grangemouth
Steam C15 4-4-2T 7460       01/01/1948 EFD 01/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam C15 4-4-2T 7467       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65E Kipps
Steam C16 4-4-2T 7482       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C16 4-4-2T 7485       01/01/1948 EFD 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C16 4-4-2T 7500       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C16 4-4-2T 7501       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 06/10/1951 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam C16 4-4-2T 7502       01/01/1948 EFD 04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2671       01/01/1948 EFD 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2672       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2673       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2674       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2675       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2676       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2680       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2681       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2682       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2684       01/01/1948 EFD 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2686       01/01/1948 EFD 28/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2687       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2688       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 2689       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 13/02/1960 64A St Margarets
Steam J36 0-6-0 5221       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 14/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 5227       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 14/03/1959 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 5228       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5270       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 06/07/1957 65C Parkhead
Steam J36 0-6-0 5273       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 12/04/1958 65C Parkhead
Steam J36 0-6-0 5296       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 26/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5300       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 16/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5308       01/01/1948 EFD 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5315       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 30/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5335       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 17/12/1960 65D Dawsholm
Steam J36 0-6-0 5337       01/01/1948 EFD 04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5339       01/01/1948 EFD 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4540       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4541       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr
Steam J37 0-6-0 4558       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 30/11/1963 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J37 0-6-0 4578       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 21/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4579       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 21/04/1951 65E Kipps
Steam J37 0-6-0 4580       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 27/06/1964 65F Grangemouth
Steam J37 0-6-0 4581       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4583       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 16/06/1951 64F Bathgate
Steam J37 0-6-0 4601       01/01/1948 EFD 5w/e 24/03/1951 64F Bathgate
Steam J37 0-6-0 4610       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 19/01/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam J37 0-6-0 4611       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 24/03/1962 65K Polmont
Steam J37 0-6-0 4622       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4623       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 28/12/1963 65K Polmont
Steam J37 0-6-0 4632       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 30/11/1963 65K Polmont
Steam J37 0-6-0 4633       01/01/1948 EFD 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4638       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 4639       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8953       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 11/05/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8954       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8955       01/01/1948 EFD 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8956       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8957       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8958       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 11/05/1957 66A Polmadie
Steam J72 0-6-0T 8709       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 15/02/1958 65E Kipps
Steam J72 0-6-0T 8733       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 15/02/1958 65E Kipps
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8447       01/01/1948 EFD 02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8468       01/01/1948 EFD 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8475       01/01/1948 EFD 03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8476       01/01/1948 EFD 03/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8479       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J83 0-6-0T 8480       01/01/1948 EFD 03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8326       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 01/10/1955 65F Grangemouth
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8327       01/01/1948 EFD 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8330       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8331       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 22/01/1955 65D Dawsholm
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8333       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8336       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 17/05/1952 66B Motherwell
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8345       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 27/09/1958 65A Eastfield
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8347       01/01/1948 EFD 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 8349       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 12/04/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam K4 2-6-0 1993       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 09/05/1959 62A Thornton Junction
Steam K4 2-6-0 1994       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 19/12/1959 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam K4 2-6-0 1998       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 19/12/1959 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam N14 0-6-2T 9120       01/01/1948 EFD 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N14 0-6-2T 9124       01/01/1948 EFD 11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9126       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 31/08/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9127       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 31/08/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9131       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 12/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9138       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9163       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9165       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65C Parkhead
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9166       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65C Parkhead
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9170       01/01/1948 EFD 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9176       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9177       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9179       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9180       01/01/1948 EFD 8w/e 31/08/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9181       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 12/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9182       01/01/1948 EFD 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9183       01/01/1948 EFD 13/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9184       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9188       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9189       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9191       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9203       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9205       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9178       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 01/07/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9208       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9222       01/01/1948 EFD 4w/e 12/07/1952 64A St Margarets
Steam V1 2-6-2T 7600       01/01/1948 EFD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V1 2-6-2T 7601       01/01/1948 EFD 22/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V1 2-6-2T 7602       01/01/1948 EFD w/e 07/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61340       27/11/1948 (New) EFD 30/01/1961 65F Grangemouth
Steam B1 4-6-0 61341       18/12/1948 (New) EFD 16/01/1949 PKD Parkhead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61342       03/01/1949 (New) EFD 10/11/1966 66B Motherwell
Steam B1 4-6-0 61344       05/03/1949 (New) EFD 28/10/1957 65C Parkhead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61064 14/04/1947 KEI Keith 28/08/1949 EFD 18/05/1955 68E Carlisle Canal
Steam B1 4-6-0 61148 25/04/1947 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 11/09/1949 EFD 29/01/1950 THJ Thornton Junction
Steam K1 2-6-0 61997 15/10/1947 NWE New England 13/11/1949 EFD 24/05/1954 63D Fort William
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67475 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 25/11/1950 65A 04/1954 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61733 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham 14/01/1951 65A 21/01/1951 65C Parkhead
Steam K2 2-6-0 61735 01/05/1949 NWE New England 14/01/1951 65A 21/01/1951 65C Parkhead
Steam K2 2-6-0 61770 08/01/1950 BOS Boston 14/01/1951 65A 01/01/1952 62A Thornton Junction
Steam K2 2-6-0 61741 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick 28/01/1951 65A 23/12/1951 62A Thornton Junction
Steam K2 2-6-0 61755 02/07/1946 BOS Boston 11/02/1951 65A 09/01/1952 62A Thornton Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61067 25/09/1949 64A St Margarets 04/03/1951 65A 18/03/1951 65C Parkhead
Steam K2 2-6-0 61722 27/04/1947 IMM Immingham 11/03/1951 65A 24/02/1952 65C Parkhead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61277 04/03/1951 65C Parkhead 18/03/1951 65A 04/05/1957 62A Thornton Junction
Steam K2 2-6-0 61758 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick 01/04/1951 65A 17/01/1952 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam K2 2-6-0 61769 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick 20/05/1951 65A 24/02/1952 65C Parkhead
Steam K2 2-6-0 61721 13/10/1947 STR Stratford 03/06/1951 65A 20/01/1952 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam K2 2-6-0 61734 02/10/1947 STR Stratford 03/06/1951 65A 10/02/1952 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43137 13/07/1951 31D South Lynn (New) 4w/e 14/07/1951 65A 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43138       20/07/1951 (New) 65A 8w/e 17/04/1954 64F Bathgate
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90313 4w/e 14/07/1951 65D Dawsholm 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 4w/e 31/12/1951 84C Banbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44921 4w/e 02/12/1950 24A Accrington 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 4w/e 17/05/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45214 4w/e 04/11/1950 28B Fleetwood 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 4w/e 25/12/1954 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69185 01/01/1948 CAR Carlisle Canal 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 4w/e 29/12/1951 64A St Margarets
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69197 01/01/1948 CAR Carlisle Canal 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69218 01/01/1948 CAR Carlisle Canal 8w/e 09/09/1951 65A 4w/e 26/08/1961 65D Dawsholm
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43133       30/11/1951 (New) 65A 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43134       30/11/1951 (New) 65A 4w/e 17/03/1956 65E Kipps
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43135       31/12/1951 (New) 65A 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43136       31/12/1951 (New) 65A 8w/e 16/04/1955 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45400 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 26/01/1952 65A 4w/e 25/12/1954 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68952 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 26/01/1952 65A 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62011 21/05/1950 31B March 10/02/1952 65A 01/06/1952 63D Fort William
Steam K1 2-6-0 62012 21/05/1950 31B March 10/02/1952 65A 01/06/1952 63D Fort William
Steam K1 2-6-0 62031 24/08/1949 MAR March (New) 17/02/1952 65A 24/05/1954 63D Fort William
Steam K1 2-6-0 62034 01/09/1949 MAR March (New) 17/02/1952 65A 24/05/1954 63D Fort William
Steam K1 2-6-0 62052 04/11/1949 MAR March (New) 17/02/1952 65A 24/05/1954 63D Fort William
Steam B1 4-6-0 61396       20/02/1952 (New) 65A 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44908 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 8w/e 19/04/1952 65A 4w/e 14/06/1952 65A Eastfield
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69171 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 8w/e 19/04/1952 65A 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69214 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 8w/e 19/04/1952 65A 05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61140 16/06/1947 NEA Neasden 18/05/1952 65A 10/11/1966 66B Motherwell
Steam K2 2-6-0 61782 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 06/1952 65A 05/10/1952 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 61789 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 01/06/1952 65A 30/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44908 8w/e 19/04/1952 65A Eastfield 4w/e 14/06/1952 65A 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A Perth South
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68336 4w/e 17/05/1952 66B Motherwell 4w/e 14/06/1952 65A 4w/e 15/05/1954 65E Kipps
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67664 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/06/1952 65A 4w/e 24/03/1962 67B Hurlford
Steam C16 4-4-2T 67488 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 12/07/1952 65A 4w/e 29/10/1955 64E Polmont
Steam B1 4-6-0 61133 19/08/1951 61A Kittybrewster 01/02/1953 65A 20/05/1953 91S To Southern Region
Steam B1 4-6-0 61134 09/10/1949 61A Kittybrewster 22/02/1953 65A 21/01/1956 62A Thornton Junction
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67454 4w/e 27/12/1952 63B Stirling 8w/e 21/03/1953 65A 06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61783 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 27/04/1953 65A 06/07/1953 63D Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 61788 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 27/04/1953 65A 06/07/1953 63D Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 61790 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 27/04/1953 65A 06/07/1953 63D Fort William
Steam K2 2-6-0 61791 07/07/1940 FW Fort William 27/04/1953 65A 06/07/1953 63D Fort William
Steam B1 4-6-0 61133 20/05/1953 91S To Southern Region 21/06/1953 65A 02/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43132 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A 4w/e 17/03/1956 65E Kipps
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43133 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A 8w/e 22/12/1956 65E Kipps
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43135 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A 4w/e 30/07/1960 65C Parkhead
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43137 4w/e 16/05/1953 63D Fort William 4w/e 11/07/1953 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65F Grangemouth
Steam B1 4-6-0 61294 01/03/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 13/09/1953 65A 09/06/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44908 8w/e 05/09/1953 63A Perth South 4w/e 28/11/1953 65A 4w/e 26/10/1957 67D Ardrossan
Steam B1 4-6-0 61333 31/01/1954 64F Bathgate 19/04/1954 65A 09/06/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44968 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45011 8w/e 19/04/1952 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 8w/e 09/07/1955 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45119 4w/e 06/10/1951 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 25/12/1954 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45396 8w/e 09/09/1951 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 25/12/1954 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam K4 2-6-0 61995 01/01/1948 FW Fort William 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 19/12/1959 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam K4 2-6-0 61996 01/01/1948 FW Fort William 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 09/05/1959 62A Thornton Junction
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69163 4w/e 25/11/1950 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 12/06/1954 65A 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam C15 4-4-2T 67474 01/01/1948 CAR Carlisle Canal 4w/e 25/09/1954 65A 12/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90049 4w/e 12/06/1954 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 27/11/1954 65A 6w/e 30/12/1961 65D Dawsholm
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90489       4w/e 27/11/1954 65A 6w/e 30/12/1961 65D Dawsholm
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44956 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66E Carstairs
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44957 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44995 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A 4w/e 21/01/1956 68B Dumfries
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44996 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1954 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73077       13/05/1955 (New) 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43136 8w/e 16/04/1955 63A Perth South 4w/e 14/05/1955 65A 4w/e 30/07/1960 65C Parkhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44787 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 14/05/1955 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73078       21/05/1955 (New) 65A 5w/e 29/01/1966 66E Carstairs
Steam Dock 0-6-0T 56152 01/01/1948 31D Grangemouth 4w/e 01/10/1955 65A 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44707 4w/e 14/05/1955 63D Oban 4w/e 29/10/1955 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73105       12/1955 (New) 65A 4w/e 26/12/1964 65F Grangemouth
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106       12/1955 (New) 65A 4w/e 06/07/1957 60A Inverness
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73107       12/1955 (New) 65A 4w/e 06/07/1957 60A Inverness
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73108       12/1955 (New) 65A 5w/e 29/01/1966 66E Carstairs
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73109       01/1956 (New) 65A 10/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13207       26/01/1956 (New) 65A 4w/e 25/07/1964 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13208       03/02/1956 (New) 65A 4w/e 25/07/1964 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13209       09/02/1956 (New) 65A 8w/e 25/06/1966 67B Hurlford
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67603 4w/e 21/01/1956 65E Kipps 4w/e 17/03/1956 65A 02/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61787 07/10/1939 FW Fort William 09/04/1956 65A 29/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam K2 2-6-0 61788 06/07/1953 63D Fort William 09/04/1956 65A 26/06/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13275       22/10/1956 (New) 65A 8w/e 22/12/1956 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13276       26/10/1956 (New) 65A 4w/e 15/02/1958 65F Grangemouth
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76074       11/1956 (New) 65A 4w/e 26/08/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44702       4w/e 13/04/1957 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44967 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 13/04/1957 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13210 16/02/1956 62A Thornton Junction (New) 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13211 24/02/1956 62A Thornton Junction (New) 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66C Hamilton (West)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44970 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 11/05/1957 65A 5w/e 26/09/1964 65F Grangemouth
Steam J36 0-6-0 65237 01/01/1948 FW Fort William 4w/e 06/07/1957 65A w/e 13/12/1958 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69212 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 06/07/1957 65A w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64548 4w/e 17/02/1951 65E Kipps 8w/e 31/08/1957 65A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69163 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 8w/e 31/08/1957 65A w/e 12/02/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3386       27/09/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 23/11/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3387       27/09/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 12/04/1958 65G Yoker
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3388       04/10/1957 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/11/1968 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3389       11/10/1957 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/11/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3390       16/10/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 24/03/1962 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3391       18/10/1957 (New) 65A 01/06/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3392       18/10/1957 (New) 65A w/e 22/03/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3393       25/10/1957 (New) 65A w/e 14/06/1975 EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3394       29/10/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/12/1957 65E Kipps
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3395       01/11/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/12/1957 65E Kipps
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3396       08/11/1957 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/04/1968 67A Corkerhill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44908 4w/e 26/10/1957 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 18/01/1958 65A 4w/e 19/01/1963 66B Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3418 12/03/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 12/04/1958 65A 2w/e 21/08/1971 66A Polmadie
Steam J83 0-6-0T 68470 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 12/04/1958 65A 4w/e 10/05/1958 64A St Margarets
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69160 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 12/04/1958 65A 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69180 8w/e 31/08/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 05/07/1958 65A 4w/e 11/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68345 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 27/09/1958 65A 4w/e 24/09/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Dock 0-6-0T 56158 01/01/1948 31E Dawsholm 4w/e 17/01/1959 65A 4w/e 11/04/1959 66A Polmadie
Steam B1 4-6-0 61355 27/09/1954 64B Haymarket 24/01/1959 65A 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam B1 4-6-0 61261 21/03/1957 64B Haymarket 26/01/1959 65A 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Steam B1 4-6-0 61333 21/10/1957 64B Haymarket 26/01/1959 65A 12/03/1959 65C Parkhead
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68352 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 11/04/1959 65A 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J88 0-6-0T 68325 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 09/05/1959 65A 4w/e 24/09/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90128       4w/e 04/07/1959 65A 6w/e 30/12/1961 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6130 27/10/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 07/11/1959 65A 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A Perth South
Steam B1 4-6-0 61403 07/03/1955 62A Thornton Junction 09/04/1960 65A 03/01/1961 65F Grangemouth
Steam B1 4-6-0 61401 15/10/1956 62A Thornton Junction 13/04/1960 65A 03/01/1961 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6102 23/12/1958 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 16/04/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6104 26/02/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 16/04/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6107 24/03/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 16/04/1960 65A 05/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6109 07/04/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 16/04/1960 65A 06/04/1968 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61134 21/01/1956 62A Thornton Junction 18/04/1960 65A 31/12/1962 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6105 17/03/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 23/04/1960 65A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6108 14/04/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 23/04/1960 65A 31/05/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6100 02/12/1958 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 30/04/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6103 05/05/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 30/04/1960 65A 05/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6106 24/03/1959 34B Hornsey (New) w/e 30/04/1960 65A 18/07/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6125 29/09/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 30/04/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6130 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A Perth South w/e 30/04/1960 65A 05/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6101 09/12/1958 34B Hornsey (New) 4w/e 07/05/1960 65A 03/08/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6124 29/09/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 07/05/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6126 w/e 16/01/1960 32B Ipswich w/e 07/05/1960 65A 06/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2756       19/05/1960 (New) 65A 4w/e 24/09/1960 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6128 13/10/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 21/05/1960 65A 4w/e 04/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6133 24/11/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 21/05/1960 65A 4w/e 04/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2757       24/05/1960 (New) 65A 03/07/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2758       31/05/1960 (New) 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6123 22/09/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 04/06/1960 65A 21/09/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6128 w/e 21/05/1960 65A Eastfield 4w/e 04/06/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6132 17/11/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 04/06/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6133 w/e 21/05/1960 65A Eastfield 4w/e 04/06/1960 65A 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2759       06/06/1960 (New) 65A 09/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6113 27/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 11/06/1960 65A 4w/e 02/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2760       16/06/1960 (New) 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6129 27/10/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 18/06/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6131 03/11/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 18/06/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2761       23/06/1960 (New) 65A 4w/e 25/07/1964 67E Dumfries
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2762       24/06/1960 (New) 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6127 w/e 07/05/1960 32B Ipswich m/e 07/1960 65A m/e 04/1962 To Store
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6113 w/e 11/06/1960 65A Eastfield 4w/e 02/07/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6121 18/08/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 02/07/1960 65A 06/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6134 01/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 02/07/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Large/Scottish Director 4-4-0 62689 4w/e 13/02/1960 64A St Margarets 4w/e 02/07/1960 65A 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65218 01/01/1948 THJ Thornton Junction 4w/e 02/07/1960 65A w/e 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2763       04/07/1960 (New) 65A 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2764       08/07/1960 (New) 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2765       11/07/1960 (New) 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60818 25/01/1953 64A St Margarets 11/07/1960 65A 17/11/1960 64A St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 60836 04/03/1951 64A St Margarets 11/07/1960 65A 24/10/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam V2 2-6-2 60931 13/10/1958 64A St Margarets 11/07/1960 65A 24/10/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam V2 2-6-2 60933 30/11/1952 64A St Margarets 11/07/1960 65A 17/11/1960 64A St Margarets
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2766       15/07/1960 (New) 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6135 08/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 16/07/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6136 17/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 16/07/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6117 w/e 05/12/1959 32B Ipswich w/e 30/07/1960 65A 16/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6137 22/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 30/07/1960 65A 24/04/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6120 07/07/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 13/08/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6122 15/09/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 13/08/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2767       17/08/1960 (New) 65A 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6116 09/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 20/08/1960 65A 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6118 24/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 20/08/1960 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6119 w/e 05/12/1959 32B Ipswich w/e 27/08/1960 65A 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6112 20/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 03/09/1960 65A 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6115 02/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 03/09/1960 65A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6110 20/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 17/09/1960 65A 14/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6111 12/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 17/09/1960 65A 16/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6114 27/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 17/09/1960 65A 05/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3894 27/07/1960 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 26/01/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3895 03/08/1960 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 03/03/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3896 12/08/1960 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 24/03/1962 60B Aviemore
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3897 17/08/1960 67C Ayr (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5117 14/05/1960 60A Inverness (New) 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 08/04/1961 65A Eastfield
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67605 4w/e 02/08/1958 65E Kipps 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65E Kipps
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67609 4w/e 02/08/1958 65E Kipps 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65E Kipps
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67618 4w/e 25/11/1950 65E Kipps 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65E Kipps
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67627 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65E Kipps
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67630 4w/e 14/02/1959 65C Parkhead 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65C Parkhead
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67676 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 65C Parkhead
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2780       09/03/1961 (New) 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2756 4w/e 24/09/1960 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 11/03/1961 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8030 4w/e 16/01/1960 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/03/1961 65A 4w/e 08/04/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 65313 01/01/1948 POL Polmont 4w/e 11/03/1961 65A 4w/e 11/03/1961 63B Fort William
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5117 4w/e 19/11/1960 65A Eastfield 4w/e 08/04/1961 65A 4w/e 06/1961 60A Inverness
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8070       30/06/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8071       10/07/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8072       10/07/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8073       19/07/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8074       19/07/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8075       26/07/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8076       26/07/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5349       28/07/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 05/08/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8077       28/07/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8078       28/07/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 28/10/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5347 30/06/1961 62A Thornton Junction (New) 4w/e 29/07/1961 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5348 17/07/1961 62A Thornton Junction (New) 4w/e 29/07/1961 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5350       23/08/1961 (New) 65A 12/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8079       28/08/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8080       28/08/1961 (New) 65A 3w/e 29/06/1968 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4096       30/08/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 23/09/1961 63B Fort William
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5351       30/08/1961 (New) 65A 10/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8081       31/08/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8082       31/08/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5352       06/09/1961 (New) 65A 21/01/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8083       12/09/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8084       12/09/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5353       13/09/1961 (New) 65A 28/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8085       18/09/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 08/09/1962 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8086       18/09/1961 (New) 65A 3w/e 29/09/1962 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5354       20/09/1961 (New) 65A 18/08/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8087       26/09/1961 (New) 65A w/e 08/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8088       26/09/1961 (New) 65A w/e 08/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5355       28/09/1961 (New) 65A 27/07/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8090       29/09/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8089       03/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8091       10/10/1961 (New) 65A w/e 08/03/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8092       10/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5356       11/10/1961 (New) 65A 20/04/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8093       17/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 28/03/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8094       17/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5357       18/10/1961 (New) 65A 30/03/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8071 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A w/e 08/03/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8072 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8073 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8074 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8081 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 4w/e 28/10/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8083 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A w/e 01/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8084 4w/e 21/10/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 4w/e 28/03/1970 66A Polmadie
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67608 4w/e 02/08/1958 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67675 4w/e 14/03/1959 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 65A 12/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5358       25/10/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8095       26/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/04/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8096       26/10/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5359       01/11/1961 (New) 65A 13/07/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8097       08/11/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8098       08/11/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8099       15/11/1961 (New) 65A w/e 01/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5360       18/11/1961 (New) 65A 08/09/1986 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69218 4w/e 26/08/1961 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 18/11/1961 65A w/e 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67604 4w/e 19/11/1960 65C Parkhead 4w/e 18/11/1961 65A 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67628 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 18/11/1961 65A w/e 08/12/1962 52B Heaton
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5361       22/11/1961 (New) 65A 27/01/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8100       22/11/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8101       22/11/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5362       30/11/1961 (New) 65A 09/04/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8102       01/12/1961 (New) 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8103       01/12/1961 (New) 65A 08/03/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5363       07/12/1961 (New) 65A 12/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8104       08/12/1961 (New) 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8105       08/12/1961 (New) 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8106       12/12/1961 (New) 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5364       13/12/1961 (New) 65A 12/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8107       20/12/1961 (New) 65A 21/01/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8108       20/12/1961 (New) 65A 13/09/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8109       29/12/1961 (New) 65A 14/02/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5365       30/12/1961 (New) 65A 28/05/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5366       04/01/1962 (New) 65A 20/04/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5367       04/01/1962 (New) 65A 03/06/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8110       10/01/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5368       11/01/1962 (New) 65A 28/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5369       17/01/1962 (New) 65A 12/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8111       18/01/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/09/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8112       26/01/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 01/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8113       01/02/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8114       08/02/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8115       08/02/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8116       15/02/1962 (New) 65A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam B1 4-6-0 61064 18/05/1955 68E Carlisle Canal 15/07/1962 65A 12/08/1962 12C Carlisle Canal
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3390 4w/e 24/03/1962 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 3w/e 29/09/1962 65A w/e 17/02/1968 16C Derby
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8117 23/02/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 3w/e 29/09/1962 65A 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8118 08/03/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 3w/e 29/09/1962 65A 4w/e 25/01/1964 66A Polmadie
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2768 25/08/1960 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3212 29/02/1956 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3213 05/03/1956 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3214 13/03/1956 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3277 26/10/1956 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 4w/e 27/06/1964 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3410 16/01/1958 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3532 4w/e 27/09/1958 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3562 28/11/1958 65C Parkhead (New) 4w/e 24/11/1962 65A w/e 05/03/1966 41A Tinsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 61007 01/10/1961 64A St Margarets 29/12/1962 65A 21/01/1963 67C Ayr
Steam A3 4-6-2 60090 18/06/1962 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 31/12/1962 65A 14/01/1963 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam A3 4-6-2 60094 18/06/1962 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 31/12/1962 65A 14/01/1963 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80004 4w/e 01/07/1961 68D Beattock 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 5w/e 26/09/1964 65D Dawsholm
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80027 04/01/1952 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 4w/e 26/12/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80056 30/12/1954 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 10/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80057 31/12/1954 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 4w/e 27/02/1965 66A Polmadie
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90114 5w/e 24/03/1951 66B Motherwell 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90199 4w/e 02/08/1958 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 4w/e 30/11/1963 65F Grangemouth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2194 4w/e 21/11/1959 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A w/e 10/10/1964 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42194 4w/e 21/11/1959 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A w/e 10/10/1964 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42269 4w/e 23/09/1961 68B Dumfries 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A w/e 10/10/1964 56A Wakefield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42690 4w/e 04/06/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 4w/e 27/02/1965 66A Polmadie
Steam J37 0-6-0 64559 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64563 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A 5w/e 26/09/1964 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61116 15/03/1962 2F Woodford Halse 10/03/1963 65A 26/06/1966 66E Carstairs
Steam B1 4-6-0 61008 21/07/1962 2F Woodford Halse 16/03/1963 65A 13/06/1966 66E Carstairs
Steam J37 0-6-0 64632 4w/e 30/11/1963 65K Polmont 4w/e 28/12/1963 65A 4w/e 22/08/1964 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2738 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/01/1964 65A 4w/e 25/07/1964 67E Dumfries
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2740 16/12/1958 63B Stirling (New) 4w/e 22/08/1964 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2742 30/01/1959 63B Stirling (New) 4w/e 22/08/1964 65A w/e 06/03/1965 99C Crewe Works
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2779 4w/e 21/10/1961 64A St Margarets 5w/e 26/09/1964 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Steam J37 0-6-0 64563 10/1964 Withdrawn 5w/e 31/10/1964 (R) 65A      
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2774 11/10/1960 65F Grangemouth (New) 5w/e 30/01/1965 65A 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44970 5w/e 26/09/1964 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 26/06/1965 65A 09/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2730 5w/e 26/09/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 09/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2734 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2735 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2739 4w/e 22/08/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3214 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 9w/e 26/11/1966 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3278 02/11/1956 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 4w/e 24/02/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3279 02/11/1956 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3386 4w/e 23/11/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3387 4w/e 27/09/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 5w/e 30/11/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3408 4w/e 15/02/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 4w/e 23/03/1974 AY Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3417 28/02/1958 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 4w/e 25/12/1965 65A 5w/e 01/08/1970 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3409 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A 4w/e 25/03/1967 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73145 4w/e 16/02/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73146 02/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) (New) 5w/e 29/01/1966 65A 9w/e 26/11/1966 66B Motherwell
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7611       16/04/1966 (New) 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7612       23/04/1966 (New) 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7613       30/04/1966 (New) 65A w/e 17/08/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7614       07/06/1966 (New) 65A 3w/e 27/07/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7614       07/06/1966 (New) 65A w/e 27/07/1968 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7615       12/06/1966 (New) 65A w/e 17/08/1968 D08 Liverpool Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7616       19/06/1966 (New) 65A w/e 15/06/1968 8J Allerton
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2731 5w/e 26/09/1964 67E Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 65A 09/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2738 4w/e 25/07/1964 67E Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 65A 24/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2761 4w/e 25/07/1964 67E Dumfries 8w/e 25/06/1966 65A 09/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7617       12/08/1966 (New) 65A w/e 17/08/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7618       18/08/1966 (New) 65A w/e 03/08/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7619       20/08/1966 (New) 65A 3w/e 27/07/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7619       20/08/1966 (New) 65A w/e 27/07/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7620       26/08/1966 (New) 65A w/e 20/07/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7621       29/08/1966 (New) 65A w/e 20/07/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7622       02/09/1966 (New) 65A w/e 20/07/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7623       08/09/1966 (New) 65A w/e 20/07/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5050 w/e 18/03/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A 5w/e 31/12/1966 64B Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5051 w/e 14/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A 02/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5052 w/e 14/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 06/04/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5053 w/e 25/03/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 06/04/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5054 w/e 28/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 06/04/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5055 w/e 21/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 06/04/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5056 w/e 18/02/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 04/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7598 05/02/1966 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7599 05/02/1966 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7600 w/e 20/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7601 w/e 18/06/1966 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 08/10/1966 65A w/e 09/09/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2736 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2737 4w/e 25/01/1964 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2772 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2773 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 03/02/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 5w/e 30/05/1964 65F Grangemouth 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 9w/e 26/11/1966 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3536 08/08/1958 63B Stirling (New) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A m/e 31/10/1979 ML Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3898 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 67A Corkerhill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3899 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3900 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 3w/e 15/11/1975 HN Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3901 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 17/06/1968 D10 Preston Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3903 6w/e 30/12/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 4w/e 26/08/1967 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3904 4w/e 19/11/1960 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 5w/e 01/03/1969 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44703 4w/e 06/08/1955 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A 12/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6840 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/12/1966 65A 4w/e 26/08/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2776 4w/e 25/01/1964 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 28/01/1967 65A 09/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8077 5w/e 31/12/1966 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 25/03/1967 65A 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2422 5w/e 30/01/1965 60A Inverness 4w/e 24/06/1967 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 62B Dundee West
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2439 21/06/1960 67A Corkerhill (New) 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2440 11/07/1960 67A Corkerhill (New) 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8085 4w/e 08/09/1962 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/08/1967 65A 5w/e 30/09/1967 66A Polmadie
