Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1288 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9029 Week
» 29471 Month
» 366317 Year
» 1587882 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Consett


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Consett Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam J39 0-6-0 1465 on 13/11/1935 SUN Sunderland (New) on 15/06/1936 CON on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1473 on 15/11/1935 SUN Sunderland (New) on 28/11/1938 CON on 14/11/1941 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam J39 0-6-0 2736 on 19/03/1939 TWD Tweedmouth on 08/07/1939 CON on 19/10/1940 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1285 on 24/06/1937 AFP Annfield Plain on 21/12/1939 CON on 01/01/1951 51C West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1264 on 24/06/1937 AFP Annfield Plain on 09/09/1940 CON on 29/11/1947 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1291 on 24/06/1937 AFP Annfield Plain on 09/09/1940 CON on 11/05/1958 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2215 on 01/03/1940 AFP Annfield Plain on 09/09/1940 CON on 16/05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2232 on 24/06/1937 AFP Annfield Plain on 09/09/1940 CON on 02/05/1941 TDK Tyne Dock
Steam J39 0-6-0 1896 on 21/04/1938 CAR Carlisle Canal (New) on 20/10/1940 CON on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2276 m/e 05/1920 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 05/05/1941 CON on 08/09/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2261 on 28/03/1943 NEV Neville Hill on 19/06/1943 CON on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2298 m/e 12/1920 NEV Neville Hill (New) on 19/06/1943 CON on 23/05/1965 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2282 on 14/07/1943 DAR Darlington on 18/10/1943 CON on 07/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1283 on 08/11/1925 NPT Newport (Teeside) on 04/12/1943 CON on 17/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1311 on 09/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 23/07/1945 CON on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2220 on 04/09/1944 NEV Neville Hill on 23/07/1945 CON on 29/11/1947 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2247 on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside) on 14/01/1946 CON on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2154 on 18/01/1939 SUN Sunderland on 05/08/1946 CON on 20/01/1947 SUN Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3346 on 14/01/1946 TDK Tyne Dock on 13/04/1947 CON on 10/06/1956 54C Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3379 on 14/01/1946 TDK Tyne Dock on 13/04/1947 CON on 23/05/1965 52H Tyne Dock
Steam N8 0-6-2T 9384       on 01/01/1948 CON m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam N8 0-6-2T 9394       on 01/01/1948 CON 4w/e 20/02/1954 54B Tyne Dock
Steam N9 0-6-2T 9411 by 01/01/1923 DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948 CON m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam N9 0-6-2T 9414 by 01/01/1923 Dar Barnard Castle on 01/01/1948 CON m/e 07/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63427 on 05/03/1945 WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1951 54D on 23/05/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68017 on 01/01/1948 SCA Scarborough 4w/e 20/01/1951 54D 4w/e 17/02/1951 54A Sunderland
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68019 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 4w/e 20/01/1951 54D w/e 02/05/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam N8 0-6-2T 69390 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 20/09/1952 54D 4w/e 20/02/1954 54A Sunderland
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90045       4w/e 18/04/1953 54D 4w/e 19/02/1955 54B Tyne Dock
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90054       4w/e 18/04/1953 54D 4w/e 19/02/1955 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63359 on 06/07/1952 54B Tyne Dock on 27/02/1955 54D on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam T1 4-8-0T 69917 on 01/01/1948 NPT Newport (Teeside) 3w/e 16/06/1956 54D w/e 21/02/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63453 on 17/08/1952 54B Tyne Dock on 01/09/1957 54D on 20/07/1958 54C Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63406 on 16/06/1957 54B Tyne Dock on 18/01/1959 52K on 08/09/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63345 on 10/06/1956 51G Haverton Hill on 08/05/1959 52K on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63342 on 04/12/1943 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52K on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63346 on 10/06/1956 54C Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52K on 04/10/1964 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63456 on 14/06/1959 52C Blaydon on 27/09/1959 52K on 06/05/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63387 on 17/08/1952 54B Tyne Dock on 01/11/1959 52K on 11/09/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63354 on 14/06/1959 52H Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959 52K on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63437 on 01/12/1949 TDK Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959 52K on 11/09/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63448 on 13/09/1959 52H Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959 52K on 08/11/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3939 on 10/03/1960 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 17/09/1960 52K w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63368 on 08/11/1959 52C Blaydon on 20/08/1961 52K on 23/05/1965 51C West Hartlepool
Steam K1 2-6-0 62002 on 06/07/1952 52C Blaydon on 06/05/1962 52K on 16/06/1963 SBH Blyth (South)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62022 on 04/08/1949 BLA Blaydon (New) on 06/05/1962 52K on 12/05/1963 52F Blyth (North)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62023 on 05/08/1949 BLA Blaydon (New) on 06/05/1962 52K on 23/09/1962 52B Heaton
Steam K1 2-6-0 62027 on 15/08/1949 BLA Blaydon (New) on 06/05/1962 52K on 23/05/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62050 on 01/11/1959 52C Blaydon on 06/05/1962 52K on 01/11/1964 52d Alnmouth
Steam K1 2-6-0 62060 on 01/11/1959 52C Blaydon on 06/05/1962 52K on 16/06/1963 SBH Blyth (South)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63394 on 12/05/1963 52E Percy Main on 19/01/1964 52K on 23/05/1965 51C West Hartlepool