Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1303 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9044 Week
» 29486 Month
» 366332 Year
» 1587897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Chester (MR)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Chester (MR) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2975 w/e 01/06/1935 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/07/1936 6A w/e 03/07/1937 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2971 w/e 03/10/1936 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 25/09/1937 6A w/e 25/11/1939 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2976 w/e 25/09/1937 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/10/1940 6A w/e 22/02/1941 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2979 w/e 05/03/1938 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/10/1940 6A w/e 08/11/1941 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2976 w/e 22/02/1941 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 05/04/1941 6A w/e 30/01/1943 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2978 w/e 03/05/1941 1A Willesden w/e 17/01/1942 6A w/e 02/05/1942 6B Mold Junction
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2976 w/e 30/01/1943 6B Mold Junction w/e 28/08/1943 6A w/e 14/07/1945 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Compound 4-4-0 900       4w/e 22/06/1946 6A on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1163       4w/e 22/06/1946 6A on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 7821       4w/e 22/06/1946 6A on 27/03/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7297       on 01/01/1948 6A w/e 06/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7373       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 03/12/1955 11A Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7374       on 01/01/1948 6A w/e 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7375       on 01/01/1948 6A w/e 17/06/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7383       on 01/01/1948 6A w/e 17/06/1961 8C Speke Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7504       on 01/01/1948 6A 2w/e 17/06/1950 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7600       on 01/01/1948 6A m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 900 4w/e 22/06/1946 6A Chester (MR) on 01/01/1948 6A 5w/e 24/12/1949 19G Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 926       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 19/05/1951 5A Crewe North
Steam Compound 4-4-0 933       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 07/10/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1098       on 01/01/1948 6A 5w/e 21/06/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1106       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 17/05/1958 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1107       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 22/03/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1108       on 01/01/1948 6A 8w/e 19/06/1954 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1120       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1121       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 14/08/1954 8A Edge Hill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1157 4w/e 22/06/1946 7A Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 28/12/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1158       on 01/01/1948 6A on 22/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1162       on 01/01/1948 6A 2w/e 17/06/1950 8E Brunswick
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1163 4w/e 22/06/1946 6A Chester (MR) on 01/01/1948 6A 8w/e 11/07/1953 3E Monument Lane
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1164       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1169       on 01/01/1948 6A 8w/e 19/06/1954 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1170       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 24/02/1951 8E Brunswick
Steam 27 0-6-0 52417       on 01/01/1948 6A on 14/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 130       on 01/01/1948 6A on 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2425       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2540       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2568       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2587       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2617       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2677       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 04/11/1950 7B Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5042       on 01/01/1948 6A 3w/e 11/12/1948 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5247       on 01/01/1948 6A 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5275       on 01/01/1948 6A w/e 23/04/1966 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5297 m/e 12/1937 3E Monument Lane (New) on 01/01/1948 6A 2w/e 17/06/1950 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5382       on 01/01/1948 6A 2w/e 17/06/1950 7C Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5403       on 01/01/1948 6A 3w/e 11/12/1948 10C Patricroft
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40658 on 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 5w/e 16/07/1949 6A w/e 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47504 on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR) 2w/e 17/06/1950 6A w/e 21/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40144 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 2w/e 17/06/1950 6A 4w/e 04/11/1950 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 3w/e 14/01/1950 9A Longsight 2w/e 17/06/1950 6A 4w/e 09/09/1950 7A Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45095 on 01/01/1948 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 09/09/1950 6A 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42660 on 01/01/1948 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 07/10/1950 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45307 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/10/1950 6A 4w/e 12/07/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42155 4w/e 07/10/1950 5D Stoke 4w/e 04/11/1950 6A 4w/e 02/12/1950 5D Stoke
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41166 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A 4w/e 14/08/1954 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44710       4w/e 24/02/1951 6A w/e 27/02/1960 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44759 2w/e 17/06/1950 9A Longsight 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A 4w/e 24/03/1951 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44910 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A 4w/e 10/09/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45070 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A 4w/e 24/03/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45332 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A 4w/e 24/03/1951 10B Preston
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40144 4w/e 27/01/1951 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1951 6A 4w/e 19/05/1951 5D Stoke
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40324 on 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 16/06/1951 6A 4w/e 12/07/1952 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42315 on 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 17/07/1951 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42426 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 17/07/1951 6A 4w/e 06/10/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42061 4w/e 16/06/1951 9G Northwich 4w/e 17/07/1951 6A 4w/e 29/12/1951 4A Bletchley
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40377 4w/e 17/07/1951 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 6A 8w/e 19/06/1954 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44869 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 06/10/1951 6A 4w/e 03/10/1953 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45095 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead 4w/e 06/10/1951 6A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45402 on 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 06/10/1951 6A 4w/e 12/07/1952 3A Bescot
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41098 5w/e 21/06/1952 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 09/08/1952 6A 8w/e 11/07/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42159 5w/e 16/07/1949 5D Stoke 4w/e 09/08/1952 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14C St Albans
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73020 4w/e 06/09/1952 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1952 6A 4w/e 03/10/1953 84K Chester West
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45006 4w/e 12/07/1952 6J Holyhead 4w/e 04/10/1952 6A 8w/e 11/07/1953 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45247 4w/e 12/07/1952 6J Holyhead 4w/e 04/10/1952 6A 4w/e 09/10/1954 6B Mold Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42444 on 01/01/1948 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 8w/e 29/11/1952 6A 8w/e 11/07/1953 6H Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45132 on 01/01/1948 3D Aston 8w/e 29/11/1952 6A 4w/e 09/10/1954 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42461 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 8w/e 11/07/1953 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42672 on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 8w/e 11/07/1953 6A 4w/e 05/09/1953 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73040       m/e 10/1953 (New) 6A w/e 02/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73041       m/e 10/1953 (New) 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6J Holyhead
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73042       m/e 10/1953 (New) 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6J Holyhead
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42063 4w/e 16/06/1951 5D Stoke 4w/e 03/10/1953 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45043 8w/e 05/09/1953 64A St Margarets 4w/e 03/10/1953 6A 4w/e 08/10/1955 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45180 8w/e 09/09/1951 64A St Margarets 4w/e 03/10/1953 6A 8w/e 19/06/1954 6J Holyhead
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41163 8w/e 11/07/1953 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 31/10/1953 6A 8w/e 19/06/1954 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45403 4w/e 29/12/1951 5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/10/1953 6A 4w/e 28/11/1953 2A Rugby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73070       on 13/11/1954 (New) 6A w/e 02/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73071       on 20/11/1954 (New) 6A 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40629 on 01/01/1948 7D Rhyl 4w/e 04/12/1954 6A 8w/e 16/07/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73072       on 11/12/1954 (New) 6A 4w/e 22/11/1958 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 m/e 07/1953 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 26/02/1955 6A m/e 16/06/1956 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 m/e 07/1953 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 26/02/1955 6A 4w/e 19/05/1956 24A Accrington
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75035 m/e 08/1953 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 26/02/1955 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75039 m/e 08/1953 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 26/02/1955 6A w/e 10/03/1962 1E Bletchley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3221 w/e 01/02/1969 5A Crewe Diesel on 22/04/1955 6A on 19/12/1982 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44911 4w/e 18/04/1953 5A Crewe North 4w/e 23/04/1955 6A 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13177       on 30/09/1955 (New) 6A 4w/e 01/12/1956 2A Rugby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13178       on 06/10/1955 (New) 6A 4w/e 01/12/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40580 4w/e 19/05/1951 7D Rhyl 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40589 4w/e 23/02/1952 7D Rhyl 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A m/e 16/06/1956 6K Rhyl
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44910 4w/e 10/09/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/10/1955 6A w/e 27/02/1960 3D Aston
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40675 on 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 05/11/1955 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40559 8w/e 29/11/1952 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 05/11/1955 6A w/e 21/12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42178 8w/e 19/06/1954 6H Bangor 4w/e 05/11/1955 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75031 4w/e 26/02/1955 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A 4w/e 18/05/1957 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75032 4w/e 26/02/1955 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A m/e 16/06/1956 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40679 4w/e 07/10/1950 8E Brunswick 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45057 4w/e 17/07/1951 10C Patricroft 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A 4w/e 08/09/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45312 on 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 31/12/1955 6A w/e 09/01/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44773 4w/e 02/12/1950 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 21/04/1956 6A 4w/e 19/05/1956 8A Edge Hill
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75049 4w/e 05/11/1955 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956 6A 4w/e 11/08/1956 27A Bank Hall
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46459 4w/e 27/02/1954 12D Workington 4w/e 19/05/1956 6A m/e 16/06/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42465 3w/e 11/12/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) m/e 16/06/1956 6A 4w/e 11/08/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 4w/e 19/05/1956 24A Accrington 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46459 m/e 16/06/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 3A Bescot
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42563 4w/e 04/10/1952 10C Patricroft 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 10C Patricroft
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42610 on 01/01/1948 1C Watford 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75032 m/e 16/06/1956 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 m/e 16/06/1956 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80045 4w/e 29/01/1955 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80047 3w/e 24/01/1953 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80048 on 13/10/1952 14B Kentish Town (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A w/e 19/09/1964 6D Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80049 on 24/10/1952 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80050 on 06/11/1952 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80051 on 21/11/1952 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80052 on 05/12/1952 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 09/04/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80053 on 22/12/1952 26A Newton Heath (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059 on 03/03/1953 14B Kentish Town (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 17/05/1958 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80062 on 29/04/1953 14B Kentish Town (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 22/02/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80063 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 23/02/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80086 4w/e 11/08/1956 25A Wakefield 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 23/02/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45441 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A Longsight 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A 4w/e 26/01/1957 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42315 4w/e 06/10/1956 5D Stoke 4w/e 03/11/1956 6A 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75051       on 27/11/1956 (New) 6A 4w/e 12/07/1958 6K Rhyl
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12070 4w/e 25/02/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 01/12/1956 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12071 4w/e 25/02/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 01/12/1956 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42445 4w/e 27/02/1954 8E Brunswick 4w/e 01/12/1956 6A 4w/e 26/01/1957 8E Brunswick
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75053       m/e 01/1957 (New) 6A 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75054       on 17/01/1957 (New) 6A 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K Rhyl
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12082 4w/e 01/12/1956 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42303 m/e 16/06/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6D Chester Northgate
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42308 4w/e 06/10/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 6D Chester Northgate
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73071 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957 6A w/e 25/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44911 4w/e 18/02/1956 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 18/05/1957 6A 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12036 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A on 19/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12037 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A on 19/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7124 4w/e 06/11/1954 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A on 19/10/1968 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78057 4w/e 26/01/1957 6K Rhyl 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A 4w/e 30/11/1957 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80040 on 27/06/1952 1E Bletchley (New) 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42416 4w/e 24/04/1954 6H Bangor 4w/e 10/08/1957 6A 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44911 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot 4w/e 07/09/1957 6A w/e 09/01/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75014 4w/e 03/10/1953 6G Llandudno Junction 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75031 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K Rhyl 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A w/e 20/06/1959 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75050 m/e 10/1956 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42431 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 8w/e 05/10/1957 6A w/e 06/08/1960 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80091 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80092 4w/e 26/01/1957 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A 4w/e 09/04/1960 63A Perth South
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58293 4w/e 21/04/1956 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A 4w/e 17/05/1958 6K Rhyl
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47207 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 25/01/1958 6A w/e 15/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47208 4w/e 11/08/1956 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/01/1958 6A w/e 24/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80086 4w/e 23/02/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 22/02/1958 6A 4w/e 07/05/1960 64C Dalry Road
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42427 4w/e 21/04/1956 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/04/1958 6A 4w/e 17/05/1958 11B Workington
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58171 4w/e 28/12/1957 6K Rhyl 4w/e 17/05/1958 6A w/e 09/05/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42544 4w/e 30/11/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 17/05/1958 6A w/e 20/06/1959 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75034 4w/e 30/11/1957 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 10/06/1961 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75035 4w/e 30/11/1957 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 23/06/1962 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75051 4w/e 12/07/1958 6K Rhyl 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 23/06/1962 1E Bletchley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75053 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K Rhyl 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 18/06/1960 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75054 4w/e 14/06/1958 6K Rhyl 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 18/06/1960 6K Rhyl
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45041 4w/e 14/06/1958 26F Patricroft 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 09/01/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45042 3w/e 11/12/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/10/1958 6A w/e 20/06/1959 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45339 m/e 16/06/1956 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 08/11/1958 6A w/e 07/11/1959 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47269 4w/e 01/01/1955 2A Rugby w/e 22/11/1958 6A w/e 06/12/1958 2A Rugby
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47006 4w/e 10/08/1957 6H Bangor w/e 29/11/1958 6A w/e 20/06/1959 8D Widnes
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47371 on 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 13/12/1958 6A m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11114 4w/e 06/09/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 04/04/1959 6A w/e 26/12/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12053 4w/e 16/06/1957 2A Rugby w/e 04/04/1959 6A w/e 12/12/1964 1C Watford
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12054 4w/e 10/08/1957 2A Rugby w/e 04/04/1959 6A on 25/07/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3764       on 25/04/1959 (New) 6A w/e 29/08/1959 9A Longsight
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12005 4w/e 06/11/1954 5B Crewe South w/e 30/05/1959 6A w/e 16/01/1960 5B Crewe South
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42482 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden w/e 20/06/1959 6A w/e 06/08/1960 6H Bangor
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47006 w/e 20/06/1959 8D Widnes w/e 22/08/1959 6A w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3764 w/e 29/08/1959 9A Longsight w/e 29/08/1959 6A w/e 08/05/1971 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75013 4w/e 03/10/1953 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 12/09/1959 6A w/e 09/04/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75014 w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 12/09/1959 6A w/e 09/04/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75031 w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 12/09/1959 6A w/e 09/04/1960 6B Mold Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75032 4w/e 30/11/1957 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 12/09/1959 6A w/e 23/06/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45237 w/e 20/06/1959 6E Chester West w/e 19/09/1959 6A w/e 07/11/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73013 4w/e 16/07/1955 84K Chester West w/e 26/09/1959 6A w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73033 4w/e 14/06/1958 6E Chester West w/e 26/09/1959 6A w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70045 on 14/06/1954 6J Holyhead (New) w/e 07/11/1959 6A w/e 21/11/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70049 on 28/07/1954 6J Holyhead (New) w/e 07/11/1959 6A w/e 21/11/1959 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42079 6w/e 22/10/1959 73F Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 6A w/e 12/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46472 w/e 20/12/1958 2A Rugby w/e 09/01/1960 6A w/e 30/04/1960 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42417 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D Chester Northgate w/e 09/01/1960 6A w/e 20/08/1960 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73004 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73048 m/e 12/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 02/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42202 4w/e 21/11/1959 60B Aviemore w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42212 4w/e 06/10/1951 67D Ardrossan w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 26/06/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42213 8w/e 19/04/1952 68D Beattock w/e 06/02/1960 6A on 20/06/1965 51A Darlington
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42217 on 01/01/1948 27C Hamilton (West) w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 18/06/1960 24L Carnforth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42229 4w/e 07/10/1950 20E Manningham w/e 06/02/1960 6A on 18/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42236 8w/e 17/04/1954 66D Greenock Ladyburn w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 21/08/1965 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42238 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A Corkerhill w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 18/06/1960 12G Oxenholme
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42240 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A Corkerhill w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 26/06/1965 9K Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42247 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A Corkerhill w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42270 4w/e 01/08/1959 67A Corkerhill w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42198       w/e 06/02/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 5D Stoke
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12048 4w/e 10/09/1955 2A Rugby w/e 05/03/1960 6A on 25/01/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12057 4w/e 25/02/1956 2A Rugby w/e 05/03/1960 6A w/e 18/05/1968 8J Allerton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3630 4w/e 31/01/1952 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3665       w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3676 w/e 06/12/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3786       w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4602 w/e 06/09/1952 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5399 4w/e 08/10/1955 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6380 on 01/01/1934 101 Old Oak Common w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7762 4w/e 04/10/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8709 4w/e 04/10/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8729 4w/e 31/08/1951 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8730 4w/e 29/12/1956 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9728       w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 21/05/1960 88E Abercynon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9794       w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73014 4w/e 04/10/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73038 4w/e 03/10/1953 84K Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 17/11/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82001 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 82G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82002 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 15/04/1961 82G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82003 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82005 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82032 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 15/04/1961 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82034 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 22/04/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82036 4w/e 09/08/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 15/04/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40106 w/e 01/11/1958 6E Chester West w/e 09/04/1960 6A w/e 10/12/1960 24K Preston
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78018 5w/e 24/04/1954 51H Kirkby Stephen w/e 30/04/1960 6A w/e 23/06/1962 12F Workington
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78032 w/e 09/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 30/04/1960 6A w/e 13/06/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44869 w/e 02/04/1960 5A Crewe North w/e 11/06/1960 6A w/e 11/04/1961 2E Northampton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78032 w/e 30/04/1960 6A Chester (MR) w/e 13/06/1960 6A w/e 07/09/1963 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78033 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes w/e 13/06/1960 6A w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42209 w/e 06/02/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 30/07/1960 6A w/e 16/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42247 w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor w/e 06/08/1960 6A w/e 15/08/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42270 w/e 18/06/1960 6H Bangor w/e 06/08/1960 6A w/e 26/01/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42431 w/e 06/08/1960 6H Bangor w/e 20/08/1960 6A w/e 23/02/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42482 w/e 06/08/1960 6H Bangor w/e 20/08/1960 6A w/e 16/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42182 w/e 21/05/1960 21A Saltley w/e 20/08/1960 6A 4w/e 03/12/1960 87E Landore
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46420 w/e 18/06/1960 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1960 6A w/e 10/12/1960 2B Nuneaton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13176 w/e 10/09/1960 5B Crewe South w/e 24/09/1960 6A w/e 08/05/1971 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47648 w/e 17/09/1960 5C Stafford w/e 15/10/1960 6A w/e 20/05/1961 99C Crewe Works
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3851 w/e 03/10/1959 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 12/11/1960 6A w/e 03/12/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42463 w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 6A on 25/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42538 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden w/e 14/01/1961 6A on 17/06/1962 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42061 w/e 30/07/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/01/1961 6A w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40126 4w/e 10/09/1960 82G Templecombe (S&D) w/e 15/04/1961 6A on 20/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40205 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G Shrewsbury w/e 15/04/1961 6A w/e 10/06/1961 6H Bangor
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40110 4w/e 27/02/1960 84G Shrewsbury w/e 22/04/1961 6A w/e 10/06/1961 6H Bangor
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40085 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D Leamington w/e 29/04/1961 6A w/e 16/06/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40086 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A Shrewsbury w/e 29/04/1961 6A w/e 17/06/1961 8E Northwich
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40098 4w/e 31/12/1960 82G Templecombe (S&D) w/e 29/04/1961 6A w/e 16/06/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2386 on 24/03/1961 6F Bidston (New) w/e 13/05/1961 6A w/e 02/12/1961 21E Monument Lane
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40106 w/e 10/12/1960 24K Preston w/e 13/05/1961 6A w/e 16/06/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42202 w/e 22/04/1961 5D Stoke w/e 20/05/1961 6A on 22/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42198 w/e 22/04/1961 5D Stoke w/e 20/05/1961 6A w/e 23/06/1962 6H Bangor
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42950 w/e 04/02/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/06/1961 6A w/e 14/10/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42971 w/e 09/02/1952 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/06/1961 6A w/e 14/10/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42982 w/e 04/02/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/06/1961 6A w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45149 4w/e 22/03/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 10/06/1961 6A w/e 10/03/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47648 w/e 20/05/1961 99C Crewe Works w/e 24/06/1961 6A w/e 22/07/1961 12E Barrow in Furness
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42967 w/e 10/08/1957 6B Mold Junction w/e 10/08/1961 6A w/e 16/06/1962 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40086 w/e 17/06/1961 8E Northwich w/e 12/08/1961 6A w/e 26/08/1961 24L Carnforth
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2385 on 24/03/1961 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 02/09/1961 6A w/e 16/09/1961 8C Speke Junction
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2218 w/e 29/11/1958 6B Mold Junction w/e 09/09/1961 6A w/e 26/12/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2220 w/e 22/11/1958 6B Mold Junction w/e 09/09/1961 6A w/e 26/12/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4105       on 07/11/1961 (New) 6A 2w/e 23/09/1968 70B Feltham
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42781 w/e 16/09/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 05/05/1962 6A w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42933 w/e 16/09/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 05/05/1962 6A w/e 26/01/1963 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42934 w/e 10/06/1961 5A Crewe North w/e 05/05/1962 6A w/e 12/01/1963 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73033 w/e 14/05/1960 1A Willesden w/e 09/06/1962 6A w/e 16/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42783 on 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962 6A w/e 15/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42811 w/e 26/11/1960 2B Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962 6A w/e 14/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42681 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness w/e 23/06/1962 6A on 29/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44780 w/e 10/06/1961 1A Willesden w/e 23/06/1962 6A w/e 06/02/1965 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44916 w/e 19/08/1961 1A Willesden w/e 23/06/1962 6A w/e 13/10/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45256 w/e 07/11/1959 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 23/06/1962 6A w/e 13/10/1962 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45332 w/e 13/01/1962 21C Bushbury w/e 23/06/1962 6A w/e 15/09/1962 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42366 w/e 19/09/1959 1A Willesden w/e 30/06/1962 6A on 11/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73033 w/e 16/06/1962 1A Willesden w/e 28/07/1962 6A w/e 11/08/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3370 w/e 05/03/1960 8C Speke Junction w/e 25/08/1962 6A w/e 22/12/1962 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78018 w/e 23/06/1962 12F Workington w/e 06/10/1962 6A w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73067 w/e 06/02/1960 6J Holyhead w/e 09/02/1963 6A w/e 02/11/1963 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75010 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 09/03/1963 6A w/e 05/03/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75012 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 09/03/1963 6A w/e 08/01/1966 6F Machynlleth
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46470 w/e 23/06/1962 1C Watford w/e 09/03/1963 6A w/e 24/10/1964 2L Leamington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45403 w/e 22/11/1958 5B Crewe South w/e 06/04/1963 6A w/e 10/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45111 w/e 31/03/1962 1A Willesden w/e 27/04/1963 6A w/e 02/10/1965 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45427 w/e 15/09/1962 1A Willesden w/e 27/04/1963 6A w/e 20/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73157 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 25/05/1963 6A w/e 02/11/1963 1G Woodford Halse
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46505 w/e 30/03/1963 1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963 6A w/e 07/12/1963 2E Saltley
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46506 w/e 30/03/1963 1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963 6A w/e 07/12/1963 16D Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45031 w/e 19/01/1963 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 18/03/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45130 w/e 09/09/1961 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 02/10/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45184 w/e 25/11/1961 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 18/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45231 w/e 23/02/1963 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 01/04/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45419 w/e 22/07/1961 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 10/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45429 w/e 19/01/1963 2A Rugby w/e 22/06/1963 6A w/e 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42350 w/e 25/05/1963 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/07/1963 6A w/e 20/06/1964 5C Stafford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42482 w/e 22/06/1963 6H Bangor w/e 20/07/1963 6A on 24/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44844 w/e 18/08/1962 1A Willesden w/e 02/11/1963 6A w/e 28/11/1964 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45000 w/e 22/06/1963 6J Holyhead w/e 02/11/1963 6A w/e 27/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45044 w/e 26/10/1963 1A Willesden w/e 02/11/1963 6A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45198 w/e 07/04/1962 1A Willesden w/e 02/11/1963 6A w/e 02/10/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45305 w/e 31/03/1962 1A Willesden w/e 02/11/1963 6A w/e 21/08/1965 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42283 w/e 30/06/1962 6H Bangor w/e 01/02/1964 6A w/e 13/06/1964 6H Bangor
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45353 w/e 14/09/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/03/1964 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45438 w/e 14/09/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 07/03/1964 6A m/e 08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47437 w/e 21/12/1963 16C Derby w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 05/12/1964 2K Bushbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42252 w/e 30/06/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 21/08/1965 9K Bolton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44682 w/e 19/05/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44713 w/e 10/11/1962 2E Northampton w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45050 w/e 17/11/1962 2E Northampton w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45257 w/e 29/06/1963 5D Stoke w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45270 w/e 25/01/1964 1H Northampton w/e 20/06/1964 6A w/e 19/09/1964 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46457 w/e 13/01/1962 21B Bescot w/e 18/07/1964 6A w/e 24/10/1964 2L Leamington
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45250 w/e 18/04/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 18/07/1964 6A w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45660 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A Shrewsbury w/e 18/07/1964 6A w/e 05/09/1964 6D Shrewsbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42247 w/e 15/08/1964 5C Stafford w/e 03/10/1964 6A w/e 26/06/1965 10A Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45344 w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North w/e 12/12/1964 6A w/e 02/10/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44913 5w/e 16/07/1949 7B Bangor w/e 10/04/1965 6A w/e 29/04/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42606 w/e 20/06/1964 6H Bangor w/e 12/06/1965 6A w/e 26/06/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42251 w/e 20/06/1964 6H Bangor w/e 12/06/1965 6A w/e 21/08/1965 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42267 w/e 20/06/1964 6H Bangor w/e 12/06/1965 6A w/e 26/06/1965 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42283 w/e 13/06/1964 6H Bangor w/e 12/06/1965 6A w/e 21/08/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074 w/e 11/11/1961 6H Bangor w/e 12/06/1965 6A on 20/06/1965 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42477 w/e 25/11/1961 51A Darlington on 20/06/1965 6A on 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42109 on 20/04/1949 25F Low Moor (New) on 20/06/1965 6A on 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42224 w/e 23/06/1962 5D Stoke w/e 26/06/1965 6A w/e 21/08/1965 10C Fleetwood
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 26/06/1965 6A w/e 21/08/1965 12C Barrow in Furness
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76020 w/e 05/12/1964 5D Stoke w/e 31/07/1965 6A w/e 23/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76035 w/e 12/12/1964 1A Willesden w/e 31/07/1965 6A w/e 07/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76052 w/e 17/07/1965 2E Saltley w/e 07/08/1965 6A w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76095 w/e 16/01/1965 2J Aston w/e 07/08/1965 6A w/e 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1622 on 16/01/1965 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 11/09/1965 6A w/e 16/04/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47437 w/e 17/04/1965 2F Bescot w/e 16/10/1965 6A w/e 13/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76044 w/e 20/06/1964 5D Stoke w/e 12/03/1966 6A w/e 08/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76047 w/e 27/03/1965 2F Bescot w/e 19/03/1966 6A w/e 03/12/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3802 w/e 02/04/1966 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 05/02/1972 6J Holyhead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3832 on 01/01/1960 6B Mold Junction (New) w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 10/10/1970 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3833 on 01/01/1960 6B Mold Junction (New) w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 08/05/1971 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 12020 w/e 30/09/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 29/04/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76036 w/e 13/11/1965 2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 28/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47598 w/e 22/05/1965 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 23/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48090 w/e 12/01/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 25/03/1967 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48253 w/e 09/09/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 12/11/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48458 on 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 08/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48632 w/e 26/02/1966 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 12/11/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48655 w/e 15/09/1962 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 11/03/1967 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48697 w/e 26/02/1966 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 12/11/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48723 w/e 20/06/1964 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 11/03/1967 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48754 w/e 02/10/1965 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 27/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44917 w/e 20/06/1959 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44971 w/e 23/09/1961 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 23/07/1966 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45325 4w/e 24/04/1954 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 20/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45369 w/e 19/06/1965 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6A w/e 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 w/e 09/04/1966 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/04/1966 6A w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75046 w/e 16/04/1966 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/04/1966 6A w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75048 4w/e 05/11/1955 27A Bank Hall w/e 30/04/1966 6A w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75060 w/e 02/04/1966 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/04/1966 6A w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47266 w/e 31/10/1964 6J Holyhead w/e 23/07/1966 6A w/e 10/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47391 w/e 25/04/1964 5B Crewe South w/e 23/07/1966 6A m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47507 w/e 09/02/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 23/07/1966 6A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47673 w/e 22/05/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 10/09/1966 6A w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44840 w/e 03/01/1966 2D Banbury w/e 10/09/1966 6A w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45089 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 10/09/1966 6A w/e 29/04/1967 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3004 4w/e 10/09/1960 84F Stourbridge Junction w/e 01/10/1966 6A w/e 11/03/1967 6J Holyhead
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12077 w/e 16/04/1966 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 01/10/1966 6A w/e 03/04/1971 9A Longsight
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44766 w/e 28/05/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 29/04/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44875 w/e 28/05/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 20/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45042 w/e 23/04/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45064 w/e 28/05/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45277 w/e 04/12/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 25/02/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45282 w/e 02/03/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 11/03/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45298 w/e 27/11/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45345 w/e 13/11/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1966 6A w/e 20/05/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44771 w/e 04/06/1966 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 6A w/e 18/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44831 w/e 04/06/1966 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 6A w/e 20/05/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45116 w/e 23/04/1966 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 6A w/e 20/05/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45247 w/e 10/04/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 6A w/e 08/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45280 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 10/12/1966 6A w/e 29/04/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76037 w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley w/e 04/02/1967 6A w/e 08/04/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76088 w/e 26/03/1966 2B Oxley w/e 25/02/1967 6A w/e 10/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76039 w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 08/04/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76041 w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 01/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48073 w/e 10/12/1966 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 08/04/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48603 w/e 02/10/1965 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 10/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48645 w/e 10/12/1966 2E Saltley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 27/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44661 w/e 12/11/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44805 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44876 w/e 16/10/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44944 w/e 02/10/1965 2B Oxley w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 29/04/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45052 w/e 12/11/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967 6A w/e 15/04/1967 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48018 w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South w/e 15/04/1967 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48287 w/e 26/03/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 15/04/1967 6A w/e 10/06/1967 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3085 w/e 05/03/1966 2A Tyseley w/e 22/04/1967 6A on 18/12/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3046 2w/e 23/09/1968 91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/10/1968 6A w/e 23/03/1974 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3046 2w/e 23/09/1968 91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/10/1968 6A w/e 23/03/1974 TI Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3038 w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot w/e 19/10/1968 6A w/e 21/10/1972 9A Longsight
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4112 w/e 05/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel w/e 16/11/1968 6A w/e 07/12/1968 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4157 w/e 04/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 16/11/1968 6A w/e 10/10/1970 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12071 w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot w/e 11/01/1969 6A w/e 10/10/1970 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2867 w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 06/06/1970 6A w/e 06/06/1970 O/L  
Diesel 02 0-4-0 D2867 w/e 06/06/1970 O/L   w/e 22/08/1970 6A on 12/09/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12074 w/e 18/05/1968 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/12/1971 6A on 01/01/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3247 w/e 12/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel 2w/e 01/01/1972 6A w/e 05/02/1972 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3084 w/e 27/01/1968 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 05/02/1972 6A w/e 24/11/1973 HD Holyhead