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7576 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7578 w/e 11/03/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7579 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7581 w/e 11/03/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7583 w/e 11/03/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A w/e 25/08/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7584 16/01/1965 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 09/09/1967 65A w/e 25/08/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2432 4w/e 09/04/1960 66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/09/1967 65A 15/12/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2436 9w/e 26/11/1966 67C Ayr 5w/e 30/09/1967 65A 26/11/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6140 24/02/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 65A 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6152 24/06/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 65A 16/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3547 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 28/10/1967 65A 4w/e 29/03/1969 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3561 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/11/1967 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3554 4w/e 25/11/1967 64H Leith Central 5w/e 30/12/1967 65A 4w/e 27/01/1968 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2410 4w/e 27/06/1964 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/01/1968 65A 02/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8320 25/11/1967 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 27/01/1968 65A 5w/e 30/05/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8321 30/12/1967 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 27/01/1968 65A 4w/e 24/05/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2425 11/11/1959 66D Greenock Ladyburn (New) 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A 08/06/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2426 4w/e 08/04/1961 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A 4w/e 27/04/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3279 4w/e 27/01/1968 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A 4w/e 28/12/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8322 30/12/1967 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A 5w/e 01/03/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8323 4w/e 24/02/1968 66A Polmadie 4w/e 24/02/1968 65A 4w/e 24/05/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5065 w/e 13/08/1966 64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/03/1968 65A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5066 4w/e 20/08/1966 64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/03/1968 65A w/e 11/05/1968 9A Longsight
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6936 4w/e 20/07/1964 86A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/04/1968 65A 4w/e 28/09/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6937 13/05/1964 86A Cardiff Canton (New) 4w/e 27/04/1968 65A 3w/e 29/06/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8325 07/02/1968 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 27/04/1968 65A 5w/e 31/05/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8326 07/02/1968 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 27/04/1968 65A 5w/e 31/05/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2427 4w/e 24/02/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 30/09/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6904 05/11/1963 86A Cardiff Canton (New) 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6905 4w/e 31/08/1967 86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 5w/e 30/11/1968 66A Polmadie
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6919 4w/e 22/02/1964 87E Landore 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 28/09/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7580 w/e 27/04/1968 8J Allerton 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8316 26/05/1967 64B Haymarket (New) 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 16/06/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8317 25/11/1967 64B Haymarket (New) 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 5w/e 01/03/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8318 25/11/1967 64B Haymarket (New) 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 27/01/1973 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8319 27/01/1968 64B Haymarket (New) 5w/e 01/06/1968 65A 4w/e 27/01/1973 64B Haymarket
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D363 18/10/1961 64B Haymarket (New) 3w/e 29/06/1968 65A 5w/e 30/05/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2434 5w/e 30/03/1968 67C Ayr 3w/e 29/06/1968 65A 07/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5382 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 20/07/1968 65A 22/07/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5394 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 20/07/1968 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5396 w/e 04/05/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 20/07/1968 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5415 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 20/07/1968 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5402 17/06/1968 D01 London Division w/e 27/07/1968 65A 27/01/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5407 17/06/1968 D01 London Division w/e 27/07/1968 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5414 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 03/08/1968 65A 21/04/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7582 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 17/08/1968 65A 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7590 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division w/e 17/08/1968 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7591 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division w/e 17/08/1968 65A 4w/e 26/10/1968 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3886 5w/e 31/08/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/08/1968 65A 5w/e 29/06/1974 FW Fort William
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3887 5w/e 01/06/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/08/1968 65A 22/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6838 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/09/1968 65A 2w/e 12/10/1974 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6845 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/09/1968 65A 01/01/1994 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6843 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/10/1968 65A 2w/e 12/10/1974 LE Landore
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6848 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/10/1968 65A 01/12/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6849 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/10/1968 65A 01/01/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8080 3w/e 29/06/1968 60A Inverness 4w/e 26/10/1968 65A 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3213 4w/e 26/10/1968 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 30/11/1968 65A 5w/e 30/11/1968 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2421 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 25/01/1969 65A 4w/e 28/12/1974 DT Dunfermline Townhill
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8075 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie 4w/e 25/01/1969 65A w/e 05/07/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4095 4w/e 25/01/1969 63A Perth South 5w/e 01/03/1969 65A 4w/e 21/04/1973 62B Dundee West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5403 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 4w/e 26/12/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5404 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5408 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5410 w/e 27/01/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5411 w/e 05/02/1966 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 4w/e 26/12/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5412 w/e 04/05/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/03/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8085 5w/e 30/09/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/03/1969 65A 4w/e 08/09/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8086 3w/e 29/09/1962 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/03/1969 65A 4w/e 16/06/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5405 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/03/1969 65A 11/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5406 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/03/1969 65A 06/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5409 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/03/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5413 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/03/1969 65A 4w/e 03/10/1970 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3728 4w/e 25/02/1967 64H Leith Central 5w/e 31/05/1969 65A 2w/e 21/08/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8078 4w/e 28/10/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/05/1969 65A 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8081 4w/e 28/10/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/05/1969 65A w/e 28/02/1970 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8102 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/05/1969 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8112 5w/e 01/03/1969 66A Polmadie 5w/e 31/05/1969 65A w/e 25/10/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5392 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5393 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5395 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5398 w/e 30/09/1967 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 5w/e 27/09/1975 To Store
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5399 w/e 30/09/1967 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5400 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5401 w/e 20/07/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/06/1969 65A 4w/e 26/02/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8070 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A w/e 25/10/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8073 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A w/e 08/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8074 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8077 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8079 4w/e 29/03/1969 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8092 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/06/1969 65A 4w/e 26/07/1969 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5397 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division w/e 12/07/1969 65A 01/05/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5391 w/e 05/07/1969 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/07/1969 65A 5w/e 01/05/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5372 w/e 03/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 25/10/1969 65A 06/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5386 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 25/10/1969 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5374 w/e 08/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 01/11/1969 65A 4w/e 29/12/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5375 w/e 08/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 01/11/1969 65A 19/08/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6857 9w/e 26/11/1966 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/11/1969 65A 4w/e 03/03/1979 ML Motherwell
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8092 4w/e 26/07/1969 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/11/1969 65A 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5378 w/e 22/01/1966 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/11/1969 65A 06/05/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5379 w/e 15/01/1966 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/11/1969 65A 27/05/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5380 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/11/1969 65A 4w/e 26/02/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5387 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/11/1969 65A 01/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5390 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/11/1969 65A 10/02/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5370 w/e 03/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 15/11/1969 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5373 w/e 08/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 15/11/1969 65A 13/06/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5389 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 15/11/1969 65A 24/03/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5371 w/e 03/01/1966 D15 Leicester Division w/e 28/02/1970 65A 18/06/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5376 w/e 22/01/1966 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/02/1970 65A 09/01/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5381 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/02/1970 65A 24/02/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5384 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/02/1970 65A 29/09/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5385 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 28/02/1970 65A 20/04/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7576 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/02/1970 65A w/e 06/10/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7579 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/02/1970 65A w/e 06/10/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5377 w/e 22/01/1966 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/03/1970 65A 4w/e 28/03/1970 65A Eastfield
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5388 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/03/1970 65A 4w/e 28/03/1970 65A Eastfield
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5377 w/e 07/03/1970 65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/03/1970 65A 20/04/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5388 w/e 07/03/1970 65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/03/1970 65A 01/04/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6850 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/05/1970 65A 01/11/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8092 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1970 65A w/e 12/05/1973 IM Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4098 4w/e 25/01/1964 63B Fort William 5w/e 01/08/1970 65A w/e 01/07/1972 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4098 4w/e 25/01/1964 63B Fort William 5w/e 01/08/1970 65A 5w/e 01/07/1972 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6844 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 31/10/1970 65A 31/08/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6847 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 31/10/1970 65A w/e 15/05/1988 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6851 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 31/10/1970 65A      
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6936 4w/e 28/09/1968 64B Haymarket 4w/e 31/10/1970 65A w/e 11/11/1972 87A Landore
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8084 4w/e 28/03/1970 66A Polmadie 4w/e 31/10/1970 65A w/e 01/09/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5002 w/e 29/03/1969 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5003 w/e 08/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5004 w/e 08/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A w/e 11/01/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5006 w/e 08/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5007 w/e 08/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5008 w/e 22/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5009 w/e 22/04/1967 D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/03/1971 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5066 w/e 02/08/1969 64B Haymarket 7w/e 27/03/1971 65A 5w/e 01/05/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo D5329 5w/e 31/05/1969 64B Haymarket 4w/e 29/05/1971 65A 5w/e 07/08/1971 64B Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5176 4w/e 07/10/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 17/07/1971 65A w/e 16/09/1972 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5177 4w/e 20/05/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 17/07/1971 65A w/e 16/09/1972 D09 Manchester Division
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5178 4w/e 07/10/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 31/07/1971 65A 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5415 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket 6w/e 02/10/1971 65A 14/07/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8024 w/e 27/06/1970 55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971 65A 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8027 w/e 10/10/1970 40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971 65A 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8030 w/e 01/11/1969 30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1971 65A 2w/e 12/10/1974 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8034 w/e 17/10/1970 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1971 65A 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8041 w/e 17/10/1970 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1971 65A w/e 01/09/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8046 w/e 17/10/1970 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1971 65A 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED Eastfield
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8048 w/e 17/10/1970 41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1971 65A 4w/e 06/03/1976 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8055 w/e 10/08/1968 30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1971 65A w/e 12/12/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5149 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/10/1971 65A 09/10/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5150 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/10/1971 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5157 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/10/1971 65A 5w/e 27/04/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5161 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/10/1971 65A 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5158 w/e 17/07/1971 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/01/1972 65A 2w/e 15/02/1975 TI Tinsley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5159 w/e 07/08/1971 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/01/1972 65A 5w/e 27/04/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5160 w/e 07/08/1971 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/01/1972 65A 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5347 4w/e 28/02/1970 64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/02/1972 65A 5w/e 01/04/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5348 4w/e 28/02/1970 64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/02/1972 65A 5w/e 01/04/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5001 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie m/e 03/1972 65A w/e 11/01/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2420 5w/e 03/07/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2433 4w/e 04/06/1960 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 18/06/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3136 6w/e 02/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 15/04/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3182 6w/e 02/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 22/07/1972 52A Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3297 4w/e 26/12/1970 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3396 4w/e 27/04/1968 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3418 2w/e 21/08/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 09/07/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3545 5w/e 01/08/1970 62B Dundee West 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 28/10/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3591 w/e 27/11/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 30/12/1972 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3728 5w/e 01/04/1972 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3733 4w/e 29/11/1969 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 19/10/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3906 4w/e 26/12/1970 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3907 18/10/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 17/06/1972 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3908 20/10/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 01/07/1972 2A Tyseley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3908 20/10/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 01/07/1972 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3909 27/10/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 15/04/1972 8J Allerton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3912 18/11/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 15/04/1972 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3922 4w/e 27/12/1969 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3923 4w/e 29/05/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 6w/e 04/09/1976 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5000 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 11/01/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5010 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5011 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5012 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5013 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5014 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5015 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5016 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5017 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5018 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5019 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5073 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5090 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5096 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 16/08/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5097 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5098 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 16/08/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5099 w/e 31/07/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5100 w/e 31/07/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5101 w/e 31/07/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 24/02/1973 60A Inverness
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5101 w/e 31/07/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 24/02/1973 65A Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5112 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/02/1974 IS Inverness
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5113 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 29/04/1972 60A Inverness
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5147 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5148 w/e 16/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5380 4w/e 26/02/1972 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5401 4w/e 26/02/1972 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/02/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5410 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5412 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 08/09/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6839 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 5w/e 05/08/1972 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6840 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 28/10/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6840 7w/e 27/03/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 28/10/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6841 7w/e 27/03/1971 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 11/11/1972 86A Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6841 7w/e 27/03/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 11/11/1972 86A Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6842 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 11/11/1972 87A Landore
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6852 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/12/1999 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6853 5w/e 01/05/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 15/01/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6854 5w/e 01/05/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 15/05/1988 SF Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6855 4w/e 26/02/1972 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/03/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6856 4w/e 20/08/1966 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 4w/e 03/03/1979 ML Motherwell
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6859 5w/e 30/09/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 11/11/1972 87A Landore
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6904 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/05/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6905 5w/e 30/11/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8078 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8079 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8080 4w/e 29/11/1969 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 10/07/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8082 4w/e 30/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 01/09/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8089 4w/e 27/01/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 27/04/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8090 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 10/11/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8091 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 12/05/1973 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8093 4w/e 28/03/1970 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 20/05/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8094 4w/e 28/02/1970 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 09/06/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8095 4w/e 27/04/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8096 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 01/06/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8097 08/11/1961 65A Eastfield (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 10/11/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8098 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8099 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 04/02/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8100 4w/e 26/10/1968 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 12/12/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8101 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8106 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 13/10/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8110 4w/e 25/03/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 14/09/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8112 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 21/01/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8113 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 10/11/1973 TO Toton
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8116 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 16/01/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8117 5w/e 30/05/1964 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8118 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 03/03/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8119 08/03/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8120 16/03/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8121 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8123 29/03/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 30/04/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8124 13/04/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 07/06/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8125 w/e 09/10/1971 66A Polmadie 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 23/09/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8126 15/05/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A 18/09/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8127 16/07/1962 66A Polmadie (New) 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A w/e 12/05/1973 IM Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3211 2w/e 21/08/1971 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 01/07/1972 65A 16/03/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2413 4w/e 29/04/1972 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A 6w/e 04/09/1976 To Store
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2424 4w/e 24/06/1967 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A 19/11/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3860 w/e 06/07/1968 9A Longsight 2w/e 05/08/1972 65A 16/06/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3889 4w/e 27/05/1972 64B Haymarket 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5348 5w/e 01/04/1972 64B Haymarket 5w/e 05/08/1972 65A 06/01/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5155 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division w/e 16/09/1972 65A 4w/e 19/05/1973 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5156 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division w/e 16/09/1972 65A 5w/e 27/04/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3545 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/10/1972 65A 4w/e 29/12/1973 AY Ayr
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6846 5w/e 24/09/1966 64B Haymarket 4w/e 25/11/1972 65A w/e 15/05/1988 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6858 w/e 11/11/1972 87A Landore 4w/e 25/11/1972 65A w/e 15/05/1988 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6919 5w/e 01/05/1971 64B Haymarket 4w/e 25/11/1972 65A w/e 13/10/1973 TE Thornaby
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6937 5w/e 01/05/1971 64B Haymarket 4w/e 25/11/1972 65A      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3921 5w/e 01/04/1972 64B Haymarket 5w/e 30/12/1972 65A 26/03/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5101 5w/e 01/04/1972 65A Eastfield 4w/e 24/02/1973 65A 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20050 w/e 09/10/1971 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/02/1973 65A 4w/e 21/04/1973 64B Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20007 w/e 09/10/1971 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/02/1973 65A 4w/e 21/04/1973 64B Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 27001 5w/e 01/04/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 19/05/1973 ED 08/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 27003 5w/e 05/08/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 19/05/1973 ED 16/01/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20179 w/e 24/03/1973 64B Haymarket 4w/e 16/06/1973 ED 4w/e 24/05/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20184 w/e 24/03/1973 64B Haymarket 4w/e 16/06/1973 ED 4w/e 24/05/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25085 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 25/08/1973 ED w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25086 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 25/08/1973 ED w/e 10/11/1973 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20011 w/e 12/07/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/09/1973 ED 02/02/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20015 w/e 08/02/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/09/1973 ED 13/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20036 w/e 14/09/1968 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 01/09/1973 ED 11/06/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25083 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division 4w/e 08/09/1973 ED w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25084 17/06/1968 D16 Nottingham Division 4w/e 08/09/1973 ED w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3932 4w/e 21/04/1973 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 03/11/1973 ED 4w/e 01/12/1973 AB Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5113 4w/e 29/04/1972 60A Inverness 4w/e 03/11/1973 ED 4w/e 23/02/1974 IS Inverness
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8114 w/e 08/03/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 10/11/1973 ED 31/01/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20115 w/e 08/03/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 10/11/1973 ED 11/01/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20122 w/e 08/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 10/11/1973 ED 05/07/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4097 4w/e 27/12/1969 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/12/1973 ED m/e 31/10/1979 ML Motherwell
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3241 4w/e 24/02/1973 67C Ayr 4w/e 29/12/1973 ED 11/12/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25001 w/e 04/11/1972 64B Haymarket 4w/e 29/12/1973 ED 4w/e 23/02/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 27124 4w/e 08/09/1973 HA Haymarket 4w/e 29/12/1973 ED 01/03/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20216 4w/e 16/06/1973 HA Haymarket 4w/e 29/12/1973 ED 4w/e 24/05/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25216 2w/e 19/08/1972 D01 London Division 4w/e 26/01/1974 ED 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25217 w/e 10/11/1973 LO Longsight 4w/e 26/01/1974 ED 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4019 9w/e 11/03/1972 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 09/02/1974 ED 4w/e 29/03/1975 IS Inverness
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25094 w/e 10/05/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 09/03/1974 ED 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25096 w/e 10/05/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 09/03/1974 ED 4w/e 25/05/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4020 w/e 29/11/1964 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 16/03/1974 ED 03/08/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24107 w/e 06/04/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 27/04/1974 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24108 w/e 06/04/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 27/04/1974 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24109 w/e 06/04/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 27/04/1974 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24111 w/e 09/03/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 27/04/1974 ED 4w/e 28/12/1974 IS Inverness
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47466 2w/e 02/09/1972 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47467 9w/e 16/10/1971 82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974 ED 12/12/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47141 2w/e 24/03/1973 40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47143 w/e 02/06/1973 IM Immingham w/e 11/05/1974 ED w/e 07/12/1974 BS Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47144 w/e 19/05/1973 HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/05/1974 ED w/e 07/12/1974 BS Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47317 w/e 19/05/1973 TI Tinsley w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47318 w/e 19/05/1973 TI Tinsley w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47319 w/e 04/06/1966 40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1974 ED 2w/e 12/10/1974 KY Knottingley
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47197 17/06/1968 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED w/e 18/05/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47206 3w/e 06/10/1973 CE Crewe Diesel w/e 11/05/1974 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47207 w/e 03/04/1971 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47208 w/e 09/10/1971 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47210 w/e 09/09/1972 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47211 w/e 09/10/1971 D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED 31/05/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47359 4w/e 06/10/1973 TE Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974 ED 2w/e 30/11/1974 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47360 w/e 02/05/1970 51L Thornaby w/e 11/05/1974 ED 2w/e 12/10/1974 TE Thornaby
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47269 w/e 06/05/1972 52A Gateshead w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 25/10/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08621 w/e 15/07/1972 16A Toton w/e 11/05/1974 ED 20/06/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24105 10/09/1960 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 To Store
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24106 24/09/1960 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 11/05/1974 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20002 w/e 09/08/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED 19/02/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20083 w/e 01/11/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED w/e 15/05/1988 TE Thornaby
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20137 w/e 08/02/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED 01/12/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20138 w/e 25/01/1969 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/05/1974 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47471 w/e 11/05/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 29/06/1974 ED 2w/e 12/10/1974 YK York (North)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3417 5w/e 01/08/1970 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 5w/e 29/06/1974 ED 01/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47053 4w/e 29/12/1973 HA Haymarket 4w/e 26/10/1974 ED w/e 15/05/1988 ED Eastfield
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47139 w/e 09/10/1971 D02 Birmingham Division 2w/e 30/11/1974 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47424 3w/e 06/10/1973 BS Bescot w/e 07/12/1974 ED w/e 15/05/1988 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47427 w/e 10/02/1973 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/12/1974 ED 05/02/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47144 w/e 07/12/1974 BS Bescot w/e 07/12/1974 ED w/e 11/01/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24001 w/e 11/01/1975 LO Longsight w/e 08/02/1975 ED m/e 07/1975 98Ss  
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24004 w/e 11/01/1975 LO Longsight w/e 08/02/1975 ED 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47059 w/e 09/11/1974 BS Bescot 2w/e 08/03/1975 ED 2w/e 07/08/1976 BR Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08855 2w/e 25/01/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 22/03/1975 ED 5w/e 26/07/1975 IS Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08505 5w/e 30/11/1968 60A Inverness 4w/e 29/03/1975 ED 4w/e 24/05/1975 GM Grangemouth
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24111 4w/e 28/12/1974 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/03/1975 ED 4w/e 23/08/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08938 w/e 29/03/1975 AY Ayr 4w/e 26/04/1975 ED 14/07/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08952 27/09/1962 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) w/e 17/05/1975 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24065 w/e 05/12/1970 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 5w/e 26/07/1975 To Store
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25230 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 06/08/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25232 w/e 11/01/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 01/12/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25233 w/e 11/01/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 13/03/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25234 w/e 11/01/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 27/02/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25237 w/e 09/11/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 4w/e 06/03/1976 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25240 w/e 09/11/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 28/08/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25241 4w/e 26/10/1968 64B Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 06/05/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25246 w/e 09/11/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 05/10/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20024 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20027 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20034 4w/e 26/10/1974 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED w/e 12/12/1976 TI Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20039 w/e 01/09/1973 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20085 4w/e 08/09/1973 HA Haymarket 4w/e 24/05/1975 ED 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08853 q/e 22/05/1971 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 14/06/1975 ED      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08851 4w/e 29/03/1975 IS Inverness 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 07/02/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25001 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 28/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25002 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 01/12/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25003 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 18/08/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25004 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 15/09/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25089 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 3w/e 02/08/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25090 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 3w/e 02/08/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25091 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 3w/e 02/08/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25092 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 3w/e 02/08/1975 TO Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25101 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 16/01/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25108 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 14/07/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25111 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 30/03/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25150 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 2w/e 23/08/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25151 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 2w/e 23/08/1975 LO Longsight
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25213 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 26/07/1975 ED 19/03/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25005 2w/e 09/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 01/12/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25014 2w/e 09/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 5w/e 07/02/1976 To Store
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25034 2w/e 15/02/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 22/12/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25062 w/e 12/05/1973 LO Longsight 2w/e 23/08/1975 ED 4w/e 29/05/1976 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25083 3w/e 02/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 5w/e 03/07/1976 IS Inverness
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25086 3w/e 02/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 09/10/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25087 3w/e 02/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 28/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25235 3w/e 02/08/1975 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 01/03/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25244 17/06/1968 D09 Manchester Division 2w/e 23/08/1975 ED 21/07/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20024 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 02/05/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20027 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 19/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20039 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 23/09/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20085 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 23/08/1975 ED 08/03/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 27012 5w/e 26/07/1975 98S   5w/e 27/09/1975 ED 11/05/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25018 w/e 09/03/1974 TI Tinsley w/e 01/02/1976 ED 22/11/1976 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25019 w/e 05/08/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 01/02/1976 ED 03/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25021 w/e 02/09/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 01/02/1976 ED 03/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25023 w/e 07/10/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 01/02/1976 ED 28/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25025 w/e 07/10/1972 41A Tinsley w/e 01/02/1976 ED 15/04/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47207 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 5w/e 07/02/1976 ED 30/09/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20146 10/06/1966 D16 Nottingham Division (New) 4w/e 06/03/1976 ED w/e 15/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20149 05/07/1966 D16 Nottingham Division (New) 4w/e 06/03/1976 ED 09/11/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47464 3w/e 12/07/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 10/04/1976 ED 02/10/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47469 w/e 11/05/1974 HA Haymarket 5w/e 01/05/1976 ED 19/03/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47472 w/e 13/07/1974 BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/05/1976 ED 19/04/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47045 3w/e 02/05/1976 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 01/10/2002 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47141 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47208 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED m/e 31/10/1979 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08952 4w/e 21/06/1975 HA Haymarket 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 14/07/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25030 3w/e 15/11/1975 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 4w/e 12/06/1976 CW Cricklewood East
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25031 3w/e 15/11/1975 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 4w/e 12/06/1976 SP Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25092 3w/e 15/11/1975 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 3w/e 24/07/1976 IS Inverness
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25093 3w/e 15/11/1975 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 3w/e 24/07/1976 IS Inverness
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25096 3w/e 15/11/1975 IS Inverness 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 31/12/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25231 4w/e 28/06/1969 64B Haymarket 4w/e 29/05/1976 ED 23/08/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08828 w/e 16/12/1967 16A Toton w/e 26/06/1976 ED 5w/e 31/12/1976 AB Aberdeen Ferryhill
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25009 5w/e 07/02/1976 98S   5w/e 03/07/1976 ED 07/07/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25013 3w/e 27/03/1976 98S   5w/e 03/07/1976 ED 28/09/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25068 2w/e 14/06/1975 CW Cricklewood East 5w/e 03/07/1976 ED 14/07/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25239 4w/e 08/11/1975 TO Toton 5w/e 03/07/1976 ED 05/11/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20046 w/e 09/10/1971 65A Eastfield 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED 09/06/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20200 2w/e 04/07/1976 91X To Scottish Region 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED 06/08/1979 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20201 2w/e 04/07/1976 91X To Scottish Region 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED w/e 15/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20202 2w/e 04/07/1976 91X To Scottish Region 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED w/e 15/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20203 2w/e 04/07/1976 91X To Scottish Region 3w/e 24/07/1976 ED w/e 15/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47268 w/e 11/10/1969 64B Haymarket 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47269 4w/e 25/10/1975 HA Haymarket 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED 01/04/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25092 3w/e 24/07/1976 IS Inverness 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED 11/05/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25093 3w/e 24/07/1976 IS Inverness 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED 07/11/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25094 4w/e 25/10/1975 HA Haymarket 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED 01/02/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25098 4w/e 25/10/1975 HA Haymarket 6w/e 04/09/1976 ED 15/10/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25301 w/e 12/05/1973 SP Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/12/1976 ED 11/12/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20204 w/e 09/10/1971 41A Tinsley w/e 12/12/1976 ED w/e 15/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20205 w/e 09/10/1971 41A Tinsley w/e 12/12/1976 ED 18/12/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20206 w/e 09/10/1971 41A Tinsley w/e 12/12/1976 ED 12/04/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20207 w/e 09/10/1971 41A Tinsley w/e 12/12/1976 ED 11/07/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08443 2w/e 21/08/1971 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 31/12/1976 ED 07/07/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37028 w/e 01/02/1975 GD Gateshead 2w/e 17/02/1979 ED 4w/e 03/03/1979 ED Eastfield
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37046 w/e 10/10/1970 52A Gateshead 2w/e 17/02/1979 ED 4w/e 03/03/1979 ED Eastfield
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47149 w/e 06/12/1969 D02 Birmingham Division 4w/e 03/03/1979 ED 01/01/1998 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37028 2w/e 17/02/1979 ED Eastfield 4w/e 03/03/1979 ED 01/12/2000 Withdrawn
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37046 2w/e 17/02/1979 ED Eastfield 4w/e 03/03/1979 ED 30/09/2008 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47470 w/e 11/05/1974 HA Haymarket m/e 31/10/1979 ED 05/06/1988 ED Eastfield
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20228 w/e 31/03/1973 41A Tinsley w/e 21/04/1988 ED 22/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20171 27/10/1966 D16 Nottingham Division (New) w/e 21/04/1988 ED 22/05/1988 IM Immingham
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47518 2w/e 11/10/1975 HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 15/05/1988 ED 14/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47524 w/e 08/03/1975 YK York (North) w/e 15/05/1988 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47527 w/e 08/03/1975 YK York (North) w/e 15/05/1988 ED 27/11/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47003 3w/e 10/05/1975 SF Stratford w/e 15/05/1988 ED 05/07/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47018 w/e 08/01/1972 30A Stratford w/e 15/05/1988 ED 22/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47458 4w/e 06/10/1973 HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 15/05/1988 ED 27/05/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47544 w/e 29/02/1976 YK York (North) w/e 15/05/1988 ED 05/02/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47569 3w/e 02/05/1976 IM Immingham w/e 15/05/1988 ED      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47053 4w/e 26/10/1974 ED Eastfield w/e 15/05/1988 ED 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47482 w/e 30/03/1974 91M To London Midland Region w/e 15/05/1988 ED 20/10/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel