Depot: Carnforth
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Carnforth | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 5993 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 11A | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 5999 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 11A | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5560 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 30A | Corkerhill | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5586 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 11A | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2921 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5039 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5333 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5343 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5392 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3329 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3757 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3760 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4060 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4374 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 20/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7317 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7406 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7409 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7503 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 11D | Oxenholme | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8934 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9151 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9109 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9188 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 10/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9269 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9314 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 1 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 41 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | on | 01/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 103 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2428 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2431 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2601 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2613 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 11D | Oxenholme | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2267 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5039 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | Carnforth | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5050 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5291 | m/e | 12/1936 | 2A | Rugby (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5306 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5333 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | Carnforth | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5343 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | Carnforth | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5392 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11A | Carnforth | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5427 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2573 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2581 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5495 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11A | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4075 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4192 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4399 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 136 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9023 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 11A | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5193 | m/e | 09/1931 | Withdrawn | w/e | 05/06/1948 (R) | 11A | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49241 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 11A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 11A | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8894 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 11A | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44374 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 11A | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 68 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 11A | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 11A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44709 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44904 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9112 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 11A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45333 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 11A | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49241 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 11A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9129 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 11A | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49438 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 11A | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49257 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 11A | on | 04/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44915 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 11A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45235 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 11A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40070 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44905 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 11A | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44874 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44874 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45004 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45004 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 11A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 11A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49252 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 11A | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 11A | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49143 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 11A | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 11A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 11A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40011 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 11A | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49434 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49434 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 11A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44892 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45019 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44892 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45019 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 11A | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45017 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 11A | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45054 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40011 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61C | Keith |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45054 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 11A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45387 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 11A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 11A | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45092 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 11A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45326 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44306 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 11A | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43984 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 11A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45327 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 11A | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44454 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 11A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12F | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42591 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 11A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45097 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 11A | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47373 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 11A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 11A | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45037 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 11A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42427 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 11A | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45291 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 11A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45230 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 11A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42542 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 11A | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45014 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11A | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45046 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45291 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11A | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 11A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43240 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45303 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44904 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6J | Holyhead | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 11A | w/e | 25/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49394 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 11A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42320 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 11A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42591 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 11A | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 11A | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24L | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44892 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24L | w/e | 08/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44469 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47342 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 24L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45317 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 24L | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45494 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 24L | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49428 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 24L | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49439 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 24L | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44305 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44445 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44905 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44939 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45494 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45431 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 24L | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40011 | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 67A | Corkerhill | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 24L | on | 06/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44905 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24L | m/e | 11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45370 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24L | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45500 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45510 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45539 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45547 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45511 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 24L | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44083 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44345 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11D | Tebay | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45501 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45546 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45548 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43908 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3838 | on | 02/01/1960 (New) | 24L | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21D | Aston | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3839 | on | 02/01/1960 (New) | 24L | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45592 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45632 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45676 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45686 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90212 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47401 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24L | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 5E | Alsager |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3840 | on | 16/01/1960 (New) | 24L | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | Monument Lane | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3841 | on | 06/02/1960 (New) | 24L | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90178 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24L | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3841 | on | 06/02/1960 | 24L | Carnforth (New) | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 24L | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40081 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 24L | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45592 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 24L | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42578 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47288 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47471 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42217 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45503 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45097 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 24L | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40016 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 24L | on | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 24L | on | 27/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49428 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49449 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45513 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40081 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 24L | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40118 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 24L | on | 19/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47473 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47514 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47522 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 12F | Workington |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47668 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 24L | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45394 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 24L | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47662 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 24L | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40206 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 24L | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 10/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 11/03/1961 | 24L | on | 18/07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46211 | on | 21/11/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 11/03/1961 | 24L | m/e | 07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 24L | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42319 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | on | 19/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42359 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | on | 24/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45000 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45002 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44302 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 12F | Workington | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24L | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24L | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45344 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24L | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44874 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 24L | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40086 | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46200 | on | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 02/09/1961 | 24L | on | 27/01/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49196 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 24L | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45582 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 24L | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45633 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 24L | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 18/07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 09/09/1961 | 24L | on | 27/01/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45696 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45714 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24L | on | 20/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45730 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 24L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44445 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 24L | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42578 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 65C | Parkhead | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 24L | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40138 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44016 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 24L | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44060 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 24L | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47520 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 24L | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44016 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45587 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24L | w/e | 15/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45604 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45613 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45625 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24L | on | 07/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45629 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24L | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45543 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45550 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42322 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 31/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42358 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42369 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42457 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11D | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42464 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10B | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42571 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | on | 09/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42594 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | on | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42238 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42415 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 12H | Tebay |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42613 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45340 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45398 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45399 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42315 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 24L | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4139 | on | 11/07/1962 (New) | 24L | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42378 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24L | on | 18/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4140 | on | 02/08/1962 (New) | 24L | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4141 | on | 08/08/1962 (New) | 24L | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4142 | on | 17/08/1962 (New) | 24L | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45306 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 24L | w/e | 30/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44081 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 24L | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44390 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 24L | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 12F | Workington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 24L | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90392 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 24L | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 24L | on | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47287 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42238 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | on | 12/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44948 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 24H | Hellifield | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45092 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 16/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 24H | Hellifield | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45354 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24L | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42299 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 24L | on | 20/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45181 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 24L | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45329 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 24L | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4156 | on | 21/12/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre (New) | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 24L | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4157 | on | 28/12/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre (New) | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 24L | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45645 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 24L | on | 19/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48519 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48712 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45604 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10A | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 10A | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44390 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 12F | Workington | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10A | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42198 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10A | on | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44386 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 10A | w/e | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44464 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 10A | w/e | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44439 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 10A | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42309 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 10A | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44300 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 10A | w/e | 04/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42147 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 10A | on | 01/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47317 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47375 | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 08/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47468 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47599 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47616 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47641 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47662 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44211 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 10A | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42680 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 10A | on | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45095 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45294 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 10A | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42154 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 10A | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47362 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47531 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45328 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10A | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45154 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45451 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44733 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | w/e | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44778 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45286 | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 10B | Blackpool Central | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45495 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10B | Blackpool Central | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | w/e | 04/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45227 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43066 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 10A | on | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43095 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 10A | on | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43105 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 10A | on | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43011 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43036 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43103 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 10A | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43045 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 10A | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42105 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 10A | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42247 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10A | on | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42118 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10A | on | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45212 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45342 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44894 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44809 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10A | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45374 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10A | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48365 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48739 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45017 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45437 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46400 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46499 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44987 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10A | w/e | 22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45424 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10A | w/e | 20/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 10A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46422 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46431 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46433 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46441 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46486 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46514 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 25/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44667 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | m/e | 08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44758 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44889 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 27/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45014 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45025 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45193 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | m/e | 08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45373 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45394 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45435 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45445 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43004 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43023 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 10A | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48247 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46522 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 10A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92212 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84E | Tyseley | on | 29/10/1966 | 10A | on | 30/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3008 | on | 27/12/1952 | 67B | Hurlford (New) | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3826 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10A | on | 24/06/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92087 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92118 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92128 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10A | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48384 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10A | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45001 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 10A | w/e | 16/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45134 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43119 | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 10A | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3566 | on | 05/12/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor (New) | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | D2500 | on | 31/12/1955 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | D2502 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | D2503 | on | 31/01/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75019 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75039 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75015 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 11/02/1967 | 10A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3200 | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92077 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75041 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 27/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75042 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 04/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75058 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75059 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2274 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75021 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 10A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48400 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 10A | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48451 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10A | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2392 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75020 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75043 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92016 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75009 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75010 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75040 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75048 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75062 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7638 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 15/07/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7638 | w/e | 15/07/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 10A | w/e | 22/07/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44897 | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44963 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 10A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D245 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 10A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92088 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 10A | w/e | 27/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92167 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 10A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2390 | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | on | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70013 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | on | 17/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75019 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | Tebay | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 17/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92004 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92009 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92223 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | w/e | 13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92091 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92160 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44877 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45231 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3007 | w/e | 05/11/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 10A | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73069 | w/e | 13/04/1968 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44735 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44781 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 17/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44809 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44871 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 17/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45200 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45206 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45268 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45310 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45330 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn |